Case Last Refreshed: 7 months ago
Clear Creek Systems, Inc., filed a(n) Breach of Contract - Commercial case against South Coast Water District, in the jurisdiction of Orange County. This case was filed in Orange County Superior Courts with James J. Di Cesare presiding.
Case Number |
||
Filing DateMay 10, 2016 |
CategoryBreach Of Contract/Warranty |
Time To Trial101 days |
Last RefreshedSeptember 13, 2023 |
Practice AreaCommercial |
Time to Dismissal Following Dispositive Motions981 days |
Filing LocationOrange County, CA |
Matter TypeBreach of Contract |
|
Case Cycle Time982 days |
CIVIL CASE COVER SHEET FILED BY CLEAR CREEK SYSTEMS, INC. ON 05/10/2016
Date: 2016-05-10T00:00:00COMPLAINT FILED BY CLEAR CREEK SYSTEMS, INC. ON 05/10/2016
Date: 2016-05-10T00:00:00CASE ASSIGNED TO JUDICIAL OFFICER DI CESARE, JAMES ON 05/10/2016.
Date: 2016-05-10T00:00:00E-FILING TRANSACTION NUMBER 3412829 REJECTED.
Date: 2016-05-12T00:00:00NOTICE OF POSTING JURY FEES FILED BY SOUTH COAST WATER DISTRICT ON 06/17/2016
Date: 2016-06-17T00:00:00NOTICE OF RULING FILED BY SOUTH COAST WATER DISTRICT ON 04/25/2017
Date: 2017-04-25T00:00:00SUMMONS ISSUED AND FILED FILED BY CLEAR CREEK SYSTEMS, INC. ON 05/13/2016
Date: 2016-05-13T00:00:00CASE MANAGEMENT CONFERENCE SCHEDULED FOR 08/05/2016 AT 09:00:00 AM IN C16 AT CENTRAL JUSTICE CENTER.
Date: 2016-05-26T00:00:00CASE MANAGEMENT STATEMENT FILED BY SOUTH COAST WATER DISTRICT ON 06/28/2016
Date: 2016-06-28T00:00:00DECLARATION IN SUPPORT FILED BY SOUTH COAST WATER DISTRICT ON 08/01/2016
Date: 2016-08-01T00:00:00PROPOSED STIPULATION AND ORDER RECEIVED ON 08/01/2016.
Date: 2016-08-01T00:00:00ANSWER TO COMPLAINT FILED BY SOUTH COAST WATER DISTRICT ON 06/17/2016
Date: 2016-06-17T00:00:00PROPOSED STIPULATION AND ORDER RECEIVED ON 08/01/2016
Date: 2016-08-01T00:00:00STIPULATION AND ORDER (TO CONTINUE CMC) FILED BY SOUTH COAST WATER DISTRICT ON 08/02/2016
Date: 2016-08-02T00:00:00CASE MANAGEMENT STATEMENT FILED BY CLEAR CREEK SYSTEMS, INC. ON 07/18/2016
Date: 2016-07-18T00:00:00MINUTES FINALIZED FOR CASE MANAGEMENT CONFERENCE 08/19/2016 09:00:00 AM.
Date: 2016-08-23T00:00:00MINUTES FINALIZED FOR CHAMBERS WORK 10/26/2016 03:30:00 PM.
Date: 2016-10-26T00:00:00CLERK'S CERTIFICATE OF MAILING/ELECTRONIC SERVICE
Date: 2016-10-26T00:00:00DECLARATION IN SUPPORT FILED BY CLEAR CREEK SYSTEMS, INC. ON 06/12/2017
Date: 2017-06-12T00:00:00EX PARTE APPLICATION - OTHER FILED BY SOUTH COAST WATER DISTRICT ON 04/18/2017
Date: 2017-04-18T00:00:00OPPOSITION FILED BY SOUTH COAST WATER DISTRICT ON 06/29/2017
Date: 2017-06-29T00:00:00MINUTES FINALIZED FOR MULTIPLE EVENTS 04/21/2017 01:30:00 PM.
Date: 2017-04-21T00:00:00PROPOSED ORDER RECEIVED ON 06/14/2017
Date: 2017-06-14T00:00:00PROPOSED ORDER RECEIVED ON 06/12/2017
Date: 2017-06-12T00:00:00MEMORANDUM OF POINTS AND AUTHORITIES FILED BY CLEAR CREEK SYSTEMS, INC. ON 06/14/2017
Date: 2017-06-14T00:00:00MOTION TO COMPEL DEPOSITION (ORAL OR WRITTEN) FILED BY CLEAR CREEK SYSTEMS, INC. ON 06/14/2017
Date: 2017-06-14T00:00:00PROOF OF ESERVICE FILED BY CLEAR CREEK SYSTEMS, INC. ON 06/14/2017
Date: 2017-06-14T00:00:00MOTION FOR LEAVE TO AMEND FILED BY CLEAR CREEK SYSTEMS, INC. ON 06/12/2017
Date: 2017-06-12T00:00:00DECLARATION IN SUPPORT FILED BY CLEAR CREEK SYSTEMS, INC. ON 06/14/2017
Date: 2017-06-14T00:00:00PROOF OF SERVICE FILED BY CLEAR CREEK SYSTEMS, INC. ON 06/12/2017
Date: 2017-06-12T00:00:00MEMORANDUM OF POINTS AND AUTHORITIES FILED BY CLEAR CREEK SYSTEMS, INC. ON 06/12/2017
Date: 2017-06-12T00:00:00PROPOSED AMENDED PLEADING RECEIVED ON 06/12/2017.
Date: 2017-06-12T00:00:00PROOF OF ESERVICE FILED BY CLEAR CREEK SYSTEMS, INC. ON 07/05/2017
Date: 2017-07-05T00:00:00REPLY TO OPPOSITION FILED BY CLEAR CREEK SYSTEMS, INC. ON 07/05/2017
Date: 2017-07-05T00:00:00MOTION FOR SUMMARY JUDGMENT/ADJUDICATION FILED BY CLEAR CREEK SYSTEMS, INC. ON 02/15/2018
Date: 2018-02-15T00:00:00MINUTES FINALIZED FOR EX PARTE 02/27/2018 01:30:00 PM.
Date: 2018-02-27T00:00:00PROPOSED STIPULATION AND ORDER RECEIVED ON 04/09/2018
Date: 2018-04-09T00:00:00MINUTES FINALIZED FOR MULTIPLE EVENTS 07/14/2017 09:00:00 AM.
Date: 2017-07-14T00:00:00NOTICE OF CHANGE OF ADDRESS AND/OR TELEPHONE FILED BY CLEAR CREEK SYSTEMS, INC. ON 04/23/2018
Date: 2018-04-23T00:00:00PROPOSED ORDER (NOT SIGNED) FILED BY CLEAR CREEK SYSTEMS, INC. ON 07/19/2017
Date: 2017-07-19T00:00:00E-FILING TRANSACTION NUMBER 3556649 REJECTED.
Date: 2017-07-20T00:00:00AMENDED COMPLAINT (FIRST) FILED BY CLEAR CREEK SYSTEMS, INC. ON 07/14/2017
Date: 2017-07-14T00:00:00MEMORANDUM OF POINTS AND AUTHORITIES FILED BY CLEAR CREEK SYSTEMS, INC. ON 02/15/2018
Date: 2018-02-15T00:00:00PROPOSED ORDER RECEIVED ON 02/15/2018
Date: 2018-02-15T00:00:00SEPARATE STATEMENT FILED BY CLEAR CREEK SYSTEMS, INC. ON 02/15/2018
Date: 2018-02-15T00:00:00ANSWER TO AMENDED COMPLAINT (FIRST) FILED BY SOUTH COAST WATER DISTRICT ON 08/11/2017
Date: 2017-08-11T00:00:00DECLARATION IN SUPPORT FILED BY CLEAR CREEK SYSTEMS, INC. ON 02/15/2018
Date: 2018-02-15T00:00:00PROOF OF ESERVICE FILED BY CLEAR CREEK SYSTEMS, INC. ON 02/15/2018
Date: 2018-02-15T00:00:00REPLY TO OPPOSITION FILED BY CLEAR CREEK SYSTEMS, INC. ON 06/22/2018
Date: 2018-06-22T00:00:00EX PARTE APPLICATION - OTHER FILED BY CLEAR CREEK SYSTEMS, INC. ON 02/21/2018
Date: 2018-02-21T00:00:00PROPOSED ORDER RECEIVED ON 02/21/2018
Date: 2018-02-21T00:00:00DECLARATION IN SUPPORT FILED BY CLEAR CREEK SYSTEMS, INC. ON 02/21/2018
Date: 2018-02-21T00:00:00OBJECTION FILED BY CLEAR CREEK SYSTEMS, INC. ON 06/22/2018
Date: 2018-06-22T00:00:00NOTICE OF RULING FILED BY CLEAR CREEK SYSTEMS, INC. ON 07/03/2018
Date: 2018-07-03T00:00:00PROPOSED ORDER (NOT SIGNED) FILED BY CLEAR CREEK SYSTEMS, INC. ON 03/09/2018
Date: 2018-03-09T00:00:00PROOF OF ESERVICE FILED BY CLEAR CREEK SYSTEMS, INC. ON 07/03/2018
Date: 2018-07-03T00:00:00STIPULATION - OTHER (FOR NEW TRIAL DATE) FILED BY CLEAR CREEK SYSTEMS, INC. ON 04/09/2018
Date: 2018-04-09T00:00:00ORDER - OTHER FILED BY CLEAR CREEK SYSTEMS, INC. ON 04/16/2018
Date: 2018-04-16T00:00:00OPPOSITION FILED BY SOUTH COAST WATER DISTRICT ON 06/08/2018
Date: 2018-06-08T00:00:00PROPOSED ORDER RECEIVED ON 06/22/2018
Date: 2018-06-22T00:00:00PROOF OF SERVICE FILED BY SOUTH COAST WATER DISTRICT ON 06/08/2018
Date: 2018-06-08T00:00:00REPLY - OTHER (TO SEPARATE STATEMENT) FILED BY CLEAR CREEK SYSTEMS, INC. ON 06/22/2018
Date: 2018-06-22T00:00:00PROOF OF ESERVICE FILED BY CLEAR CREEK SYSTEMS, INC. ON 06/22/2018
Date: 2018-06-22T00:00:00MINUTES FINALIZED FOR MOTION FOR SUMMARY JUDGMENT AND/OR ADJUDICATION 06/29/2018 09:00:00 AM.
Date: 2018-06-29T00:00:00CASE REASSIGNED TO ROBERT MOSS EFFECTIVE 01/02/2019.
Date: December 14, 2018E-FILING TRANSACTION NUMBER 3680683 REJECTED.
Date: 2018-07-10T00:00:00E-FILING TRANSACTION NUMBER 3637089 REJECTED.
Date: 2018-07-10T00:00:00MINUTES FINALIZED FOR MANDATORY SETTLEMENT CONFERENCE 07/13/2018 08:30:00 AM.
Date: 2018-07-13T00:00:00E-FILING TRANSACTION NUMBER 1516554 REJECTED.
Date: 2018-07-09T00:00:00NOTICE OF SETTLEMENT FILED BY CLEAR CREEK SYSTEMS, INC. ON 01/07/2019
Date: January 07, 2019MINUTES FINALIZED FOR MANDATORY SETTLEMENT CONFERENCE 10/12/2018 08:30:00 AM.
Date: October 12, 2018For full print and download access, please subscribe at https://www.trellis.law/.