Case Last Refreshed: 1 day ago
Ilwu-Pma Welfare Plan, Leonard Carder Llp, People Of The State Of California Ex R, filed a(n) Fraud case against Alan Ember, Angel Gomez-Garcia, Angel Gomez-Garcia Medical Center, Inc, Ann Kron, Bharat Patel, (total of 38) See All in the jurisdiction of Orange County. This case was filed in Orange County Superior Courts with Kirk H. Nakamura presiding.
Case Number |
JudgeKirk H. Nakamura Track Judge’s New Cases |
Filing DateFebruary 29, 2016 |
CategoryFraud |
Last RefreshedApril 28, 2024 |
|
Filing LocationOrange County, CA |
|
NOTICE OF HEARING OC GENERATED
Date: 2016-03-09T00:00:00COMPLAINT FILED BY IL WU-PMA WELFARE PLAN ON 02/29/2016
Date: 2016-02-29T00:00:00CASE ASSIGNED TO JUDICIAL OFFICER SCOTT, NATHAN ON 02/29/2016.
Date: 2016-02-29T00:00:00SUMMONS ISSUED AND FILED SUBMITTED BY IL WU-PMA WELFARE PLAN REJECTED ON 03/04/2016.
Date: 2016-03-04T00:00:00CIVIL CASE COVER SHEET FILED BY IL WU-PMA WELFARE PLAN ON 02/29/2016
Date: 2016-02-29T00:00:00EX PARTE APPLICATION - OTHER (TO SEAL A RECORD) FILED BY IL WU-PMA WELFARE PLAN ON 04/29/2016
Date: 2016-04-29T00:00:00ORDER GRANTING (EX PARTE APPLICATION TO SEAL RECORD) FILED BY IL WU-PMA WELFARE PLAN ON 05/02/2016
Date: 2016-05-02T00:00:00MINUTES FINALIZED FOR MULTIPLE EVENTS 05/02/2016 01:30:00 PM.
Date: 2016-05-03T00:00:00MINUTES FINALIZED FOR EX PARTE 05/16/2016 01:30:00 PM.
Date: 2016-05-17T00:00:00PROPOSED ORDER RECEIVED ON 06/24/2016
Date: 2016-06-24T00:00:00MINUTES FINALIZED FOR EX PARTE 06/27/2016 10:00:00 AM.
Date: 2016-06-27T00:00:00EX PARTE APPLICATION - OTHER FILED BY IL WU-PMA WELFARE PLAN; IL WU-PMA WELFARE PLAN ON 06/24/2016
Date: 2016-06-24T00:00:00DECLARATION - OTHER FILED BY JUDE J. SANTIAGO, M.D., INC. ON 06/27/2016
Date: 2016-06-27T00:00:00PROPOSED STIPULATION AND ORDER RECEIVED ON 06/28/2016
Date: 2016-06-28T00:00:00ANSWER TO COMPLAINT FILED BY ANGEL GOMEZ-GARCIA MEDICAL CENTER, INC. ON 07/05/2016
Date: 2016-07-05T00:00:00REQUEST FOR ENTRY OF DEFAULT FILED BY IL WU-PMA WELFARE PLAN ON 07/07/2016
Date: 2016-07-07T00:00:00ANSWER TO COMPLAINT FILED BY DAHIYA, SHYAM; SHYAM DAHIYA, M.D., INC. ON 07/15/2016
Date: 2016-07-15T00:00:00ANSWER TO COMPLAINT FILED BY PATEL, BHARAT; PATEL UROLOGY ON 07/20/2016
Date: 2016-07-20T00:00:00ANSWER (GENERAL DENIAL) FILED BY PSS PHYSICIANS SALES & SERVICES, INC.; NGUYEN, VI ON 07/22/2016
Date: 2016-07-22T00:00:00E-FILING TRANSACTION NUMBER 2481221 REJECTED.
Date: 2016-07-29T00:00:00PROPOSED ORDER RECEIVED ON 07/29/2016
Date: 2016-07-29T00:00:00ANSWER (GENERAL DENIAL) FILED BY MUKADAM, HYDER M.; MUKADAM MEDICAL CENTER, INC. ON 08/01/2016
Date: 2016-08-01T00:00:00MINUTES FINALIZED FOR MULTIPLE EVENTS 08/01/2016 01:30:00 PM.
Date: 2016-08-03T00:00:00ANSWER TO COMPLAINT FILED BY JUDE J. SANTIAGO, M.D., INC.; SANTIAGO, JUDE J. ON 07/29/2016
Date: 2016-07-29T00:00:00ANSWER TO COMPLAINT FILED BY S, D. ON 08/08/2016
Date: 2016-08-08T00:00:00ANSWER TO COMPLAINT FILED BY TORRES, MARIA ON 08/08/2016
Date: 2016-08-08T00:00:00CASE MANAGEMENT STATEMENT FILED BY PATEL, BHARAT ON 08/16/2016
Date: 2016-08-16T00:00:00ORDER ON COURT FEE WAIVER (SUPERIOR COURT) FILED BY S, D. ON 08/08/2016
Date: 2016-08-08T00:00:00PROOF OF SERVICE BY MAIL (FIRST CLASS MAIL) FILED BY S, D. ON 08/08/2016
Date: 2016-08-08T00:00:00CASE MANAGEMENT STATEMENT FILED BY ANGEL GOMEZ-GARCIA MEDICAL CENTER, INC. ON 08/26/2016
Date: 2016-08-26T00:00:00CASE MANAGEMENT STATEMENT FILED BY DAHIYA, SHYAM; SHYAM DAHIYA, M.D., INC. ON 08/23/2016
Date: 2016-08-23T00:00:00PROPOSED ORDER RECEIVED ON 08/22/2016
Date: 2016-08-22T00:00:00E-FILING TRANSACTION NUMBER 2487658 REJECTED.
Date: 2016-08-25T00:00:00PROPOSED ORDER RECEIVED ON 08/29/2016
Date: 2016-08-29T00:00:00E-FILING TRANSACTION NUMBER 2487659 REJECTED.
Date: 2016-08-29T00:00:00NOTICE OF POSTING JURY FEES FILED BY SANTIAGO, JUDE J.; JUDE J. SANTIAGO, M.D., INC. ON 08/29/2016
Date: 2016-08-29T00:00:00CASE MANAGEMENT STATEMENT FILED BY SANTIAGO, JUDE J.; JUDE J. SANTIAGO, M.D., INC. ON 08/29/2016
Date: 2016-08-29T00:00:00NOTICE OF POSTING JURY FEES FILED BY FISHER, THERESA ON 08/29/2016
Date: 2016-08-29T00:00:00NOTICE OF POSTING JURY FEES FILED BY IL WU-PMA WELFARE PLAN ON 08/30/2016
Date: 2016-08-30T00:00:00DEMAND FOR JURY TRIAL FILED BY FISHER, THERESA ON 08/29/2016
Date: 2016-08-29T00:00:00ANSWER TO COMPLAINT FILED BY FISHER, THERESA ON 08/29/2016
Date: 2016-08-29T00:00:00MOTION TO STRIKE (ANSWER) FILED BY IL WU-PMA WELFARE PLAN ON 08/29/2016
Date: 2016-08-29T00:00:00CASE MANAGEMENT STATEMENT FILED BY MUKADAM, HYDER M.; MUKADAM MEDICAL CENTER, INC. ON 09/01/2016
Date: 2016-09-01T00:00:00CASE MANAGEMENT STATEMENT FILED BY FISHER, THERESA ON 09/02/2016
Date: 2016-09-02T00:00:00ANSWER TO COMPLAINT FILED BY L, C. ON 09/07/2016
Date: 2016-09-07T00:00:00PROPOSED ORDER RECEIVED ON 09/08/2016
Date: 2016-09-08T00:00:00MOTION TO STRIKE (GENERAL DENIAL) FILED BY IL WU-PMA WELFARE PLAN ON 09/08/2016
Date: 2016-09-08T00:00:00PROPOSED ORDER RECEIVED ON 09/27/2016
Date: 2016-09-27T00:00:00MINUTES FINALIZED FOR CASE MANAGEMENT CONFERENCE 09/12/2016 10:00:00 AM.
Date: 2016-09-13T00:00:00MINUTES FINALIZED FOR EX PARTE 09/28/2016 01:30:00 PM.
Date: 2016-09-29T00:00:00E-FILING TRANSACTION NUMBER 4621092 REJECTED.
Date: 2016-10-17T00:00:00CLERK'S CERTIFICATE OF MAILING/ELECTRONIC SERVICE
Date: 2016-09-29T00:00:00MINUTES FINALIZED FOR MOTION TO STRIKE ANSWER 10/31/2016 02:00:00 PM.
Date: 2016-11-01T00:00:00NOTICE OF RULING FILED BY PEOPLE OF THE STATE OF CALIFORNIA EX REL. IL WU-PMA WELFARE PLAN ON 11/21/2016
Date: 2016-11-21T00:00:00PROPOSED ORDER RECEIVED ON 12/21/2016
Date: 2016-12-21T00:00:00MINUTES FINALIZED FOR MULTIPLE EVENTS 11/21/2016 02:00:00 PM.
Date: 2016-11-30T00:00:00CLERK'S CERTIFICATE OF MAILING/ELECTRONIC SERVICE
Date: 2016-12-22T00:00:00CASE MANAGEMENT STATEMENT FILED BY MUKADAM, HYDER M.; MUKADAM MEDICAL CENTER, INC. ON 02/14/2017
Date: 2017-02-14T00:00:00MINUTES FINALIZED FOR EX PARTE 12/22/2016 01:30:00 PM.
Date: 2016-12-22T00:00:00CASE MANAGEMENT STATEMENT FILED BY JUDE J. SANTIAGO, M.D., INC. ON 02/15/2017
Date: 2017-02-15T00:00:00CASE MANAGEMENT STATEMENT FILED BY FISHER, THERESA; FISHER, THERESA ON 02/16/2017
Date: 2017-02-16T00:00:00CASE MANAGEMENT STATEMENT FILED BY L, C. ON 02/27/2017
Date: 2017-02-27T00:00:00CASE MANAGEMENT STATEMENT FILED BY MUKADAM, HYDER M.; MUKADAM MEDICAL CENTER, INC. ON 02/15/2017
Date: 2017-02-15T00:00:00CASE MANAGEMENT STATEMENT FILED BY PATEL, BHARAT; PATEL UROLOGY ON 02/16/2017
Date: 2017-02-16T00:00:00MINUTES FINALIZED FOR MULTIPLE EVENTS 02/27/2017 02:00:00 PM.
Date: 2017-03-01T00:00:00PROOF OF SERVICE OF SUMMONS FILED BY IL WU-PMA WELFARE PLAN ON 03/06/2017
Date: 2017-03-06T00:00:00MINUTES FINALIZED FOR MOTION FOR PROTECTIVE ORDER 03/27/2017 02:00:00 PM.
Date: 2017-03-30T00:00:00PROOF OF SERVICE OF SUMMONS FILED BY IL WU-PMA WELFARE PLAN ON 04/07/2017
Date: 2017-04-07T00:00:00STATEMENT OF DAMAGES FILED BY IL WU-PMA WELFARE PLAN ON 04/07/2017
Date: 2017-04-07T00:00:00ANSWER TO COMPLAINT FILED BY KNON, ANN ON 04/13/2017
Date: 2017-04-13T00:00:00REQUEST FOR ENTRY OF DEFAULT FILED BY IL WU-PMA WELFARE PLAN ON 05/05/2017
Date: 2017-05-05T00:00:00CASE MANAGEMENT STATEMENT FILED BY MUKADAM, HYDER M.; MUKADAM MEDICAL CENTER, INC. ON 05/19/2017
Date: 2017-05-19T00:00:00CASE MANAGEMENT STATEMENT FILED BY JUDE J. SANTIAGO, M.D., INC. ON 05/19/2017
Date: 2017-05-19T00:00:00CASE MANAGEMENT STATEMENT FILED BY FISHER, THERESA ON 05/22/2017
Date: 2017-05-22T00:00:00CASE MANAGEMENT STATEMENT FILED BY PATEL, BHARAT ON 05/23/2017
Date: 2017-05-23T00:00:00CORRESPONDENCE SUBMITTED BY SHAMAAN, IHSAN N. REJECTED ON 05/23/2017.
Date: 2017-05-23T00:00:00MOTION TO DEEM ANSWERS ADMITTED (MARIA TORRES) FILED BY IL WU-PMA WELFARE PLAN ON 06/06/2017
Date: 2017-06-06T00:00:00PROPOSED ORDER RECEIVED ON 06/06/2017
Date: 2017-06-06T00:00:00CASE MANAGEMENT STATEMENT FILED BY KNON, ANN ON 06/02/2017
Date: 2017-06-02T00:00:00PROPOSED ORDER RECEIVED ON 06/28/2017
Date: 2017-06-28T00:00:00MINUTES FINALIZED FOR CASE MANAGEMENT CONFERENCE 06/05/2017 10:00:00 AM.
Date: 2017-06-13T00:00:00MOTION TO DEEM ANSWERS ADMITTED (DANIELLE SANDOVAL) FILED BY IL WU-PMA WELFARE PLAN ON 06/06/2017
Date: 2017-06-06T00:00:00PROOF OF SERVICE OF SUMMONS (AMENDED) FILED BY IL WU-PMA WELFARE PLAN ON 07/24/2017
Date: 2017-07-24T00:00:00E-FILING TRANSACTION NUMBER 2572195 REJECTED.
Date: 2017-07-13T00:00:00PROOF OF SERVICE OF SUMMONS FILED BY IL WU-PMA WELFARE PLAN ON 07/27/2017
Date: 2017-07-27T00:00:00PROOF OF SERVICE FILED BY IL WU-PMA WELFARE PLAN ON 07/28/2017
Date: 2017-07-28T00:00:00PROPOSED ORDER RECEIVED ON 07/28/2017
Date: 2017-07-28T00:00:00SEPARATE STATEMENT FILED BY IL WU-PMA WELFARE PLAN ON 07/28/2017
Date: 2017-07-28T00:00:00DECLARATION IN SUPPORT FILED BY IL WU-PMA WELFARE PLAN ON 07/28/2017
Date: 2017-07-28T00:00:00PROPOSED ORDER RECEIVED ON 08/02/2017
Date: 2017-08-02T00:00:00DECLARATION IN SUPPORT FILED BY IHSAN N. SHAMAAN, M.D., INC.; SHAMAAN, IHSAN N. ON 08/02/2017
Date: 2017-08-02T00:00:00REQUEST FOR ENTRY OF DEFAULT FILED BY IL WU-PMA WELFARE PLAN ON 08/01/2017
Date: 2017-08-01T00:00:00SUMMONS ISSUED AND FILED RECEIVED ON 08/02/2017.
Date: 2017-08-02T00:00:00ANSWER TO COMPLAINT RECEIVED ON 08/02/2017.
Date: 2017-08-02T00:00:00CROSS-COMPLAINT RECEIVED ON 08/02/2017.
Date: 2017-08-02T00:00:00PROPOSED ORDER RECEIVED ON 08/24/2017
Date: 2017-08-24T00:00:00MINUTES FINALIZED FOR MOTION TO DEEM FACTS ADMITTED 08/28/2017 02:00:00 PM.
Date: 2017-08-29T00:00:00CLERK'S CERTIFICATE OF MAILING/ELECTRONIC SERVICE
Date: 2017-08-29T00:00:00SUBSTITUTION OF ATTORNEY FILED BY DAHIYA, SHYAM ON 09/01/2017
Date: 2017-09-01T00:00:00NOTICE - OTHER FILED BY SHAMAAN, IHSAN N. ON 09/12/2017
Date: 2017-09-12T00:00:00CLERK'S CERTIFICATE OF MAILING/ELECTRONIC SERVICE
Date: 2017-09-18T00:00:00MINUTES FINALIZED FOR MULTIPLE EVENTS 09/11/2017 02:00:00 PM.
Date: 2017-09-18T00:00:00CASE MANAGEMENT STATEMENT FILED BY DAHIYA, SHYAM ON 09/18/2017
Date: 2017-09-18T00:00:00MINUTES FINALIZED FOR CHAMBERS WORK 09/19/2017 09:15:00 AM.
Date: 2017-09-19T00:00:00E-FILING TRANSACTION NUMBER 3644289 REJECTED.
Date: 2018-03-12T00:00:00E-FILING TRANSACTION NUMBER 3571456 REJECTED.
Date: 2018-03-12T00:00:00E-FILING TRANSACTION NUMBER 1455928 REJECTED.
Date: 2018-03-12T00:00:00E-FILING TRANSACTION NUMBER 3623289 REJECTED.
Date: 2018-03-12T00:00:00E-FILING TRANSACTION NUMBER 4824638 REJECTED.
Date: 2018-03-13T00:00:00E-FILING TRANSACTION NUMBER 4824259 REJECTED.
Date: 2018-03-14T00:00:00DECLARATION IN SUPPORT FILED BY ILWU-PMA WELFARE PLAN ON 03/13/2018
Date: 2018-03-13T00:00:00MOTION TO COMPEL ANSWERS TO INTERROGATORIES (SPECIAL) FILED BY ILWU-PMA WELFARE PLAN ON 03/13/2018
Date: 2018-03-13T00:00:00PROPOSED ORDER RECEIVED ON 03/16/2018
Date: 2018-03-16T00:00:00ANSWER TO AMENDED COMPLAINT FILED BY JUDE J. SANTIAGO, M.D., INC. ON 03/15/2018
Date: 2018-03-15T00:00:00CROSS-COMPLAINT FILED BY IHSAN N. SHAMAAN, M.D., INC. ON 03/15/2018
Date: 2018-03-15T00:00:00AMENDED ANSWER FILED BY IHSAN N. SHAMAAN, M.D., INC.; SHAMAAN, IHSAN N. ON 03/15/2018
Date: 2018-03-15T00:00:00ANSWER (GENERAL DENIAL) FILED BY MUKADAM, HYDER M.; MUKADAM MEDICAL CENTER, INC. ON 03/16/2018
Date: 2018-03-16T00:00:00STATEMENT OF DAMAGES FILED BY ILWU-PMA WELFARE PLAN ON 03/16/2018
Date: 2018-03-16T00:00:00RESPONSE (TO SPECIAL INTERROGATORY NO.1) FILED BY SANDOVAL, DANIELLE ON 03/21/2018
Date: 2018-03-21T00:00:00ANSWER TO AMENDED COMPLAINT FILED BY FISHER, THERESA ON 03/19/2018
Date: 2018-03-19T00:00:00AMENDED ANSWER FILED BY MUKADAM, HYDER M.; MUKADAM MEDICAL CENTER, INC. ON 03/20/2018
Date: 2018-03-20T00:00:00REQUEST - OTHER (REQUEST FOR ADMISSION NO. 1) FILED BY SANDOVAL, DANIELLE ON 03/21/2018
Date: 2018-03-21T00:00:00PROOF OF SERVICE FILED BY SANDOVAL, DANIELLE ON 03/21/2018
Date: 2018-03-21T00:00:00ANSWER TO AMENDED COMPLAINT FILED BY KRON, ANN ON 03/27/2018
Date: 2018-03-27T00:00:00ANSWER TO AMENDED COMPLAINT FILED BY ALTIS, LORA ON 03/23/2018
Date: 2018-03-23T00:00:00OPPOSITION (TO MOTION TO QUASH) FILED BY ILWU-PMA WELFARE PLAN ON 04/02/2018
Date: 2018-04-02T00:00:00PROOF OF SERVICE FILED BY ILWU-PMA WELFARE PLAN ON 04/02/2018
Date: 2018-04-02T00:00:00STATUS CONFERENCE STATEMENT FILED BY ILWU-PMA WELFARE PLAN ON 03/29/2018
Date: 2018-03-29T00:00:00REPLY - OTHER FILED BY GOMEZ-GARCIA, ANGEL; ANGEL GOMEZ-GARCIA MEDICAL CENTER, INC. ON 04/06/2018
Date: 2018-04-06T00:00:00MINUTES FINALIZED FOR MULTIPLE EVENTS 04/13/2018 10:00:00 AM.
Date: 2018-04-13T00:00:00ANSWER TO AMENDED COMPLAINT FILED BY L.A. UROLOGY, INC ON 04/12/2018
Date: 2018-04-12T00:00:00E-FILING TRANSACTION NUMBER 3572952 REJECTED.
Date: 2018-04-24T00:00:00E-FILING TRANSACTION NUMBER 4794167 REJECTED.
Date: 2018-04-16T00:00:00DECLARATION - OTHER (OF JESSICA WOERSCHING) FILED BY ILWU-PMA WELFARE PLAN ON 04/13/2018
Date: 2018-04-13T00:00:00PROOF OF SERVICE FILED BY ILWU-PMA WELFARE PLAN ON 04/13/2018
Date: 2018-04-13T00:00:00E-FILING TRANSACTION NUMBER 1414137 REJECTED.
Date: 2018-04-24T00:00:00E-FILING TRANSACTION NUMBER 4734905 REJECTED.
Date: 2018-04-24T00:00:00E-FILING TRANSACTION NUMBER 2567946 REJECTED.
Date: 2018-04-24T00:00:00PROPOSED ORDER RECEIVED ON 05/07/2018
Date: 2018-05-07T00:00:00E-FILING TRANSACTION NUMBER 4742978 REJECTED.
Date: 2018-04-24T00:00:00E-FILING TRANSACTION NUMBER 1496509 REJECTED.
Date: 2018-05-08T00:00:00E-FILING TRANSACTION NUMBER 3664630 REJECTED.
Date: 2018-05-07T00:00:00OPPOSITION FILED BY PATEL UROLOGY ON 05/07/2018
Date: 2018-05-07T00:00:00AMENDED CROSS-COMPLAINT (FIRST) FILED BY IHSAN N. SHAMAAN, M.D., INC. ON 05/07/2018
Date: 2018-05-07T00:00:00MINUTES FINALIZED FOR EX PARTE 05/08/2018 01:30:00 PM.
Date: 2018-05-08T00:00:00CLERK'S CERTIFICATE OF MAILING/ELECTRONIC SERVICE
Date: 2018-05-08T00:00:00PROPOSED ORDER RECEIVED ON 05/08/2018
Date: 2018-05-08T00:00:00E-FILING TRANSACTION NUMBER 3667217 REJECTED.
Date: 2018-05-16T00:00:00E-FILING TRANSACTION NUMBER 2668252 REJECTED.
Date: 2018-05-09T00:00:00REPLY - OTHER FILED BY ILWU-PMA WELFARE PLAN ON 05/11/2018
Date: 2018-05-11T00:00:00E-FILING TRANSACTION NUMBER 2666485 REJECTED.
Date: 2018-05-17T00:00:00PROPOSED ORDER RECEIVED ON 06/06/2018
Date: 2018-06-06T00:00:00MINUTES FINALIZED FOR MULTIPLE EVENTS 05/18/2018 10:00:00 AM.
Date: 2018-05-18T00:00:00ANSWER TO AMENDED COMPLAINT FILED BY NGUYEN, VI ON 06/01/2018
Date: 2018-06-01T00:00:00NOTICE - OTHER (APPEARANCE BY ALEXANDRA V. DRURY) FILED BY ILWU-PMA WELFARE PLAN ON 06/06/2018
Date: 2018-06-06T00:00:00ANSWER TO AMENDED COMPLAINT FILED BY L, C. ON 06/04/2018
Date: 2018-06-04T00:00:00PROOF OF ESERVICE FILED BY L, C. ON 06/04/2018
Date: 2018-06-04T00:00:00DECLARATION IN SUPPORT (DECLARATION OF ALEXANDRA V. DRURY) FILED BY ILWU-PMA WELFARE PLAN ON 06/06/2018
Date: 2018-06-06T00:00:00DEMURRER TO AMENDED CROSS-COMPLAINT FILED BY ILWU-PMA WELFARE PLAN ON 06/06/2018
Date: 2018-06-06T00:00:00REQUEST FOR JUDICIAL NOTICE FILED BY ILWU-PMA WELFARE PLAN ON 06/06/2018
Date: 2018-06-06T00:00:00AMENDED CROSS-COMPLAINT (FIRST) FILED BY PATEL UROLOGY; ILWU-PMA WELFARE PLAN ON 06/07/2018
Date: 2018-06-07T00:00:00PROOF OF SERVICE FILED BY ILWU-PMA WELFARE PLAN ON 06/06/2018
Date: 2018-06-06T00:00:00PROPOSED ORDER RECEIVED ON 06/19/2018
Date: 2018-06-19T00:00:00PROPOSED ORDER RECEIVED ON 06/15/2018
Date: 2018-06-15T00:00:00PROOF OF SERVICE OF SUMMONS FILED BY ILWU-PMA WELFARE PLAN ON 06/15/2018
Date: 2018-06-15T00:00:00DECLARATION IN SUPPORT FILED BY ILWU-PMA WELFARE PLAN ON 06/15/2018
Date: 2018-06-15T00:00:00PROOF OF SERVICE FILED BY ILWU-PMA WELFARE PLAN ON 06/15/2018
Date: 2018-06-15T00:00:00MOTION TO COMPEL ANSWERS TO INTERROGATORIES (FORM) FILED BY ILWU-PMA WELFARE PLAN ON 06/15/2018
Date: 2018-06-15T00:00:00SEPARATE STATEMENT FILED BY ILWU-PMA WELFARE PLAN ON 06/15/2018
Date: 2018-06-15T00:00:00E-FILING TRANSACTION NUMBER 3451577 REJECTED.
Date: 2016-11-04T00:00:00REQUEST FOR DISMISSAL WITHOUT PREJUDICE - PARTY FILED BY IL WU-PMA WELFARE PLAN ON 10/17/2016
Date: 2016-10-17T00:00:00PROPOSED ORDER RECEIVED ON 11/10/2016
Date: 2016-11-10T00:00:00CASE MANAGEMENT STATEMENT FILED BY FISHER, THERESA ON 11/14/2016
Date: 2016-11-14T00:00:00MINUTES FINALIZED FOR EX PARTE 11/14/2016 01:30:00 PM.
Date: 2016-11-14T00:00:00PROPOSED ORDER RECEIVED ON 11/17/2016.
Date: 2016-11-17T00:00:00MOTION FOR PROTECTIVE ORDER FILED BY IL WU-PMA WELFARE PLAN ON 11/17/2016
Date: 2016-11-17T00:00:00REQUEST FOR DISMISSAL WITHOUT PREJUDICE - PARTY FILED BY IL WU-PMA WELFARE PLAN ON 11/14/2016
Date: 2016-11-14T00:00:00DECLARATION IN SUPPORT FILED BY IL WU-PMA WELFARE PLAN ON 11/17/2016
Date: 2016-11-17T00:00:00E-FILING TRANSACTION NUMBER 2491884 REJECTED.
Date: 2016-11-22T00:00:00DECLARATION IN SUPPORT (OF CHRISTOPHER LEE) FILED BY ILWU-PMA WELFARE PLAN ON 06/15/2018
Date: 2018-06-15T00:00:00E-FILING TRANSACTION NUMBER 1518830 REJECTED.
Date: 2018-07-13T00:00:00MINUTES FINALIZED FOR MULTIPLE EVENTS 07/13/2018 10:00:00 AM.
Date: 2018-07-13T00:00:00ORDER ON COURT FEE WAIVER (SUPERIOR COURT) RECEIVED ON 07/17/2018.
Date: 2018-07-17T00:00:00CROSS-COMPLAINT FILED BY CASTRO, VANESSA ON 07/17/2018
Date: 2018-07-17T00:00:00ANSWER TO COMPLAINT FILED BY CASTRO, VANESSA ON 07/17/2018
Date: 2018-07-17T00:00:00PROOF OF SERVICE FILED BY CASTRO, VANESSA ON 07/17/2018
Date: 2018-07-17T00:00:00SUBSTITUTION OF ATTORNEY FILED BY FISHER, THERESA ON 07/17/2018
Date: 2018-07-17T00:00:00E-FILING TRANSACTION NUMBER 4863854 REJECTED.
Date: 2018-07-23T00:00:00SUMMONS ISSUED AND FILED FILED BY CASTRO, VANESSA ON 07/17/2018
Date: 2018-07-17T00:00:00E-FILING TRANSACTION NUMBER 1511251 REJECTED.
Date: 2018-07-23T00:00:00E-FILING TRANSACTION NUMBER 1510253 REJECTED.
Date: 2018-07-23T00:00:00E-FILING TRANSACTION NUMBER 2689170 REJECTED.
Date: 2018-07-23T00:00:00E-FILING TRANSACTION NUMBER 1511254 REJECTED.
Date: 2018-07-23T00:00:00E-FILING TRANSACTION NUMBER 3685977 REJECTED.
Date: 2018-07-23T00:00:00E-FILING TRANSACTION NUMBER 1511255 REJECTED.
Date: 2018-07-23T00:00:00E-FILING TRANSACTION NUMBER 1510260 REJECTED.
Date: 2018-07-23T00:00:00E-FILING TRANSACTION NUMBER 3685976 REJECTED.
Date: 2018-07-23T00:00:00E-FILING TRANSACTION NUMBER 2682961 REJECTED.
Date: 2018-07-23T00:00:00NOTICE OF RULING FILED BY PEOPLE OF THE STATE OF CALIFORNIA EX REL. ILWU-PMA WELFARE PLAN ON 07/23/2018
Date: 2018-07-23T00:00:00E-FILING TRANSACTION NUMBER 1517479 REJECTED.
Date: 2018-07-23T00:00:00E-FILING TRANSACTION NUMBER 2681943 REJECTED.
Date: 2018-07-23T00:00:00E-FILING TRANSACTION NUMBER 4857652 REJECTED.
Date: 2018-07-23T00:00:00E-FILING TRANSACTION NUMBER 4856664 REJECTED.
Date: 2018-07-23T00:00:00PROPOSED ORDER RECEIVED ON 07/23/2018
Date: 2018-07-23T00:00:00PROOF OF SERVICE FILED BY PEOPLE OF THE STATE OF CALIFORNIA EX REL. ILWU-PMA WELFARE PLAN ON 07/23/2018
Date: 2018-07-23T00:00:00CLERK'S CERTIFICATE OF SERVICE BY MAIL (OUT OF PROCESS) GENERATED
Date: 2018-07-24T00:00:00ORDER ON COURT FEE WAIVER (SUPERIOR COURT) FILED BY THE SUPERIOR COURT OF ORANGE ON 07/23/2018
Date: 2018-07-23T00:00:00PROOF OF SERVICE FILED BY ILWU-PMA WELFARE PLAN ON 07/23/2018
Date: 2018-07-23T00:00:00MOTION TO COMPEL ANSWERS TO INTERROGATORIES (SET ONE) FILED BY ILWU-PMA WELFARE PLAN ON 07/23/2018
Date: 2018-07-23T00:00:00MINUTES FINALIZED FOR MISCELLANEOUS HEARING 07/25/2018 09:00:00 AM.
Date: 2018-07-25T00:00:00SEPARATE STATEMENT FILED BY ILWU-PMA WELFARE PLAN ON 07/23/2018
Date: 2018-07-23T00:00:00DECLARATION IN SUPPORT (DECLARATION OF CHRISTOPHER LEE) FILED BY ILWU-PMA WELFARE PLAN ON 07/23/2018
Date: 2018-07-23T00:00:00MINUTES FINALIZED FOR MULTIPLE EVENTS 07/20/2018 10:00:00 AM.
Date: 2018-08-02T00:00:00OPPOSITION FILED BY KRON, ANN ON 07/26/2018
Date: 2018-07-26T00:00:00CLERK'S CERTIFICATE OF MAILING/ELECTRONIC SERVICE
Date: 2018-08-02T00:00:00NOTICE OF RULING FILED BY PEOPLE OF THE STATE OF CALIFORNIA EX REL. ILWU-PMA WELFARE PLAN ON 07/27/2018
Date: 2018-07-27T00:00:00PROPOSED ORDER RECEIVED ON 07/27/2018
Date: 2018-07-27T00:00:00OPPOSITION FILED BY IHSAN N. SHAMAAN, M.D., INC. ON 08/07/2018
Date: 2018-08-07T00:00:00E-FILING TRANSACTION NUMBER 3694350 REJECTED.
Date: 2018-08-07T00:00:00E-FILING TRANSACTION NUMBER 3694337 REJECTED.
Date: 2018-08-07T00:00:00PROOF OF SERVICE OF STATEMENT OF DAMAGES FILED BY ILWU-PMA WELFARE PLAN ON 08/07/2018
Date: 2018-08-07T00:00:00PROOF OF ESERVICE FILED BY IHSAN N. SHAMAAN, M.D., INC. ON 08/03/2018
Date: 2018-08-03T00:00:00STATEMENT OF DAMAGES FILED BY ILWU-PMA WELFARE PLAN ON 08/07/2018
Date: 2018-08-07T00:00:00PROOF OF SERVICE FILED BY ILWU-PMA WELFARE PLAN ON 08/08/2018
Date: 2018-08-08T00:00:00STATEMENT OF DAMAGES FILED BY ILWU-PMA WELFARE PLAN ON 08/08/2018
Date: 2018-08-08T00:00:00E-FILING TRANSACTION NUMBER 1463557 REJECTED.
Date: 2018-08-14T00:00:00PROOF OF SERVICE OF STATEMENT OF DAMAGES FILED BY ILWU-PMA WELFARE PLAN ON 08/08/2018
Date: 2018-08-08T00:00:00PROOF OF SERVICE OF SUMMONS FILED BY ILWU-PMA WELFARE PLAN ON 08/08/2018
Date: 2018-08-08T00:00:00E-FILING TRANSACTION NUMBER 4810148 REJECTED.
Date: 2018-08-14T00:00:00E-FILING TRANSACTION NUMBER 1479617 REJECTED.
Date: 2018-08-14T00:00:00PROOF OF SERVICE OF STATEMENT OF DAMAGES FILED BY ILWU-PMA WELFARE PLAN ON 08/10/2018
Date: 2018-08-10T00:00:00PROOF OF SERVICE FILED BY ILWU-PMA WELFARE PLAN ON 08/10/2018
Date: 2018-08-10T00:00:00REQUEST FOR ENTRY OF DEFAULT FILED BY ILWU-PMA WELFARE PLAN ON 08/16/2018
Date: 2018-08-16T00:00:00STATEMENT OF DAMAGES FILED BY ILWU-PMA WELFARE PLAN ON 08/10/2018
Date: 2018-08-10T00:00:00CLERK'S CERTIFICATE OF MAILING/ELECTRONIC SERVICE
Date: 2018-08-17T00:00:00MINUTES FINALIZED FOR DEMURRER TO AMENDED CROSS-COMPLAINT 08/17/2018 10:00:00 AM.
Date: 2018-08-17T00:00:00PROOF OF SERVICE FILED BY PEOPLE OF THE STATE OF CALIFORNIA EX REL. ILWU-PMA WELFARE PLAN ON 08/17/2018
Date: 2018-08-17T00:00:00REQUEST FOR ENTRY OF DEFAULT FILED BY ILWU-PMA WELFARE PLAN ON 08/17/2018
Date: 2018-08-17T00:00:00E-FILING TRANSACTION NUMBER 2705003 REJECTED.
Date: 2018-08-23T00:00:00PROOF OF SERVICE FILED BY ILWU-PMA WELFARE PLAN ON 08/21/2018
Date: 2018-08-21T00:00:00E-FILING TRANSACTION NUMBER 4877882 REJECTED.
Date: 2018-08-21T00:00:00E-FILING TRANSACTION NUMBER 1531288 REJECTED.
Date: 2018-08-21T00:00:00E-FILING TRANSACTION NUMBER 3701906 REJECTED.
Date: 2018-08-24T00:00:00PROOF OF SERVICE OF SUMMONS FILED BY ILWU-PMA WELFARE PLAN ON 08/23/2018
Date: 2018-08-23T00:00:00E-FILING TRANSACTION NUMBER 3701875 REJECTED.
Date: 2018-08-24T00:00:00MINUTES FINALIZED FOR STATUS CONFERENCE 08/23/2018 01:30:00 PM.
Date: 2018-08-23T00:00:00REQUEST FOR ENTRY OF DEFAULT FILED BY ILWU-PMA WELFARE PLAN ON 08/23/2018
Date: 2018-08-23T00:00:00OPPOSITION FILED BY PATEL, BHARAT ON 08/24/2018
Date: 2018-08-24T00:00:00MINUTES FINALIZED FOR MULTIPLE EVENTS 08/24/2018 10:00:00 AM.
Date: 2018-08-24T00:00:00ORDER - OTHER (RE DEMURRER TO 1ST AMENDED COMPLAINT) FILED BY ILWU-PMA WELFARE PLAN ON 08/24/2018
Date: 2018-08-24T00:00:00REQUEST FOR JUDICIAL NOTICE FILED BY PATEL, BHARAT ON 08/24/2018
Date: 2018-08-24T00:00:00E-FILING TRANSACTION NUMBER 4882962 REJECTED.
Date: 2018-09-04T00:00:00REPLY - OTHER FILED BY PEOPLE OF THE STATE OF CALIFORNIA EX REL. ILWU-PMA WELFARE PLAN ON 08/30/2018
Date: 2018-08-30T00:00:00PROOF OF ESERVICE FILED BY NGUYEN, VI ON 08/30/2018
Date: 2018-08-30T00:00:00STATEMENT OF DAMAGES FILED BY ILWU-PMA WELFARE PLAN ON 08/31/2018
Date: 2018-08-31T00:00:00OPPOSITION FILED BY NGUYEN, VI ON 08/30/2018
Date: 2018-08-30T00:00:00DECLARATION IN SUPPORT FILED BY IL WU-PMA WELFARE PLAN ON 12/06/2017
Date: 2017-12-06T00:00:00PROOF OF SERVICE FILED BY IL WU-PMA WELFARE PLAN ON 12/06/2017
Date: 2017-12-06T00:00:00SEPARATE STATEMENT FILED BY IL WU-PMA WELFARE PLAN ON 12/06/2017
Date: 2017-12-06T00:00:00ASSOCIATION OF ATTORNEY FILED BY GOMEZ-GARCIA, ANGEL ON 12/07/2017
Date: 2017-12-07T00:00:00CASE REASSIGNED TO RANDALL SHERMAN EFFECTIVE 01/02/2018.
Date: 2017-12-20T00:00:00PROPOSED ORDER RECEIVED ON 01/05/2018
Date: 2018-01-05T00:00:00PROPOSED ORDER RECEIVED ON 01/10/2018
Date: 2018-01-10T00:00:00PROOF OF SERVICE FILED BY PEOPLE OF THE STATE OF CALIFORNIA EX REL. IL WU-PMA WELFARE PLAN ON 01/10/2018
Date: 2018-01-10T00:00:00PROOF OF SERVICE FILED BY PEOPLE OF THE STATE OF CALIFORNIA EX REL. IL WU-PMA WELFARE PLAN ON 01/05/2018
Date: 2018-01-05T00:00:00PROPOSED ORDER RECEIVED ON 01/29/2018
Date: 2018-01-29T00:00:00PROPOSED ORDER RECEIVED ON 01/29/2018.
Date: 2018-01-29T00:00:00MINUTES FINALIZED FOR MOTION FOR LEAVE TO AMEND 02/02/2018 10:30:00 AM.
Date: 2018-02-02T00:00:00NOTICE OF RULING FILED BY PEOPLE OF THE STATE OF CALIFORNIA EX REL. ILWU-PMA WELFARE PLAN ON 02/05/2018
Date: 2018-02-05T00:00:00E-FILING TRANSACTION NUMBER 1439732 REJECTED.
Date: 2018-02-05T00:00:00OPPOSITION FILED BY MUKADAM, HYDER M.; MUKADAM MEDICAL CENTER, INC. ON 02/13/2018
Date: 2018-02-13T00:00:00OPPOSITION FILED BY L, C. ON 02/14/2018
Date: 2018-02-14T00:00:00REPLY - OTHER (BRIEF IN SUPPORT MOTION TO COMPEL) FILED BY ILWU-PMA WELFARE PLAN ON 02/14/2018
Date: 2018-02-14T00:00:00CLERK'S CERTIFICATE OF MAILING/ELECTRONIC SERVICE
Date: 2018-02-16T00:00:00MINUTES FINALIZED FOR MULTIPLE EVENTS 02/16/2018 10:00:00 AM.
Date: 2018-02-16T00:00:00E-FILING TRANSACTION NUMBER 3639238 REJECTED.
Date: 2018-02-22T00:00:00MINUTES FINALIZED FOR MULTIPLE EVENTS 02/23/2018 10:30:00 AM.
Date: 2018-02-23T00:00:00E-FILING TRANSACTION NUMBER 3595835 REJECTED.
Date: 2018-02-23T00:00:00E-FILING TRANSACTION NUMBER 1429093 REJECTED.
Date: 2018-02-23T00:00:00E-FILING TRANSACTION NUMBER 2642489 REJECTED.
Date: 2018-02-21T00:00:00E-FILING TRANSACTION NUMBER 4776064 REJECTED.
Date: 2018-02-23T00:00:00OPPOSITION FILED BY MUKADAM, HYDER M.; MUKADAM MEDICAL CENTER, INC. ON 02/26/2018
Date: 2018-02-26T00:00:00E-FILING TRANSACTION NUMBER 1473512 REJECTED.
Date: 2018-02-28T00:00:00ANSWER TO AMENDED COMPLAINT FILED BY TORRES, MARIA ON 03/01/2018
Date: 2018-03-01T00:00:00MINUTES FINALIZED FOR MULTIPLE EVENTS 03/02/2018 10:30:00 AM.
Date: 2018-03-02T00:00:00NOTICE OF ERRATA FILED BY PEOPLE OF THE STATE OF CALIFORNIA EX REL. ILWU-PMA WELFARE PLAN ON 03/02/2018
Date: 2018-03-02T00:00:00E-FILING TRANSACTION NUMBER 3580607 REJECTED.
Date: 2018-03-06T00:00:00PROPOSED ORDER RECEIVED ON 03/02/2018
Date: 2018-03-02T00:00:00E-FILING TRANSACTION NUMBER 1389087 REJECTED.
Date: 2018-03-06T00:00:00E-FILING TRANSACTION NUMBER 1395738 REJECTED.
Date: 2018-03-06T00:00:00E-FILING TRANSACTION NUMBER 1395737 REJECTED.
Date: 2018-03-06T00:00:00ANSWER TO AMENDED COMPLAINT FILED BY DAHIYA, SHYAM; SHYAM DAHIYA, M.D., INC. ON 03/06/2018
Date: 2018-03-06T00:00:00PROPOSED ORDER RECEIVED ON 03/08/2018
Date: 2018-03-08T00:00:00ANSWER TO AMENDED COMPLAINT FILED BY PATEL, BHARAT; PATEL UROLOGY ON 03/05/2018
Date: 2018-03-05T00:00:00CROSS-COMPLAINT FILED BY PATEL UROLOGY ON 03/05/2018
Date: 2018-03-05T00:00:00MINUTES FINALIZED FOR NUNC PRO TUNC MINUTES 03/09/2018 02:57:00 PM.
Date: 2018-03-09T00:00:00E-FILING TRANSACTION NUMBER 2627647 REJECTED.
Date: 2018-03-12T00:00:00MINUTES FINALIZED FOR MULTIPLE EVENTS 03/09/2018 10:00:00 AM.
Date: 2018-03-09T00:00:00E-FILING TRANSACTION NUMBER 4752592 REJECTED.
Date: 2018-03-12T00:00:00E-FILING TRANSACTION NUMBER 1455929 REJECTED.
Date: 2018-03-12T00:00:00E-FILING TRANSACTION NUMBER 3702205 REJECTED.
Date: 2018-09-05T00:00:00REQUEST FOR ENTRY OF DEFAULT FILED BY ILWU-PMA WELFARE PLAN ON 08/24/2018
Date: 2018-08-24T00:00:00PROPOSED ORDER RECEIVED ON 10/29/2018
Date: 2018-10-29T00:00:00E-FILING TRANSACTION NUMBER 4897851 REJECTED.
Date: 2018-10-26T00:00:00REPLY TO OPPOSITION FILED BY NGUYEN, HUY ON 10/26/2018
Date: 2018-10-26T00:00:00MOTION TO SET ASIDE (DEFAULT) FILED BY NGUYEN, HUY ON 10/05/2018
Date: 2018-10-05T00:00:00PROPOSED ORDER RECEIVED ON 10/30/2018
Date: 2018-10-30T00:00:00NOTICE OF MOTION FILED BY NGUYEN, HUY ON 11/02/2018
Date: 2018-11-02T00:00:00OPPOSITION FILED BY IHSAN N. SHAMAAN, M.D., INC. ON 12/03/2018
Date: 2018-12-03T00:00:00PROOF OF ESERVICE FILED BY IHSAN N. SHAMAAN, M.D., INC. ON 12/03/2018
Date: 2018-12-03T00:00:00MINUTES FINALIZED FOR MOTION TO SET ASIDE/VACATE DEFAULT 12/07/2018 10:00:00 AM.
Date: 2018-12-07T00:00:00MINUTES FINALIZED FOR STATUS CONFERENCE 11/29/2018 09:00:00 AM.
Date: 2018-11-29T00:00:00NOTICE OF RULING FILED BY NGUYEN, HUY ON 12/10/2018
Date: 2018-12-10T00:00:00MINUTES FINALIZED FOR DEMURRER TO AMENDED CROSS-COMPLAINT 12/14/2018 10:00:00 AM.
Date: 2018-12-14T00:00:00E-FILING TRANSACTION NUMBER 1551438 REJECTED.
Date: 2018-12-14T00:00:00ORDER G057120
Date: 2018-12-27T00:00:00OPPOSITION (TO SECONF AMENDED CROSS-COMPLAINT) FILED BY PATEL UROLOGY ON 12/26/2018
Date: 2018-12-26T00:00:00NOTICE OF CHANGE OF ADDRESS AND/OR TELEPHONE FILED BY PATEL UROLOGY ON 01/09/2019
Date: 2019-01-09T00:00:00MINUTES FINALIZED FOR DEMURRER TO AMENDED CROSS-COMPLAINT 01/11/2019 10:00:00 AM.
Date: 2019-01-11T00:00:00PROPOSED ORDER RECEIVED ON 01/16/2019
Date: 2019-01-16T00:00:00NOTICE OF RULING FILED BY ILWU-PMA WELFARE PLAN ON 01/14/2019
Date: 2019-01-14T00:00:00AMENDED CROSS-COMPLAINT (THIRD) FILED BY IHSAN N. SHAMAAN, M.D., INC. ON 01/14/2019
Date: 2019-01-14T00:00:00PROOF OF ESERVICE FILED BY IHSAN N. SHAMAAN, M.D., INC. ON 01/14/2019
Date: 2019-01-14T00:00:00NOTICE OF CHANGE OF FIRM NAME FILED BY IHSAN N. SHAMAAN, M.D., INC. ON 01/14/2019
Date: 2019-01-14T00:00:00MINUTES FINALIZED FOR EX PARTE 01/17/2019 01:30:00 PM.
Date: 2019-01-23T00:00:00E-FILING TRANSACTION NUMBER 4927355 REJECTED.
Date: 2019-01-24T00:00:00ALTERNATIVE WRIT G057120
Date: 2019-02-04T00:00:00NOTICE OF FEES DUE ELECTRONIC FILING
Date: 2019-01-30T00:00:00AMENDED CROSS-COMPLAINT (- REDLINE -THIRD AMENDED CROSS-COMPLAINT) RECEIVED ON 02/07/2019.
Date: 2019-02-07T00:00:00MINUTES FINALIZED FOR CHAMBERS WORK 02/11/2019 11:30:00 AM.
Date: 2019-02-11T00:00:00PROPOSED ORDER RECEIVED ON 02/08/2019
Date: 2019-02-08T00:00:00AMENDED CROSS-COMPLAINT (THIRD) FILED BY PATEL UROLOGY ON 02/01/2019
Date: 2019-02-01T00:00:00CLERK'S CERTIFICATE OF MAILING/ELECTRONIC SERVICE
Date: 2019-02-11T00:00:00PROPOSED ORDER RECEIVED ON 02/15/2019
Date: 2019-02-15T00:00:00ORDER RE: PETITION (COURT OF APPEAL NO. G057120)
Date: 2019-02-11T00:00:00PROOF OF ESERVICE FILED BY NGUYEN, HUY ON 02/15/2019
Date: 2019-02-15T00:00:00OPPOSITION FILED BY NGUYEN, HUY ON 02/15/2019
Date: 2019-02-15T00:00:00DECLARATION IN SUPPORT OF MOTION TO BE RELIEVED AS COUNSEL FILED BY SHAMAAN, IHSAN N. ON 02/15/2019
Date: 2019-02-15T00:00:00MOTION TO BE RELIEVED AS COUNSEL OF RECORD FILED BY SHAMAAN, IHSAN N. ON 02/15/2019
Date: 2019-02-15T00:00:00PROPOSED ORDER RECEIVED ON 02/15/2019.
Date: 2019-02-15T00:00:00PROOF OF ESERVICE FILED BY SHAMAAN, IHSAN N. ON 02/15/2019
Date: 2019-02-15T00:00:00ORDER GRANTING ATTORNEYS MOTION TO BE RELIEVED AS COUNSEL RECEIVED ON 02/15/2019.
Date: 2019-02-15T00:00:00PROOF OF ESERVICE FILED BY IHSAN N. SHAMAAN, M.D., INC. ON 02/15/2019
Date: 2019-02-15T00:00:00MOTION TO BE RELIEVED AS COUNSEL OF RECORD FILED BY IHSAN N. SHAMAAN, M.D., INC. ON 02/15/2019
Date: 2019-02-15T00:00:00PROPOSED ORDER RECEIVED ON 02/20/2019
Date: 2019-02-20T00:00:00MINUTES FINALIZED FOR EX PARTE 02/19/2019 01:30:00 PM.
Date: 2019-02-19T00:00:00PROPOSED ORDER RECEIVED ON 02/27/2019
Date: 2019-02-27T00:00:00PROPOSED ORDER RECEIVED ON 03/05/2019
Date: 2019-03-05T00:00:00SUBSTITUTION OF ATTORNEY FILED BY ALTIS, LORA ON 03/01/2019
Date: 2019-03-01T00:00:00CLERK'S CERTIFICATE OF MAILING/ELECTRONIC SERVICE
Date: 2019-04-09T00:00:00MINUTES FINALIZED FOR MISCELLANEOUS HEARING 04/05/2019 10:00:00 AM.
Date: 2019-04-05T00:00:00AFFIDAVIT - OTHER FILED BY PATEL, BHARAT ON 03/25/2019
Date: 2019-03-25T00:00:00MEMORANDUM OF POINTS AND AUTHORITIES FILED BY NGUYEN, HUY ON 03/28/2019
Date: 2019-03-28T00:00:00CLERK'S CERTIFICATE OF MAILING/ELECTRONIC SERVICE
Date: 2019-04-05T00:00:00MINUTES FINALIZED FOR MULTIPLE EVENTS 04/12/2019 10:00:00 AM.
Date: 2019-04-12T00:00:00ORDER G057120
Date: 2019-04-11T00:00:00PROOF OF SERVICE FILED BY PEOPLE OF THE STATE OF CALIFORNIA EX REL. ILWU-PMA WELFARE PLAN ON 04/10/2019
Date: 2019-04-10T00:00:00ORDER GRANTING ATTORNEYS MOTION TO BE RELIEVED AS COUNSEL FILED BY HINMAN LAW GROUP P.C. ON 04/12/2019
Date: 2019-04-12T00:00:00PROPOSED ORDER RECEIVED ON 04/26/2019
Date: 2019-04-26T00:00:00PROPOSED ORDER RECEIVED ON 04/25/2019
Date: 2019-04-25T00:00:00E-FILING TRANSACTION NUMBER 3786160 REJECTED.
Date: 2019-04-30T00:00:00E-FILING TRANSACTION NUMBER 4963122 REJECTED.
Date: 2019-04-26T00:00:00E-FILING TRANSACTION NUMBER 2788332 REJECTED.
Date: 2019-04-26T00:00:00E-FILING TRANSACTION NUMBER 2788334 REJECTED.
Date: 2019-05-06T00:00:00MOTION TO DISMISS FILED BY NGUYEN, HUY ON 04/29/2019
Date: 2019-04-29T00:00:00NOTICE OF RULING FILED BY IHSAN N. SHAMAAN, M.D., INC.; SHAMAAN, IHSAN N. ON 05/09/2019
Date: 2019-05-09T00:00:00E-FILING TRANSACTION NUMBER 4963119 REJECTED.
Date: 2019-05-06T00:00:00REQUEST FOR JUDICIAL NOTICE FILED BY PATEL UROLOGY ON 05/09/2019
Date: 2019-05-09T00:00:00OPPOSITION (TO DEMURRER TO THIRD AMENDED COMPLAINT) FILED BY PATEL UROLOGY ON 05/09/2019
Date: 2019-05-09T00:00:00DISCOVERY REFEREE REPORT NO. 3 AND ORDER
Date: 2019-05-17T00:00:00REPORT OF REFEREE (ALTERNATIVE DISPUTE RESOLUTION) RECEIVED ON 05/15/2019.
Date: 2019-05-15T00:00:00E-FILING TRANSACTION NUMBER 4944173 REJECTED.
Date: 2019-05-24T00:00:00MINUTES FINALIZED FOR DEMURRER TO CROSS-COMPLAINT 05/24/2019 10:00:00 AM.
Date: 2019-05-24T00:00:00DECLARATION IN SUPPORT FILED BY ILWU-PMA WELFARE PLAN ON 05/24/2019
Date: 2019-05-24T00:00:00OPPOSITION (TO MOTION TO DISMISS THE 1ST AMENDED COMPLAINT) FILED BY ILWU-PMA WELFARE PLAN ON 05/24/2019
Date: 2019-05-24T00:00:00PROPOSED ORDER RECEIVED ON 05/29/2019
Date: 2019-05-29T00:00:00MINUTES FINALIZED FOR EX PARTE 11/09/2017 01:30:00 PM.
Date: 2017-11-13T00:00:00PROOF OF ESERVICE FILED BY ANGEL GOMEZ-GARCIA MEDICAL CENTER, INC. ON 11/14/2017
Date: 2017-11-14T00:00:00SEPARATE STATEMENT FILED BY ANGEL GOMEZ-GARCIA MEDICAL CENTER, INC. ON 11/14/2017
Date: 2017-11-14T00:00:00PROPOSED ORDER RECEIVED ON 11/14/2017.
Date: 2017-11-14T00:00:00NOTICE OF RULING FILED BY DAHIYA, SHYAM ON 11/16/2017
Date: 2017-11-16T00:00:00MINUTES FINALIZED FOR STATUS CONFERENCE 11/08/2017 01:30:00 PM.
Date: 2017-11-17T00:00:00MINUTES FINALIZED FOR CHAMBERS WORK 11/20/2017 09:23:00 AM.
Date: 2017-11-20T00:00:00PROOF OF SERVICE FILED BY IL WU-PMA WELFARE PLAN ON 11/28/2017
Date: 2017-11-28T00:00:00CLERK'S CERTIFICATE OF MAILING/ELECTRONIC SERVICE
Date: 2017-11-20T00:00:00MINUTES FINALIZED FOR EX PARTE 11/15/2017 01:30:00 PM.
Date: 2017-11-17T00:00:00PROPOSED ORDER RECEIVED ON 12/06/2017
Date: 2017-12-06T00:00:00MOTION TO COMPEL ANSWERS TO INTERROGATORIES (SPECIAL) FILED BY ILWU-PMA WELFARE PLAN ON 06/15/2018
Date: 2018-06-15T00:00:00MOTION TO COMPEL ANSWERS TO REQUEST FOR ADMISSIONS FILED BY ILWU-PMA WELFARE PLAN ON 06/15/2018
Date: 2018-06-15T00:00:00PROOF OF SERVICE FILED BY ILWU-PMA WELFARE PLAN ON 06/19/2018
Date: 2018-06-19T00:00:00DECLARATION IN SUPPORT FILED BY ILWU-PMA WELFARE PLAN ON 06/19/2018
Date: 2018-06-19T00:00:00SEPARATE STATEMENT FILED BY ILWU-PMA WELFARE PLAN ON 06/19/2018
Date: 2018-06-19T00:00:00MOTION FOR SANCTIONS (FOR CONTEMPT) FILED BY ILWU-PMA WELFARE PLAN ON 06/19/2018
Date: 2018-06-19T00:00:00PROPOSED STIPULATION AND ORDER RECEIVED ON 06/22/2018
Date: 2018-06-22T00:00:00ANSWER TO COMPLAINT FILED BY NGUYEN, VU ON 06/20/2018
Date: 2018-06-20T00:00:00SEPARATE STATEMENT FILED BY FISHER, THERESA ON 06/29/2018
Date: 2018-06-29T00:00:00SUBSTITUTION OF ATTORNEY FILED BY FISHER, THERESA ON 06/28/2018
Date: 2018-06-28T00:00:00OPPOSITION FILED BY FISHER, THERESA ON 06/29/2018
Date: 2018-06-29T00:00:00DECLARATION IN SUPPORT OF OPPOSITION FILED BY FISHER, THERESA ON 06/29/2018
Date: 2018-06-29T00:00:00PROPOSED ORDER RECEIVED ON 07/09/2018
Date: 2018-07-09T00:00:00OPPOSITION (TO MOTION TO COMPEL) FILED BY MUKADAM, HYDER M.; MUKADAM MEDICAL CENTER, INC. ON 07/09/2018
Date: 2018-07-09T00:00:00PROOF OF SERVICE FILED BY MUKADAM, HYDER M.; MUKADAM MEDICAL CENTER, INC. ON 07/09/2018
Date: 2018-07-09T00:00:00DECLARATION IN SUPPORT FILED BY MUKADAM, HYDER M.; MUKADAM MEDICAL CENTER, INC. ON 07/09/2018
Date: 2018-07-09T00:00:00SEPARATE STATEMENT FILED BY MUKADAM, HYDER M.; MUKADAM MEDICAL CENTER, INC. ON 07/09/2018
Date: 2018-07-09T00:00:00OPPOSITION FILED BY MUKADAM, HYDER M.; MUKADAM MEDICAL CENTER, INC. ON 07/09/2018
Date: 2018-07-09T00:00:00PROPOSED ORDER RECEIVED ON 07/10/2018
Date: 2018-07-10T00:00:00DECLARATION IN SUPPORT (DECLARATION OF CHRISTOPHER LEE) FILED BY ILWU-PMA WELFARE PLAN ON 07/09/2018
Date: 2018-07-09T00:00:00SEPARATE STATEMENT FILED BY ILWU-PMA WELFARE PLAN ON 07/09/2018
Date: 2018-07-09T00:00:00PROOF OF SERVICE FILED BY ILWU-PMA WELFARE PLAN ON 07/09/2018
Date: 2018-07-09T00:00:00DECLARATION IN SUPPORT FILED BY MUKADAM, HYDER M.; MUKADAM MEDICAL CENTER, INC. ON 07/11/2018
Date: 2018-07-11T00:00:00DECLARATION IN SUPPORT (DECLARATION OF CHRISTOPHER LEE) FILED BY ILWU-PMA WELFARE PLAN ON 07/10/2018
Date: 2018-07-10T00:00:00PROOF OF SERVICE FILED BY ILWU-PMA WELFARE PLAN ON 07/10/2018
Date: 2018-07-10T00:00:00DEMURRER TO AMENDED CROSS-COMPLAINT (TO FIRST) FILED BY ILWU-PMA WELFARE PLAN ON 07/10/2018
Date: 2018-07-10T00:00:00PROPOSED STIPULATION AND ORDER RECEIVED ON 05/29/2019
Date: 2019-05-29T00:00:00OPPOSITION FILED BY ILWU-PMA WELFARE PLAN ON 03/01/2021
Date: 2021-03-01T00:00:00CLERK'S CERTIFICATE OF MAILING/ELECTRONIC SERVICE
Date: 2021-02-25T00:00:00DECLARATION IN SUPPORT OF OPPOSITION FILED BY ILWU-PMA WELFARE PLAN ON 03/01/2021
Date: 2021-03-01T00:00:00DECLARATION IN SUPPORT OF MOTION TO BE RELIEVED AS COUNSEL FILED BY SHAMAAN, IHSAN N. ON 03/05/2021
Date: 2021-03-05T00:00:00NOTICE OF RULING FILED BY GOMEZ-GARCIA, ANGEL ON 03/08/2021
Date: 2021-03-08T00:00:00RECOMMENDED DECISION OF DISCOVERY REFEREE (NO. 19)
Date: 2021-03-10T00:00:00MOTION TO BE RELIEVED AS COUNSEL OF RECORD FILED BY SHAMAAN, IHSAN N. ON 03/05/2021
Date: 2021-03-05T00:00:00MINUTES FINALIZED FOR MOTION TO COMPEL DEPOSITION (ORAL OR WRITTEN) 03/05/2021 09:30:00 AM.
Date: 2021-03-16T00:00:00MOTION FOR JOINDER FILED BY DAHIYA, SHYAM ON 03/22/2021
Date: 2021-03-22T00:00:00CLERK'S CERTIFICATE OF MAILING/ELECTRONIC SERVICE
Date: 2021-03-10T00:00:00MOTION TO BIFURCATE FILED BY PATEL, BHARAT ON 03/12/2021
Date: 2021-03-12T00:00:00PROPOSED ORDER RECEIVED ON 03/12/2021
Date: 2021-03-12T00:00:00RESPONSE (TO MOTION FOR RECONSIDERATION) FILED BY ILWU-PMA WELFARE PLAN ON 03/25/2021
Date: 2021-03-25T00:00:00PROPOSED ORDER RECEIVED ON 03/25/2021
Date: 2021-03-25T00:00:00DECLARATION IN SUPPORT (ADDITIONAL) FILED BY PATEL, BHARAT ON 03/22/2021
Date: 2021-03-22T00:00:00REPLY TO OPPOSITION FILED BY PATEL, BHARAT ON 04/01/2021
Date: 2021-04-01T00:00:00PROOF OF SERVICE FILED BY ILWU-PMA WELFARE PLAN ON 03/26/2021
Date: 2021-03-26T00:00:00PROOF OF SERVICE (RE REPLY TO OPPOSITION) FILED BY PATEL, BHARAT ON 04/01/2021
Date: 2021-04-01T00:00:00OPPOSITION (TO MOTION FOR ORDER BIFURCATING TRIAL) FILED BY ILWU-PMA WELFARE PLAN ON 04/02/2021
Date: 2021-04-02T00:00:00PROOF OF SERVICE FILED BY ILWU-PMA WELFARE PLAN ON 04/02/2021
Date: 2021-04-02T00:00:00REPLY TO OPPOSITION FILED BY PATEL, BHARAT ON 04/08/2021
Date: 2021-04-08T00:00:00PROOF OF SERVICE FILED BY PACIFIC MARITIME ASSOCIATIONS ON 04/16/2021
Date: 2021-04-16T00:00:00CLERK'S CERTIFICATE OF MAILING/ELECTRONIC SERVICE
Date: 2021-04-12T00:00:00MINUTES FINALIZED FOR MOTION FOR RECONSIDERATION 04/08/2021 02:00:00 PM.
Date: 2021-04-12T00:00:00PROPOSED ORDER (RECOMMENDED DECISION NO. 22) RECEIVED ON 04/16/2021.
Date: 2021-04-16T00:00:00MOTION FOR SUMMARY JUDGMENT/ADJUDICATION FILED BY GOMEZ-GARCIA, ANGEL ON 04/19/2021
Date: 2021-04-19T00:00:00REQUEST FOR JUDICIAL NOTICE FILED BY GOMEZ-GARCIA, ANGEL ON 04/19/2021
Date: 2021-04-19T00:00:00SEPARATE STATEMENT FILED BY GOMEZ-GARCIA, ANGEL ON 04/19/2021
Date: 2021-04-19T00:00:00MOTION FOR SUMMARY JUDGMENT/ADJUDICATION FILED BY GOMEZ-GARCIA, ANGEL ON 04/20/2021
Date: 2021-04-20T00:00:00REQUEST FOR JUDICIAL NOTICE FILED BY GOMEZ-GARCIA, ANGEL ON 04/21/2021
Date: 2021-04-21T00:00:00MINUTES FINALIZED FOR MOTION FOR RECONSIDERATION 2021-04-15 14:00:00.0.
Date: 2021-04-21T00:00:00E-FILING TRANSACTION NUMBER 3990279 REJECTED.
Date: 2021-04-23T00:00:00SEPARATE STATEMENT FILED BY PATEL, BHARAT; PATEL UROLOGY; L.A. UROLOGY, INC ON 04/22/2021
Date: 2021-04-22T00:00:00DECLARATION IN SUPPORT FILED BY DAHIYA, SHYAM ON 04/26/2021
Date: 2021-04-26T00:00:00REQUEST FOR JUDICIAL NOTICE FILED BY PATEL, BHARAT; PATEL UROLOGY; L.A. UROLOGY, INC ON 04/22/2021
Date: 2021-04-22T00:00:00RESPONSE FILED BY ILWU-PMA WELFARE PLAN ON 04/22/2021
Date: 2021-04-22T00:00:00MOTION FOR SUMMARY JUDGMENT/ADJUDICATION FILED BY DAHIYA, SHYAM ON 04/26/2021
Date: 2021-04-26T00:00:00REQUEST FOR JUDICIAL NOTICE FILED BY DAHIYA, SHYAM ON 04/26/2021
Date: 2021-04-26T00:00:00SEPARATE STATEMENT FILED BY DAHIYA, SHYAM ON 04/26/2021
Date: 2021-04-26T00:00:00REQUEST FOR JUDICIAL NOTICE FILED BY GOMEZ-GARCIA, ANGEL ON 04/28/2021
Date: 2021-04-28T00:00:00SEPARATE STATEMENT FILED BY GOMEZ-GARCIA, ANGEL ON 04/28/2021
Date: 2021-04-28T00:00:00PROOF OF SERVICE FILED BY GOMEZ-GARCIA, ANGEL ON 04/28/2021
Date: 2021-04-28T00:00:00DECLARATION IN SUPPORT FILED BY GOMEZ-GARCIA, ANGEL ON 04/28/2021
Date: 2021-04-28T00:00:00PROPOSED ORDER RECEIVED ON 04/29/2021
Date: 2021-04-29T00:00:00MOTION FOR SUMMARY JUDGMENT/ADJUDICATION FILED BY GOMEZ-GARCIA, ANGEL ON 04/28/2021
Date: 2021-04-28T00:00:00OBJECTION FILED BY PATEL UROLOGY; L.A. UROLOGY, INC ON 04/30/2021
Date: 2021-04-30T00:00:00PROOF OF SERVICE FILED BY ILWU-PMA WELFARE PLAN ON 04/29/2021
Date: 2021-04-29T00:00:00OPPOSITION FILED BY GOMEZ-GARCIA, ANGEL ON 04/30/2021
Date: 2021-04-30T00:00:00DECLARATION IN SUPPORT FILED BY PATEL UROLOGY; L.A. UROLOGY, INC ON 04/30/2021
Date: 2021-04-30T00:00:00MINUTES FINALIZED FOR NUNC PRO TUNC MINUTES 05/06/2021 07:59:00 AM.
Date: 2021-05-06T00:00:00DECLARATION IN SUPPORT FILED BY GOMEZ-GARCIA, ANGEL ON 04/30/2021
Date: 2021-04-30T00:00:00OBJECTION FILED BY NGUYEN, VU ON 05/05/2021
Date: 2021-05-05T00:00:00CLERK'S CERTIFICATE OF MAILING/ELECTRONIC SERVICE
Date: 2021-05-06T00:00:00PROPOSED ORDER RECEIVED ON 05/06/2021.
Date: 2021-05-06T00:00:00NOTICE OF MOTION FILED BY SHAMAAN, IHSAN N.; IHSAN N. SHAMAAN, M.D., INC. ON 05/06/2021
Date: 2021-05-06T00:00:00E-FILING TRANSACTION NUMBER 41191021 REJECTED.
Date: 2021-05-07T00:00:00PROPOSED ORDER RECEIVED ON 05/10/2021
Date: 2021-05-10T00:00:00OPPOSITION FILED BY ILWU-PMA WELFARE PLAN ON 05/06/2021
Date: 2021-05-06T00:00:00STATUS CONFERENCE STATEMENT FILED BY ILWU-PMA WELFARE PLAN ON 05/07/2021
Date: 2021-05-07T00:00:00PROOF OF SERVICE FILED BY SHAMAAN, IHSAN N.; IHSAN N. SHAMAAN, M.D., INC. ON 05/11/2021
Date: 2021-05-11T00:00:00MINUTES FINALIZED FOR MOTION TO BE RELIEVED AS COUNSEL OF RECORD 05/06/2021 02:00:00 PM.
Date: 2021-05-11T00:00:00OBJECTION FILED BY GOMEZ-GARCIA, ANGEL ON 05/12/2021
Date: 2021-05-12T00:00:00PROPOSED ORDER RECEIVED ON 05/12/2021
Date: 2021-05-12T00:00:00RESPONSE FILED BY PACIFIC MARITIME ASSOCIATIONS ON 05/14/2021
Date: 2021-05-14T00:00:00EX PARTE APPLICATION - OTHER FILED BY PATEL, BHARAT; PATEL UROLOGY; L.A. UROLOGY, INC ON 05/12/2021
Date: 2021-05-12T00:00:00PROPOSED ORDER RECEIVED ON 05/14/2021
Date: 2021-05-14T00:00:00PROOF OF SERVICE FILED BY PATEL, BHARAT; PATEL UROLOGY; L.A. UROLOGY, INC ON 05/12/2021
Date: 2021-05-12T00:00:00NOTICE OF RULING FILED BY ILWU-PMA WELFARE PLAN ON 05/14/2021
Date: 2021-05-14T00:00:00PROOF OF SERVICE FILED BY PACIFIC MARITIME ASSOCIATIONS ON 05/14/2021
Date: 2021-05-14T00:00:00DECLARATION - OTHER FILED BY PACIFIC MARITIME ASSOCIATIONS ON 05/14/2021
Date: 2021-05-14T00:00:00CLERK'S CERTIFICATE OF MAILING/ELECTRONIC SERVICE
Date: 2021-05-18T00:00:00REPLY TO OPPOSITION FILED BY SHAMAAN, IHSAN N.; IHSAN N. SHAMAAN, M.D., INC. ON 05/17/2021
Date: 2021-05-17T00:00:00MINUTES FINALIZED FOR CHAMBERS WORK 2021-05-18 09:34:00.0.
Date: 2021-05-18T00:00:00MINUTES FINALIZED FOR EX PARTE 2021-05-14 13:30:00.0.
Date: 2021-05-19T00:00:00E-FILING TRANSACTION NUMBER 21016782 REJECTED.
Date: 2021-05-19T00:00:00CLERK'S CERTIFICATE OF MAILING/ELECTRONIC SERVICE
Date: 2021-05-19T00:00:00PROPOSED ORDER RECEIVED ON 05/20/2021
Date: 2021-05-20T00:00:00MINUTES FINALIZED FOR STATUS CONFERENCE 2021-05-14 09:00:00.0.
Date: 2021-05-19T00:00:00RECOMMENDED DECISION NO. 22
Date: 2021-05-19T00:00:00PROOF OF SERVICE FILED BY ILWU-PMA WELFARE PLAN ON 05/20/2021
Date: 2021-05-20T00:00:00CLERK'S CERTIFICATE OF MAILING/ELECTRONIC SERVICE
Date: 2021-05-21T00:00:00DECLARATION IN SUPPORT FILED BY ILWU-PMA WELFARE PLAN ON 05/20/2021
Date: 2021-05-20T00:00:00RESPONSE (TO OBJECTIONS TO RECOMMENDED DECISION) FILED BY ILWU-PMA WELFARE PLAN ON 05/20/2021
Date: 2021-05-20T00:00:00E-FILING TRANSACTION NUMBER 21021047 REJECTED.
Date: 2021-05-21T00:00:00DECLARATION IN SUPPORT FILED BY PATEL, BHARAT ON 05/21/2021
Date: 2021-05-21T00:00:00E-FILING TRANSACTION NUMBER 31019717 REJECTED.
Date: 2021-05-25T00:00:00E-FILING TRANSACTION NUMBER 21020770 REJECTED.
Date: 2021-05-25T00:00:00WITHDRAWAL OF ATTORNEY FILED BY ILWU-PMA WELFARE PLAN ON 05/25/2021
Date: 2021-05-25T00:00:00MINUTES FINALIZED FOR MOTION TO BE RELIEVED AS COUNSEL OF RECORD 05/20/2021 02:00:00 PM.
Date: 2021-05-28T00:00:00OPPOSITION FILED BY ILWU-PMA WELFARE PLAN ON 05/27/2021
Date: 2021-05-27T00:00:00CLERK'S CERTIFICATE OF MAILING/ELECTRONIC SERVICE
Date: 2017-09-19T00:00:00PROOF OF SERVICE FILED BY IHSAN N. SHAMAAN, M.D., INC. ON 09/21/2017
Date: 2017-09-21T00:00:00REPLY TO OPPOSITION FILED BY IHSAN N. SHAMAAN, M.D., INC.; SHAMAAN, IHSAN N. ON 09/25/2017
Date: 2017-09-25T00:00:00PROPOSED ORDER RECEIVED ON 10/06/2017
Date: 2017-10-06T00:00:00MINUTES FINALIZED FOR CHAMBERS WORK 10/06/2017 03:38:00 PM.
Date: 2017-10-06T00:00:00PROPOSED ORDER RECEIVED ON 10/10/2017
Date: 2017-10-10T00:00:00CLERK'S CERTIFICATE OF MAILING/ELECTRONIC SERVICE
Date: 2017-10-06T00:00:00MINUTES FINALIZED FOR EX PARTE 10/10/2017 01:30:00 PM.
Date: 2017-10-12T00:00:00CASE MANAGEMENT STATEMENT FILED BY FISHER, THERESA ON 11/07/2017
Date: 2017-11-07T00:00:00CASE MANAGEMENT STATEMENT SUBMITTED BY FISHER, THERESA REJECTED ON 11/08/2017.
Date: 2017-11-08T00:00:00PROPOSED ORDER RECEIVED ON 11/08/2017
Date: 2017-11-08T00:00:00STATUS CONFERENCE STATEMENT FILED BY PATEL, BHARAT; PATEL UROLOGY ON 11/03/2017
Date: 2017-11-03T00:00:00PROPOSED ORDER RECEIVED ON 11/10/2017
Date: 2017-11-10T00:00:00STATEMENT OF DAMAGES FILED BY ILWU-PMA WELFARE PLAN ON 09/05/2018
Date: 2018-09-05T00:00:00E-FILING TRANSACTION NUMBER 1522471 REJECTED.
Date: 2018-09-07T00:00:00MINUTES FINALIZED FOR MULTIPLE EVENTS 09/07/2018 10:00:00 AM.
Date: 2018-09-07T00:00:00E-FILING TRANSACTION NUMBER 1522518 REJECTED.
Date: 2018-09-07T00:00:00E-FILING TRANSACTION NUMBER 2694186 REJECTED.
Date: 2018-09-07T00:00:00PROOF OF ESERVICE FILED BY IHSAN N. SHAMAAN, M.D., INC. ON 09/13/2018
Date: 2018-09-13T00:00:00AMENDED CROSS-COMPLAINT FILED BY IHSAN N. SHAMAAN, M.D., INC. ON 09/13/2018
Date: 2018-09-13T00:00:00E-FILING TRANSACTION NUMBER 1541005 REJECTED.
Date: 2018-09-20T00:00:00AMENDED CROSS-COMPLAINT (SECOND) FILED BY PATEL UROLOGY ON 09/26/2018
Date: 2018-09-26T00:00:00E-FILING TRANSACTION NUMBER 2689138 REJECTED.
Date: 2018-09-21T00:00:00E-FILING TRANSACTION NUMBER 4863826 REJECTED.
Date: 2018-09-21T00:00:00E-FILING TRANSACTION NUMBER 4863753 REJECTED.
Date: 2018-09-21T00:00:00MINUTES FINALIZED FOR MULTIPLE EVENTS 09/21/2018 10:00:00 AM.
Date: 2018-09-21T00:00:00CLERK'S CERTIFICATE OF MAILING/ELECTRONIC SERVICE
Date: 2018-10-05T00:00:00PROPOSED ORDER RECEIVED ON 10/16/2018
Date: 2018-10-16T00:00:00MINUTES FINALIZED FOR MOTION TO COMPEL ANSWERS TO SPECIAL INTERROGATORIES 09/28/2018 10:00:00 AM.
Date: 2018-09-28T00:00:00E-FILING TRANSACTION NUMBER 2694183 REJECTED.
Date: 2018-09-28T00:00:00MINUTES FINALIZED FOR MOTION TO COMPEL RESPONSE TO REQUESTS FOR ADMISSIONS 10/05/2018 10:00:00 AM.
Date: 2018-10-05T00:00:00DOCUMENT - OTHER (RED LINED - SECOND AMENDED CROSS COMPLAINT) FILED BY PATEL UROLOGY ON 09/26/2018
Date: 2018-09-26T00:00:00NOTICE OF RULING FILED BY ILWU-PMA WELFARE PLAN ON 05/26/2021
Date: 2021-05-26T00:00:00MOTION TO BE RELIEVED AS COUNSEL OF RECORD FILED BY IHSAN N. SHAMAAN, M.D., INC. ON 05/28/2021
Date: 2021-05-28T00:00:00PROPOSED ORDER RECEIVED ON 09/23/2021
Date: 2021-09-23T00:00:00PROPOSED ORDER RECEIVED ON 09/23/2021.
Date: 2021-09-23T00:00:00DECLARATION IN SUPPORT OF MOTION TO BE RELIEVED AS COUNSEL FILED BY NGUYEN, VU ON 09/23/2021
Date: 2021-09-23T00:00:00NOTICE OF MOTION (TO BE RELIEVED AS COUNSEL OF RECORD) RECEIVED ON 09/23/2021.
Date: 2021-09-23T00:00:00EX PARTE APPLICATION - OTHER FILED BY NGUYEN, VU ON 09/23/2021
Date: 2021-09-23T00:00:00NOTICE OF HEARING FILED BY NGUYEN, VU ON 09/27/2021
Date: 2021-09-27T00:00:00E-FILING TRANSACTION NUMBER 41243847 REJECTED.
Date: 2021-09-27T00:00:00MINUTES FINALIZED FOR MULTIPLE EVENTS 09/24/2021 01:30:00 PM.
Date: 2021-09-24T00:00:00MOTION IN LIMINE (#1) FILED BY MUKADAM MEDICAL CENTER, INC. ON 10/01/2021
Date: 2021-10-01T00:00:00PROOF OF SERVICE FILED BY MUKADAM MEDICAL CENTER, INC. ON 10/01/2021
Date: 2021-10-01T00:00:00OPPOSITION FILED BY MUKADAM MEDICAL CENTER, INC. ON 10/01/2021
Date: 2021-10-01T00:00:00ORDER - OTHER (RE EX-PARTE) FILED BY NGUYEN, VU ON 09/27/2021
Date: 2021-09-27T00:00:00MOTION IN LIMINE (NO, 2) FILED BY MUKADAM, HYDER M.; MUKADAM MEDICAL CENTER, INC. ON 10/01/2021
Date: 2021-10-01T00:00:00PROOF OF SERVICE FILED BY NGUYEN, VU ON 10/01/2021
Date: 2021-10-01T00:00:00OPPOSITION FILED BY ILWU-PMA WELFARE PLAN ON 10/06/2021
Date: 2021-10-06T00:00:00E-FILING TRANSACTION NUMBER 31070813 REJECTED.
Date: 2021-10-06T00:00:00NOTICE OF CHANGE OF ADDRESS AND/OR TELEPHONE FILED BY ILWU-PMA WELFARE PLAN ON 10/07/2021
Date: 2021-10-07T00:00:00STATEMENT - OTHER FILED BY MUKADAM MEDICAL CENTER, INC. ON 10/07/2021
Date: 2021-10-07T00:00:00STATEMENT OF COMPLIANCE FILED BY ILWU-PMA WELFARE PLAN ON 10/06/2021
Date: 2021-10-06T00:00:00STATEMENT OF CONTROVERTED ISSUES FILED BY ILWU-PMA WELFARE PLAN ON 10/12/2021
Date: 2021-10-12T00:00:00DECLARATION IN SUPPORT (DECLARATION OF COUNSEL) FILED BY KRON, ANN ON 10/05/2021
Date: 2021-10-05T00:00:00OPPOSITION (TO MIL #1) FILED BY ILWU-PMA WELFARE PLAN ON 10/08/2021
Date: 2021-10-08T00:00:00TRIAL BRIEF FILED BY ILWU-PMA WELFARE PLAN ON 10/12/2021
Date: 2021-10-12T00:00:00VERDICT RECEIVED ON 10/12/2021.
Date: 2021-10-12T00:00:00MINUTES FINALIZED FOR PRETRIAL CONFERENCE 10/08/2021 01:30:00 PM.
Date: 2021-10-15T00:00:00WITNESS LIST FILED BY ILWU-PMA WELFARE PLAN ON 10/12/2021
Date: 2021-10-12T00:00:00EXHIBIT LIST FILED BY ILWU-PMA WELFARE PLAN ON 10/12/2021
Date: 2021-10-12T00:00:00PROOF OF SERVICE FILED BY ILWU-PMA WELFARE PLAN ON 10/12/2021
Date: 2021-10-12T00:00:00EX PARTE APPLICATION - OTHER (FOR ORDER CONTINUING TRIAL) FILED BY KRON, ANN ON 10/15/2021
Date: 2021-10-15T00:00:00TRIAL BRIEF FILED BY MUKADAM MEDICAL CENTER, INC. ON 10/18/2021
Date: 2021-10-18T00:00:00DECLARATION IN SUPPORT OF MOTION TO BE RELIEVED AS COUNSEL FILED BY NGUYEN, VU ON 10/18/2021
Date: 2021-10-18T00:00:00PROOF OF PERSONAL SERVICE FILED BY IHSAN N. SHAMAAN, M.D., INC. ON 10/21/2021
Date: 2021-10-21T00:00:00STIPULATION - OTHER (TO EXTEND TIME TO BRING CASE TO TRIAL) FILED BY ILWU-PMA WELFARE PLAN ON 10/20/2021
Date: 2021-10-20T00:00:00PROOF OF SERVICE FILED BY NGUYEN, VU ON 10/20/2021
Date: 2021-10-20T00:00:00PROPOSED ORDER RECEIVED ON 10/20/2021
Date: 2021-10-20T00:00:00MINUTES FINALIZED FOR COURT TRIAL 10/18/2021 10:00:00 AM.
Date: 2021-10-22T00:00:00NOTICE - OTHER FILED BY PEOPLE OF THE STATE OF CALIFORNIA EX REL. ILWU-PMA WELFARE PLAN ON 10/21/2021.
Date: 2021-10-21T00:00:00MINUTES FINALIZED FOR MOTION TO BE RELIEVED AS COUNSEL OF RECORD 10/18/2021 09:00:00 AM.
Date: 2021-10-22T00:00:00E-FILING TRANSACTION NUMBER 31076514 REJECTED.
Date: 2021-10-22T00:00:00PROOF OF ESERVICE FILED BY MUKADAM MEDICAL CENTER, INC. ON 10/27/2021
Date: 2021-10-27T00:00:00SUPPLEMENTAL FILED BY ILWU-PMA WELFARE PLAN ON 10/26/2021
Date: 2021-10-26T00:00:00REQUEST FOR DISMISSAL WITH PREJUDICE - PARTY FILED BY ILWU-PMA WELFARE PLAN ON 10/22/2021
Date: 2021-10-22T00:00:00DECLARATION IN SUPPORT (OF KATHLEEN CAHILL SLAUGHT) FILED BY ILWU-PMA WELFARE PLAN ON 10/25/2021
Date: 2021-10-25T00:00:00DECLARATION - OTHER FILED BY MUKADAM MEDICAL CENTER, INC. ON 10/27/2021
Date: 2021-10-27T00:00:00MINUTES FINALIZED FOR COURT TRIAL 2021-10-25 09:00:00.0.
Date: 2021-10-29T00:00:00MINUTES FINALIZED FOR COURT TRIAL 10/26/2021 09:00:00 AM.
Date: 2021-10-29T00:00:00REQUEST FOR DISMISSAL WITHOUT PREJUDICE - PARTY FILED BY ILWU-PMA WELFARE PLAN ON 11/01/2021
Date: 2021-11-01T00:00:00MINUTES FINALIZED FOR COURT TRIAL 10/27/2021 09:00:00 AM.
Date: 2021-11-02T00:00:00MINUTES FINALIZED FOR COURT TRIAL 11/01/2021 09:00:00 AM.
Date: 2021-11-02T00:00:00REQUEST FOR DISMISSAL WITH PREJUDICE - PARTY FILED BY ILWU-PMA WELFARE PLAN ON 11/01/2021
Date: 2021-11-01T00:00:00NOTICE - OTHER FILED BY ILWU-PMA WELFARE PLAN ON 11/02/2021.
Date: 2021-11-02T00:00:00MINUTES FINALIZED FOR COURT TRIAL 11/02/2021 09:00:00 AM.
Date: 2021-11-08T00:00:00NOTICE OF ENTRY OF DISMISSAL AND PROOF OF SERVICE FILED BY PATEL, BHARAT ON 11/09/2021
Date: 2021-11-09T00:00:00MINUTES FINALIZED FOR COURT TRIAL 11/09/2021 09:00:00 AM.
Date: 2021-11-10T00:00:00TRIAL BRIEF FILED BY MUKADAM MEDICAL CENTER, INC. ON 11/12/2021
Date: 2021-11-12T00:00:00CLERK'S CERTIFICATE OF MAILING/ELECTRONIC SERVICE
Date: 2021-11-19T00:00:00MINUTES FINALIZED FOR COURT TRIAL 11/03/2021 09:00:00 AM.
Date: 2021-11-30T00:00:00MINUTES FINALIZED FOR COURT TRIAL 11/29/2021 09:00:00 AM.
Date: 2021-11-30T00:00:00MEMORANDUM OF POINTS AND AUTHORITIES FILED BY KRON, ANN ON 11/30/2021
Date: 2021-11-30T00:00:00NOTICE OF LODGING FILED BY KRON, ANN ON 11/30/2021
Date: 2021-11-30T00:00:00MINUTES FINALIZED FOR COURT TRIAL 11/16/2021 09:00:00 AM.
Date: 2021-12-03T00:00:00REQUEST FOR JUDICIAL NOTICE FILED BY KRON, ANN ON 11/30/2021
Date: 2021-11-30T00:00:00MINUTES FINALIZED FOR COURT TRIAL 11/10/2021 09:00:00 AM.
Date: 2021-12-03T00:00:00MINUTES FINALIZED FOR COURT TRIAL 11/15/2021 09:00:00 AM.
Date: 2021-12-03T00:00:00E-FILING TRANSACTION NUMBER 21018882 REJECTED.
Date: 2021-12-06T00:00:00MINUTES FINALIZED FOR COURT TRIAL 11/17/2021 09:00:00 AM.
Date: 2021-12-03T00:00:00MINUTES FINALIZED FOR COURT TRIAL 11/30/2021 09:00:00 AM.
Date: 2021-12-15T00:00:00REQUEST FOR STATEMENT OF DECISION FILED BY KRON, ANN ON 12/13/2021
Date: 2021-12-13T00:00:00REQUEST FOR DISMISSAL WITH PREJUDICE - PARTY FILED BY ILWU-PMA WELFARE PLAN ON 12/16/2021
Date: 2021-12-16T00:00:00MINUTES FINALIZED FOR COURT TRIAL 11/08/2021 09:00:00 AM.
Date: 2021-12-15T00:00:00MINUTES FINALIZED FOR CHAMBERS WORK 12/17/2021 02:23:00 PM.
Date: 2021-12-17T00:00:00NOTICE OF ENTRY OF DISMISSAL AND PROOF OF SERVICE FILED BY SHYAM DAHIYA, M.D., INC. ON 12/16/2021
Date: 2021-12-16T00:00:00CLERK'S CERTIFICATE OF MAILING/ELECTRONIC SERVICE
Date: 2021-12-17T00:00:00REPLY - OTHER FILED BY PATEL, BHARAT ON 01/08/2020
Date: 2020-01-08T00:00:00NOTICE - OTHER FILED BY IHSAN N. SHAMAAN, M.D., INC. ON 01/09/2020.
Date: 2020-01-09T00:00:00MINUTES FINALIZED FOR STATUS CONFERENCE 02/20/2020 01:30:00 PM.
Date: 2020-02-24T00:00:00E-FILING TRANSACTION NUMBER 2897238 REJECTED.
Date: 2020-03-02T00:00:00NOTICE OF RULING FILED BY PEOPLE OF THE STATE OF CALIFORNIA EX REL. ILWU-PMA WELFARE PLAN ON 02/21/2020
Date: 2020-02-21T00:00:00STATUS CONFERENCE STATEMENT FILED BY PATEL, BHARAT ON 02/14/2020
Date: 2020-02-14T00:00:00PROPOSED ORDER RECEIVED ON 03/04/2020
Date: 2020-03-04T00:00:00EX PARTE APPLICATION - OTHER FILED BY GOMEZ-GARCIA, ANGEL ON 03/04/2020
Date: 2020-03-04T00:00:00ORDER - OTHER (RE EX PARTE) FILED BY GOMEZ-GARCIA, ANGEL ON 03/05/2020
Date: 2020-03-05T00:00:00E-FILING TRANSACTION NUMBER 41072839 REJECTED.
Date: 2020-03-09T00:00:00NOTICE OF INTENT TO APPEAR TELEPHONICALLY FILED BY ILWU-PMA WELFARE PLAN ON 03/04/2020
Date: 2020-03-04T00:00:00NOTICE - OTHER FILED BY GOMEZ-GARCIA, ANGEL ON 03/09/2020.
Date: 2020-03-09T00:00:00MINUTES FINALIZED FOR EX PARTE 03/05/2020 01:30:00 PM.
Date: 2020-03-09T00:00:00PROPOSED ORDER RECEIVED ON 04/03/2020
Date: 2020-04-03T00:00:00COMMISSION (ISSUED 3/10/2020) RECEIVED ON 03/09/2020.
Date: 2020-03-09T00:00:00NOTICE OF CONTINUANCE
Date: 2020-05-11T00:00:00STIPULATION - OTHER (TO CONTINUE TRIAL DATE) FILED BY PATEL, BHARAT ON 05/26/2020
Date: 2020-05-26T00:00:00NOTICE OF CONTINUANCE
Date: 2020-05-14T00:00:00E-FILING TRANSACTION NUMBER 3903854 REJECTED.
Date: 2020-06-03T00:00:00CLERK'S CERTIFICATE OF MAILING/ELECTRONIC SERVICE
Date: 2020-06-02T00:00:00NOTICE - OTHER (JOINDER STATUS CONFERENCE REPORT) FILED BY DAHIYA, SHYAM ON 08/20/2020
Date: 2020-08-20T00:00:00MINUTES FINALIZED FOR CHAMBERS WORK 06/02/2020 03:56:00 PM.
Date: 2020-06-02T00:00:00STATUS CONFERENCE STATEMENT FILED BY PATEL, BHARAT ON 08/18/2020
Date: 2020-08-18T00:00:00NOTICE - OTHER FILED BY SHAMAAN, IHSAN N.; IHSAN N. SHAMAAN, M.D., INC. ON 08/25/2020.
Date: 2020-08-25T00:00:00E-FILING TRANSACTION NUMBER 1761575 REJECTED.
Date: 2020-08-20T00:00:00PROOF OF SERVICE FILED BY GOMEZ-GARCIA, ANGEL ON 08/24/2020
Date: 2020-08-24T00:00:00PROOF OF SERVICE FILED BY ILWU-PMA WELFARE PLAN ON 08/25/2020
Date: 2020-08-25T00:00:00STATUS CONFERENCE STATEMENT FILED BY ILWU-PMA WELFARE PLAN ON 08/25/2020
Date: 2020-08-25T00:00:00NOTICE OF INTENT TO APPEAR TELEPHONICALLY FILED BY PATEL, BHARAT ON 08/25/2020
Date: 2020-08-25T00:00:00MINUTES FINALIZED FOR STATUS CONFERENCE 08/27/2020 01:30:00 PM.
Date: 2020-08-27T00:00:00NOTICE - OTHER FILED BY ILWU-PMA WELFARE PLAN ON 09/08/2020.
Date: 2020-09-08T00:00:00OBJECTION FILED BY GOMEZ-GARCIA, ANGEL ON 09/10/2020
Date: 2020-09-10T00:00:00E-FILING TRANSACTION NUMBER 3934591 REJECTED.
Date: 2020-09-08T00:00:00PROOF OF SERVICE FILED BY PACIFIC MARITIME ASSOCIATIONS ON 09/21/2020
Date: 2020-09-21T00:00:00PROPOSED STIPULATION AND ORDER RECEIVED ON 09/25/2020
Date: 2020-09-25T00:00:00E-FILING TRANSACTION NUMBER 3935685 REJECTED.
Date: 2020-09-11T00:00:00OBJECTION (JOINDER IN OBJECTION) FILED BY PATEL, BHARAT ON 09/28/2020
Date: 2020-09-28T00:00:00NOTICE OF ERRATA FILED BY GOMEZ-GARCIA, ANGEL ON 09/30/2020
Date: 2020-09-30T00:00:00OBJECTION (JOINDER) FILED BY DAHIYA, SHYAM; SHYAM DAHIYA, M.D., INC. ON 09/29/2020
Date: 2020-09-29T00:00:00MINUTES FINALIZED FOR CHAMBERS WORK 10/02/2020 09:42:00 AM.
Date: 2020-10-05T00:00:00NOTICE - OTHER FILED BY GOMEZ-GARCIA, ANGEL ON 10/07/2020.
Date: 2020-10-07T00:00:00ADR - STIPULATION (#19) FILED BY ILWU-PMA WELFARE PLAN ON 10/16/2020
Date: 2020-10-16T00:00:00CLERK'S CERTIFICATE OF MAILING/ELECTRONIC SERVICE
Date: 2020-10-05T00:00:00PROOF OF SERVICE FILED BY ILWU-PMA WELFARE PLAN ON 10/16/2020
Date: 2020-10-16T00:00:00PROOF OF SERVICE FILED BY GOMEZ-GARCIA, ANGEL; ANGEL GOMEZ-GARCIA MEDICAL CENTER, INC. ON 10/23/2020
Date: 2020-10-23T00:00:00OBJECTION FILED BY GOMEZ-GARCIA, ANGEL; ANGEL GOMEZ-GARCIA MEDICAL CENTER, INC. ON 10/23/2020
Date: 2020-10-23T00:00:00RESPONSE (TO OBJECTION) FILED BY ILWU-PMA WELFARE PLAN ON 11/02/2020
Date: 2020-11-02T00:00:00APPLICATION AND ORDER (REQUEST FOR HEARING) RECEIVED ON 10/26/2020.
Date: 2020-10-26T00:00:00DECLARATION IN SUPPORT FILED BY ILWU-PMA WELFARE PLAN ON 11/02/2020
Date: 2020-11-02T00:00:00NOTICE - OTHER FILED BY PATEL, BHARAT ON 10/27/2020.
Date: 2020-10-27T00:00:00CASE REASSIGNED TO KIRK NAKAMURA EFFECTIVE 01/04/2021.
Date: 2020-12-10T00:00:00CLERK'S CERTIFICATE OF MAILING/ELECTRONIC SERVICE
Date: 2020-11-18T00:00:00MINUTES FINALIZED FOR CHAMBERS WORK 11/18/2020 03:25:00 PM.
Date: 2020-11-18T00:00:00OBJECTION (TO DECISION OF DISCOVERY #20) FILED BY PATEL, BHARAT ON 01/05/2021
Date: 2021-01-05T00:00:00POINTS AND AUTHORITIES SUBMITTED BY PATEL, BHARAT REJECTED ON 01/05/2021.
Date: 2021-01-05T00:00:00DECLARATION IN SUPPORT FILED BY PATEL, BHARAT ON 01/05/2021
Date: 2021-01-05T00:00:00PROOF OF SERVICE FILED BY PATEL, BHARAT ON 01/05/2021
Date: 2021-01-05T00:00:00DECLARATION IN SUPPORT FILED BY GOMEZ-GARCIA, ANGEL ON 01/05/2021
Date: 2021-01-05T00:00:00PROOF OF SERVICE FILED BY GOMEZ-GARCIA, ANGEL ON 01/05/2021
Date: 2021-01-05T00:00:00E-FILING TRANSACTION NUMBER 3968621 REJECTED.
Date: 2021-01-06T00:00:00SUPPLEMENTAL (DECLARATION OF JOEL RUBEN) FILED BY GOMEZ-GARCIA, ANGEL ON 01/05/2021
Date: 2021-01-05T00:00:00OBJECTION (TO RECOMMENDED DECISION OF DISCOVERY REFEREE #20) FILED BY GOMEZ-GARCIA, ANGEL ON 01/05/2021
Date: 2021-01-05T00:00:00EXHIBIT LIST (Q - X) FILED BY PATEL, BHARAT ON 01/06/2021
Date: 2021-01-06T00:00:00REQUEST - OTHER (HEARING AND ORAL ARGUMENT) RECEIVED ON 01/06/2021.
Date: 2021-01-06T00:00:00EXHIBIT LIST (A - P) FILED BY PATEL, BHARAT ON 01/06/2021
Date: 2021-01-06T00:00:00STATUS CONFERENCE STATEMENT FILED BY GOMEZ-GARCIA, ANGEL ON 01/07/2021
Date: 2021-01-07T00:00:00CASE MANAGEMENT STATEMENT FILED BY MUKADAM MEDICAL CENTER, INC. ON 01/12/2021
Date: 2021-01-12T00:00:00PROPOSED ORDER RECEIVED ON 01/12/2021
Date: 2021-01-12T00:00:00PROOF OF SERVICE BY POSTING (NON-UD) FILED BY MUKADAM MEDICAL CENTER, INC. ON 01/12/2021
Date: 2021-01-12T00:00:00OBJECTION FILED BY ILWU-PMA WELFARE PLAN ON 01/20/2021
Date: 2021-01-20T00:00:00NOTICE OF INTENT TO APPEAR TELEPHONICALLY FILED BY ILWU-PMA WELFARE PLAN ON 01/19/2021
Date: 2021-01-19T00:00:00PROOF OF SERVICE FILED BY ILWU-PMA WELFARE PLAN ON 01/20/2021
Date: 2021-01-20T00:00:00MINUTES FINALIZED FOR STATUS CONFERENCE 2021-01-14 13:30:00.0.
Date: 2021-01-19T00:00:00E-FILING TRANSACTION NUMBER 3972070 REJECTED.
Date: 2021-01-19T00:00:00DECLARATION IN SUPPORT FILED BY ILWU-PMA WELFARE PLAN ON 01/20/2021
Date: 2021-01-20T00:00:00NOTICE OF HEARING FILED BY ILWU-PMA WELFARE PLAN ON 01/21/2021
Date: 2021-01-21T00:00:00NOTICE OF RULING FILED BY GOMEZ-GARCIA, ANGEL ON 02/19/2021
Date: 2021-02-19T00:00:00MINUTES FINALIZED FOR UNDER SUBMISSION RULING 2021-02-18 15:48:00.0.
Date: 2021-02-18T00:00:00CLERK'S CERTIFICATE OF MAILING/ELECTRONIC SERVICE
Date: 2021-02-18T00:00:00OPPOSITION FILED BY ILWU-PMA WELFARE PLAN ON 02/18/2021
Date: 2021-02-18T00:00:00MOTION TO COMPEL DEPOSITION (ORAL OR WRITTEN) FILED BY GOMEZ-GARCIA, ANGEL ON 02/22/2021
Date: 2021-02-22T00:00:00E-FILING TRANSACTION NUMBER 41148424 REJECTED.
Date: 2021-02-22T00:00:00RECOMMENDED DECISION NO._20
Date: 2021-02-24T00:00:00RECOMMENDED DECISION OF DISCOVERY REFEREE (NO.17)
Date: 2021-02-24T00:00:00MINUTES FINALIZED FOR EX PARTE 02/18/2021 01:30:00 PM.
Date: 2021-02-23T00:00:00AMENDED RECOMMENDED DECISION OF DISCOVERY REFEREE (NO.18)
Date: 2021-02-24T00:00:00MOTION FOR RECONSIDERATION FILED BY PATEL, BHARAT ON 02/26/2021
Date: 2021-02-26T00:00:00REQUEST FOR DISMISSAL WITHOUT PREJUDICE - PARTY FILED BY ILWU-PMA WELFARE PLAN ON 12/20/2021
Date: 2021-12-20T00:00:00EXHIBIT LIST (CLERK'S WORKING COPY) FILED BY THE SUPERIOR COURT OF ORANGE ON 11/30/2021
Date: 2021-11-30T00:00:00MINUTES FINALIZED FOR MULTIPLE EVENTS 05/30/2019 01:30:00 PM.
Date: 2019-05-31T00:00:00MINUTES FINALIZED FOR MOTION TO DISMISS 06/07/2019 10:00:00 AM.
Date: 2019-06-07T00:00:00REPLY TO OPPOSITION FILED BY NGUYEN, HUY ON 05/31/2019
Date: 2019-05-31T00:00:00MEMORANDUM OF COSTS (SUMMARY) FILED BY ILWU-PMA WELFARE PLAN ON 06/12/2019
Date: 2019-06-12T00:00:00PROOF OF SERVICE FILED BY ILWU-PMA WELFARE PLAN ON 06/12/2019
Date: 2019-06-12T00:00:00ORDER ON COURT FEE WAIVER (SUPERIOR COURT) RECEIVED ON 06/13/2019.
Date: 2019-06-13T00:00:00NOTICE - OTHER (WAIVER OF COURT FEES) RECEIVED ON 06/13/2019.
Date: 2019-06-13T00:00:00ORDER ON COURT FEE WAIVER (SUPERIOR COURT) (GRANTED) FILED BY THE SUPERIOR COURT OF ORANGE ON 06/14/2019
Date: 2019-06-14T00:00:00E-FILING TRANSACTION NUMBER 4986735 REJECTED.
Date: 2019-07-03T00:00:00REPORT OF REFEREE (ALTERNATIVE DISPUTE RESOLUTION) (AMENDED RECOMENDATION) RECEIVED ON 06/28/2019.
Date: 2019-06-28T00:00:00ORDER G057877
Date: 2019-06-27T00:00:00CLERK'S CERTIFICATE OF MAILING/ELECTRONIC SERVICE
Date: 2019-06-15T00:00:00ORDER G057932
Date: 2019-07-03T00:00:00PROPOSED JUDGMENT RECEIVED ON 07/03/2019.
Date: 2019-07-03T00:00:00CLERK'S CERTIFICATE OF MAILING/ELECTRONIC SERVICE
Date: 2019-07-03T00:00:00MINUTES FINALIZED FOR CHAMBERS WORK 07/03/2019 04:16:00 PM.
Date: 2019-07-03T00:00:00MINUTES FINALIZED FOR EX PARTE 07/05/2019 10:00:00 AM.
Date: 2019-07-05T00:00:00DECLARATION - OTHER FILED BY KRON, ANN ON 07/15/2019
Date: 2019-07-15T00:00:00ORDER - OTHER (ON FEE WAIVER) FILED BY THE SUPERIOR COURT OF ORANGE ON 07/17/2019
Date: 2019-07-17T00:00:00MINUTES FINALIZED FOR CHAMBERS WORK 07/18/2019 04:08:00 PM.
Date: 2019-07-18T00:00:00PROPOSED ORDER RECEIVED ON 07/18/2019
Date: 2019-07-18T00:00:00ORDER ON COURT FEE WAIVER (SUPERIOR COURT) RECEIVED ON 07/15/2019.
Date: 2019-07-15T00:00:00CLERK'S CERTIFICATE OF MAILING/ELECTRONIC SERVICE
Date: 2019-07-18T00:00:00E-FILING TRANSACTION NUMBER 3814002 REJECTED.
Date: 2019-07-22T00:00:00MOTION TO BE RELIEVED AS COUNSEL OF RECORD FILED BY SHAMAAN, IHSAN N. ON 05/28/2021
Date: 2021-05-28T00:00:00DECLARATION IN SUPPORT OF MOTION TO BE RELIEVED AS COUNSEL FILED BY SHAMAAN, IHSAN N. ON 05/28/2021
Date: 2021-05-28T00:00:00ORDER G060165
Date: 2021-06-09T00:00:00STATUS CONFERENCE STATEMENT FILED BY ILWU-PMA WELFARE PLAN ON 06/14/2021
Date: 2021-06-14T00:00:00ORDER G060166
Date: 2021-06-09T00:00:00DOCUMENT - OTHER (RECOMMENDED DECISION NO. 23) RECEIVED ON 05/23/2021.
Date: 2021-05-23T00:00:00PROPOSED STIPULATION AND ORDER RECEIVED ON 06/16/2021
Date: 2021-06-16T00:00:00PROPOSED STIPULATION AND ORDER RECEIVED ON 06/18/2021
Date: 2021-06-18T00:00:00STATUS CONFERENCE STATEMENT FILED BY GOMEZ-GARCIA, ANGEL ON 06/15/2021
Date: 2021-06-15T00:00:00MINUTES FINALIZED FOR CHAMBERS WORK 06/16/2021 11:42:00 AM.
Date: 2021-06-16T00:00:00CLERK'S CERTIFICATE OF MAILING/ELECTRONIC SERVICE
Date: 2021-06-16T00:00:00STIPULATION AND ORDER (TO CONTINUE TRIAL) FILED BY GOMEZ-GARCIA, ANGEL ON 06/22/2021
Date: 2021-06-22T00:00:00MINUTES FINALIZED FOR APPLICATION/REQUEST 06/17/2021 02:00:00 PM.
Date: 2021-06-22T00:00:00RESPONSE FILED BY ILWU-PMA WELFARE PLAN ON 06/24/2021
Date: 2021-06-24T00:00:00DECLARATION IN SUPPORT FILED BY ILWU-PMA WELFARE PLAN ON 06/24/2021
Date: 2021-06-24T00:00:00OPPOSITION FILED BY ILWU-PMA WELFARE PLAN ON 06/24/2021
Date: 2021-06-24T00:00:00CLERK'S CERTIFICATE OF MAILING/ELECTRONIC SERVICE
Date: 2021-06-24T00:00:00PROPOSED ORDER RECEIVED ON 06/24/2021
Date: 2021-06-24T00:00:00PROPOSED ORDER RECEIVED ON 07/01/2021
Date: 2021-07-01T00:00:00OPPOSITION FILED BY ILWU-PMA WELFARE PLAN ON 07/01/2021
Date: 2021-07-01T00:00:00PROOF OF SERVICE FILED BY ILWU-PMA WELFARE PLAN ON 06/24/2021
Date: 2021-06-24T00:00:00PROOF OF SERVICE FILED BY PACIFIC MARITIME ASSOCIATIONS ON 07/01/2021
Date: 2021-07-01T00:00:00DECLARATION IN SUPPORT FILED BY PACIFIC MARITIME ASSOCIATIONS ON 07/01/2021
Date: 2021-07-01T00:00:00OPPOSITION FILED BY PACIFIC MARITIME ASSOCIATIONS ON 07/01/2021
Date: 2021-07-01T00:00:00OBJECTION FILED BY GOMEZ-GARCIA, ANGEL ON 07/02/2021
Date: 2021-07-02T00:00:00RESPONSE (TO SEPARATE STATEMENT) FILED BY PACIFIC MARITIME ASSOCIATIONS ON 07/01/2021
Date: 2021-07-01T00:00:00REPLY - OTHER FILED BY GOMEZ-GARCIA, ANGEL ON 07/02/2021
Date: 2021-07-02T00:00:00REPLY TO OPPOSITION FILED BY PATEL, BHARAT; PATEL UROLOGY; L.A. UROLOGY, INC ON 07/02/2021
Date: 2021-07-02T00:00:00DECLARATION IN SUPPORT (SUPPLEMENTAL) FILED BY GOMEZ-GARCIA, ANGEL ON 07/02/2021
Date: 2021-07-02T00:00:00OBJECTION FILED BY PATEL, BHARAT; PATEL UROLOGY; L.A. UROLOGY, INC ON 07/02/2021
Date: 2021-07-02T00:00:00RESPONSE (TO OBJECTIONS TO EVIDENCE SUBMITTED) FILED BY ILWU-PMA WELFARE PLAN ON 07/07/2021
Date: 2021-07-07T00:00:00PROOF OF SERVICE FILED BY PATEL, BHARAT; PATEL UROLOGY; L.A. UROLOGY, INC ON 07/02/2021
Date: 2021-07-02T00:00:00MINUTES FINALIZED FOR MULTIPLE EVENTS 07/08/2021 02:00:00 PM.
Date: 2021-07-09T00:00:00REPLY - OTHER FILED BY DAHIYA, SHYAM; SHYAM DAHIYA, M.D., INC. ON 07/12/2021
Date: 2021-07-12T00:00:00MINUTES FINALIZED FOR CHAMBERS WORK 07/13/2021 01:41:00 PM.
Date: 2021-07-13T00:00:00REPLY TO OPPOSITION FILED BY DAHIYA, SHYAM; SHYAM DAHIYA, M.D., INC. ON 07/12/2021
Date: 2021-07-12T00:00:00OBJECTION FILED BY GOMEZ-GARCIA, ANGEL ON 07/09/2021
Date: 2021-07-09T00:00:00REPLY - OTHER FILED BY GOMEZ-GARCIA, ANGEL ON 07/09/2021
Date: 2021-07-09T00:00:00CLERK'S CERTIFICATE OF MAILING/ELECTRONIC SERVICE
Date: 2021-07-13T00:00:00RESPONSE (TO OBJECTIONS) FILED BY ILWU-PMA WELFARE PLAN ON 07/14/2021
Date: 2021-07-14T00:00:00CLERK'S CERTIFICATE OF MAILING/ELECTRONIC SERVICE
Date: 2021-07-15T00:00:00E-FILING TRANSACTION NUMBER 21018894 REJECTED.
Date: 2021-07-13T00:00:00ORDER - OTHER (DISCOVERY REFEREE'S RECOMMENDED) FILED BY ILWU-PMA WELFARE PLAN ON 07/13/2021
Date: 2021-07-13T00:00:00MINUTES FINALIZED FOR MOTION TO BE RELIEVED AS COUNSEL OF RECORD 2021-07-15 14:00:00.0.
Date: 2021-07-16T00:00:00MINUTES FINALIZED FOR UNDER SUBMISSION RULING 07/16/2021 03:12:00 PM.
Date: 2021-07-19T00:00:00NOTICE OF RULING FILED BY ILWU-PMA WELFARE PLAN ON 07/22/2021
Date: 2021-07-22T00:00:00CLERK'S CERTIFICATE OF MAILING/ELECTRONIC SERVICE
Date: 2021-07-19T00:00:00E-FILING TRANSACTION NUMBER 41212123 REJECTED.
Date: 2021-07-19T00:00:00NOTICE OF RULING FILED BY SHAMAAN, IHSAN N.; IHSAN N. SHAMAAN, M.D., INC. ON 07/22/2021
Date: 2021-07-22T00:00:00NOTICE OF RULING FILED BY PEOPLE OF THE STATE OF CALIFORNIA EX REL. ILWU-PMA WELFARE PLAN ON 07/22/2021
Date: 2021-07-22T00:00:00E-FILING TRANSACTION NUMBER 31031497 REJECTED.
Date: 2021-07-30T00:00:00PROOF OF SERVICE FILED BY SHAMAAN, IHSAN N.; IHSAN N. SHAMAAN, M.D., INC. ON 07/27/2021
Date: 2021-07-27T00:00:00MINUTES FINALIZED FOR MOTION TO BE RELIEVED AS COUNSEL OF RECORD 07/22/2021 02:00:00 PM.
Date: 2021-07-26T00:00:00PROOF OF SERVICE FILED BY SHAMAAN, IHSAN N.; IHSAN N. SHAMAAN, M.D., INC. ON 07/30/2021
Date: 2021-07-30T00:00:00CLERK'S CERTIFICATE OF MAILING/ELECTRONIC SERVICE
Date: 2021-07-26T00:00:00PROPOSED STIPULATION AND ORDER RECEIVED ON 08/06/2021
Date: 2021-08-06T00:00:00MOTION TO BIFURCATE (TRIAL) FILED BY GOMEZ-GARCIA, ANGEL ON 07/30/2021
Date: 2021-07-30T00:00:00STIPULATION AND ORDER (TO CONTINUE STATUS CONFERENCE) FILED BY GOMEZ-GARCIA, ANGEL ON 08/11/2021
Date: 2021-08-11T00:00:00MOTION FOR JUDGMENT ON THE PLEADINGS FILED BY GOMEZ-GARCIA, ANGEL ON 08/06/2021
Date: 2021-08-06T00:00:00PROPOSED ORDER RECEIVED ON 08/13/2021
Date: 2021-08-13T00:00:00CLERK'S CERTIFICATE OF MAILING/ELECTRONIC SERVICE
Date: 2021-08-12T00:00:00OPPOSITION FILED BY ILWU-PMA WELFARE PLAN ON 08/13/2021
Date: 2021-08-13T00:00:00PROOF OF SERVICE FILED BY ILWU-PMA WELFARE PLAN ON 08/13/2021
Date: 2021-08-13T00:00:00NOTICE - OTHER FILED BY GOMEZ-GARCIA, ANGEL ON 08/12/2021.
Date: 2021-08-12T00:00:00STATUS CONFERENCE STATEMENT (JOINT) FILED BY ILWU-PMA WELFARE PLAN ON 08/19/2021
Date: 2021-08-19T00:00:00DECLARATION IN SUPPORT FILED BY ILWU-PMA WELFARE PLAN ON 08/13/2021
Date: 2021-08-13T00:00:00MINUTES FINALIZED FOR APPLICATION/REQUEST 08/19/2021 02:00:00 PM.
Date: 2021-08-20T00:00:00REPLY TO MOTION FILED BY GOMEZ-GARCIA, ANGEL ON 08/19/2021
Date: 2021-08-19T00:00:00PROPOSED ORDER RECEIVED ON 08/19/2021
Date: 2021-08-19T00:00:00CLERK'S CERTIFICATE OF MAILING/ELECTRONIC SERVICE
Date: 2021-08-20T00:00:00ORDER - ORDER DENYING PETITION FILED (G060573)
Date: 2021-08-26T00:00:00NOTICE OF INTENT TO APPEAR TELEPHONICALLY FILED BY ILWU-PMA WELFARE PLAN ON 08/24/2021
Date: 2021-08-24T00:00:00MINUTES FINALIZED FOR UNDER SUBMISSION RULING 08/20/2021 02:02:00 PM.
Date: 2021-08-20T00:00:00MINUTES FINALIZED FOR MULTIPLE EVENTS 08/26/2021 02:00:00 PM.
Date: 2021-08-27T00:00:00E-FILING TRANSACTION NUMBER 21012949 REJECTED.
Date: 2021-08-25T00:00:00E-FILING TRANSACTION NUMBER 21056551 REJECTED.
Date: 2021-08-23T00:00:00CLERK'S CERTIFICATE OF MAILING/ELECTRONIC SERVICE
Date: 2021-08-27T00:00:00MINUTES FINALIZED FOR CHAMBERS WORK 08/27/2021 02:32:00 PM.
Date: 2021-08-27T00:00:00E-FILING TRANSACTION NUMBER 1882148 REJECTED.
Date: 2021-08-31T00:00:00CLERK'S CERTIFICATE OF MAILING/ELECTRONIC SERVICE
Date: 2021-08-31T00:00:00MINUTES FINALIZED FOR CHAMBERS WORK 08/31/2021 11:29:00 AM.
Date: 2021-08-31T00:00:00NOTICE OF RULING FILED BY ILWU-PMA WELFARE PLAN ON 09/02/2021
Date: 2021-09-02T00:00:00PROOF OF SERVICE FILED BY ILWU-PMA WELFARE PLAN ON 09/10/2021
Date: 2021-09-10T00:00:00DECLARATION - OTHER (OF KATHLEEN CAHILL SLAUGHT) FILED BY ILWU-PMA WELFARE PLAN ON 09/10/2021
Date: 2021-09-10T00:00:00CORRESPONDENCE-RETURNED MAIL
Date: 2021-09-16T00:00:00TRIAL BRIEF (JOINT) FILED BY ILWU-PMA WELFARE PLAN ON 09/10/2021
Date: 2021-09-10T00:00:00NOTICE OF SETTLEMENT FILED BY PATEL, BHARAT; PATEL UROLOGY; L.A. UROLOGY, INC ON 09/20/2021
Date: 2021-09-20T00:00:00NOTICE OF SETTLEMENT FILED BY SHYAM DAHIYA, M.D., INC. ON 09/21/2021
Date: 2021-09-21T00:00:00NOTICE OF SETTLEMENT FILED BY GOMEZ-GARCIA, ANGEL ON 09/21/2021
Date: 2021-09-21T00:00:00E-FILING TRANSACTION NUMBER 31063436 REJECTED.
Date: 2021-09-17T00:00:00MOTION TO BE RELIEVED AS COUNSEL OF RECORD FILED BY NGUYEN, VU ON 09/22/2021
Date: 2021-09-22T00:00:00DECLARATION IN SUPPORT OF MOTION TO BE RELIEVED AS COUNSEL FILED BY NGUYEN, VU ON 09/22/2021
Date: 2021-09-22T00:00:00NOTICE - OTHER FILED BY ILWU-PMA WELFARE PLAN ON 09/21/2021.
Date: 2021-09-21T00:00:00ORDER GRANTING ATTORNEYS MOTION TO BE RELIEVED AS COUNSEL RECEIVED ON 09/22/2021.
Date: 2021-09-22T00:00:00PROPOSED ORDER RECEIVED ON 09/22/2021
Date: 2021-09-22T00:00:00E-FILING TRANSACTION NUMBER 31065758 REJECTED.
Date: 2021-09-23T00:00:00REQUEST FOR ENTRY OF DEFAULT FILED BY ILWU-PMA WELFARE PLAN ON 07/15/2019
Date: 2019-07-15T00:00:00SUPPLEMENTAL (FEE WAIVER) FILED BY ILWU-PMA WELFARE PLAN ON 08/08/2019
Date: 2019-08-08T00:00:00RESPONSE (TO COURT ORDER & OBJECTION TO IMPROPERLY NOTICED MOTION) FILED BY KRON, ANN ON 08/09/2019
Date: 2019-08-09T00:00:00PROPOSED STIPULATION AND ORDER RECEIVED ON 08/07/2019
Date: 2019-08-07T00:00:00OPPOSITION FILED BY GOMEZ-GARCIA, ANGEL ON 12/27/2019
Date: 2019-12-27T00:00:00PROPOSED ORDER RECEIVED ON 01/02/2020
Date: 2020-01-02T00:00:00OBJECTION (TO RECOMMENDED DECISION NO. 14 OF DISCOVERY REFEREE) FILED BY PATEL UROLOGY ON 12/27/2019
Date: 2019-12-27T00:00:00NOTICE - OTHER FILED BY IHSAN N. SHAMAAN, M.D., INC. ON 01/08/2020.
Date: 2020-01-08T00:00:00CLERK'S CERTIFICATE OF MAILING/ELECTRONIC SERVICE
Date: 2021-05-28T00:00:00ORDER GRANTING ATTORNEYS MOTION TO BE RELIEVED AS COUNSEL RECEIVED ON 05/28/2021.
Date: 2021-05-28T00:00:00NOTICE OF INTENT TO APPEAR TELEPHONICALLY FILED BY ILWU-PMA WELFARE PLAN ON 05/28/2021
Date: 2021-05-28T00:00:00PROOF OF SERVICE FILED BY ILWU-PMA WELFARE PLAN ON 01/18/2022
Date: 2022-01-18T00:00:00PROPOSED ORDER RECEIVED ON 01/18/2022
Date: 2022-01-18T00:00:00MINUTES FINALIZED FOR CHAMBERS WORK 2022-02-10 15:29:00.0.
Date: 2022-02-10T00:00:00CLERK'S CERTIFICATE OF MAILING/ELECTRONIC SERVICE
Date: 2022-01-25T00:00:00MINUTES FINALIZED FOR CHAMBERS WORK 01/25/2022 02:23:00 PM.
Date: 2022-01-25T00:00:00CLERK'S CERTIFICATE OF MAILING/ELECTRONIC SERVICE
Date: 2022-02-10T00:00:00ORDER - OTHER (STATEMENT OF DECISION) FILED BY ILWU-PMA WELFARE PLAN ON 03/02/2022
Date: 2022-03-02T00:00:00PROPOSED ORDER RECEIVED ON 03/21/2022
Date: 2022-03-21T00:00:00MINUTES FINALIZED FOR CHAMBERS WORK 03/07/2022 11:04:00 AM.
Date: 2022-03-07T00:00:00MINUTES FINALIZED FOR CHAMBERS WORK 2022-03-02 10:49:00.0.
Date: 2022-03-07T00:00:00CLERK'S CERTIFICATE OF MAILING/ELECTRONIC SERVICE
Date: 2022-03-07T00:00:00OBJECTION FILED BY KRON, ANN ON 03/29/2022
Date: 2022-03-29T00:00:00MINUTES FINALIZED FOR STATUS CONFERENCE 04/01/2022 01:30:00 PM.
Date: 2022-04-05T00:00:00JUDGMENT FILED BY ILWU-PMA WELFARE PLAN ON 04/06/2022
Date: 2022-04-06T00:00:00CLERK'S CERTIFICATE OF MAILING/ELECTRONIC SERVICE
Date: 2022-04-08T00:00:00MINUTES FINALIZED FOR CHAMBERS WORK 2022-04-06 15:12:00.0.
Date: 2022-04-07T00:00:00CLERK'S CERTIFICATE OF MAILING/ELECTRONIC SERVICE
Date: 2022-04-07T00:00:00E-FILING TRANSACTION NUMBER 1987079 REJECTED.
Date: 2022-05-11T00:00:00NOTICE - OTHER FILED BY ILWU-PMA WELFARE PLAN ON 05/20/2022.
Date: 2022-05-20T00:00:00PROOF OF SERVICE FILED BY PEOPLE OF THE STATE OF CALIFORNIA EX REL. ILWU-PMA WELFARE PLAN ON 06/06/2022
Date: 2022-06-06T00:00:00PROPOSED ORDER RECEIVED ON 06/06/2022
Date: 2022-06-06T00:00:00E-FILING TRANSACTION NUMBER 41369184 REJECTED.
Date: 2022-08-09T00:00:00E-FILING TRANSACTION NUMBER 11023040 REJECTED.
Date: 2022-08-09T00:00:00ABSTRACT OF JUDGMENT ISSUED ON 08/09/2022
Date: 2022-08-09T00:00:00NOTICE - OTHER FILED.
Date: 2022-09-02T00:00:00PROOF OF SERVICE BY MAIL FILED BY ILWU-PMA WELFARE PLAN ON 12/13/2022
Date: 2022-12-13T00:00:00MINUTES FINALIZED FOR MOTION FOR ATTORNEY FEES 08/26/2022 10:00:00 AM.
Date: 2022-08-26T00:00:00WRIT (AS TO ORANGE COUNTY) ISSUED ON 08/11/2022
Date: 2022-08-11T00:00:00MINUTES FINALIZED FOR APPEARANCE AND EXAMINATION OF JUDGMENT DEBTOR 12/16/2022 09:00:00 AM.
Date: 2022-12-16T00:00:00MINUTES FINALIZED FOR ORDER TO SHOW CAUSE RE: FAILURE TO APPEAR 12/30/2022 09:00:00 AM.
Date: 2022-12-30T00:00:00E-FILING TRANSACTION NUMBER 21194062 REJECTED.
Date: 2022-08-10T00:00:00E-FILING TRANSACTION NUMBER 21214051 REJECTED.
Date: 2022-09-27T00:00:00WRIT (AS TO ORANGE COUNTY) ISSUED ON 11/08/2022
Date: 2022-11-08T00:00:00SUBSTITUTION OF ATTORNEY FILED BY KRON, ANN ON 08/18/2022
Date: 2022-08-18T00:00:00CLERK'S CERTIFICATE OF MAILING/ELECTRONIC SERVICE
Date: 2023-01-11T00:00:00PROOF OF PERSONAL SERVICE FILED BY ILWU-PMA WELFARE PLAN ON 11/28/2022
Date: 2022-11-28T00:00:00ABSTRACT OF JUDGMENT ISSUED ON 10/19/2022
Date: 2022-10-19T00:00:00MINUTES FINALIZED FOR APPEARANCE AND EXAMINATION OF JUDGMENT DEBTOR 02/03/2023 09:00:00 AM.
Date: 2023-02-03T00:00:00PROOF OF SERVICE FILED BY ILWU-PMA WELFARE PLAN ON 03/21/2024
Date: March 21, 2024MINUTES FINALIZED FOR APPEARANCE AND EXAMINATION OF JUDGMENT DEBTOR 09/29/2023 09:00:00 AM.
Date: 2023-09-29T00:00:00SUBSTITUTION OF ATTORNEY FILED BY ILWU-PMA WELFARE PLAN ON 03/06/2024
Date: 2024-03-06T00:00:00CLERK'S CERTIFICATE OF MAILING/ELECTRONIC SERVICE
Date: 2023-06-09T00:00:00MINUTES FINALIZED FOR APPEARANCE AND EXAMINATION OF JUDGMENT DEBTOR 06/09/2023 09:00:00 AM.
Date: 2023-06-09T00:00:00E-FILING TRANSACTION NUMBER 41471627 REJECTED.
Date: 2023-04-10T00:00:00NOTICE OF CHANGE OF ADDRESS AND/OR TELEPHONE FILED BY ILWU-PMA WELFARE PLAN ON 09/29/2023
Date: 2023-09-29T00:00:00MINUTES FINALIZED FOR APPEARANCE AND EXAMINATION OF JUDGMENT DEBTOR 09/15/2023 09:00:00 AM.
Date: 2023-09-15T00:00:00PROPOSED STIPULATION AND ORDER RECEIVED ON 03/19/2024.
Date: 2024-03-19T00:00:00MINUTES FINALIZED FOR APPEARANCE AND EXAMINATION OF JUDGMENT DEBTOR 03/08/2024 09:00:00 AM.
Date: 2024-03-08T00:00:00MINUTES FINALIZED FOR APPEARANCE AND EXAMINATION OF JUDGMENT DEBTOR 03/15/2024 09:00:00 AM.
Date: 2024-03-15T00:00:00PROPOSED STIPULATION AND ORDER RECEIVED ON 03/19/2024
Date: 2024-03-19T00:00:00SUBSTITUTION OF ATTORNEY FILED BY MUKADAM, HYDER M. ON 03/19/2024
Date: 2024-03-19T00:00:00CLERK'S CERTIFICATE OF MAILING/ELECTRONIC SERVICE
Date: March 22, 2024CLERK'S CERTIFICATE OF MAILING/ELECTRONIC SERVICE
Date: 2019-08-14T00:00:00MINUTES FINALIZED FOR CHAMBERS WORK 08/14/2019 09:36:00 AM.
Date: 2019-08-14T00:00:00MINUTES FINALIZED FOR FEE WAIVER HEARING 08/15/2019 09:45:00 AM.
Date: 2019-08-16T00:00:00E-FILING TRANSACTION NUMBER 1656794 REJECTED.
Date: 2019-08-19T00:00:00ORDER G057877
Date: 2019-08-20T00:00:00E-FILING TRANSACTION NUMBER 41006090 REJECTED.
Date: 2019-09-04T00:00:00E-FILING TRANSACTION NUMBER 4999076 REJECTED.
Date: 2019-09-03T00:00:00PROPOSED ORDER RECEIVED ON 08/27/2019
Date: 2019-08-27T00:00:00REQUEST FOR ENTRY OF DEFAULT FILED BY ILWU-PMA WELFARE PLAN ON 10/04/2019
Date: 2019-10-04T00:00:00MINUTES FINALIZED FOR MULTIPLE EVENTS 09/26/2019 01:30:00 PM.
Date: 2019-09-27T00:00:00PROPOSED ORDER RECEIVED ON 10/01/2019
Date: 2019-10-01T00:00:00PROPOSED ORDER RECEIVED ON 10/30/2019
Date: 2019-10-30T00:00:00E-FILING TRANSACTION NUMBER 3857346 REJECTED.
Date: 2019-11-18T00:00:00E-FILING TRANSACTION NUMBER 41035120 REJECTED.
Date: 2019-11-15T00:00:00SUBSTITUTION OF ATTORNEY FILED BY IHSAN N. SHAMAAN, M.D., INC. ON 11/18/2019
Date: 2019-11-18T00:00:00NOTICE - OTHER FILED BY SHAMAAN, IHSAN N.; IHSAN N. SHAMAAN, M.D., INC. ON 11/27/2019.
Date: 2019-11-27T00:00:00PROPOSED STIPULATION AND ORDER RECEIVED ON 12/11/2019
Date: 2019-12-11T00:00:00SUBSTITUTION OF ATTORNEY FILED BY SHAMAAN, IHSAN N. ON 11/18/2019
Date: 2019-11-18T00:00:00For full print and download access, please subscribe at https://www.trellis.law/.