Case Last Refreshed: 6 months ago
Driscoll & Company, Inc., filed a(n) Breach of Contract - Commercial case against Angela C. Driscoll, Angela C. Driscoll, Trustee Of The Elo, in the jurisdiction of Orange County. This case was filed in Orange County Superior Courts with James J. Di Cesare presiding.
Case Number |
JudgeJames J. Di Cesare Track Judge’s New Cases |
|
Filing DateAugust 26, 2016 |
CategoryBreach Of Contract/Warranty |
Time To Trial213 days |
Last RefreshedOctober 18, 2023 |
Practice AreaCommercial |
Time to Dismissal Following Dispositive Motions598 days |
Filing LocationOrange County, CA |
Matter TypeBreach of Contract |
|
Case Cycle Time854 days |
DEMURRER TO COMPLAINT FILED BY DRISCOLL, ANGELA C. ON 10/31/2016
Date: 2016-10-31T00:00:00NOTICE OF HEARING (OF CASE MANAGEMENT CONFERENCE) FILED BY DRISCOLL & COMPANY, INC. ON 11/07/2016
Date: 2016-11-07T00:00:00POINTS AND AUTHORITIES FILED BY DRISCOLL & COMPANY, INC. ON 04/28/2017
Date: 2017-04-28T00:00:00CLERK'S CERTIFICATE OF MAILING/ELECTRONIC SERVICE
Date: 2017-05-15T00:00:00MINUTES FINALIZED FOR CASE MANAGEMENT CONFERENCE 02/27/2017 09:00:00 AM.
Date: 2017-02-28T00:00:00NOTICE OF POSTING JURY FEES FILED BY DRISCOLL & COMPANY, INC. ON 02/14/2017
Date: 2017-02-14T00:00:00NOTICE - OTHER FILED BY DRISCOLL & COMPANY, INC. ON 10/18/2017
Date: 2017-10-18T00:00:00MINUTES FINALIZED FOR MANDATORY SETTLEMENT CONFERENCE 10/20/2017 09:00:00 AM.
Date: 2017-10-20T00:00:00MOTION FOR JUDGMENT ON THE PLEADINGS FILED BY DRISCOLL, ANGELA C. ON 03/15/2017
Date: 2017-03-15T00:00:00MINUTES FINALIZED FOR CASE MANAGEMENT CONFERENCE 03/27/2017 09:00:00 AM.
Date: 2017-03-27T00:00:00STATEMENT OF COMPLIANCE FILED BY DRISCOLL & COMPANY, INC. ON 11/03/2017
Date: 2017-11-03T00:00:00WITNESS LIST FILED BY DRISCOLL & COMPANY, INC. ON 11/03/2017
Date: 2017-11-03T00:00:00EXHIBIT LIST FILED BY DRISCOLL & COMPANY, INC. ON 11/03/2017
Date: 2017-11-03T00:00:00TRIAL BRIEF FILED BY DRISCOLL & COMPANY, INC. ON 11/03/2017
Date: 2017-11-03T00:00:00NOTICE OF LODGING FILED BY DRISCOLL & COMPANY, INC. ON 11/03/2017
Date: 2017-11-03T00:00:00MINUTES FINALIZED FOR JURY TRIAL 11/09/2017 09:00:00 AM.
Date: 2017-11-09T00:00:00MINUTES FINALIZED FOR JURY TRIAL 11/13/2017 11:15:00 AM.
Date: 2017-11-13T00:00:00MINUTES FINALIZED FOR MOTION FOR JUDGMENT ON THE PLEADINGS 05/15/2017 01:30:00 PM.
Date: 2017-05-15T00:00:00STATEMENT OF CONTROVERTED ISSUES FILED BY DRISCOLL & COMPANY, INC. ON 11/03/2017
Date: 2017-11-03T00:00:00MINUTES FINALIZED FOR COURT TRIAL 2018-02-06 09:00:00.0.
Date: 2018-02-06T00:00:00MINUTES FINALIZED FOR COURT TRIAL 02/07/2018 09:00:00 AM.
Date: 2018-02-08T00:00:00MINUTES FINALIZED FOR JURY TRIAL 11/06/2017 09:00:00 AM.
Date: 2017-11-07T00:00:00MINUTES FINALIZED FOR JURY TRIAL 11/07/2017 09:00:00 AM.
Date: 2017-11-08T00:00:00MINUTES FINALIZED FOR JURY TRIAL 11/08/2017 09:00:00 AM.
Date: 2017-11-09T00:00:00CLERK'S CERTIFICATE OF MAILING/ELECTRONIC SERVICE
Date: 2017-11-09T00:00:00MINUTES FINALIZED FOR COURT TRIAL 02/13/2018 09:00:00 AM.
Date: 2018-02-21T00:00:00MINUTES FINALIZED FOR COURT TRIAL 02/05/2018 09:00:00 AM.
Date: 2018-02-05T00:00:00TRIAL BRIEF FILED BY DRISCOLL & COMPANY, INC. ON 03/05/2018
Date: 2018-03-05T00:00:00MINUTES FINALIZED FOR COURT TRIAL 02/20/2018 09:00:00 AM.
Date: 2018-02-20T00:00:00DECLARATION - OTHER (BRIEF RE MEASURE DAMAGES) FILED BY DRISCOLL & COMPANY, INC. ON 02/14/2018
Date: 2018-02-14T00:00:00EXHIBIT LIST
Date: 2018-03-14T00:00:00RECEIPT FOR EXHIBITS (DEFENDANT) FILED BY THE SUPERIOR COURT OF ORANGE ON 04/02/2018
Date: 2018-04-02T00:00:00PROPOSED JUDGMENT RECEIVED ON 03/19/2018.
Date: 2018-03-19T00:00:00MINUTES FINALIZED FOR COURT TRIAL 02/26/2018 09:00:00 AM.
Date: 2018-03-19T00:00:00MINUTES FINALIZED FOR COURT TRIAL 03/06/2018 09:00:00 AM.
Date: 2018-03-19T00:00:00MINUTES FINALIZED FOR COURT TRIAL 03/07/2018 09:30:00 AM.
Date: 2018-03-19T00:00:00SUPPLEMENTAL (BRIEF) FILED BY DRISCOLL & COMPANY, INC. ON 03/06/2018
Date: 2018-03-06T00:00:00EXHIBIT RECEIPT - PLAINTIFF
Date: 2018-04-06T00:00:00DECLARATION - OTHER FILED BY DRISCOLL & COMPANY, INC. ON 07/24/2018
Date: July 24, 2018MINUTES FINALIZED FOR COURT TRIAL 03/13/2018 09:10:00 AM.
Date: 2018-03-20T00:00:00WRIT (ISSUED 7/25/18) RECEIVED ON 07/24/2018.
Date: July 24, 2018JOINT EXHIBIT LIST
Date: 2018-03-14T00:00:00NOTICE OF ENTRY OF JUDGMENT FILED BY DRISCOLL & COMPANY, INC. ON 05/21/2018
Date: May 21, 2018JUDGMENT (JUDGMENT AFTER BENCH TRIAL) FILED BY DRISCOLL & COMPANY, INC. ON 04/16/2018
Date: 2018-04-16T00:00:00MINUTES FINALIZED FOR COURT TRIAL 03/05/2018 09:15:00 AM.
Date: 2018-03-19T00:00:00MINUTES FINALIZED FOR COURT TRIAL 03/12/2018 09:30:00 AM.
Date: 2018-03-19T00:00:00MINUTES FINALIZED FOR COURT TRIAL 02/27/2018 09:00:00 AM.
Date: 2018-03-19T00:00:00MINUTES FINALIZED FOR COURT TRIAL 03/14/2018 09:10:00 AM.
Date: December 28, 2018CASE MANAGEMENT CONFERENCE SCHEDULED FOR 02/27/2017 AT 09:00:00 AM IN C34 AT CENTRAL JUSTICE CENTER.
Date: 2016-09-15T00:00:00CASE ASSIGNED TO JUDICIAL OFFICER GOODING, MARTHA ON 08/26/2016.
Date: 2016-08-26T00:00:00CIVIL CASE COVER SHEET FILED BY DRISCOLL & COMPANY, INC. ON 08/26/2016
Date: 2016-08-26T00:00:00CLERK'S CERTIFICATE OF MAILING/ELECTRONIC SERVICE
Date: 2016-12-19T00:00:00SUPPLEMENTAL (BRIEF IN SUPPORT OF MOTION) FILED BY DRISCOLL, ANGELA C. ON 01/12/2017
Date: 2017-01-12T00:00:00AMENDED COMPLAINT (FIRST) FILED BY DRISCOLL & COMPANY, INC. ON 01/31/2017
Date: 2017-01-31T00:00:00CASE MANAGEMENT STATEMENT FILED BY DRISCOLL, ANGELA C. ON 02/07/2017
Date: 2017-02-07T00:00:00NOTICE OF CONTINUANCE FILED BY DRISCOLL, ANGELA C. ON 12/20/2016
Date: 2016-12-20T00:00:00CASE MANAGEMENT STATEMENT FILED BY DRISCOLL & COMPANY, INC. ON 02/09/2017
Date: 2017-02-09T00:00:00COMPLAINT FILED BY DRISCOLL & COMPANY, INC. ON 08/26/2016
Date: 2016-08-26T00:00:00SUMMONS ISSUED AND FILED FILED BY DRISCOLL & COMPANY, INC. ON 08/26/2016
Date: 2016-08-26T00:00:00MINUTES FINALIZED FOR DEMURRER TO COMPLAINT 12/19/2016 01:30:00 PM.
Date: 2016-12-19T00:00:00REPLY TO OPPOSITION FILED BY DRISCOLL, ANGELA C. ON 12/12/2016
Date: 2016-12-12T00:00:00POINTS AND AUTHORITIES FILED BY DRISCOLL & COMPANY, INC. ON 12/05/2016
Date: 2016-12-05T00:00:00SUPPLEMENTAL FILED BY DRISCOLL & COMPANY, INC. ON 01/03/2017
Date: 2017-01-03T00:00:00MINUTES FINALIZED FOR DEMURRER TO COMPLAINT 01/30/2017 01:30:00 PM.
Date: 2017-02-02T00:00:00CLERK'S CERTIFICATE OF MAILING/ELECTRONIC SERVICE
Date: 2017-02-02T00:00:00NOTICE OF RULING FILED BY DRISCOLL, ANGELA C. ON 01/31/2017
Date: 2017-01-31T00:00:00For full print and download access, please subscribe at https://www.trellis.law/.