Case Last Refreshed: 1 year ago
Ids Property Casualty Insurance Company, filed a(n) Automobile - Torts case against Jose Luna Ornelas, Bernice Luna, in the jurisdiction of Orange County. This case was filed in Orange County Superior Courts with Corey Scott Cramin presiding.
Case Number |
||
Filing DateAugust 28, 2015 |
CategoryUninsured Motorist |
|
Last RefreshedMay 04, 2023 |
Practice AreaTorts |
Time to Dismissal Following Dispositive Motions203 days |
Filing LocationOrange County, CA |
Matter TypeAutomobile |
|
Case Cycle Time203 days |
MINUTES FINALIZED FOR CASE MANAGEMENT CONFERENCE 03/18/2016 09:00:00 AM.
Date: March 18, 2016SUMMONS ISSUED AND FILED FILED BY IDS PROPERTY CASUALTY INSURANCE COMPANY ON 08/28/2015
Date: August 28, 2015DECLARATION - OTHER FILED BY IDS PROPERTY CASUALTY INSURANCE COMPANY ON 08/28/2015
Date: August 28, 2015COMPLAINT FILED BY IDS PROPERTY CASUALTY INSURANCE COMPANY ON 08/28/2015
Date: August 28, 2015CIVIL CASE COVER SHEET FILED BY IDS PROPERTY CASUALTY INSURANCE COMPANY ON 08/28/2015
Date: 2015-08-28T00:00:00For full print and download access, please subscribe at https://www.trellis.law/.