Case Last Refreshed: 7 months ago
Christopher Soldan, Kayla Ryan, filed a(n) Civil Rights case against An Tang Dao, Loan Thi Nguyen, in the jurisdiction of Orange County. This case was filed in Orange County Superior Courts with Andrew P. Banks presiding.
Case Number |
|
Filing DateAugust 26, 2016 |
CategoryCivil Rights |
Last RefreshedOctober 18, 2023 |
Time to Dismissal Following Dispositive Motions293 days |
Filing LocationOrange County, CA |
|
Case Cycle Time297 days |
SUMMONS ISSUED AND FILED FILED BY SOLDAN, CHRISTOPHER; RYAN, KAYLA ON 08/26/2016
Date: 2016-08-26T00:00:00PROOF OF SERVICE OF SUMMONS FILED BY SOLDAN, CHRISTOPHER; RYAN, KAYLA ON 09/22/2016
Date: 2016-09-22T00:00:00CASE MANAGEMENT CONFERENCE SCHEDULED FOR 01/26/2017 AT 09:00:00 AM IN C11 AT CENTRAL JUSTICE CENTER.
Date: 2016-09-20T00:00:00PROPOSED STIPULATION AND ORDER RECEIVED ON 10/19/2016
Date: 2016-10-19T00:00:00CIVIL CASE COVER SHEET FILED BY SOLDAN, CHRISTOPHER; RYAN, KAYLA ON 08/26/2016
Date: 2016-08-26T00:00:00CASE ASSIGNED TO JUDICIAL OFFICER BANKS, ANDREW ON 08/26/2016.
Date: 2016-08-26T00:00:00COMPLAINT FILED BY SOLDAN, CHRISTOPHER; RYAN, KAYLA ON 08/26/2016
Date: 2016-08-26T00:00:00PROPOSED STIPULATION AND ORDER RECEIVED ON 10/21/2016.
Date: 2016-10-21T00:00:00PROOF OF SERVICE FILED BY SOLDAN, CHRISTOPHER; RYAN, KAYLA ON 12/12/2016
Date: 2016-12-12T00:00:00MINUTES FINALIZED FOR CASE MANAGEMENT CONFERENCE 01/26/2017 09:00:00 AM.
Date: January 26, 2017E-FILING TRANSACTION NUMBER 1375187 REJECTED.
Date: March 27, 2017NOTICE OF SETTLEMENT FILED BY SOLDAN, CHRISTOPHER; RYAN, KAYLA ON 04/07/2017
Date: April 07, 2017CASE MANAGEMENT STATEMENT FILED BY DAO, AN TANG; NGUYEN, LOAN THI ON 01/12/2017
Date: 2017-01-12T00:00:00CASE MANAGEMENT STATEMENT FILED BY SOLDAN, CHRISTOPHER; RYAN, KAYLA ON 01/09/2017
Date: 2017-01-09T00:00:00ANSWER TO COMPLAINT FILED BY DAO, AN TANG; NGUYEN, LOAN THI ON 11/14/2016
Date: 2016-11-14T00:00:00For full print and download access, please subscribe at https://www.trellis.law/.