Case Last Refreshed: 1 year ago
Lisa Bliss, filed a(n) Civil case against David Jackson, in the jurisdiction of Orange County. This case was filed in Orange County Superior Courts with James J. Di Cesare presiding.
Case Number |
|
Filing DateApril 06, 2016 |
CategoryCivil |
Last RefreshedMay 04, 2023 |
Time to Dismissal Following Dispositive Motions751 days |
Filing LocationOrange County, CA |
|
Case Cycle Time798 days |
CASE MANAGEMENT CONFERENCE SCHEDULED FOR 07/15/2016 AT 09:00:00 AM IN C16 AT CENTRAL JUSTICE CENTER.
Date: 2016-04-26T00:00:00DECLARATION OF DUE DILIGENCE FILED BY BLISS, LISA ON 09/13/2016
Date: 2016-09-13T00:00:00PROOF OF SERVICE OF SUMMONS RECEIVED ON 04/26/2017.
Date: 2017-04-26T00:00:00COMPLAINT FILED BY BLISS, LISA ON 04/06/2016
Date: 2016-04-06T00:00:00CASE MANAGEMENT STATEMENT FILED BY BLISS, LISA ON 03/02/2017
Date: 2017-03-02T00:00:00DECLARATION IN SUPPORT (OF PROOF OF SERVICE) FILED BY BLISS, LISA ON 12/12/2016
Date: 2016-12-12T00:00:00CASE MANAGEMENT STATEMENT FILED BY BLISS, LISA ON 04/24/2017
Date: 2017-04-24T00:00:00PROOF OF SERVICE OF SUMMONS FILED BY BLISS, LISA ON 12/12/2016
Date: 2016-12-12T00:00:00NOTICE OF HEARING FILED BY BLISS, LISA ON 02/14/2017
Date: 2017-02-14T00:00:00NOTICE OF CONTINUANCE FILED BY BLISS, LISA ON 04/25/2017
Date: 2017-04-25T00:00:00APPLICATION FOR ORDER FOR PUBLICATION OF SUMMONS RECEIVED ON 07/11/2016.
Date: 2016-07-11T00:00:00CASE MANAGEMENT STATEMENT FILED BY BLISS, LISA ON 01/05/2017
Date: 2017-01-05T00:00:00STATEMENT OF DAMAGES RECEIVED ON 04/26/2017.
Date: 2017-04-26T00:00:00MINUTES FINALIZED FOR STATUS CONFERENCE 03/15/2017 08:45:00 AM.
Date: 2017-03-15T00:00:00CIVIL CASE COVER SHEET FILED BY BLISS, LISA ON 04/06/2016
Date: 2016-04-06T00:00:00NOTICE OF HEARING (OF CASE MANAGEMENT CONFERENCE) FILED BY BLISS, LISA ON 10/19/2016
Date: 2016-10-19T00:00:00CLERK'S CERTIFICATE OF MAILING/ELECTRONIC SERVICE
Date: 2016-08-04T00:00:00NOTICE OF RULING FILED BY BLISS, LISA ON 08/23/2017
Date: 2017-08-23T00:00:00DECLARATION - OTHER FILED BY BLISS, LISA ON 09/23/2016
Date: 2016-09-23T00:00:00MINUTES FINALIZED FOR CASE MANAGEMENT CONFERENCE 01/10/2017 08:45:00 AM.
Date: 2017-02-02T00:00:00CASE MANAGEMENT STATEMENT FILED BY BLISS, LISA ON 07/25/2017
Date: 2017-07-25T00:00:00MINUTES FINALIZED FOR CASE MANAGEMENT CONFERENCE 09/27/2016 08:45:00 AM.
Date: 2016-09-28T00:00:00E-FILING TRANSACTION NUMBER 2535448 REJECTED.
Date: 2017-03-06T00:00:00MEMORANDUM OF POINTS AND AUTHORITIES FILED BY BLISS, LISA ON 08/25/2017
Date: 2017-08-25T00:00:00CASE MANAGEMENT STATEMENT FILED BY BLISS, LISA ON 05/26/2017
Date: 2017-05-26T00:00:00MINUTES FINALIZED FOR CASE MANAGEMENT CONFERENCE 07/26/2017 09:00:00 AM.
Date: 2017-07-26T00:00:00DECLARATION OF DUE DILIGENCE FILED BY BLISS, LISA ON 07/11/2016
Date: 2016-07-11T00:00:00SUMMONS ISSUED AND FILED FILED BY BLISS, LISA ON 04/06/2016
Date: 2016-04-06T00:00:00CASE MANAGEMENT STATEMENT FILED BY BLISS, LISA ON 10/04/2017
Date: 2017-10-04T00:00:00MINUTES FINALIZED FOR STATUS CONFERENCE 04/25/2017 08:45:00 AM.
Date: 2017-04-25T00:00:00CASE ASSIGNED TO JUDICIAL OFFICER DI CESARE, JAMES ON 04/06/2016.
Date: 2016-04-06T00:00:00CLERK'S CERTIFICATE OF MAILING/ELECTRONIC SERVICE
Date: 2016-10-07T00:00:00REQUEST FOR ENTRY OF DEFAULT RECEIVED ON 04/26/2017.
Date: 2017-04-26T00:00:00MINUTES FINALIZED FOR CASE MANAGEMENT CONFERENCE 07/15/2016 09:00:00 AM.
Date: 2016-07-22T00:00:00NOTICE OF HEARING FILED BY BLISS, LISA ON 09/07/2016
Date: 2016-09-07T00:00:00CASE MANAGEMENT STATEMENT FILED BY BLISS, LISA ON 09/14/2016
Date: 2016-09-14T00:00:00NOTICE OF CONTINUANCE FILED BY BLISS, LISA ON 04/24/2017
Date: 2017-04-24T00:00:00MINUTES FINALIZED FOR CASE MANAGEMENT CONFERENCE 08/04/2016 03:08:00 PM.
Date: 2016-08-04T00:00:00CASE MANAGEMENT STATEMENT FILED BY BLISS, LISA ON 06/24/2016
Date: 2016-06-24T00:00:00MINUTES FINALIZED FOR CASE MANAGEMENT CONFERENCE 05/31/2017 09:00:00 AM.
Date: 2017-05-31T00:00:00CLERK'S CERTIFICATE OF MAILING/ELECTRONIC SERVICE
Date: 2017-02-02T00:00:00E-FILING TRANSACTION NUMBER 4836343 REJECTED.
Date: April 18, 2018CLERK'S CERTIFICATE OF MAILING/ELECTRONIC SERVICE
Date: 2018-03-08T00:00:00MINUTES FINALIZED FOR MULTIPLE EVENTS 03/23/2018 01:30:00 PM.
Date: 2018-03-27T00:00:00MEMORANDUM OF POINTS AND AUTHORITIES FILED BY BLISS, LISA ON 04/18/2018
Date: 2018-04-18T00:00:00NOTICE OF CONTINUANCE FILED BY BLISS, LISA ON 03/08/2018
Date: 2018-03-08T00:00:00MINUTES FINALIZED FOR MULTIPLE EVENTS 10/11/2017 09:00:00 AM.
Date: 2017-10-12T00:00:00CLERK'S CERTIFICATE OF MAILING/ELECTRONIC SERVICE
Date: 2018-02-27T00:00:00MINUTES FINALIZED FOR MULTIPLE EVENTS 11/15/2017 09:00:00 AM.
Date: 2017-11-20T00:00:00MINUTES FINALIZED FOR MULTIPLE EVENTS 02/23/2018 09:30:00 AM.
Date: 2018-02-27T00:00:00REQUEST FOR COURT DEFAULT JUDGMENT FILED BY BLISS, LISA ON 03/23/2018
Date: 2018-03-23T00:00:00E-FILING TRANSACTION NUMBER 4814426 REJECTED.
Date: 2018-02-13T00:00:00NOTICE OF RULING FILED BY BLISS, LISA ON 02/27/2018
Date: 2018-02-27T00:00:00NOTICE OF RULING FILED BY BLISS, LISA ON 03/23/2018
Date: 2018-03-23T00:00:00MINUTES FINALIZED FOR MULTIPLE EVENTS 01/10/2018 09:00:00 AM.
Date: 2018-01-25T00:00:00NOTICE OF CONTINUANCE FILED BY BLISS, LISA ON 04/16/2018
Date: 2018-04-16T00:00:00PROPOSED DEFAULT JUDGMENT RECEIVED ON 03/23/2018.
Date: 2018-03-23T00:00:00MINUTES FINALIZED FOR CHAMBERS WORK 03/08/2018 04:52:00 PM.
Date: 2018-03-08T00:00:00MINUTES FINALIZED FOR DEFAULT PROVE-UP HEARING 04/27/2018 10:30:00 AM.
Date: May 03, 2018DECLARATION IN SUPPORT OF DEFAULT JUDGMENT BY COURT CCP 585(D) FILED BY BLISS, LISA ON 03/23/2018
Date: 2018-03-23T00:00:00MINUTES FINALIZED FOR DEFAULT PROVE-UP HEARING 04/06/2018 10:30:00 AM.
Date: 2018-04-06T00:00:00MINUTES FINALIZED FOR CHAMBERS WORK 02/27/2018 04:23:00 PM.
Date: 2018-02-27T00:00:00NOTICE OF ENTRY OF JUDGMENT FILED BY BLISS, LISA ON 06/11/2018
Date: June 11, 2018NOTICE TO FILING PARTY RE: REQUEST FOR REFUND
Date: June 13, 2018CLERK'S CERTIFICATE OF MAILING/ELECTRONIC SERVICE
Date: May 16, 2018JUDGMENT FILED BY BLISS, LISA ON 04/27/2018
Date: April 27, 2018For full print and download access, please subscribe at https://www.trellis.law/.