Case Last Refreshed: 1 year ago
Kurtz-Ahlers, Llc, filed a(n) Civil case against Haskell & White Llp, Elizabeth Mulder, Bank Of America, N.A., in the jurisdiction of Orange County. This case was filed in Orange County Superior Courts with Walter P. Schwarm presiding.
Case Number |
|
Filing DateJanuary 02, 2018 |
CategoryCivil |
Last RefreshedMay 04, 2023 |
|
Filing LocationOrange County, CA |
|
CASE MANAGEMENT CONFERENCE SCHEDULED FOR 10/14/2016 AT 09:00:00 AM IN C19 AT CENTRAL JUSTICE CENTER.
Date: 2016-07-13T00:00:00CIVIL CASE COVER SHEET FILED BY KURTZ-AHLERS, LLC ON 06/03/2016
Date: 2016-06-03T00:00:00COMPLAINT FILED BY KURTZ-AHLERS, LLC ON 06/03/2016
Date: 2016-06-03T00:00:00SUMMONS ISSUED AND FILED FILED BY KURTZ-AHLERS, LLC ON 06/03/2016
Date: 2016-06-03T00:00:00CASE MANAGEMENT STATEMENT FILED BY KURTZ-AHLERS, LLC ON 09/29/2016
Date: 2016-09-29T00:00:00CASE ASSIGNED TO JUDICIAL OFFICER SCHWARM, WALTER ON 06/03/2016.
Date: 2016-06-03T00:00:00AMENDED COMPLAINT (FIRST) FILED BY KURTZ-AHLERS, LLC ON 09/29/2016
Date: 2016-09-29T00:00:00PROOF OF SERVICE OF SUMMONS FILED BY KURTZ-AHLERS, LLC ON 10/12/2016
Date: 2016-10-12T00:00:00NOTICE OF RULING FILED BY KURTZ-AHLERS, LLC ON 10/17/2016
Date: 2016-10-17T00:00:00MINUTES FINALIZED FOR CASE MANAGEMENT CONFERENCE 10/14/2016 09:00:00 AM.
Date: 2016-10-14T00:00:00NOTICE OF POSTING JURY FEES FILED BY KURTZ-AHLERS, LLC ON 10/14/2016
Date: 2016-10-14T00:00:00PROOF OF SERVICE FILED BY KURTZ-AHLERS, LLC ON 10/17/2016
Date: 2016-10-17T00:00:00PROOF OF SERVICE OF SUMMONS FILED BY KURTZ-AHLERS, LLC ON 10/19/2016
Date: 2016-10-19T00:00:00ANSWER TO AMENDED COMPLAINT FILED BY BANK OF AMERICA, N.A. ON 11/10/2016
Date: 2016-11-10T00:00:00PROPOSED STIPULATION AND ORDER RECEIVED ON 11/22/2016
Date: 2016-11-22T00:00:00CASE MANAGEMENT STATEMENT FILED BY BANK OF AMERICA, N.A. ON 12/01/2016
Date: 2016-12-01T00:00:00STIPULATION - OTHER (TO EXTEND TIME TO RESPOND) FILED BY HASKELL & WHITE LLP ON 11/22/2016
Date: 2016-11-22T00:00:00CASE MANAGEMENT STATEMENT FILED BY HASKELL & WHITE LLP ON 12/01/2016
Date: 2016-12-01T00:00:00ORDER - OTHER (EXTENDING TIME TO SERVE) FILED BY HASKELL & WHITE LLP ON 11/30/2016
Date: 2016-11-30T00:00:00REQUEST FOR ENTRY OF DEFAULT FILED BY KURTZ-AHLERS, LLC ON 11/30/2016
Date: 2016-11-30T00:00:00MINUTES FINALIZED FOR CASE MANAGEMENT CONFERENCE 12/16/2016 09:00:00 AM.
Date: 2016-12-16T00:00:00NOTICE OF INTENT TO APPEAR TELEPHONICALLY FILED BY HASKELL & WHITE LLP ON 12/12/2016
Date: 2016-12-12T00:00:00ANSWER TO AMENDED COMPLAINT FILED BY HASKELL & WHITE LLP ON 12/22/2016
Date: 2016-12-22T00:00:00PROPOSED STIPULATION AND ORDER RECEIVED ON 12/20/2016
Date: 2016-12-20T00:00:00NOTICE OF RULING FILED BY KURTZ-AHLERS, LLC ON 12/16/2016
Date: 2016-12-16T00:00:00NOTICE OF POSTING JURY FEES FILED BY HASKELL & WHITE LLP ON 12/30/2016
Date: 2016-12-30T00:00:00NOTICE OF INTENT TO APPEAR TELEPHONICALLY FILED BY HASKELL & WHITE LLP ON 12/30/2016
Date: 2016-12-30T00:00:00STIPULATION AND ORDER (STRIKING CLAIM FOR ATTORNEY'S FEES) FILED BY HASKELL & WHITE LLP ON 01/05/2017
Date: 2017-01-05T00:00:00MINUTES FINALIZED FOR CASE MANAGEMENT CONFERENCE 01/06/2017 09:00:00 AM.
Date: 2017-01-06T00:00:00PROPOSED STIPULATION AND ORDER RECEIVED ON 06/07/2017
Date: 2017-06-07T00:00:00NOTICE OF RULING FILED BY KURTZ-AHLERS, LLC ON 01/11/2017
Date: 2017-01-11T00:00:00STIPULATION AND ORDER (PROTECTIVE ORDER) FILED BY HASKELL & WHITE LLP ON 06/07/2017
Date: 2017-06-07T00:00:00REQUEST FOR JUDICIAL NOTICE FILED BY BANK OF AMERICA, N.A. ON 07/06/2017
Date: 2017-07-06T00:00:00SEPARATE STATEMENT FILED BY BANK OF AMERICA, N.A. ON 07/06/2017
Date: 2017-07-06T00:00:00MOTION FOR SUMMARY JUDGMENT/ADJUDICATION FILED BY BANK OF AMERICA, N.A. ON 07/06/2017
Date: 2017-07-06T00:00:00E-FILING TRANSACTION NUMBER 4747061 REJECTED.
Date: 2017-07-12T00:00:00E-FILING TRANSACTION NUMBER 1399848 REJECTED.
Date: 2017-07-12T00:00:00E-FILING TRANSACTION NUMBER 3565658 REJECTED.
Date: 2017-07-12T00:00:00EXHIBIT LIST FILED BY BANK OF AMERICA, N.A. ON 07/06/2017
Date: 2017-07-06T00:00:00PROPOSED STIPULATION AND ORDER RECEIVED ON 08/14/2017
Date: 2017-08-14T00:00:00MINUTES FINALIZED FOR CHAMBERS WORK 08/28/2017 03:52:00 PM.
Date: 2017-08-28T00:00:00STIPULATION AND ORDER (TO CONTINUE TRIAL) FILED BY KURTZ-AHLERS, LLC ON 08/28/2017
Date: 2017-08-28T00:00:00NOTICE - OTHER FILED BY KURTZ-AHLERS, LLC ON 08/31/2017
Date: 2017-08-31T00:00:00SEPARATE STATEMENT FILED BY KURTZ-AHLERS, LLC ON 09/05/2017
Date: 2017-09-05T00:00:00REQUEST FOR JUDICIAL NOTICE FILED BY KURTZ-AHLERS, LLC ON 09/05/2017
Date: 2017-09-05T00:00:00DECLARATION IN SUPPORT FILED BY KURTZ-AHLERS, LLC ON 09/05/2017
Date: 2017-09-05T00:00:00OPPOSITION FILED BY KURTZ-AHLERS, LLC ON 09/05/2017
Date: 2017-09-05T00:00:00E-FILING TRANSACTION NUMBER 3599909 REJECTED.
Date: 2017-10-24T00:00:00MINUTES FINALIZED FOR MOTION FOR SUMMARY JUDGMENT AND/OR ADJUDICATION 10/13/2017 01:30:00 PM.
Date: 2017-10-13T00:00:00REPLY - OTHER FILED BY KURTZ-AHLERS, LLC ON 10/12/2017
Date: 2017-10-12T00:00:00APPLICATION - OTHER (FOR SEPARATE JUDGMENT) FILED BY KURTZ-AHLERS, LLC ON 10/20/2017
Date: 2017-10-20T00:00:00CLERK'S CERTIFICATE OF MAILING/ELECTRONIC SERVICE
Date: 2017-11-03T00:00:00E-FILING TRANSACTION NUMBER 2613433 REJECTED.
Date: 2017-11-17T00:00:00MINUTES FINALIZED FOR UNDER SUBMISSION RULING 11/03/2017 03:40:00 PM.
Date: 2017-11-03T00:00:00REQUEST FOR JUDICIAL NOTICE FILED BY KURTZ-AHLERS, LLC ON 10/20/2017
Date: 2017-10-20T00:00:00DECLARATION IN SUPPORT FILED BY KURTZ-AHLERS, LLC ON 10/20/2017
Date: 2017-10-20T00:00:00PROPOSED DEFAULT JUDGMENT RECEIVED ON 11/17/2017.
Date: 2017-11-17T00:00:00STATEMENT OF CASE FILED BY KURTZ-AHLERS, LLC ON 11/17/2017
Date: 2017-11-17T00:00:00DECLARATION IN SUPPORT OF DEFAULT JUDGMENT BY COURT CCP 585(D) FILED BY KURTZ-AHLERS, LLC ON 11/17/2017
Date: 2017-11-17T00:00:00REQUEST FOR COURT DEFAULT JUDGMENT FILED BY KURTZ-AHLERS, LLC ON 11/17/2017
Date: 2017-11-17T00:00:00REQUEST FOR JUDICIAL NOTICE FILED BY KURTZ-AHLERS, LLC ON 11/17/2017
Date: 2017-11-17T00:00:00OPPOSITION FILED BY BANK OF AMERICA, N.A. ON 11/22/2017
Date: 2017-11-22T00:00:00OPPOSITION FILED BY HASKELL & WHITE LLP ON 11/20/2017
Date: 2017-11-20T00:00:00NOTICE OF NON-OPPOSITION FILED BY HASKELL & WHITE LLP ON 11/27/2017
Date: 2017-11-27T00:00:00REPLY TO OPPOSITION FILED BY KURTZ-AHLERS, LLC ON 11/28/2017
Date: 2017-11-28T00:00:00MINUTES FINALIZED FOR APPLICATION/REQUEST 12/05/2017 01:30:00 PM.
Date: 2017-12-05T00:00:00PROPOSED ORDER RECEIVED ON 12/11/2017
Date: 2017-12-11T00:00:00DECLARATION IN SUPPORT FILED BY KURTZ-AHLERS, LLC ON 12/11/2017
Date: 2017-12-11T00:00:00NOTICE OF RULING FILED BY KURTZ-AHLERS, LLC ON 12/05/2017
Date: 2017-12-05T00:00:00MOTION FOR DETERMINATION OF GOOD FAITH SETTLEMENT FILED BY KURTZ-AHLERS, LLC ON 12/11/2017
Date: 2017-12-11T00:00:00REQUEST FOR JUDICIAL NOTICE FILED BY KURTZ-AHLERS, LLC ON 12/11/2017
Date: 2017-12-11T00:00:00MINUTES FINALIZED FOR MANDATORY SETTLEMENT CONFERENCE 01/05/2018 09:00:00 AM.
Date: 2018-01-05T00:00:00MOTION IN LIMINE (NO. 1) FILED BY KURTZ-AHLERS, LLC ON 01/25/2018
Date: 2018-01-25T00:00:00MINUTES FINALIZED FOR MOTION FOR DETERMINATION OF GOOD FAITH SETTLEMENT 01/23/2018 01:30:00 PM.
Date: 2018-01-23T00:00:00NOTICE TO APPEAR AT TRIAL FILED BY BANK OF AMERICA, N.A. ON 01/19/2018
Date: 2018-01-19T00:00:00NOTICE TO APPEAR AT TRIAL FILED BY BANK OF AMERICA, N.A. ON 01/12/2018
Date: 2018-01-12T00:00:00MOTION IN LIMINE (NO. 3) FILED BY KURTZ-AHLERS, LLC ON 01/25/2018
Date: 2018-01-25T00:00:00MOTION IN LIMINE (NO. 4) FILED BY KURTZ-AHLERS, LLC ON 01/25/2018
Date: 2018-01-25T00:00:00PROPOSED ORDER (NOT SIGNED.) FILED BY KURTZ-AHLERS, LLC ON 01/26/2018
Date: 2018-01-26T00:00:00MOTION IN LIMINE (NO. 2) FILED BY KURTZ-AHLERS, LLC ON 01/25/2018
Date: 2018-01-25T00:00:00OPPOSITION FILED BY KURTZ-AHLERS, LLC ON 01/31/2018
Date: 2018-01-31T00:00:00DECLARATION - OTHER FILED BY KURTZ-AHLERS, LLC ON 01/31/2018
Date: 2018-01-31T00:00:00REPLY - OTHER FILED BY KURTZ-AHLERS, LLC ON 02/01/2018
Date: 2018-02-01T00:00:00MINUTES FINALIZED FOR MULTIPLE EVENTS 02/02/2018 09:00:00 AM.
Date: 2018-02-02T00:00:00DECLARATION IN SUPPORT FILED BY KURTZ-AHLERS, LLC ON 02/01/2018
Date: 2018-02-01T00:00:00PROPOSED ORDER RECEIVED ON 02/12/2018
Date: 2018-02-12T00:00:00STIPULATION AND APPOINTMENT OF OFFICIAL REPORTER PRO TEMPORE
Date: 2018-02-02T00:00:00MINUTES FINALIZED FOR MULTIPLE EVENTS 02/09/2018 09:00:00 AM.
Date: 2018-02-09T00:00:00PROPOSED ORDER RECEIVED ON 03/05/2018
Date: 2018-03-05T00:00:00PROPOSED ORDER (NOT SIGNED) FILED BY KURTZ-AHLERS, LLC ON 02/13/2018
Date: 2018-02-13T00:00:00MOTION FOR JUDGMENT ON THE PLEADINGS FILED BY BANK OF AMERICA, N.A. ON 03/02/2018
Date: 2018-03-02T00:00:00NOTICE OF CONTINUANCE FILED BY KURTZ-AHLERS, LLC ON 02/13/2018
Date: 2018-02-13T00:00:00REQUEST FOR JUDICIAL NOTICE FILED BY BANK OF AMERICA, N.A. ON 03/02/2018
Date: 2018-03-02T00:00:00PROPOSED ORDER RECEIVED ON 03/13/2018
Date: 2018-03-13T00:00:00REQUEST FOR JUDICIAL NOTICE FILED BY KURTZ-AHLERS, LLC ON 03/15/2018
Date: 2018-03-15T00:00:00PROPOSED ORDER (NOT SIGNED.) FILED BY KURTZ-AHLERS, LLC ON 03/08/2018
Date: 2018-03-08T00:00:00REPLY TO OPPOSITION FILED BY BANK OF AMERICA, N.A. ON 03/26/2018
Date: 2018-03-26T00:00:00OPPOSITION FILED BY KURTZ-AHLERS, LLC ON 03/15/2018
Date: 2018-03-15T00:00:00MINUTES FINALIZED FOR CHAMBERS WORK 04/16/2018 11:05:00 AM.
Date: 2018-04-16T00:00:00MINUTES FINALIZED FOR MOTION FOR JUDGMENT ON THE PLEADINGS 05/01/2018 01:30:00 PM.
Date: 2018-05-01T00:00:00ORDER - OTHER FILED BY KURTZ-AHLERS, LLC ON 04/16/2018
Date: 2018-04-16T00:00:00NOTICE OF ENTRY OF DISMISSAL AND PROOF OF SERVICE FILED BY KURTZ-AHLERS, LLC ON 05/11/2018
Date: 2018-05-11T00:00:00MINUTES FINALIZED FOR CHAMBERS WORK 05/07/2018 02:58:00 PM.
Date: 2018-05-07T00:00:00CLERK'S CERTIFICATE OF MAILING/ELECTRONIC SERVICE
Date: 2018-05-07T00:00:00REQUEST FOR DISMISSAL WITH PREJUDICE - PARTY FILED BY KURTZ-AHLERS, LLC ON 05/07/2018
Date: 2018-05-07T00:00:00NOTICE OF RULING FILED BY KURTZ-AHLERS, LLC ON 05/07/2018
Date: 2018-05-07T00:00:00PROPOSED ORDER RECEIVED ON 06/07/2018
Date: 2018-06-07T00:00:00REPLY TO OPPOSITION FILED BY BANK OF AMERICA, N.A. ON 06/07/2018
Date: 2018-06-07T00:00:00REPLY - OTHER FILED BY BANK OF AMERICA, N.A. ON 06/07/2018
Date: 2018-06-07T00:00:00DECLARATION IN SUPPORT (MOTION IN LIMINE NO. 1) FILED BY BANK OF AMERICA, N.A. ON 06/07/2018
Date: 2018-06-07T00:00:00DECLARATION IN SUPPORT (MOTION IN LIMINE NO. 2) FILED BY BANK OF AMERICA, N.A. ON 06/07/2018
Date: 2018-06-07T00:00:00MOTION IN LIMINE (NO. 1) FILED BY BANK OF AMERICA, N.A. ON 06/07/2018
Date: 2018-06-07T00:00:00PROOF OF ESERVICE FILED BY BANK OF AMERICA, N.A. ON 06/07/2018
Date: 2018-06-07T00:00:00MOTION IN LIMINE (NO. 4) FILED BY BANK OF AMERICA, N.A. ON 06/07/2018
Date: 2018-06-07T00:00:00MOTION IN LIMINE (NO. 3) FILED BY BANK OF AMERICA, N.A. ON 06/07/2018
Date: 2018-06-07T00:00:00DECLARATION IN SUPPORT (MOTION IN LIMINE NO. 4) FILED BY BANK OF AMERICA, N.A. ON 06/07/2018
Date: 2018-06-07T00:00:00MOTION IN LIMINE (NO. 2) FILED BY BANK OF AMERICA, N.A. ON 06/07/2018
Date: 2018-06-07T00:00:00DECLARATION IN SUPPORT (MOTION IN LIMINE NO. 7) FILED BY BANK OF AMERICA, N.A. ON 06/07/2018
Date: 2018-06-07T00:00:00MOTION IN LIMINE (NO. 7) FILED BY BANK OF AMERICA, N.A. ON 06/07/2018
Date: 2018-06-07T00:00:00PROPOSED ORDER (GRANTING MOTION IN LIMINE NO. 1) RECEIVED ON 06/07/2018.
Date: 2018-06-07T00:00:00MOTION IN LIMINE (NO. 6) FILED BY BANK OF AMERICA, N.A. ON 06/07/2018
Date: 2018-06-07T00:00:00MOTION IN LIMINE (NO. 8) FILED BY BANK OF AMERICA, N.A. ON 06/07/2018
Date: 2018-06-07T00:00:00MOTION IN LIMINE (NO. 5) FILED BY BANK OF AMERICA, N.A. ON 06/07/2018
Date: 2018-06-07T00:00:00MOTION IN LIMINE (NO. 9) FILED BY BANK OF AMERICA, N.A. ON 06/07/2018
Date: 2018-06-07T00:00:00PROPOSED ORDER (GRANTING MOTION IN LIMINE NO. 2) RECEIVED ON 06/07/2018.
Date: 2018-06-07T00:00:00PROPOSED ORDER (GRANTING MOTION IN LIMINE NO. 3) RECEIVED ON 06/07/2018.
Date: 2018-06-07T00:00:00PROPOSED ORDER (GRANTING MOTION IN LIMINE NO. 6) FILED BY BANK OF AMERICA, N.A. ON 06/07/2018
Date: 2018-06-07T00:00:00PROPOSED ORDER (GRANTING MOTION IN LIMINE NO. 5) RECEIVED ON 06/07/2018.
Date: 2018-06-07T00:00:00PROPOSED ORDER (GRANTING MOTION IN LIMINE NO. 4) RECEIVED ON 06/07/2018.
Date: 2018-06-07T00:00:00PROPOSED ORDER (GRANTING MOTION IN LIMINE NO. 7) FILED BY BANK OF AMERICA, N.A. ON 06/07/2018
Date: 2018-06-07T00:00:00PROPOSED ORDER (GRANTING MOTION IN LIMINE NO. 8) FILED BY BANK OF AMERICA, N.A. ON 06/07/2018
Date: 2018-06-07T00:00:00PROPOSED ORDER (GRANTING MOTION IN LIMINE NO. 9) FILED BY BANK OF AMERICA, N.A. ON 06/07/2018
Date: 2018-06-07T00:00:00MOTION FOR SUMMARY JUDGMENT/ADJUDICATION FILED BY BANK OF AMERICA, N.A. ON 07/05/2018
Date: 2018-07-05T00:00:00NOTICE OF CONTINUANCE OF TRIAL FILED BY KURTZ-AHLERS, LLC ON 06/11/2018
Date: 2018-06-11T00:00:00MINUTES FINALIZED FOR MULTIPLE EVENTS 06/08/2018 09:00:00 AM.
Date: 2018-06-08T00:00:00DOCUMENT - OTHER (VOLUME OF EVIDENCE) FILED BY BANK OF AMERICA, N.A. ON 07/05/2018
Date: 2018-07-05T00:00:00PROPOSED ORDER RECEIVED ON 07/05/2018
Date: 2018-07-05T00:00:00SEPARATE STATEMENT FILED BY BANK OF AMERICA, N.A. ON 07/05/2018
Date: 2018-07-05T00:00:00REQUEST FOR JUDICIAL NOTICE FILED BY BANK OF AMERICA, N.A. ON 07/05/2018
Date: 2018-07-05T00:00:00MEMORANDUM OF POINTS AND AUTHORITIES FILED BY BANK OF AMERICA, N.A. ON 07/05/2018
Date: 2018-07-05T00:00:00PROOF OF SERVICE FILED BY KURTZ-AHLERS, LLC ON 08/08/2018
Date: 2018-08-08T00:00:00PROPOSED ORDER RECEIVED ON 08/17/2018
Date: 2018-08-17T00:00:00DECLARATION - OTHER FILED BY KURTZ-AHLERS, LLC ON 08/17/2018
Date: 2018-08-17T00:00:00PROOF OF SERVICE FILED BY KURTZ-AHLERS, LLC ON 08/06/2018
Date: 2018-08-06T00:00:00EX PARTE APPLICATION - OTHER FILED BY KURTZ-AHLERS, LLC ON 08/17/2018
Date: 2018-08-17T00:00:00REQUEST FOR JUDICIAL NOTICE FILED BY KURTZ-AHLERS, LLC ON 08/17/2018
Date: 2018-08-17T00:00:00MOTION FOR SANCTIONS FILED BY KURTZ-AHLERS, LLC ON 08/17/2018
Date: 2018-08-17T00:00:00MINUTES FINALIZED FOR EX PARTE 08/20/2018 08:30:00 AM.
Date: 2018-08-20T00:00:00OPPOSITION FILED BY BANK OF AMERICA, N.A. ON 08/17/2018
Date: 2018-08-17T00:00:00REQUEST FOR JUDICIAL NOTICE FILED BY BANK OF AMERICA, N.A. ON 08/17/2018
Date: 2018-08-17T00:00:00DECLARATION IN SUPPORT OF OPPOSITION FILED BY BANK OF AMERICA, N.A. ON 08/17/2018
Date: 2018-08-17T00:00:00REQUEST FOR JUDICIAL NOTICE FILED BY BANK OF AMERICA, N.A. ON 08/27/2018
Date: 2018-08-27T00:00:00DECLARATION IN SUPPORT FILED BY BANK OF AMERICA, N.A. ON 08/27/2018
Date: 2018-08-27T00:00:00PROPOSED ORDER (NOT SIGNED.) FILED BY KURTZ-AHLERS, LLC ON 08/22/2018
Date: 2018-08-22T00:00:00OPPOSITION FILED BY BANK OF AMERICA, N.A. ON 08/27/2018
Date: 2018-08-27T00:00:00PROPOSED ORDER (NOT SIGNED) FILED BY THE SUPERIOR COURT OF ORANGE ON 10/02/2018
Date: 2018-10-02T00:00:00STIPULATION AND APPOINTMENT OF OFFICIAL REPORTER PRO TEMPORE
Date: 2018-10-29T00:00:00MINUTES FINALIZED FOR JURY TRIAL 11/01/2018 09:00:00 AM.
Date: 2018-11-01T00:00:00STIPULATIONS: DEPARTMENT C19
Date: 2018-11-01T00:00:00EXHIBIT LIST FILED BY BANK OF AMERICA, N.A. ON 11/05/2018
Date: 2018-11-05T00:00:00SUPPLEMENTAL (BRIEF IN SUPPORT TO MOTION IN LIMINE NO 3) FILED BY BANK OF AMERICA, N.A. ON 11/05/2018
Date: 2018-11-05T00:00:00WITNESS LIST FILED BY BANK OF AMERICA, N.A. ON 11/05/2018
Date: 2018-11-05T00:00:00SUPPLEMENTAL FILED BY BANK OF AMERICA, N.A. ON 11/05/2018
Date: 2018-11-05T00:00:00STATEMENT OF CASE FILED BY BANK OF AMERICA, N.A. ON 11/05/2018
Date: 2018-11-05T00:00:00SUPPLEMENTAL (BRIEF IN SUPPORT OF MOTION IN LIMINE NO 3) FILED BY KURTZ-AHLERS, LLC ON 11/06/2018
Date: 2018-11-06T00:00:00PROOF OF ESERVICE FILED BY BANK OF AMERICA, N.A. ON 11/05/2018
Date: 2018-11-05T00:00:00SUPPLEMENTAL (BRIEF IN SUPPORT OF MIL NO. 3, SECOND) FILED BY KURTZ-AHLERS, LLC ON 11/07/2018
Date: 2018-11-07T00:00:00MOTION IN LIMINE (NO. 5) FILED BY KURTZ-AHLERS, LLC ON 11/07/2018
Date: 2018-11-07T00:00:00MOTION IN LIMINE (NO. 10) FILED BY BANK OF AMERICA, N.A. ON 11/07/2018
Date: 2018-11-07T00:00:00DECLARATION IN SUPPORT FILED BY BANK OF AMERICA, N.A. ON 11/07/2018
Date: 2018-11-07T00:00:00MINUTES FINALIZED FOR MULTIPLE EVENTS 11/07/2018 09:00:00 AM.
Date: 2018-11-07T00:00:00JURY INSTRUCTIONS FILED BY BANK OF AMERICA, N.A. ON 11/13/2018
Date: 2018-11-13T00:00:00DECLARATION IN SUPPORT (SUPPLEMENTAL, OF MIL NO. 10) FILED BY BANK OF AMERICA, N.A. ON 11/20/2018
Date: 2018-11-20T00:00:00SUPPLEMENTAL (BRIEF IN SUPPORT OF MIL NO. 10) FILED BY BANK OF AMERICA, N.A. ON 11/20/2018
Date: 2018-11-20T00:00:00OBJECTION FILED BY BANK OF AMERICA, N.A. ON 11/26/2018
Date: 2018-11-26T00:00:00EXHIBIT LIST FILED BY BANK OF AMERICA, N.A. ON 11/26/2018
Date: 2018-11-26T00:00:00STATEMENT OF CONTROVERTED ISSUES FILED BY BANK OF AMERICA, N.A. ON 11/26/2018
Date: 2018-11-26T00:00:00MINUTES FINALIZED FOR JURY TRIAL 2018-11-15 09:00:00.0.
Date: 2018-11-26T00:00:00REQUEST - OTHER FILED BY BANK OF AMERICA, N.A. ON 11/27/2018
Date: 2018-11-27T00:00:00MINUTES FINALIZED FOR MULTIPLE EVENTS 11/26/2018 09:00:00 AM.
Date: 2018-11-28T00:00:00MINUTES FINALIZED FOR MULTIPLE EVENTS 11/14/2018 09:00:00 AM.
Date: 2018-11-28T00:00:00MINUTES FINALIZED FOR MULTIPLE EVENTS 11/08/2018 09:00:00 AM.
Date: 2018-11-28T00:00:00E-FILING TRANSACTION NUMBER 1507393 REJECTED.
Date: 2018-11-29T00:00:00DECLARATION IN SUPPORT FILED BY BANK OF AMERICA, N.A. ON 12/03/2018
Date: 2018-12-03T00:00:00NOTICE OF LODGING FILED BY BANK OF AMERICA, N.A. ON 11/27/2018
Date: 2018-11-27T00:00:00DECLARATION IN SUPPORT FILED BY BANK OF AMERICA, N.A. ON 11/28/2018
Date: 2018-11-28T00:00:00SUPPLEMENTAL FILED BY BANK OF AMERICA, N.A. ON 11/28/2018
Date: 2018-11-28T00:00:00OPPOSITION FILED BY KURTZ-AHLERS, LLC ON 12/03/2018
Date: 2018-12-03T00:00:00E-FILING TRANSACTION NUMBER 4853835 REJECTED.
Date: 2018-12-05T00:00:00MINUTES FINALIZED FOR MULTIPLE EVENTS 11/28/2018 09:00:00 AM.
Date: 2018-12-05T00:00:00MINUTES FINALIZED FOR MULTIPLE EVENTS 11/29/2018 09:00:00 AM.
Date: 2018-12-05T00:00:00OPPOSITION FILED BY KURTZ-AHLERS, LLC ON 12/05/2018
Date: 2018-12-05T00:00:00E-FILING TRANSACTION NUMBER 4853836 REJECTED.
Date: 2018-12-05T00:00:00NOTICE OF LODGING FILED BY KURTZ-AHLERS, LLC ON 12/10/2018
Date: 2018-12-10T00:00:00NOTICE OF LODGING FILED BY BANK OF AMERICA, N.A. ON 12/10/2018
Date: 2018-12-10T00:00:00MINUTES FINALIZED FOR MULTIPLE EVENTS 12/10/2018 08:30:00 AM.
Date: 2018-12-10T00:00:00DECLARATION IN SUPPORT FILED BY BANK OF AMERICA, N.A. ON 12/10/2018
Date: 2018-12-10T00:00:00OBJECTION FILED BY KURTZ-AHLERS, LLC ON 12/10/2018
Date: 2018-12-10T00:00:00DOCUMENT - OTHER (POCKET BRIEF RE PROPOSED VERDICT FORM) FILED BY BANK OF AMERICA, N.A. ON 12/10/2018
Date: 2018-12-10T00:00:00MINUTES FINALIZED FOR JURY TRIAL 2018-12-12 08:30:00.0.
Date: 2018-12-28T00:00:00OBJECTION FILED BY KURTZ-AHLERS, LLC ON 09/05/2017
Date: 2017-09-05T00:00:00REPLY - OTHER (IN SUPPORT) FILED BY BANK OF AMERICA, N.A. ON 09/14/2017
Date: 2017-09-14T00:00:00NOTICE OF INTENT TO APPEAR TELEPHONICALLY FILED BY HASKELL & WHITE LLP ON 09/18/2017
Date: 2017-09-18T00:00:00OBJECTION FILED BY BANK OF AMERICA, N.A. ON 09/14/2017
Date: 2017-09-14T00:00:00MINUTES FINALIZED FOR MOTION FOR SUMMARY JUDGMENT AND/OR ADJUDICATION 09/19/2017 01:30:00 PM.
Date: 2017-09-20T00:00:00NOTICE OF CONTINUANCE FILED BY BANK OF AMERICA, N.A. ON 09/20/2017
Date: 2017-09-20T00:00:00PROPOSED STIPULATION AND ORDER RECEIVED ON 09/20/2017
Date: 2017-09-20T00:00:00MINUTES FINALIZED FOR CHAMBERS WORK 09/21/2017 02:39:00 PM.
Date: 2017-09-21T00:00:00NOTICE OF INTENT TO APPEAR TELEPHONICALLY FILED BY HASKELL & WHITE LLP ON 10/10/2017
Date: 2017-10-10T00:00:00SUPPLEMENTAL (BRIEFING IN SUPPORT OF MOTION) FILED BY BANK OF AMERICA, N.A. ON 10/11/2017
Date: 2017-10-11T00:00:00MINUTES FINALIZED FOR MOTION FOR SUMMARY JUDGMENT AND/OR ADJUDICATION 10/10/2017 01:30:00 PM.
Date: 2017-10-11T00:00:00PROPOSED ORDER (NOT SIGNED) FILED BY BANK OF AMERICA, N.A. ON 06/07/2018
Date: 2018-06-07T00:00:00MINUTES FINALIZED FOR MULTIPLE EVENTS 12/03/2018 09:00:00 AM.
Date: 2019-01-02T00:00:00PROPOSED ORDER (NOT SIGNED.) FILED BY BANK OF AMERICA, N.A. ON 06/07/2018
Date: 2018-06-07T00:00:00MINUTES FINALIZED FOR JURY TRIAL 2018-12-05 09:00:00.0.
Date: 2019-01-02T00:00:00REQUEST FOR JUDICIAL NOTICE (SUPPLEMENTAL) FILED BY KURTZ-AHLERS, LLC ON 01/04/2019
Date: 2019-01-04T00:00:00DECLARATION IN SUPPORT FILED BY KURTZ-AHLERS, LLC ON 01/04/2019
Date: 2019-01-04T00:00:00MINUTES FINALIZED FOR MULTIPLE EVENTS 12/06/2018 09:00:00 AM.
Date: 2019-01-02T00:00:00NOTICE OF LODGING FILED BY KURTZ-AHLERS, LLC ON 01/04/2019
Date: 2019-01-04T00:00:00JURY INSTRUCTIONS (GIVEN) FILED BY THE SUPERIOR COURT OF ORANGE ON 12/12/2018
Date: 2018-12-12T00:00:00E-FILING TRANSACTION NUMBER 3675744 REJECTED.
Date: 2019-01-08T00:00:00PROPOSED JUDGMENT RECEIVED ON 01/04/2019.
Date: 2019-01-04T00:00:00MINUTES FINALIZED FOR MULTIPLE EVENTS 01/08/2019 08:30:00 AM.
Date: 2019-01-08T00:00:00STIPULATION - OTHER (RE: PROPOSED JUDGMENT) FILED BY BANK OF AMERICA, N.A. ON 01/18/2019
Date: 2019-01-18T00:00:00MINUTES FINALIZED FOR MULTIPLE EVENTS 02/08/2019 10:30:00 AM.
Date: 2019-02-08T00:00:00E-FILING TRANSACTION NUMBER 2755307 REJECTED.
Date: 2019-02-05T00:00:00E-FILING TRANSACTION NUMBER 2760536 REJECTED.
Date: 2019-02-08T00:00:00NOTICE OF LODGING FILED BY BANK OF AMERICA, N.A. ON 01/18/2019
Date: 2019-01-18T00:00:00MOTION TO STRIKE OR TAX COSTS FILED BY KURTZ-AHLERS, LLC ON 03/04/2019
Date: 2019-03-04T00:00:00MEMORANDUM OF COSTS (SUMMARY) FILED BY BANK OF AMERICA, N.A. ON 02/13/2019
Date: 2019-02-13T00:00:00NOTICE OF ENTRY OF JUDGMENT FILED BY BANK OF AMERICA, N.A. ON 02/13/2019
Date: 2019-02-13T00:00:00DECLARATION IN SUPPORT FILED BY KURTZ-AHLERS, LLC ON 03/04/2019
Date: 2019-03-04T00:00:00JUDGMENT FILED BY BANK OF AMERICA, N.A. ON 02/08/2019
Date: 2019-02-08T00:00:00MEMORANDUM OF COSTS (SUMMARY) FILED BY BANK OF AMERICA, N.A. ON 02/21/2019
Date: 2019-02-21T00:00:00E-FILING TRANSACTION NUMBER 4939966 REJECTED.
Date: 2019-03-15T00:00:00REQUEST FOR JUDICIAL NOTICE FILED BY KURTZ-AHLERS, LLC ON 03/04/2019
Date: 2019-03-04T00:00:00RECEIPT FOR RECORDS AND PAPER G057486
Date: 2019-03-22T00:00:00NOTICE OF APPEAL - UNLIMITED CIVIL FILED
Date: 2019-03-20T00:00:00NOTIFICATION OF FILING NOTICE OF APPEAL
Date: 2019-03-20T00:00:00NOTICE OF DEFAULT
Date: 2019-03-29T00:00:00NOTICE TO REPORTER TO PREPARE TRANSCRIPT ON APPEAL
Date: 2019-04-17T00:00:00APPEAL - OTHER (NOTICE OF DEPOSIT OF REPORTER TRANSCRIPTS FEES) FILED BY KURTZ-AHLERS, LLC ON 04/09/2019
Date: 2019-04-09T00:00:00OPPOSITION FILED BY BANK OF AMERICA, N.A. ON 05/14/2019
Date: 2019-05-14T00:00:00DESIGNATION OF RECORD ON APPEAL FILED BY KURTZ-AHLERS, LLC ON 03/29/2019
Date: 2019-03-29T00:00:00E-FILING TRANSACTION NUMBER 2781857 REJECTED.
Date: 2019-04-09T00:00:00MINUTES FINALIZED FOR DEFAULT PROVE-UP HEARING 04/26/2019 10:30:00 AM.
Date: 2019-05-01T00:00:00E-FILING TRANSACTION NUMBER 4954574 REJECTED.
Date: 2019-04-03T00:00:00MINUTES FINALIZED FOR CHAMBERS WORK 04/16/2019 11:00:00 AM.
Date: 2019-04-16T00:00:00CLERK'S CERTIFICATE OF MAILING/ELECTRONIC SERVICE
Date: 2019-04-16T00:00:00NOTICE OF MAILING OF REGISTER OF ACTIONS
Date: 2019-04-17T00:00:00NOTICE - OTHER FILED BY BANK OF AMERICA, N.A. ON 03/25/2019
Date: 2019-03-25T00:00:00SUPPLEMENTAL (SECOND SUPPLEMENTAL BRIEF) FILED BY KURTZ-AHLERS, LLC ON 04/03/2019
Date: 2019-04-03T00:00:00REQUEST FOR ENTRY OF DEFAULT FILED BY KURTZ-AHLERS, LLC ON 04/29/2019
Date: 2019-04-29T00:00:00MINUTES FINALIZED FOR MOTION TO STRIKE OR TAX COSTS 05/28/2019 01:30:00 PM.
Date: 2019-05-28T00:00:00CLERK'S CERTIFICATE OF MAILING/ELECTRONIC SERVICE
Date: 2019-06-20T00:00:00MINUTES FINALIZED FOR DEFAULT PROVE-UP HEARING 06/25/2019 08:30:00 AM.
Date: June 25, 2019ABSTRACT OF JUDGMENT ISSUED ON 08/08/2019
Date: August 08, 2019MINUTES FINALIZED FOR CHAMBERS WORK 06/20/2019 08:25:00 AM.
Date: 2019-06-20T00:00:00E-FILING TRANSACTION NUMBER 3818848 REJECTED.
Date: August 05, 2019JUDGMENT (DEFAULT JUDGMENT AGAINST DEFENDANT ELIZABETH MULDER) FILED BY KURTZ-AHLERS, LLC ON 06/25/2019
Date: 2019-06-25T00:00:00E-FILING TRANSACTION NUMBER 4991032 REJECTED.
Date: July 23, 2019RECEIPT FOR RECORDS AND PAPERS G057486
Date: 2019-05-24T00:00:00REMITTITUR (G057486) FILED BY THE SUPERIOR COURT OF ORANGE ON 07/10/2020
Date: July 10, 2020OPINION G057486
Date: May 27, 2020NOTICE OF RELOCATION
Date: July 29, 2021REPLY - OTHER FILED BY KURTZ-AHLERS, LLC ON 05/20/2019
Date: 2019-05-20T00:00:00NOTICE OF RULING FILED BY KURTZ-AHLERS, LLC ON 06/03/2019
Date: 2019-06-03T00:00:00DECLARATION IN SUPPORT OF DEFAULT JUDGMENT BY COURT CCP 585(D) FILED BY KURTZ-AHLERS, LLC ON 06/25/2019
Date: 2019-06-25T00:00:00DECLARATION IN SUPPORT OF OPPOSITION FILED BY BANK OF AMERICA, N.A. ON 05/14/2019
Date: 2019-05-14T00:00:00E-FILING TRANSACTION NUMBER 4993885 REJECTED.
Date: July 30, 2019E-FILING TRANSACTION NUMBER 4982851 REJECTED.
Date: 2019-06-21T00:00:00NOTICE OF RULING FILED BY KURTZ-AHLERS, LLC ON 09/13/2018
Date: 2018-09-13T00:00:00MINUTES FINALIZED FOR MOTION FOR SANCTIONS 09/11/2018 01:30:00 PM.
Date: 2018-09-12T00:00:00REPLY TO MOTION FILED BY KURTZ-AHLERS, LLC ON 09/04/2018
Date: 2018-09-04T00:00:00PROPOSED AMENDED PLEADING RECEIVED ON 10/03/2018.
Date: 2018-10-03T00:00:00STIPULATION - OTHER (TO FILE FIRST AMENDED ANSWER) FILED BY BANK OF AMERICA, N.A. ON 10/03/2018
Date: 2018-10-03T00:00:00E-FILING TRANSACTION NUMBER 1516327 REJECTED.
Date: 2018-10-18T00:00:00MINUTES FINALIZED FOR MULTIPLE EVENTS 10/26/2018 09:00:00 AM.
Date: 2018-10-26T00:00:00MINUTES FINALIZED FOR MULTIPLE EVENTS 10/29/2018 09:00:00 AM.
Date: 2018-10-29T00:00:00REPLY - OTHER FILED BY BANK OF AMERICA, N.A. ON 10/31/2018
Date: 2018-10-31T00:00:00DECLARATION IN SUPPORT OF REPLY FILED BY BANK OF AMERICA, N.A. ON 10/31/2018
Date: 2018-10-31T00:00:00STIPULATION - OTHER (RE SCOPE OF CLAIMS) FILED BY BANK OF AMERICA, N.A. ON 10/31/2018
Date: 2018-10-31T00:00:00For full print and download access, please subscribe at https://www.trellis.law/.