Your recipients will receive an email with this envelope shortly and will be able to access it on trellis. You can always see your envelopes by clicking the Inbox on the top right hand corner.
RALPH BLAHNIK VS. RALPH CHARLES NEGRINO
A Pi/Pd/Wd - Auto case was filed in the jurisdiction of Orange County. Judge Peter J. Wilson presiding.
Case Details
Case Number
Filing Date
August 26, 2016
Last Refreshed
May 04, 2023
Filing Location
Orange County, CA
Category
PI/PD/WD - AUTO
Practice Area
Torts
Matter Type
Automobile
Case Duration
1 year, 6 months and 9 days
Time To Trial
5 months and 30 days
Case Documents
Case Events
Date | Type | Description | |
---|---|---|---|
March 06, 2018 | Docket Event | E-FILING TRANSACTION 2646868 RECEIVED ON 03/05/2018 03:40:22 PM. | |
March 05, 2018 | Docket Event | REQUEST FOR DISMISSAL WITH PREJUDICE - ENTIRE ACTION FILED BY BLAHNIK, RALPH ON 03/05/2018 |
|
March 05, 2018 | Docket Event | CASE DISMISSED WITH DISPOSITION OF REQUEST FOR DISMISSAL | |
March 05, 2018 | Docket Event | COMPLAINT DISPOSED WITH DISPOSITION OF REQUEST FOR DISMISSAL. | |
January 29, 2018 | Docket Event | PAYMENT RECEIVED BY LAW OFFICES OF CHRISTOPHER LOMBARDI FOR 210 - COURT REPORTING SERVICES IN CIVIL PROCEEDINGS LASTING UNDER 1 HOUR IN THE AMOUNT OF 30.00, TRANSACTION NUMBER 12290033 AND RECEIPT NUMBER 12113777. |
|
January 23, 2018 | Docket Event | CLERK'S CERTIFICATE OF SERVICE BY MAIL (OUT OF PROCESS) GENERATED |
|
January 19, 2018 | Docket Event |
ORDER TO SHOW CAUSE RE: DISMISSAL ON SETTLED CASE SCHEDULED FOR 03/16/2018 AT 08:30:00 AM IN C15 AT CENTRAL JUSTICE CENTER.
Judge: Peter J. Wilson |
|
January 19, 2018 | Docket Event | MINUTES FINALIZED FOR MANDATORY SETTLEMENT CONFERENCE 01/19/2018 08:30:00 AM. |
|
January 19, 2018 | Docket Event | THE ORDER TO SHOW CAUSE RE: DISMISSAL ON SETTLED CASE IS SCHEDULED FOR 03/16/2018 AT 08:30 AM IN DEPARTMENT C15. | |
January 17, 2018 | Docket Event | E-FILING TRANSACTION 3626655 RECEIVED ON 01/17/2018 12:13:25 PM. | |
January 17, 2018 | Docket Event | MANDATORY SETTLEMENT CONFERENCE STATEMENT RECEIVED ON 01/17/2018. | |
March 03, 2017 | Docket Event | MINUTES FINALIZED FOR CASE MANAGEMENT CONFERENCE 02/24/2017 09:00:00 AM. |
|
March 02, 2017 | Docket Event | E-FILING TRANSACTION 4683461 RECEIVED ON 02/24/2017 12:45:53 PM. | |
March 02, 2017 | Docket Event | PAYMENT RECEIVED BY DDSLEGAL FOR 209 - ADVANCED JURY FEE (NON-REFUNDABLE) IN THE AMOUNT OF 150.00, TRANSACTION NUMBER 12115199 AND RECEIPT NUMBER 11939005. |
|
February 24, 2017 | Docket Event |
JURY TRIAL SCHEDULED FOR 02/20/2018 AT 09:00:00 AM IN C15 AT CENTRAL JUSTICE CENTER.
Judge: Peter J. Wilson |
|
February 24, 2017 | Docket Event |
MANDATORY SETTLEMENT CONFERENCE SCHEDULED FOR 01/19/2018 AT 08:30:00 AM IN C15 AT CENTRAL JUSTICE CENTER.
Judge: Peter J. Wilson |
|
February 24, 2017 | Docket Event | THE JURY TRIAL IS SCHEDULED FOR 02/20/2018 AT 09:00 AM IN DEPARTMENT C15. | |
February 24, 2017 | Docket Event | NOTICE OF POSTING JURY FEES FILED BY BLAHNIK, RALPH ON 02/24/2017 |
|
February 24, 2017 | Docket Event | THE MANDATORY SETTLEMENT CONFERENCE IS SCHEDULED FOR 01/19/2018 AT 08:30 AM IN DEPARTMENT C15. | |
February 24, 2017 | Docket Event | NOTICE OF RULING FILED BY BLAHNIK, RALPH ON 02/24/2017 |
|
February 24, 2017 | Docket Event | SUBSTITUTION OF ATTORNEY FILED BY BLAHNIK, RALPH ON 02/24/2017 |
|
February 23, 2017 | Docket Event | CASE MANAGEMENT STATEMENT FILED BY NEGRINO, ROBERT ON 02/23/2017 |
|
February 23, 2017 | Docket Event | E-FILING TRANSACTION 3514374 RECEIVED ON 02/23/2017 02:32:04 PM. | |
February 09, 2017 | Docket Event |
CASE MANAGEMENT CONFERENCE SCHEDULED FOR 02/24/2017 AT 09:00:00 AM IN C15 AT CENTRAL JUSTICE CENTER.
Judge: Peter J. Wilson |
|
February 08, 2017 | Docket Event | PAYMENT RECEIVED BY ONELEGAL FOR 195 - ANSWER OR OTHER 1ST PAPER, 209 - ADVANCED JURY FEE (NON-REFUNDABLE) IN THE AMOUNT OF 585.00, TRANSACTION NUMBER 12104521 AND RECEIPT NUMBER 11928442. |
|
February 08, 2017 | Docket Event | NOTICE OF POSTING JURY FEES FILED BY NEGRINO, ROBERT ON 02/08/2017 |
|
February 08, 2017 | Docket Event | Answer to Complaint FILED BY NEGRINO, ROBERT ON 02/08/2017 |
|
February 08, 2017 | Docket Event | E-FILING TRANSACTION 4674922 RECEIVED ON 02/08/2017 09:39:06 AM. | |
February 07, 2017 | Docket Event | E-FILING TRANSACTION 2528731 RECEIVED ON 02/06/2017 04:50:13 PM. | |
February 06, 2017 | Docket Event | NOTICE OF CHANGE OF ADDRESS AND/OR TELEPHONE FILED BY BLAHNIK, RALPH ON 02/06/2017 |
|
February 06, 2017 | Docket Event | CASE MANAGEMENT STATEMENT FILED BY BLAHNIK, RALPH ON 02/06/2017 |
|
February 06, 2017 | Docket Event | NOTICE OF CONTINUANCE FILED BY BLAHNIK, RALPH ON 02/06/2017 |
|
February 01, 2017 | Docket Event |
CASE MANAGEMENT CONFERENCE SCHEDULED FOR 02/03/2017 AT 09:00:00 AM IN C15 AT CENTRAL JUSTICE CENTER.
Judge: Peter J. Wilson |
|
February 01, 2017 | Docket Event | MINUTES FINALIZED FOR CHAMBERS WORK 02/01/2017 09:58:00 AM. |
|
February 01, 2017 | Docket Event | CASE MANAGEMENT CONFERENCE CONTINUED TO 02/03/2017 AT 09:00 AM IN THIS DEPARTMENT. | |
February 01, 2017 | Docket Event | MINUTE ORDER DATED 01/13/2017 CORRECTED NUNC PRO TUNC. | |
February 01, 2017 | Docket Event | CLERK'S CERTIFICATE OF MAILING/ELECTRONIC SERVICE |
|
January 17, 2017 | Docket Event | MINUTES FINALIZED FOR CASE MANAGEMENT CONFERENCE 01/13/2017 09:00:00 AM. |
|
January 13, 2017 | Docket Event |
CASE MANAGEMENT CONFERENCE SCHEDULED FOR 02/04/2017 AT 09:00:00 AM IN C15 AT CENTRAL JUSTICE CENTER.
Judge: Peter J. Wilson |
|
January 13, 2017 | Docket Event | CASE MANAGEMENT CONFERENCE CONTINUED TO 02/04/2017 AT 09:00 AM IN THIS DEPARTMENT. | |
December 29, 2016 | Docket Event | CASE MANAGEMENT STATEMENT FILED BY BLAHNIK, RALPH ON 12/29/2016 |
|
December 29, 2016 | Docket Event | E-FILING TRANSACTION 1361263 RECEIVED ON 12/29/2016 12:39:29 PM. | |
December 27, 2016 | Docket Event | E-FILING TRANSACTION 4654002 RECEIVED ON 12/27/2016 12:39:54 PM. | |
December 27, 2016 | Docket Event | PROOF OF SERVICE OF Summons FILED BY BLAHNIK, RALPH ON 12/27/2016 |
|
December 23, 2016 | Docket Event | E-FILING TRANSACTION 4652999 RECEIVED ON 12/22/2016 01:04:49 PM. | |
December 22, 2016 | Docket Event | DECLARATION OF DUE DILIGENCE FILED BY BLAHNIK, RALPH ON 12/22/2016 |
|
November 08, 2016 | Docket Event | CLERK'S CERTIFICATE OF SERVICE BY MAIL (OUT OF PROCESS) GENERATED | |
November 07, 2016 | Docket Event | AMENDMENT TO COMPLAINT FILED BY BLAHNIK, RALPH ON 11/07/2016 |
|
November 02, 2016 | Docket Event | E-FILING TRANSACTION 2505794 RECEIVED ON 11/01/2016 09:44:00 AM. | |
November 01, 2016 | Docket Event | AMENDMENT TO COMPLAINT (INCORRECT NAME) RECEIVED ON 11/01/2016. |
|
September 21, 2016 | Docket Event |
CASE MANAGEMENT CONFERENCE SCHEDULED FOR 01/13/2017 AT 09:00:00 AM IN C15 AT CENTRAL JUSTICE CENTER.
Judge: Peter J. Wilson |
|
August 26, 2016 | Docket Event | COMPLAINT FILED BY BLAHNIK, RALPH ON 08/26/2016 |
|
August 26, 2016 | Docket Event | E-FILING TRANSACTION 3450935 RECEIVED ON 08/26/2016 12:46:01 PM. | |
August 26, 2016 | Docket Event | Civil Case Cover Sheet FILED BY BLAHNIK, RALPH ON 08/26/2016 |
|
August 26, 2016 | Docket Event | CASE ASSIGNED TO JUDICIAL OFFICER WILSON, PETER ON 08/26/2016. |
|
August 26, 2016 | Docket Event | Summons ISSUED AND FILED FILED BY BLAHNIK, RALPH ON 08/26/2016 |
|
August 26, 2016 | Docket Event | PAYMENT RECEIVED BY DDSLEGAL FOR 194 - COMPLAINT OR OTHER 1ST PAPER IN THE AMOUNT OF 435.00, TRANSACTION NUMBER 12021000 AND RECEIPT NUMBER 11845028. |
|