Case Last Refreshed: 1 year ago
Neda Majidimehr, filed a(n) Automobile - Torts case against Norman Morey, Jonathan Scott Morey, in the jurisdiction of Orange County. This case was filed in Orange County Superior Courts with Walter P. Schwarm presiding.
Case Number |
||
Filing DateAugust 26, 2016 |
CategoryPi/Pd/Wd - Auto |
Time To Trial133 days |
Last RefreshedMay 04, 2023 |
Practice AreaTorts |
Time to Dismissal Following Dispositive Motions187 days |
Filing LocationOrange County, CA |
Matter TypeAutomobile |
|
Case Cycle Time188 days |
CASE MANAGEMENT CONFERENCE SCHEDULED FOR 01/06/2017 AT 09:00:00 AM IN C19 AT CENTRAL JUSTICE CENTER.
Date: 2016-09-12T00:00:00NOTICE OF POSTING JURY FEES FILED BY MOREY, JONATHAN SCOTT; MOREY, NORMAN ON 12/12/2016
Date: 2016-12-12T00:00:00SUMMONS ISSUED AND FILED FILED BY MAJIDIMEHR, NEDA ON 10/12/2016
Date: 2016-10-12T00:00:00CASE MANAGEMENT STATEMENT FILED BY MOREY, JONATHAN SCOTT; MOREY, NORMAN ON 12/12/2016
Date: 2016-12-12T00:00:00CIVIL CASE COVER SHEET FILED BY MAJIDIMEHR, NEDA ON 08/26/2016
Date: 2016-08-26T00:00:00COMPLAINT FILED BY MAJIDIMEHR, NEDA ON 08/26/2016
Date: 2016-08-26T00:00:00PROOF OF SERVICE OF 30-DAY SUMMONS & COMPLAINT - PERSONAL FILED BY MAJIDIMEHR, NEDA ON 10/31/2016
Date: 2016-10-31T00:00:00CASE MANAGEMENT STATEMENT FILED BY MAJIDIMEHR, NEDA ON 12/19/2016
Date: 2016-12-19T00:00:00CASE ASSIGNED TO JUDICIAL OFFICER SCHWARM, WALTER ON 08/26/2016.
Date: 2016-08-26T00:00:00ANSWER TO COMPLAINT FILED BY MOREY, JONATHAN SCOTT; MOREY, NORMAN ON 12/12/2016
Date: 2016-12-12T00:00:00NOTICE OF RULING FILED BY MAJIDIMEHR, NEDA ON 01/11/2017
Date: January 11, 2017MINUTES FINALIZED FOR CASE MANAGEMENT CONFERENCE 01/06/2017 09:00:00 AM.
Date: January 06, 2017For full print and download access, please subscribe at https://www.trellis.law/.