Case Last Refreshed: 11 months ago
Capital One Bank, filed a(n) Collections - Creditor case against Tina Tran, in the jurisdiction of Orange County. This case was filed in Orange County Superior Courts .
Case Number |
||
Filing DateFebruary 19, 2016 |
CategoryRule 3.740 Collections |
|
Last RefreshedMay 04, 2023 |
Practice AreaCreditor |
Time to Dismissal Following Dispositive Motions133 days |
Filing LocationOrange County, CA |
Matter TypeCollections |
|
Case Cycle Time669 days |
REQUEST FOR CLERK'S DEFAULT JUDGMENT FILED BY CAPITAL ONE BANK (USA) ON 07/01/2016
Date: 2016-07-01T00:00:00ACKNOWLEDGMENT OF FULL SATISFACTION OF JUDGMENT FILED BY CAPITAL ONE BANK (USA) ON 12/05/2017
Date: December 05, 2017WRIT (ISSUED ON 02/07/2017) RECEIVED ON 02/06/2017.
Date: February 06, 2017CIVIL CASE COVER SHEET FILED BY CAPITAL ONE BANK (USA) ON 02/19/2016
Date: 2016-02-19T00:00:00PROOF OF SERVICE FILED BY CAPITAL ONE BANK (USA) ON 06/29/2016
Date: 2016-06-29T00:00:00SUMMONS ISSUED AND FILED FILED BY CAPITAL ONE BANK (USA) ON 02/19/2016
Date: 2016-02-19T00:00:00DECLARATION IN SUPPORT OF APPLICATION FOR DEFAULT JUDGMENT FILED BY CAPITAL ONE BANK (USA) ON 07/01/2016
Date: 2016-07-01T00:00:00ACKNOWLEDGMENT OF FULL SATISFACTION OF JUDGMENT FILED BY CAPITAL ONE BANK (USA) ON 12/18/2017
Date: December 18, 2017COMPLAINT - COLLECTIONS 3.740 FILED BY CAPITAL ONE BANK (USA) ON 02/19/2016
Date: 2016-02-19T00:00:00ABSTRACT OF JUDGMENT (ISSUED ON 08/09/2016) RECEIVED ON 08/08/2016.
Date: 2016-08-08T00:00:00WRIT OF EXECUTION RETURNED - PARTIALLY SATISFIED FILED BY CAPITAL ONE BANK (USA) ON 11/06/2017
Date: November 06, 2017JUDGMENT (FILED AND ENTERED ON 7/15/16) RECEIVED ON 07/01/2016.
Date: 2016-07-01T00:00:00For full print and download access, please subscribe at https://www.trellis.law/.