Case Last Refreshed: 6 months ago
Esmail Ghane, Ruhangiz Raimova, filed a(n) General Torts - Torts case against Clear Choice Lien Service Inc., Esmail Ghane, Farahnaz Gorjiyan, Jean Shiomoto, State Of California Department Of Moto, (total of 7) See All in the jurisdiction of Orange County. This case was filed in Orange County Superior Courts with Walter P. Schwarm presiding.
Case Number |
|
Filing DateJuly 13, 2015 |
CategoryNon-Pi/Pd/Wd Tort - Other |
Last RefreshedOctober 17, 2023 |
Practice AreaTorts |
Filing LocationOrange County, CA |
Matter TypeGeneral Torts |
MOTION FOR PRELIMINARY INJUNCTION FILED BY RAIMOVA, RUHANGIZ ON 07/16/2015
Date: 2015-07-16T00:00:00ORDER ON COURT FEE WAIVER (SUPERIOR COURT) FILED BY RAIMOVA, RUHANGIZ ON 07/16/2015
Date: 2015-07-16T00:00:00OPPOSITION FILED BY WEST COAST TOWING SERVICES INC. (WCTS); GORJIYANA, FARAHNAZ ON 07/24/2015
Date: 2015-07-24T00:00:00DEMURRER TO COMPLAINT FILED BY CLEAR CHOICE LIEN SERVICE INC (CCLS) ON 08/04/2015
Date: 2015-08-04T00:00:00SUMMONS ISSUED AND FILED FILED BY RAIMOVA, RUHANGIZ ON 07/13/2015
Date: 2015-07-13T00:00:00PROOF OF PERSONAL SERVICE FILED BY RAIMOVA, RUHANGIZ ON 07/16/2015
Date: 2015-07-16T00:00:00NOTICE OF APPLICATION FOR WRIT OF POSSESSION AND HEARING FILED BY RAIMOVA, RUHANGIZ ON 08/06/2015
Date: 2015-08-06T00:00:00MINUTES FINALIZED FOR MULTIPLE EVENTS 08/20/2015 09:30:00 AM.
Date: 2015-08-21T00:00:00EX PARTE APPLICATION - OTHER FILED BY RAIMOVA, RUHANGIZ ON 08/14/2015
Date: 2015-08-14T00:00:00MINUTES FINALIZED FOR MULTIPLE EVENTS 08/06/2015 09:30:00 AM.
Date: 2015-08-07T00:00:00CASE ASSIGNED TO JUDICIAL OFFICER MCEACHEN, DAVID ON 08/21/2015.
Date: 2015-08-21T00:00:00MOTION FOR PRELIMINARY INJUNCTION (AMENDED) FILED BY RAIMOVA, RUHANGIZ ON 08/06/2015
Date: 2015-08-06T00:00:00PROOF OF SERVICE BY MAIL FILED BY CLEAR CHOICE LIEN SERVICE INC. ON 09/02/2015
Date: 2015-09-02T00:00:00ANSWER TO AMENDED COMPLAINT FILED BY GORJIYAN, FARAHNAZ; WEST COAST TOWING SERVICE, INC. ON 08/25/2015
Date: 2015-08-25T00:00:00AMENDED COMPLAINT FILED BY RAIMOVA, RUHANGIZ ON 08/06/2015
Date: 2015-08-06T00:00:00STIPULATION TO JUDGE PRO TEM FILED BY THE SUPERIOR COURT OF ORANGE ON 10/20/2015
Date: 2015-10-20T00:00:00CASE REASSIGNED TO WALTER SCHWARM EFFECTIVE 11/02/2015.
Date: 2015-10-08T00:00:00CLERK'S CERTIFICATE OF SERVICE BY MAIL (OUT OF PROCESS) GENERATED
Date: 2015-10-26T00:00:00MINUTES FINALIZED FOR MOTION - OTHER 10/20/2015 01:30:00 PM.
Date: 2015-10-26T00:00:00CLERK'S CERTIFICATE OF SERVICE BY MAIL OC GENERATED
Date: 2015-08-21T00:00:00PROPOSED ORDER (COVER SHEET) (ELECTRONIC FILING) FILED BY WEST COAST TOWING SERVICE, INC. ON 11/09/2015
Date: 2015-11-09T00:00:00NOTICE OF ERRATA FILED BY WEST COAST TOWING SERVICES INC.; WEST COAST TOWING SERVICE, INC. ON 11/12/2015
Date: 2015-11-12T00:00:00NOTICE OF TRANSFER, RECLASSIFICATION AND/OR CONSOLIDATION
Date: 2015-08-21T00:00:00MINUTES FINALIZED FOR MULTIPLE EVENTS 12/22/2015 01:30:00 PM.
Date: 2015-12-23T00:00:00ANSWER TO AMENDED COMPLAINT FILED BY CLEAR CHOICE LIEN SERVICE INC. ON 08/27/2015
Date: 2015-08-27T00:00:00CASE MANAGEMENT CONFERENCE SCHEDULED FOR 01/11/2016 AT 09:00:00 AM IN C21 AT CENTRAL JUSTICE CENTER.
Date: 2015-09-09T00:00:00NOTIFICATION OF FILING NOTICE OF APPEAL
Date: 2016-01-04T00:00:00PROPOSED ORDER RECEIVED ON 11/17/2015
Date: 2015-11-17T00:00:00PROPOSED ORDER RECEIVED ON 11/07/2015
Date: 2015-11-07T00:00:00DECLARATION - OTHER FILED BY WEST COAST TOWING SERVICE, INC.; GORJIYAN, FARAHNAZ ON 01/08/2016
Date: 2016-01-08T00:00:00MINUTES FINALIZED FOR MULTIPLE EVENTS 11/10/2015 01:30:00 PM.
Date: 2015-11-12T00:00:00MINUTES FINALIZED FOR UNDER SUBMISSION RULING 11/12/2015 12:40:00 PM.
Date: 2015-11-12T00:00:00NOTICE OF CONTINUANCE FILED BY WEST COAST TOWING SERVICES INC. ON 11/10/2015
Date: 2015-11-10T00:00:00DECLARATION IN SUPPORT FILED BY WEST COAST TOWING SERVICE, INC. ON 11/09/2015
Date: 2015-11-09T00:00:00NOTICE OF APPEAL FILED
Date: 2015-12-24T00:00:00E-FILING TRANSACTION NUMBER 4461589 REJECTED.
Date: 2015-11-16T00:00:00E-FILING TRANSACTION NUMBER 4461588 REJECTED.
Date: 2015-11-16T00:00:00NOTIFICATION OF FILING NOTICE OF APPEAL
Date: 2016-01-26T00:00:00MINUTES FINALIZED FOR MULTIPLE EVENTS 01/26/2016 01:30:00 PM.
Date: 2016-01-26T00:00:00NOTICE OF APPEAL FILED
Date: 2016-01-26T00:00:00MOTION - OTHER (AND OPPOSITION) FILED BY RAIMOVA, RUHANGIZ ON 12/01/2015
Date: 2015-12-01T00:00:00CLERK'S CERTIFICATE OF SERVICE BY MAIL (OUT OF PROCESS) GENERATED
Date: 2015-11-12T00:00:00MINUTES FINALIZED FOR MOTION TO COMPEL ANSWERS TO SPECIAL INTERROGATORIES 12/15/2015 01:30:00 PM.
Date: 2015-12-15T00:00:00NOTICE OF RULING FILED BY WEST COAST TOWING SERVICE, INC.; WEST COAST TOWING SERVICES INC. ON 12/23/2015
Date: 2015-12-23T00:00:00PEREMPTORY CHALLENGE PURSUANT TO 170.6 CCP FILED BY RAIMOVA, RUHANGIZ ON 12/22/2015
Date: 2015-12-22T00:00:00PROOF OF SERVICE BY MAIL FILED BY CLEAR CHOICE LIEN SERVICE INC. ON 12/29/2015
Date: 2015-12-29T00:00:00CASE MANAGEMENT STATEMENT FILED BY CLEAR CHOICE LIEN SERVICE INC. ON 12/29/2015
Date: 2015-12-29T00:00:00MOTION - OTHER (TO STAY ALL ACTIONS) FILED BY RAIMOVA, RUHANGIZ ON 01/04/2016
Date: 2016-01-04T00:00:00DESIGNATION OF RECORD ON APPEAL (APPELLANT) FILED BY RAIMOVA, RUHANGIZ ON 12/30/2015
Date: 2015-12-30T00:00:00DESIGNATION OF RECORD ON APPEAL (APPELLANT) FILED BY RAIMOVA, RUHANGIZ ON 01/06/2016
Date: 2016-01-06T00:00:00NOTICE OF DEFAULT
Date: 2016-01-05T00:00:00PROPOSED ORDER RECEIVED ON 01/08/2016
Date: 2016-01-08T00:00:00DOCUMENT - OTHER (VOIR DIRE) FILED BY GORJIYAN, FARAHNAZ; WEST COAST TOWING SERVICE, INC. ON 08/04/2016
Date: 2016-08-04T00:00:00JURY INSTRUCTIONS FILED BY GORJIYAN, FARAHNAZ; WEST COAST TOWING SERVICE, INC. ON 08/04/2016
Date: 2016-08-04T00:00:00RECEIPT FOR RECORDS AND PAPERS G053020
Date: 2016-01-11T00:00:00NOTICE OF RULING FILED BY GORJIYAN, FARAHNAZ; WEST COAST TOWING SERVICE, INC. ON 01/11/2016
Date: 2016-01-11T00:00:00MINUTES FINALIZED FOR CASE MANAGEMENT CONFERENCE 01/11/2016 09:00:00 AM.
Date: 2016-01-12T00:00:00RECEIPT FOR RECORDS AND PAPERS G053020
Date: 2016-02-03T00:00:00NOTICE OF CLERK'S TRANSCRIPT FEES
Date: 2016-01-22T00:00:00TRIAL BRIEF FILED BY GORJIYAN, FARAHNAZ; WEST COAST TOWING SERVICE, INC. ON 08/04/2016
Date: 2016-08-04T00:00:00OPPOSITION (2 MOTION IN LIMINE) FILED BY RAIMOVA, RUHANGIZ ON 09/09/2016
Date: 2016-09-09T00:00:00STATEMENT OF COMPLIANCE FILED BY RAIMOVA, RUHANGIZ ON 09/09/2016
Date: 2016-09-09T00:00:00MINUTES FINALIZED FOR MISCELLANEOUS HEARING 08/08/2016 01:30:00 PM.
Date: 2016-08-09T00:00:00OPPOSITION (TO MOTION OF LIMINE) FILED BY RAIMOVA, RUHANGIZ ON 09/09/2016
Date: 2016-09-09T00:00:00TRIAL BRIEF FILED BY RAIMOVA, RUHANGIZ ON 09/09/2016
Date: 2016-09-09T00:00:00RECEIPT FOR RECORDS AND PAPERS G053098
Date: 2016-01-29T00:00:00NOTICE OF RULING FILED BY GORJIYAN, FARAHNAZ; WEST COAST TOWING SERVICE, INC. ON 09/13/2016
Date: 2016-09-13T00:00:00VERDICT (PARTIAL PROPOSED VERDICT FORM) RECEIVED ON 09/09/2016.
Date: 2016-09-09T00:00:00MINUTES FINALIZED FOR MISCELLANEOUS HEARING 09/09/2016 01:30:00 PM.
Date: 2016-09-12T00:00:00ORDER G053020
Date: 2016-05-13T00:00:00ORDER G053098
Date: 2016-02-01T00:00:00MINUTES FINALIZED FOR STATUS CONFERENCE 11/22/2016 09:00:00 AM.
Date: 2016-11-22T00:00:00MINUTES FINALIZED FOR JURY TRIAL 01/13/2017 09:00:00 AM.
Date: 2017-01-13T00:00:00NOTICE OF CLERK'S TRANSCRIPT FEES
Date: 2016-02-17T00:00:00DESIGNATION OF RECORD ON APPEAL (APPELLANT) FILED BY RAIMOVA, RUHANGIZ ON 01/29/2016
Date: 2016-01-29T00:00:00MOTION IN LIMINE FILED BY GORJIYAN, FARAHNAZ; WEST COAST TOWING SERVICE, INC. ON 08/04/2016
Date: 2016-08-04T00:00:00OPINION G053098
Date: 2017-03-15T00:00:00RECEIPT FOR RECORDS AND PAPERS G053098
Date: 2016-03-04T00:00:00MOTION TO CONTINUE HEARING (MSC) FILED BY RAIMOVA, RUHANGIZ ON 05/09/2016
Date: 2016-05-09T00:00:00DECLARATION - OTHER (RE REQUEST TO CONTINUE TRIAL) FILED BY CLEAR CHOICE LIEN SERVICE INC. ON 04/03/2017
Date: 2017-04-03T00:00:00REMITTITUR (G053020) FILED BY THE SUPERIOR COURT OF ORANGE ON 05/16/2017
Date: 2017-05-16T00:00:00OPPOSITION FILED BY CLEAR CHOICE LIEN SERVICE INC. ON 05/19/2017
Date: 2017-05-19T00:00:00PROOF OF SERVICE FILED BY CLEAR CHOICE LIEN SERVICE INC. ON 05/19/2017
Date: 2017-05-19T00:00:00MINUTES FINALIZED FOR MULTIPLE EVENTS 05/23/2017 01:30:00 PM.
Date: 2017-05-23T00:00:00SUBSTITUTION OF ATTORNEY FILED BY RAIMOVA, RUHANGIZ ON 05/24/2017
Date: 2017-05-24T00:00:00PROPOSED ORDER RECEIVED ON 05/26/2017
Date: 2017-05-26T00:00:00PROPOSED STIPULATION AND ORDER RECEIVED ON 05/26/2017
Date: 2017-05-26T00:00:00E-FILING TRANSACTION NUMBER 4730686 REJECTED.
Date: 2017-05-30T00:00:00MINUTES FINALIZED FOR JURY TRIAL 04/07/2017 09:00:00 AM.
Date: 2017-04-07T00:00:00REPLY TO OPPOSITION FILED BY RAIMOVA, RUHANGIZ ON 05/31/2017
Date: 2017-05-31T00:00:00REPLY - OTHER FILED BY GORJIYAN, FARAHNAZ; WEST COAST TOWING SERVICE, INC. ON 05/31/2017
Date: 2017-05-31T00:00:00PROPOSED STIPULATION AND ORDER RECEIVED ON 05/31/2017
Date: 2017-05-31T00:00:00NOTICE OF CONTINUANCE FILED BY GORJIYAN, FARAHNAZ; WEST COAST TOWING SERVICE, INC. ON 04/18/2017
Date: 2017-04-18T00:00:00MOTION FOR LEAVE TO AMEND (FIRST COMPLAINT) FILED BY RAIMOVA, RUHANGIZ ON 05/01/2017
Date: 2017-05-01T00:00:00REPLY TO OPPOSITION (TOJOINDER) FILED BY GHANE, ESMAIL ON 05/17/2017
Date: 2017-05-17T00:00:00OPPOSITION FILED BY GORJIYAN, FARAHNAZ; WEST COAST TOWING SERVICE, INC. ON 05/10/2017
Date: 2017-05-10T00:00:00E-FILING TRANSACTION NUMBER 4487484 REJECTED.
Date: 2017-06-07T00:00:00PROPOSED ORDER (NOT SIGNED) FILED BY GORJIYAN, FARAHNAZ; WEST COAST TOWING SERVICE, INC. ON 06/05/2017
Date: 2017-06-05T00:00:00MINUTES FINALIZED FOR CHAMBERS WORK 05/31/2017 09:47:00 AM.
Date: 2017-05-31T00:00:00E-FILING TRANSACTION NUMBER 4730618 REJECTED.
Date: 2017-05-30T00:00:00ORDER ON COURT FEE WAIVER (SUPERIOR COURT) FILED BY THE SUPERIOR COURT OF ORANGE ON 05/01/2017
Date: 2017-05-01T00:00:00ORDER ON COURT FEE WAIVER (SUPERIOR COURT) FILED BY THE SUPERIOR COURT OF ORANGE ON 06/16/2017
Date: 2017-06-16T00:00:00REMITTITUR (G053098) FILED BY THE SUPERIOR COURT OF ORANGE ON 05/16/2017
Date: 2017-05-16T00:00:00CASE MANAGEMENT STATEMENT FILED BY GORJIYAN, FARAHNAZ; WEST COAST TOWING SERVICE, INC. ON 05/11/2017
Date: 2017-05-11T00:00:00DECLARATION IN SUPPORT OF OPPOSITION FILED BY CLEAR CHOICE LIEN SERVICE INC. ON 05/19/2017
Date: 2017-05-19T00:00:00E-FILING TRANSACTION NUMBER 4487485 REJECTED.
Date: 2017-06-07T00:00:00CLERK'S CERTIFICATE OF MAILING/ELECTRONIC SERVICE
Date: 2017-05-31T00:00:00CLERK'S CERTIFICATE OF MAILING/ELECTRONIC SERVICE
Date: 2017-06-01T00:00:00NOTICE OF CONTINUANCE FILED BY GORJIYAN, FARAHNAZ; WEST COAST TOWING SERVICE, INC. ON 06/13/2017
Date: 2017-06-13T00:00:00MINUTES FINALIZED FOR CHAMBERS WORK 06/01/2017 09:27:00 AM.
Date: 2017-06-01T00:00:00REPLY - OTHER FILED BY CLEAR CHOICE LIEN SERVICE INC. ON 06/01/2017
Date: 2017-06-01T00:00:00PROOF OF SERVICE FILED BY CLEAR CHOICE LIEN SERVICE INC. ON 06/01/2017
Date: 2017-06-01T00:00:00E-FILING TRANSACTION NUMBER 2570798 REJECTED.
Date: 2017-07-10T00:00:00E-FILING TRANSACTION NUMBER 4745706 REJECTED.
Date: 2017-07-10T00:00:00MINUTES FINALIZED FOR MULTIPLE EVENTS 06/06/2017 10:30:00 AM.
Date: 2017-06-09T00:00:00PROOF OF SERVICE BY MAIL FILED BY CLEAR CHOICE LIEN SERVICE INC. ON 06/30/2017
Date: 2017-06-30T00:00:00OPPOSITION FILED BY RAIMOVA, RUHANGIZ ON 07/11/2017
Date: 2017-07-11T00:00:00SUPPLEMENTAL (BRIEF) FILED BY CLEAR CHOICE LIEN SERVICE INC. ON 06/30/2017
Date: 2017-06-30T00:00:00DECLARATION IN SUPPORT FILED BY GORJIYAN, FARAHNAZ; WEST COAST TOWING SERVICE, INC. ON 06/30/2017
Date: 2017-06-30T00:00:00SUPPLEMENTAL (BRIEF) FILED BY GORJIYAN, FARAHNAZ; WEST COAST TOWING SERVICE, INC. ON 06/30/2017
Date: 2017-06-30T00:00:00CLERK'S CERTIFICATE OF MAILING/ELECTRONIC SERVICE
Date: 2017-07-26T00:00:00DECLARATION - OTHER FILED BY GORJIYAN, FARAHNAZ; WEST COAST TOWING SERVICE, INC. ON 08/22/2017
Date: 2017-08-22T00:00:00DECLARATION IN SUPPORT OF OPPOSITION FILED BY CLEAR CHOICE LIEN SERVICE INC. ON 08/23/2017
Date: 2017-08-23T00:00:00SUPPLEMENTAL FILED BY RAIMOVA, RUHANGIZ ON 07/11/2017
Date: 2017-07-11T00:00:00PROOF OF SERVICE FILED BY CLEAR CHOICE LIEN SERVICE INC. ON 08/23/2017
Date: 2017-08-23T00:00:00CLERK'S CERTIFICATE OF SERVICE BY MAIL (OUT OF PROCESS) GENERATED
Date: 2017-06-20T00:00:00MINUTES FINALIZED FOR MULTIPLE EVENTS 07/25/2017 01:30:00 PM.
Date: 2017-07-26T00:00:00CASE MANAGEMENT STATEMENT FILED BY GORJIYAN, FARAHNAZ; WEST COAST TOWING SERVICES INC. ON 09/08/2017
Date: 2017-09-08T00:00:00MOTION FOR RECONSIDERATION FILED BY RAIMOVA, RUHANGIZ ON 10/30/2017
Date: 2017-10-30T00:00:00CASE MANAGEMENT STATEMENT FILED BY RAIMOVA, RUHANGIZ ON 09/15/2017
Date: 2017-09-15T00:00:00CLERK'S CERTIFICATE OF MAILING/ELECTRONIC SERVICE
Date: 2017-11-01T00:00:00OPPOSITION FILED BY RAIMOVA, RUHANGIZ ON 09/15/2017
Date: 2017-09-15T00:00:00MINUTES FINALIZED FOR CHAMBERS WORK 10/31/2017 04:15:00 PM.
Date: 2017-11-01T00:00:00CASE MANAGEMENT STATEMENT FILED BY CLEAR CHOICE LIEN SERVICE INC. ON 11/15/2017
Date: 2017-11-15T00:00:00PROOF OF SERVICE BY MAIL FILED BY CLEAR CHOICE LIEN SERVICE INC. ON 11/15/2017
Date: 2017-11-15T00:00:00CASE MANAGEMENT STATEMENT FILED BY GORJIYAN, FARAHNAZ; WEST COAST TOWING SERVICE, INC. ON 11/15/2017
Date: 2017-11-15T00:00:00OPPOSITION FILED BY GORJIYAN, FARAHNAZ; WEST COAST TOWING SERVICE, INC. ON 11/17/2017
Date: 2017-11-17T00:00:00NOTICE - OTHER FILED BY GORJIYAN, FARAHNAZ; WEST COAST TOWING SERVICE, INC. ON 09/27/2017
Date: 2017-09-27T00:00:00MINUTES FINALIZED FOR UNDER SUBMISSION RULING 10/20/2017 10:40:00 AM.
Date: 2017-10-20T00:00:00MOTION FOR JOINDER FILED BY RAIMOVA, RUHANGIZ ON 10/30/2017
Date: 2017-10-30T00:00:00CLERK'S CERTIFICATE OF SERVICE BY MAIL OC GENERATED
Date: 2017-10-20T00:00:00MINUTES FINALIZED FOR MULTIPLE EVENTS 09/26/2017 01:30:00 PM.
Date: 2017-10-02T00:00:00CLERK'S CERTIFICATE OF MAILING/ELECTRONIC SERVICE
Date: 2017-10-20T00:00:00MINUTES FINALIZED FOR MULTIPLE EVENTS 12/01/2017 09:00:00 AM.
Date: 2017-12-05T00:00:00OPPOSITION FILED BY CLEAR CHOICE LIEN SERVICE INC. ON 11/22/2017
Date: 2017-11-22T00:00:00REPLY TO OPPOSITION FILED BY RAIMOVA, RUHANGIZ ON 11/28/2017
Date: 2017-11-28T00:00:00PROOF OF SERVICE BY MAIL FILED BY CLEAR CHOICE LIEN SERVICE INC. ON 11/22/2017
Date: 2017-11-22T00:00:00REPLY - OTHER FILED BY RAIMOVA, RUHANGIZ ON 11/28/2017
Date: 2017-11-28T00:00:00PEREMPTORY CHALLENGE PURSUANT TO 170.6 CCP (HON. WALTER SBHWARM) FILED BY GHANE, ESMAIL ON 10/30/2017
Date: 2017-10-30T00:00:00CASE MANAGEMENT STATEMENT FILED BY GORJIYAN, FARAHNAZ; WEST COAST TOWING SERVICE, INC. ON 01/08/2018
Date: 2018-01-08T00:00:00REPLY TO MOTION FILED BY RAIMOVA, RUHANGIZ ON 11/28/2017
Date: 2017-11-28T00:00:00CASE MANAGEMENT STATEMENT FILED BY CLEAR CHOICE LIEN SERVICE INC. ON 01/10/2018
Date: 2018-01-10T00:00:00NOTICE OF CONTINUANCE FILED BY GORJIYAN, FARAHNAZ; WEST COAST TOWING SERVICE, INC. ON 12/01/2017
Date: 2017-12-01T00:00:00PROOF OF SERVICE BY MAIL FILED BY CLEAR CHOICE LIEN SERVICE INC. ON 01/10/2018
Date: 2018-01-10T00:00:00CASE MANAGEMENT STATEMENT FILED BY RAIMOVA, RUHANGIZ ON 11/16/2017
Date: 2017-11-16T00:00:00NOTICE OF CONTINUANCE FILED BY GORJIYAN, FARAHNAZ; WEST COAST TOWING SERVICE, INC. ON 02/27/2018
Date: 2018-02-27T00:00:00CASE MANAGEMENT STATEMENT FILED BY GORJIYAN, FARAHNAZ; WEST COAST TOWING SERVICES INC. ON 02/15/2018
Date: 2018-02-15T00:00:00CASE MANAGEMENT STATEMENT FILED BY RAIMOVA, RUHANGIZ ON 02/16/2018
Date: 2018-02-16T00:00:00NOTICE OF CONTINUANCE FILED BY GORJIYAN, FARAHNAZ; WEST COAST TOWING SERVICE, INC. ON 01/23/2018
Date: 2018-01-23T00:00:00CASE MANAGEMENT STATEMENT FILED BY GORJIYAN, FARAHNAZ; WEST COAST TOWING SERVICE, INC. ON 03/14/2018
Date: 2018-03-14T00:00:00EX PARTE APPLICATION - OTHER FILED BY RAIMOVA, RUHANGIZ ON 07/13/2015
Date: 2015-07-13T00:00:00CIVIL CASE COVER SHEET FILED BY RAIMOVA, RUHANGIZ ON 07/13/2015
Date: 2015-07-13T00:00:00MOTION - OTHER (REQUESTING A WRIT OF POSSESSION) FILED BY RAIMOVA, RUHANGIZ ON 07/16/2015
Date: 2015-07-16T00:00:00MINUTES FINALIZED FOR EX PARTE 07/13/2015 01:30:00 PM.
Date: 2015-07-13T00:00:00COMPLAINT FILED BY RAIMOVA, RUHANGIZ ON 07/13/2015
Date: 2015-07-13T00:00:00MINUTES FINALIZED FOR MULTIPLE EVENTS 02/27/2018 01:30:00 PM.
Date: 2018-03-12T00:00:00CLERK'S CERTIFICATE OF MAILING/ELECTRONIC SERVICE
Date: 2018-03-16T00:00:00PROOF OF SERVICE FILED BY CLEAR CHOICE LIEN SERVICE INC. ON 03/22/2018
Date: 2018-03-22T00:00:00CASE MANAGEMENT STATEMENT FILED BY RAIMOVA, RUHANGIZ ON 01/09/2018
Date: 2018-01-09T00:00:00MINUTES FINALIZED FOR MULTIPLE EVENTS 01/23/2018 01:30:00 PM.
Date: 2018-01-24T00:00:00CASE MANAGEMENT STATEMENT FILED BY RAIMOVA, RUHANGIZ ON 03/15/2018
Date: 2018-03-15T00:00:00DESIGNATION OF RECORD ON APPEAL FILED BY RAIMOVA, RUHANGIZ ON 04/09/2018
Date: 2018-04-09T00:00:00MOTION FOR JOINDER FILED BY GHANE, ESMAIL ON 03/27/2018
Date: 2018-03-27T00:00:00NOTICE OF DEFAULT
Date: 2018-04-03T00:00:00MINUTES FINALIZED FOR 03/15/2018 04:33:00 PM.
Date: 2018-03-16T00:00:00E-FILING TRANSACTION NUMBER 1487756 REJECTED.
Date: 2018-04-11T00:00:00NOTICE OF APPEAL FILED
Date: 2018-05-11T00:00:00NOTICE OF APPEAL FILED
Date: 2018-03-22T00:00:00RECEIPT FOR RECORDS AND PAPERS G056121
Date: 2018-03-28T00:00:00DESIGNATION OF RECORD ON APPEAL (ADDITIONAL DOCUMENTS) FILED BY RAIMOVA, RUHANGIZ ON 04/10/2018
Date: 2018-04-10T00:00:00DOCUMENT - OTHER (EXHIBIT 2 TO MOTION) FILED BY GHANE, ESMAIL ON 04/09/2018
Date: 2018-04-09T00:00:00PEREMPTORY CHALLENGE PURSUANT TO 170.6 CCP FILED BY GHANE, ESMAIL ON 03/22/2018
Date: 2018-03-22T00:00:00DECLARATION - OTHER FILED BY CLEAR CHOICE LIEN SERVICE INC. ON 03/22/2018
Date: 2018-03-22T00:00:00MINUTES FINALIZED FOR MISCELLANEOUS HEARING 03/27/2018 08:30:00 AM.
Date: 2018-03-27T00:00:00NOTICE - OTHER FILED BY GORJIYAN, FARAHNAZ; WEST COAST TOWING SERVICE, INC. ON 03/27/2018
Date: 2018-03-27T00:00:00NOTIFICATION OF FILING NOTICE OF APPEAL
Date: 2018-03-22T00:00:00RECEIPT FOR RECORDS AND PAPERS G056121
Date: 2018-05-15T00:00:00NOTIFICATION OF FILING NOTICE OF APPEAL
Date: 2018-05-11T00:00:00ORDER G056121
Date: 2018-05-14T00:00:00OPPOSITION FILED BY GORJIYAN, FARAHNAZ; WEST COAST TOWING SERVICE, INC. ON 05/22/2018
Date: 2018-05-22T00:00:00E-FILING TRANSACTION NUMBER 2670156 REJECTED.
Date: 2018-05-11T00:00:00ORDER G056121
Date: 2018-04-17T00:00:00DOCUMENT - OTHER (EXHIBIT 1 TO MOTION) FILED BY GHANE, ESMAIL ON 04/09/2018
Date: 2018-04-09T00:00:00DESIGNATION OF RECORD ON APPEAL (ADDITIONAL DOCUMENTS) FILED BY RAIMOVA, RUHANGIZ ON 04/09/2018
Date: 2018-04-09T00:00:00NOTICE OF DEFAULT
Date: 2018-04-09T00:00:00NOTICE OF MOTION (AMENDED RECONSIDERATION OF JOINDER) FILED BY GHANE, ESMAIL ON 04/09/2018
Date: 2018-04-09T00:00:00REPLY TO OPPOSITION FILED BY GHANE, ESMAIL ON 05/29/2018
Date: 2018-05-29T00:00:00DESIGNATION OF RECORD ON APPEAL (AMENDED) FILED BY RAIMOVA, RUHANGIZ ON 04/10/2018
Date: 2018-04-10T00:00:00NOTICE OF RULING FILED BY GORJIYAN, FARAHNAZ ON 08/02/2018
Date: 2018-08-02T00:00:00POINTS AND AUTHORITIES FILED BY CLEAR CHOICE LIEN SERVICE INC. ON 05/25/2018
Date: 2018-05-25T00:00:00PROOF OF SERVICE BY MAIL FILED BY CLEAR CHOICE LIEN SERVICE INC. ON 05/24/2018
Date: 2018-05-24T00:00:00CASE MANAGEMENT STATEMENT FILED BY CLEAR CHOICE LIEN SERVICE INC. ON 05/24/2018
Date: 2018-05-24T00:00:00CASE MANAGEMENT STATEMENT FILED BY GORJIYAN, FARAHNAZ; WEST COAST TOWING SERVICE, INC. ON 05/22/2018
Date: 2018-05-22T00:00:00PROOF OF ESERVICE FILED BY GHANE, ESMAIL ON 05/24/2018
Date: 2018-05-24T00:00:00DECLARATION IN SUPPORT FILED BY CLEAR CHOICE LIEN SERVICE INC. ON 05/25/2018
Date: 2018-05-25T00:00:00PROOF OF SERVICE BY MAIL FILED BY CLEAR CHOICE LIEN SERVICE INC. ON 05/25/2018
Date: 2018-05-25T00:00:00MINUTES FINALIZED FOR STATUS CONFERENCE 06/08/2018 09:00:00 AM.
Date: 2018-06-08T00:00:00NOTICE OF CHANGE OF FIRM NAME FILED BY CLEAR CHOICE LIEN SERVICE INC. ON 02/07/2019
Date: 2019-02-07T00:00:00PROOF OF SERVICE BY MAIL FILED BY CLEAR CHOICE LIEN SERVICE INC. ON 02/07/2019
Date: 2019-02-07T00:00:00CASE MANAGEMENT STATEMENT FILED BY RAIMOVA, RUHANGIZ ON 05/23/2018
Date: 2018-05-23T00:00:00PROOF OF ESERVICE FILED BY RAIMOVA, RUHANGIZ ON 05/23/2018
Date: 2018-05-23T00:00:00ORDER G056121
Date: 2018-05-31T00:00:00OPPOSITION FILED BY GHANE, ESMAIL ON 07/16/2018
Date: 2018-07-16T00:00:00CASE MANAGEMENT STATEMENT FILED BY GHANE, ESMAIL ON 07/16/2018
Date: 2018-07-16T00:00:00NOTICE OF RULING FILED BY GORJIYAN, FARAHNAZ; WEST COAST TOWING SERVICES INC. ON 06/14/2018
Date: 2018-06-14T00:00:00DESIGNATION OF RECORD ON APPEAL FILED BY GHANE, ESMAIL ON 05/24/2018
Date: 2018-05-24T00:00:00MOTION IN LIMINE (NO. 4) FILED BY GORJIYAN, FARAHNAZ; WEST COAST TOWING SERVICE, INC. ON 03/21/2019
Date: 2019-03-21T00:00:00EXHIBIT LIST FILED BY GORJIYAN, FARAHNAZ; WEST COAST TOWING SERVICE, INC. ON 03/21/2019
Date: 2019-03-21T00:00:00MOTION IN LIMINE (NO. 2) FILED BY GORJIYAN, FARAHNAZ; WEST COAST TOWING SERVICE, INC. ON 03/21/2019
Date: 2019-03-21T00:00:00MOTION IN LIMINE (NO. 5) FILED BY GORJIYAN, FARAHNAZ; WEST COAST TOWING SERVICE, INC. ON 03/21/2019
Date: 2019-03-21T00:00:00MOTION IN LIMINE (NO. 1) FILED BY GORJIYAN, FARAHNAZ; WEST COAST TOWING SERVICE, INC. ON 03/21/2019
Date: 2019-03-21T00:00:00PROOF OF SERVICE FILED BY RAIMOVA, RUHANGIZ ON 03/29/2019
Date: 2019-03-29T00:00:00MINUTES FINALIZED FOR JURY TRIAL 03/22/2019 09:00:00 AM.
Date: 2019-03-22T00:00:00OPPOSITION (TO MOTION IN LIMINE NO. 04) FILED BY RAIMOVA, RUHANGIZ ON 04/02/2019
Date: 2019-04-02T00:00:00OPPOSITION (TO MOTION IN LIMINE NO. 06) FILED BY RAIMOVA, RUHANGIZ ON 04/02/2019
Date: 2019-04-02T00:00:00OPPOSITION (TO MOTION IN LIMINE NO. 01) FILED BY RAIMOVA, RUHANGIZ ON 04/02/2019
Date: 2019-04-02T00:00:00OPPOSITION (TO MOTION IN LIMINE NO. 03) FILED BY RAIMOVA, RUHANGIZ ON 04/02/2019
Date: 2019-04-02T00:00:00OPPOSITION (TO MOTION IN LIMINE NO. 05) FILED BY RAIMOVA, RUHANGIZ ON 04/02/2019
Date: 2019-04-02T00:00:00CASE MANAGEMENT STATEMENT FILED BY GHANE, ESMAIL ON 07/18/2018
Date: 2018-07-18T00:00:00MINUTES FINALIZED FOR MOTION - OTHER 06/05/2018 01:30:00 PM.
Date: 2018-06-12T00:00:00REPLY TO OPPOSITION FILED BY CLEAR CHOICE LIEN SERVICE INC. ON 07/25/2018
Date: 2018-07-25T00:00:00CASE MANAGEMENT STATEMENT FILED BY GORJIYAN, FARAHNAZ; WEST COAST TOWING SERVICE, INC. ON 07/18/2018
Date: 2018-07-18T00:00:00OPPOSITION FILED BY GHANE, ESMAIL ON 07/18/2018
Date: 2018-07-18T00:00:00MINUTES FINALIZED FOR UNDER SUBMISSION RULING 08/16/2018 11:43:00 AM.
Date: 2018-08-16T00:00:00ORDER GRANTING ATTORNEYS MOTION TO BE RELIEVED AS COUNSEL RECEIVED ON 11/21/2018.
Date: 2018-11-21T00:00:00RESPONSE FILED BY GHANE, ESMAIL ON 07/27/2018
Date: 2018-07-27T00:00:00PROOF OF SERVICE FILED BY CLEAR CHOICE LIEN SERVICE INC. ON 07/25/2018
Date: 2018-07-25T00:00:00MINUTES FINALIZED FOR CHAMBERS WORK 01/23/2019 02:04:00 PM.
Date: 2019-01-23T00:00:00MOTION TO BE RELIEVED AS COUNSEL OF RECORD FILED BY RAIMOVA, RUHANGIZ ON 11/21/2018
Date: 2018-11-21T00:00:00OBJECTION FILED BY GHANE, ESMAIL ON 07/27/2018
Date: 2018-07-27T00:00:00E-FILING TRANSACTION NUMBER 1561102 REJECTED.
Date: 2018-11-14T00:00:00NOTICE OF HEARING FILED BY GORJIYAN, FARAHNAZ; WEST COAST TOWING SERVICES INC. ON 12/07/2018
Date: 2018-12-07T00:00:00MINUTES FINALIZED FOR STATUS CONFERENCE 12/07/2018 09:00:00 AM.
Date: 2018-12-13T00:00:00E-FILING TRANSACTION NUMBER 2761400 REJECTED.
Date: 2019-02-21T00:00:00MOTION IN LIMINE (NO. 3) FILED BY GORJIYAN, FARAHNAZ; WEST COAST TOWING SERVICE, INC. ON 03/21/2019
Date: 2019-03-21T00:00:00PROOF OF SERVICE FILED BY GORJIYAN, FARAHNAZ; WEST COAST TOWING SERVICE, INC. ON 03/21/2019
Date: 2019-03-21T00:00:00DECLARATION IN SUPPORT OF OPPOSITION FILED BY CLEAR CHOICE LIEN SERVICE INC. ON 07/25/2018
Date: 2018-07-25T00:00:00CLERK'S CERTIFICATE OF MAILING/ELECTRONIC SERVICE
Date: 2019-01-23T00:00:00PROOF OF ESERVICE FILED BY RAIMOVA, RUHANGIZ ON 04/02/2019
Date: 2019-04-02T00:00:00OPPOSITION (AND OBJECTIONS) FILED BY RAIMOVA, RUHANGIZ ON 01/24/2019
Date: 2019-01-24T00:00:00NOTICE OF RULING FILED BY GORJIYAN, FARAHNAZ ON 08/08/2018
Date: 2018-08-08T00:00:00REMITTITUR (G056121) FILED BY THE SUPERIOR COURT OF ORANGE ON 08/06/2018
Date: 2018-08-06T00:00:00CLERK'S CERTIFICATE OF MAILING/ELECTRONIC SERVICE
Date: 2018-08-07T00:00:00MINUTES FINALIZED FOR MOTION TO BE RELIEVED AS COUNSEL OF RECORD 02/05/2019 01:30:00 PM.
Date: 2019-02-05T00:00:00EX PARTE APPLICATION - OTHER FILED BY CLEAR CHOICE LIEN SERVICE INC. ON 05/14/2019
Date: 2019-05-14T00:00:00OPPOSITION FILED BY RAIMOVA, RUHANGIZ ON 01/25/2019
Date: 2019-01-25T00:00:00MINUTES FINALIZED FOR MULTIPLE EVENTS 07/31/2018 01:30:00 PM.
Date: 2018-08-07T00:00:00DECLARATION IN SUPPORT FILED BY CLEAR CHOICE LIEN SERVICE INC. ON 05/15/2019
Date: 2019-05-15T00:00:00CLERK'S CERTIFICATE OF MAILING/ELECTRONIC SERVICE
Date: 2018-08-16T00:00:00DECLARATION IN SUPPORT OF MOTION TO BE RELIEVED AS COUNSEL FILED BY RAIMOVA, RUHANGIZ ON 11/21/2018
Date: 2018-11-21T00:00:00OPPOSITION (TO MOTION IN LIMINE NO. 02) FILED BY RAIMOVA, RUHANGIZ ON 04/02/2019
Date: 2019-04-02T00:00:00PROOF OF SERVICE BY MAIL FILED BY CLEAR CHOICE LIEN SERVICE INC. ON 05/17/2019
Date: 2019-05-17T00:00:00NOTICE OF RULING FILED BY CLEAR CHOICE LIEN SERVICE INC. ON 05/17/2019
Date: 2019-05-17T00:00:00STATEMENT - OTHER (OF COMPLIANCE) FILED BY RAIMOVA, RUHANGIZ ON 04/02/2019
Date: 2019-04-02T00:00:00PROPOSED ORDER RECEIVED ON 06/12/2019
Date: 2019-06-12T00:00:00ORDER - OTHER FILED BY CLEAR CHOICE LIEN SERVICE INC. ON 05/15/2019
Date: 2019-05-15T00:00:00EX PARTE APPLICATION - OTHER FILED BY GORJIYAN, FARAHNAZ; WEST COAST TOWING SERVICE, INC. ON 06/12/2019
Date: 2019-06-12T00:00:00STATEMENT OF COMPLIANCE FILED BY GORJIYAN, FARAHNAZ; WEST COAST TOWING SERVICE, INC. ON 03/21/2019
Date: 2019-03-21T00:00:00MINUTES FINALIZED FOR EX PARTE 06/13/2019 08:30:00 AM.
Date: 2019-06-13T00:00:00VERDICT RECEIVED ON 08/04/2016.
Date: 2016-08-04T00:00:00MINUTES FINALIZED FOR MOTION - OTHER 05/31/2016 01:30:00 PM.
Date: 2016-06-01T00:00:00OPPOSITION (3 MOTION IN LIMINE) FILED BY RAIMOVA, RUHANGIZ ON 09/09/2016
Date: 2016-09-09T00:00:00JURY INSTRUCTIONS FILED BY RAIMOVA, RUHANGIZ ON 09/09/2016
Date: 2016-09-09T00:00:00STATEMENT OF COMPLIANCE FILED BY GORJIYAN, FARAHNAZ; WEST COAST TOWING SERVICE, INC. ON 08/04/2016
Date: 2016-08-04T00:00:00PROOF OF SERVICE FILED BY CLEAR CHOICE LIEN SERVICE INC. ON 04/03/2017
Date: 2017-04-03T00:00:00MINUTES FINALIZED FOR MANDATORY SETTLEMENT CONFERENCE 08/05/2016 09:00:00 AM.
Date: 2016-08-05T00:00:00CLERK'S CERTIFICATE OF SERVICE BY MAIL (OUT OF PROCESS) GENERATED
Date: 2017-04-13T00:00:00MINUTES FINALIZED FOR JURY TRIAL 04/13/2017 09:00:00 AM.
Date: 2017-04-13T00:00:00CASE MANAGEMENT STATEMENT FILED BY RAIMOVA, RUHANGIZ ON 04/25/2017
Date: 2017-04-25T00:00:00OPINION G053020
Date: 2017-03-15T00:00:00VERDICT (COPY OF PARTIAL PROPOSED VERDICT FORM) FILED BY RAIMOVA, RUHANGIZ ON 09/09/2016
Date: 2016-09-09T00:00:00MOTION FOR JOINDER FILED BY GHANE, ESMAIL ON 05/01/2017
Date: 2017-05-01T00:00:00ORDER G053098
Date: 2016-12-15T00:00:00ORDER ON COURT FEE WAIVER (SUPERIOR COURT) FILED BY THE SUPERIOR COURT OF ORANGE ON 04/11/2017
Date: 2017-04-11T00:00:00NOTICE OF RULING FILED BY GORJIYAN, FARAHNAZ; WEST COAST TOWING SERVICE, INC. ON 06/13/2019
Date: 2019-06-13T00:00:00E-FILING TRANSACTION NUMBER 41004821 REJECTED.
Date: 2019-09-12T00:00:00RECEIPT FOR RECORDS AND PAPERS G058280
Date: 2019-09-12T00:00:00CLERK'S CERTIFICATE OF MAILING/ELECTRONIC SERVICE
Date: 2019-09-13T00:00:00ORDER ON COURT FEE WAIVER (SUPERIOR COURT) FILED BY GHANE, ESMAIL ON 09/11/2019
Date: 2019-09-11T00:00:00MEMORANDUM OF COSTS (SUMMARY) FILED BY GORJIYAN, FARAHNAZ; WEST COAST TOWING SERVICE, INC. ON 10/31/2019
Date: 2019-10-31T00:00:00NOTICE TO REPORTER TO PREPARE TRANSCRIPT ON APPEAL
Date: 2019-11-04T00:00:00NOTICE OF CLERK'S TRANSCRIPT FEES
Date: 2019-11-04T00:00:00PROOF OF ESERVICE FILED BY RAIMOVA, RUHANGIZ; GHANE, ESMAIL ON 09/16/2019
Date: 2019-09-16T00:00:00NOTICE OF CLERK'S TRANSCRIPT FEES (AMENDED)
Date: 2019-11-01T00:00:00MOTION TO STRIKE OR TAX COSTS FILED BY RAIMOVA, RUHANGIZ; GHANE, ESMAIL ON 11/08/2019
Date: 2019-11-08T00:00:00DESIGNATION OF RECORD ON APPEAL FILED BY RAIMOVA, RUHANGIZ; GHANE, ESMAIL ON 09/16/2019
Date: 2019-09-16T00:00:00PROPOSED JUDGMENT RECEIVED ON 09/19/2019.
Date: 2019-09-19T00:00:00PROOF OF SERVICE BY MAIL FILED BY CLEAR CHOICE LIEN SERVICE INC. ON 09/19/2019
Date: 2019-09-19T00:00:00CASE MANAGEMENT STATEMENT FILED BY RAIMOVA, RUHANGIZ; GHANE, ESMAIL ON 09/20/2019
Date: 2019-09-20T00:00:00CASE MANAGEMENT STATEMENT FILED BY RAIMOVA, RUHANGIZ ON 09/20/2019
Date: 2019-09-20T00:00:00PROOF OF ESERVICE FILED BY RAIMOVA, RUHANGIZ ON 09/20/2019
Date: 2019-09-20T00:00:00MEMORANDUM OF COSTS (SUMMARY) FILED BY CLEAR CHOICE LIEN SERVICE INC. ON 11/07/2019
Date: 2019-11-07T00:00:00PROOF OF ESERVICE FILED BY RAIMOVA, RUHANGIZ; GHANE, ESMAIL ON 11/08/2019
Date: 2019-11-08T00:00:00MOTION TO STRIKE OR TAX COSTS FILED BY RAIMOVA, RUHANGIZ; GHANE, ESMAIL ON 11/12/2019
Date: 2019-11-12T00:00:00E-FILING TRANSACTION NUMBER 41032845 REJECTED.
Date: 2019-11-12T00:00:00PROOF OF ESERVICE FILED BY RAIMOVA, RUHANGIZ ON 11/22/2019
Date: 2019-11-22T00:00:00JUDGMENT FILED BY RAIMOVA, RUHANGIZ; GHANE, ESMAIL ON 10/04/2019
Date: 2019-10-04T00:00:00MOTION TO STRIKE OR TAX COSTS FILED BY RAIMOVA, RUHANGIZ; GHANE, ESMAIL ON 11/22/2019
Date: 2019-11-22T00:00:00MOTION TO STRIKE OR TAX COSTS (AMENDED) FILED BY RAIMOVA, RUHANGIZ; GHANE, ESMAIL ON 11/22/2019
Date: 2019-11-22T00:00:00CLERK'S CERTIFICATE OF MAILING/ELECTRONIC SERVICE
Date: 2019-10-08T00:00:00PROOF OF ESERVICE FILED BY RAIMOVA, RUHANGIZ; GHANE, ESMAIL ON 11/12/2019
Date: 2019-11-12T00:00:00PROOF OF ESERVICE FILED BY RAIMOVA, RUHANGIZ; GHANE, ESMAIL ON 09/20/2019
Date: 2019-09-20T00:00:00JUDGMENT FILED BY GHANE, ESMAIL; RAIMOVA, RUHANGIZ ON 10/04/2019
Date: 2019-10-04T00:00:00NOTICE OF APPEAL FILED
Date: 2019-10-09T00:00:00NOTICE OF CONTINUANCE
Date: 2020-05-27T00:00:00MINUTES FINALIZED FOR CASE MANAGEMENT CONFERENCE 10/08/2019 08:30:00 AM.
Date: 2019-10-08T00:00:00NOTICE OF CONTINUANCE
Date: 2020-05-20T00:00:00E-FILING TRANSACTION NUMBER 2846864 REJECTED.
Date: 2019-10-10T00:00:00NOTIFICATION OF FILING NOTICE OF APPEAL
Date: 2019-10-09T00:00:00NOTICE OF ENTRY OF JUDGMENT FILED BY GORJIYAN, FARAHNAZ; WEST COAST TOWING SERVICES INC. ON 10/29/2019
Date: 2019-10-29T00:00:00NOTICE OF DEFAULT
Date: 2019-10-16T00:00:00PROOF OF ESERVICE FILED BY RAIMOVA, RUHANGIZ ON 10/09/2019
Date: 2019-10-09T00:00:00NOTICE OF DEFAULT (AMENDED)
Date: 2019-10-15T00:00:00RECEIPT FOR RECORDS AND PAPERS G056119
Date: 2019-10-11T00:00:00NOTICE OF DEFAULT
Date: 2019-10-11T00:00:00NOTICE TO REPORTER TO PREPARE TRANSCRIPT ON APPEAL
Date: 2019-10-31T00:00:00PROOF OF ESERVICE FILED BY RAIMOVA, RUHANGIZ ON 08/20/2020
Date: 2020-08-20T00:00:00ORDER G058280 CONSOL W G058431
Date: 2019-12-27T00:00:00ORDER G058280
Date: 2019-12-06T00:00:00NOTICE OF CONTINUANCE
Date: 2020-05-19T00:00:00MINUTES FINALIZED FOR MULTIPLE EVENTS 08/24/2020 08:30:00 AM.
Date: 2020-08-24T00:00:00NOTICE OF RULING FILED BY GORJIYAN, FARAHNAZ; WEST COAST TOWING SERVICE, INC. ON 08/24/2020
Date: 2020-08-24T00:00:00RECEIPT FOR RECORDS AND PAPERS G058280 CONSOL W G058431
Date: 2020-01-15T00:00:00REPORTER'S REQUEST FOR EXTENSION OF TIME
Date: 2019-12-09T00:00:00ORDER G058431
Date: 2019-12-06T00:00:00MINUTES FINALIZED FOR MULTIPLE EVENTS 07/28/2020 09:00:00 AM.
Date: 2020-07-30T00:00:00PROOF OF ESERVICE FILED BY RAIMOVA, RUHANGIZ ON 07/17/2020
Date: 2020-07-17T00:00:00REPLY TO OPPOSITION FILED BY RAIMOVA, RUHANGIZ ON 07/17/2020
Date: 2020-07-17T00:00:00PROOF OF ESERVICE FILED BY RAIMOVA, RUHANGIZ ON 08/19/2020
Date: 2020-08-19T00:00:00EX PARTE APPLICATION - OTHER FILED BY RAIMOVA, RUHANGIZ ON 08/19/2020
Date: 2020-08-19T00:00:00CLERK'S CERTIFICATE OF MAILING/ELECTRONIC SERVICE
Date: 2020-07-30T00:00:00NOTICE OF CONTINUANCE
Date: 2020-06-01T00:00:00OPPOSITION FILED BY GORJIYAN, FARAHNAZ; WEST COAST TOWING SERVICE, INC. ON 07/14/2020
Date: 2020-07-14T00:00:00DECLARATION RE: EX-PARTE NOTICE FILED BY RAIMOVA, RUHANGIZ ON 08/20/2020
Date: 2020-08-20T00:00:00MINUTES FINALIZED FOR EX PARTE 08/20/2020 08:30:00 AM.
Date: 2020-08-20T00:00:00EX PARTE APPLICATION - OTHER FILED BY RAIMOVA, RUHANGIZ ON 08/20/2020
Date: 2020-08-20T00:00:00DECLARATION RE: EX-PARTE NOTICE FILED BY RAIMOVA, RUHANGIZ; GHANE, ESMAIL ON 11/30/2020
Date: 2020-11-30T00:00:00OPPOSITION FILED BY GORJIYAN, FARAHNAZ; WEST COAST TOWING SERVICE, INC. ON 11/30/2020
Date: 2020-11-30T00:00:00MINUTES FINALIZED FOR MULTIPLE EVENTS 12/01/2020 08:30:00 AM.
Date: 2020-12-01T00:00:00EX PARTE APPLICATION - OTHER FILED BY RAIMOVA, RUHANGIZ ON 11/30/2020
Date: 2020-11-30T00:00:00EX PARTE APPLICATION - OTHER FILED BY RAIMOVA, RUHANGIZ; GHANE, ESMAIL ON 11/30/2020
Date: 2020-11-30T00:00:00PROPOSED ORDER RECEIVED ON 11/30/2020.
Date: 2020-11-30T00:00:00NOTICE OF RULING FILED BY GORJIYAN, FARAHNAZ; WEST COAST TOWING SERVICE, INC. ON 12/01/2020
Date: 2020-12-01T00:00:00REMITTITUR (G058280, G058431) FILED BY THE SUPERIOR COURT OF ORANGE ON 07/01/2021
Date: 2021-07-01T00:00:00NOTICE OF RELOCATION
Date: 2021-07-29T00:00:00MINUTES FINALIZED FOR MULTIPLE EVENTS 06/15/2021 09:00:00 AM.
Date: 2021-06-15T00:00:00ORDER G058280
Date: 2020-12-22T00:00:00CLERK'S CERTIFICATE OF MAILING/ELECTRONIC SERVICE
Date: 2021-09-28T00:00:00OPINION G058280, G058431
Date: 2021-03-26T00:00:00REQUEST FOR JUDICIAL NOTICE FILED BY RAIMOVA, RUHANGIZ ON 11/08/2021
Date: 2021-11-08T00:00:00MOTION TO STRIKE OR TAX COSTS (AMENDED) FILED BY RAIMOVA, RUHANGIZ ON 11/08/2021
Date: 2021-11-08T00:00:00MOTION TO STRIKE OR TAX COSTS (AMENDED) FILED BY GHANE, ESMAIL; RAIMOVA, RUHANGIZ ON 11/08/2021
Date: 2021-11-08T00:00:00CLERK'S CERTIFICATE OF MAILING/ELECTRONIC SERVICE
Date: 2021-06-15T00:00:00NOTICE OF CONTINUANCE FILED BY GORJIYAN, FARAHNAZ; WEST COAST TOWING SERVICE, INC. ON 10/26/2021
Date: 2021-10-26T00:00:00MINUTES FINALIZED FOR MULTIPLE EVENTS 02/02/2021 09:00:00 AM.
Date: 2021-02-04T00:00:00CLERK'S CERTIFICATE OF MAILING/ELECTRONIC SERVICE
Date: 2021-11-30T00:00:00MINUTES FINALIZED FOR MULTIPLE EVENTS 11/30/2021 10:00:00 AM.
Date: 2021-11-30T00:00:00NOTICE OF CONTINUANCE FILED BY GORJIYAN, FARAHNAZ; WEST COAST TOWING SERVICE, INC. ON 12/10/2021
Date: 2021-12-10T00:00:00PROPOSED JUDGMENT RECEIVED ON 01/19/2022.
Date: 2022-01-19T00:00:00STATUS CONFERENCE STATEMENT FILED BY RAIMOVA, RUHANGIZ; GHANE, ESMAIL ON 02/07/2022
Date: 2022-02-07T00:00:00NOTICE OF RULING FILED BY GORJIYAN, FARAHNAZ ON 01/13/2022
Date: 2022-01-13T00:00:00CERTIFICATE OF SERVICE BY MAIL OF MINUTE ORDER DATED 10/19/2021
Date: 2021-12-01T00:00:00CERTIFICATE OF SERVICE BY MAIL OF MINUTE ORDER DATED 09/28/2021
Date: 2021-12-01T00:00:00NOTICE OF CHANGE OF ELECTRONIC SERVICE ADDRESS FILED BY WEST COAST TOWING SERVICE, INC. ON 02/15/2023
Date: 2023-02-15T00:00:00OPINION - G061524
Date: 2023-07-10T00:00:00CLERK'S CERTIFICATE OF MAILING/ELECTRONIC SERVICE
Date: 2023-08-15T00:00:00DECLARATION - OTHER FILED BY CLEAR CHOICE LIEN SERVICE INC. ON 10/12/2023
Date: October 12, 2023CLERK'S CERTIFICATE OF MAILING/ELECTRONIC SERVICE
Date: 2023-01-27T00:00:00PROOF OF SERVICE BY MAIL FILED BY CLEAR CHOICE LIEN SERVICE INC. ON 10/12/2023
Date: October 12, 2023EX PARTE APPLICATION - OTHER FILED BY RAIMOVA, RUHANGIZ ON 08/14/2023
Date: 2023-08-14T00:00:00PROOF OF SERVICE FILED BY GORJIYAN, FARAHNAZ; WEST COAST TOWING SERVICE, INC. ON 06/14/2019
Date: 2019-06-14T00:00:00DECLARATION IN SUPPORT FILED BY GORJIYAN, FARAHNAZ; WEST COAST TOWING SERVICE, INC. ON 06/14/2019
Date: 2019-06-14T00:00:00PROPOSED ORDER RECEIVED ON 05/14/2019
Date: 2019-05-14T00:00:00PROOF OF ESERVICE FILED BY GORJIYAN, FARAHNAZ; WEST COAST TOWING SERVICE, INC. ON 03/21/2019
Date: 2019-03-21T00:00:00MOTION IN LIMINE (NO. 6) FILED BY GORJIYAN, FARAHNAZ; WEST COAST TOWING SERVICE, INC. ON 03/21/2019
Date: 2019-03-21T00:00:00WITNESS LIST FILED BY GORJIYAN, FARAHNAZ; WEST COAST TOWING SERVICE, INC. ON 03/21/2019
Date: 2019-03-21T00:00:00JOINT STATEMENT FILED BY GORJIYAN, FARAHNAZ; WEST COAST TOWING SERVICE, INC. ON 03/21/2019
Date: 2019-03-21T00:00:00ORDER - OTHER FILED BY THE SUPERIOR COURT OF ORANGE ON 06/13/2019
Date: 2019-06-13T00:00:00SEPARATE STATEMENT FILED BY GORJIYAN, FARAHNAZ; WEST COAST TOWING SERVICE, INC. ON 06/14/2019
Date: 2019-06-14T00:00:00E-FILING TRANSACTION NUMBER 1653472 REJECTED.
Date: 2019-08-09T00:00:00OPPOSITION FILED BY RAIMOVA, RUHANGIZ; GHANE, ESMAIL ON 08/09/2019
Date: 2019-08-09T00:00:00MOTION FOR SUMMARY JUDGMENT/ADJUDICATION FILED BY CLEAR CHOICE LIEN SERVICE INC. ON 05/15/2019
Date: 2019-05-15T00:00:00PROOF OF SERVICE BY MAIL FILED BY CLEAR CHOICE LIEN SERVICE INC. ON 08/22/2019
Date: 2019-08-22T00:00:00PROOF OF ESERVICE FILED BY RAIMOVA, RUHANGIZ; GHANE, ESMAIL ON 08/09/2019
Date: 2019-08-09T00:00:00SEPARATE STATEMENT FILED BY RAIMOVA, RUHANGIZ; GHANE, ESMAIL ON 08/09/2019
Date: 2019-08-09T00:00:00DECLARATION IN SUPPORT FILED BY RAIMOVA, RUHANGIZ; GHANE, ESMAIL ON 08/09/2019
Date: 2019-08-09T00:00:00REPLY TO OPPOSITION FILED BY CLEAR CHOICE LIEN SERVICE INC. ON 08/22/2019
Date: 2019-08-22T00:00:00DECLARATION IN SUPPORT (OF EX PARTE APPLICATION) FILED BY CLEAR CHOICE LIEN SERVICE INC. ON 05/14/2019
Date: 2019-05-14T00:00:00MINUTES FINALIZED FOR EX PARTE 05/15/2019 08:30:00 AM.
Date: 2019-05-15T00:00:00DECLARATION RE: EX-PARTE NOTICE FILED BY CLEAR CHOICE LIEN SERVICE INC. ON 05/14/2019
Date: 2019-05-14T00:00:00PROOF OF PERSONAL SERVICE FILED BY CLEAR CHOICE LIEN SERVICE INC. ON 05/15/2019
Date: 2019-05-15T00:00:00SEPARATE STATEMENT FILED BY CLEAR CHOICE LIEN SERVICE INC. ON 05/15/2019
Date: 2019-05-15T00:00:00PROOF OF SERVICE BY MAIL FILED BY CLEAR CHOICE LIEN SERVICE INC. ON 05/15/2019
Date: 2019-05-15T00:00:00PROPOSED ORDER RECEIVED ON 08/22/2019
Date: 2019-08-22T00:00:00DECLARATION IN SUPPORT OF OPPOSITION FILED BY RAIMOVA, RUHANGIZ ON 08/26/2019
Date: 2019-08-26T00:00:00SEPARATE STATEMENT (PARTIAL) FILED BY RAIMOVA, RUHANGIZ ON 08/26/2019
Date: 2019-08-26T00:00:00REPLY TO OPPOSITION FILED BY GORJIYAN, FARAHNAZ; WEST COAST TOWING SERVICE, INC. ON 08/28/2019
Date: 2019-08-28T00:00:00PROPOSED ORDER RECEIVED ON 08/28/2019
Date: 2019-08-28T00:00:00REPLY - OTHER FILED BY RAIMOVA, RUHANGIZ ON 08/29/2019
Date: 2019-08-29T00:00:00DECLARATION IN SUPPORT OF OPPOSITION FILED BY RAIMOVA, RUHANGIZ; GHANE, ESMAIL ON 08/09/2019
Date: 2019-08-09T00:00:00PROOF OF ESERVICE FILED BY RAIMOVA, RUHANGIZ ON 08/26/2019
Date: 2019-08-26T00:00:00DECLARATION IN SUPPORT FILED BY RAIMOVA, RUHANGIZ ON 08/29/2019
Date: 2019-08-29T00:00:00PROOF OF ESERVICE FILED BY RAIMOVA, RUHANGIZ ON 08/29/2019
Date: 2019-08-29T00:00:00MINUTES FINALIZED FOR MULTIPLE EVENTS 09/04/2019 01:30:00 PM.
Date: 2019-09-04T00:00:00SEPARATE STATEMENT FILED BY RAIMOVA, RUHANGIZ ON 08/29/2019
Date: 2019-08-29T00:00:00MINUTES FINALIZED FOR UNDER SUBMISSION RULING 2019-09-05 15:53:00.0.
Date: 2019-09-06T00:00:00CLERK'S CERTIFICATE OF MAILING/ELECTRONIC SERVICE
Date: 2019-09-03T00:00:00MINUTES FINALIZED FOR MOTION FOR SUMMARY JUDGMENT AND/OR ADJUDICATION 08/27/2019 01:30:00 PM.
Date: 2019-08-28T00:00:00OBJECTION FILED BY GORJIYAN, FARAHNAZ; WEST COAST TOWING SERVICE, INC. ON 08/28/2019
Date: 2019-08-28T00:00:00REPLY - OTHER (PARTIAL SUR-REPLY, OPPOSITION & OBJECTIONS) FILED BY RAIMOVA, RUHANGIZ ON 08/26/2019
Date: 2019-08-26T00:00:00CLERK'S CERTIFICATE OF MAILING/ELECTRONIC SERVICE
Date: 2019-08-28T00:00:00OBJECTION FILED BY CLEAR CHOICE LIEN SERVICE INC. ON 08/22/2019
Date: 2019-08-22T00:00:00MINUTES FINALIZED FOR MULTIPLE EVENTS 09/03/2019 01:30:00 PM.
Date: 2019-09-03T00:00:00NOTIFICATION OF FILING NOTICE OF APPEAL
Date: 2019-09-09T00:00:00NOTICE OF RULING FILED BY GORJIYAN, FARAHNAZ; WEST COAST TOWING SERVICES INC. ON 09/06/2019
Date: 2019-09-06T00:00:00PROOF OF ESERVICE FILED BY RAIMOVA, RUHANGIZ ON 09/09/2019
Date: 2019-09-09T00:00:00NOTICE OF APPEAL FILED
Date: 2019-09-09T00:00:00CLERK'S CERTIFICATE OF MAILING/ELECTRONIC SERVICE
Date: 2019-09-06T00:00:00RECEIPT FOR RECORDS AND PAPERS G058280
Date: 2019-09-10T00:00:00NOTICE OF APPEAL FILED
Date: 2019-09-11T00:00:00PROOF OF SERVICE BY MAIL FILED BY CLEAR CHOICE LIEN SERVICE INC. ON 09/09/2019
Date: 2019-09-09T00:00:00ORDER G058280
Date: 2019-09-12T00:00:00MINUTES FINALIZED FOR FEE WAIVER HEARING 09/11/2019 01:30:00 PM.
Date: 2019-09-11T00:00:00E-FILING TRANSACTION NUMBER 3828721 REJECTED.
Date: 2019-09-12T00:00:00PROOF OF ESERVICE FILED BY RAIMOVA, RUHANGIZ ON 10/15/2019
Date: 2019-10-15T00:00:00ORDER G058280
Date: 2019-10-10T00:00:00E-FILING TRANSACTION NUMBER 2848637 REJECTED.
Date: 2019-10-15T00:00:00CLERK'S CERTIFICATE OF MAILING/ELECTRONIC SERVICE
Date: 2019-09-09T00:00:00E-FILING TRANSACTION NUMBER 41006684 REJECTED.
Date: 2019-09-12T00:00:00NOTICE OF CLERK'S TRANSCRIPT FEES
Date: 2019-10-31T00:00:00DESIGNATION OF RECORD ON APPEAL FILED BY RAIMOVA, RUHANGIZ ON 10/16/2019
Date: 2019-10-16T00:00:00MINUTES FINALIZED FOR CHAMBERS WORK 09/09/2019 04:40:00 PM.
Date: 2019-09-09T00:00:00PROPOSED JUDGMENT RECEIVED ON 09/06/2019.
Date: 2019-09-06T00:00:00NOTICE OF RULING FILED BY CLEAR CHOICE LIEN SERVICE INC. ON 09/09/2019
Date: 2019-09-09T00:00:00PROOF OF ESERVICE FILED BY RAIMOVA, RUHANGIZ; GHANE, ESMAIL ON 09/11/2019
Date: 2019-09-11T00:00:00NOTIFICATION OF FILING NOTICE OF APPEAL
Date: 2019-09-11T00:00:00ORDER ON COURT FEE WAIVER (SUPERIOR COURT) (GRANTED) FILED BY THE SUPERIOR COURT OF ORANGE ON 09/11/2019
Date: 2019-09-11T00:00:00ORDER ON COURT FEE WAIVER (SUPERIOR COURT) (DENIED) FILED BY THE SUPERIOR COURT OF ORANGE ON 09/10/2019
Date: 2019-09-10T00:00:00CERTIFICATE OF SERVICE BY MAIL OF MINUTE ORDER DATED 10/26/2021
Date: 2021-12-01T00:00:00SUPPLEMENTAL FILED BY GORJIYAN, FARAHNAZ; WEST COAST TOWING SERVICE, INC. ON 12/10/2021
Date: 2021-12-10T00:00:00CLERK'S CERTIFICATE OF MAILING/ELECTRONIC SERVICE
Date: 2022-03-10T00:00:00MINUTES FINALIZED FOR MULTIPLE EVENTS 09/28/2021 09:00:00 AM.
Date: 2021-09-28T00:00:00E-FILING TRANSACTION NUMBER 31117422 REJECTED.
Date: 2022-02-08T00:00:00MINUTES FINALIZED FOR MULTIPLE EVENTS 01/11/2022 10:30:00 AM.
Date: 2022-01-13T00:00:00REQUEST FOR JUDICIAL NOTICE FILED BY RAIMOVA, RUHANGIZ; GHANE, ESMAIL ON 02/07/2022
Date: 2022-02-07T00:00:00NOTICE - OTHER FILED BY GORJIYAN, FARAHNAZ ON 03/22/2022
Date: 2022-03-22T00:00:00MINUTES FINALIZED FOR CHAMBERS WORK 03/10/2022 09:49:00 AM.
Date: 2022-03-10T00:00:00NOTICE OF CONTINUANCE FILED BY GORJIYAN, FARAHNAZ; WEST COAST TOWING SERVICE, INC. ON 10/19/2021
Date: 2021-10-19T00:00:00MINUTES FINALIZED FOR MULTIPLE EVENTS 10/26/2021 10:00:00 AM.
Date: 2021-11-01T00:00:00CLERK'S CERTIFICATE OF MAILING/ELECTRONIC SERVICE
Date: 2021-11-01T00:00:00MOTION TO STRIKE OR TAX COSTS (AMENDED) FILED BY RAIMOVA, RUHANGIZ; GHANE, ESMAIL ON 11/09/2021
Date: 2021-11-09T00:00:00MINUTES FINALIZED FOR MULTIPLE EVENTS 10/19/2021 09:00:00 AM.
Date: 2021-10-22T00:00:00MINUTES FINALIZED FOR STATUS CONFERENCE 03/22/2022 11:00:00 AM.
Date: 2022-03-28T00:00:00REQUEST FOR JUDICIAL NOTICE FILED BY RAIMOVA, RUHANGIZ; GHANE, ESMAIL ON 11/09/2021
Date: 2021-11-09T00:00:00E-FILING TRANSACTION NUMBER 41347544 REJECTED.
Date: 2022-06-16T00:00:00CLERK'S CERTIFICATE OF MAILING/ELECTRONIC SERVICE
Date: 2022-01-13T00:00:00CERTIFICATE OF SERVICE BY MAIL OF MINUTE ORDER DATED 11/30/2021
Date: 2021-12-01T00:00:00E-FILING TRANSACTION NUMBER 41352598 REJECTED.
Date: 2022-06-29T00:00:00E-FILING TRANSACTION NUMBER 31177070 REJECTED.
Date: 2022-07-07T00:00:00NOTIFICATION OF FILING NOTICE OF APPEAL
Date: 2022-07-05T00:00:00NOTICE OF RELOCATION
Date: 2022-07-01T00:00:00NOTICE OF APPEAL FILED
Date: 2022-07-01T00:00:00MINUTES FINALIZED FOR EX PARTE 07/11/2022 08:30:00 AM.
Date: 2022-07-11T00:00:00CLERK'S CERTIFICATE OF MAILING/ELECTRONIC SERVICE
Date: 2022-06-08T00:00:00CLERK'S CERTIFICATE OF MAILING/ELECTRONIC SERVICE
Date: 2022-03-28T00:00:00MINUTES FINALIZED FOR MULTIPLE EVENTS 06/07/2022 11:00:00 AM.
Date: 2022-06-08T00:00:00CLERK'S CERTIFICATE OF MAILING/ELECTRONIC SERVICE
Date: 2022-06-14T00:00:00EX PARTE APPLICATION - OTHER FILED BY RAIMOVA, RUHANGIZ ON 07/21/2022
Date: 2022-07-21T00:00:00MINUTES FINALIZED FOR MULTIPLE EVENTS 06/14/2022 08:30:00 AM.
Date: 2022-06-14T00:00:00ORDER ON COURT FEE WAIVER (SUPERIOR COURT) FILED BY RAIMOVA, RUHANGIZ ON 06/22/2022
Date: 2022-06-22T00:00:00NOTICE OF ENTRY OF JUDGMENT FILED BY GORJIYAN, FARAHNAZ ON 06/28/2022
Date: 2022-06-28T00:00:00EX PARTE APPLICATION - OTHER FILED BY RAIMOVA, RUHANGIZ; GHANE, ESMAIL ON 07/08/2022
Date: 2022-07-08T00:00:00ORDER ON COURT FEE WAIVER (SUPERIOR COURT) FILED BY GHANE, ESMAIL ON 06/22/2022
Date: 2022-06-22T00:00:00DESIGNATION OF RECORD ON APPEAL (G061524) FILED BY GHANE, ESMAIL; RAIMOVA, RUHANGIZ ON 07/21/2022
Date: 2022-07-21T00:00:00MINUTES FINALIZED FOR EX PARTE 07/25/2022 08:30:00 AM.
Date: 2022-07-25T00:00:00RECEIPT FOR RECORDS AND PAPERS G061524
Date: 2022-07-06T00:00:00ABSTRACT OF JUDGMENT ISSUED ON 06/29/2022
Date: 2022-06-29T00:00:00NOTICE OF CONTINUANCE (AMENDED) FILED BY RAIMOVA, RUHANGIZ ON 07/26/2022
Date: 2022-07-26T00:00:00NOTICE OF CONTINUANCE FILED BY RAIMOVA, RUHANGIZ ON 07/25/2022
Date: 2022-07-25T00:00:00CLERK'S CERTIFICATE OF MAILING/ELECTRONIC SERVICE
Date: 2022-07-25T00:00:00CLERK'S CERTIFICATE OF MAILING/ELECTRONIC SERVICE
Date: 2022-07-11T00:00:00NOTICE OF CLERK'S TRANSCRIPT FEES G061524
Date: 2022-08-10T00:00:00E-FILING TRANSACTION NUMBER 41377609 REJECTED.
Date: 2022-08-29T00:00:00CLERK'S CERTIFICATE OF MAILING/ELECTRONIC SERVICE
Date: 2022-08-08T00:00:00MINUTES FINALIZED FOR EX PARTE 08/08/2022 08:30:00 AM.
Date: 2022-08-08T00:00:00ORDER G061524
Date: 2022-07-11T00:00:00NOTICE OF DEFAULT G061524
Date: 2022-07-12T00:00:00MINUTES FINALIZED FOR STATUS CONFERENCE 07/20/2022 08:30:00 AM.
Date: 2022-07-20T00:00:00ACKNOWLEDGMENT OF PARTIAL SATISFACTION OF JUDGMENT FILED BY GORJIYAN, FARAHNAZ ON 08/29/2022
Date: 2022-08-29T00:00:00MINUTES FINALIZED FOR ORDER TO SHOW CAUSE RE: DISMISSAL 01/24/2023 09:00:00 AM.
Date: 2023-01-26T00:00:00MINUTES FINALIZED FOR EX PARTE 08/22/2023 08:30:00 AM.
Date: 2023-08-22T00:00:00E-FILING TRANSACTION NUMBER 11183774 REJECTED.
Date: 2023-08-21T00:00:00PROOF OF SERVICE BY MAIL FILED BY CLEAR CHOICE LIEN SERVICE INC. ON 08/17/2023
Date: 2023-08-17T00:00:00EX PARTE APPLICATION - OTHER FILED BY RAIMOVA, RUHANGIZ ON 08/21/2023
Date: 2023-08-21T00:00:00E-FILING TRANSACTION NUMBER 21185773 REJECTED.
Date: 2022-07-25T00:00:00E-FILING TRANSACTION NUMBER 11015620 REJECTED.
Date: 2022-07-22T00:00:00REMITTITUR (G061524) FILED BY THE SUPERIOR COURT OF ORANGE ON 10/12/2023
Date: October 12, 2023CLERK'S CERTIFICATE OF MAILING/ELECTRONIC SERVICE
Date: 2023-08-22T00:00:00ACKNOWLEDGMENT OF PARTIAL SATISFACTION OF JUDGMENT FILED BY GORJIYAN, FARAHNAZ ON 07/19/2022
Date: 2022-07-19T00:00:00MINUTES FINALIZED FOR STATUS CONFERENCE RE: SETTLEMENT 07/19/2022 08:30:00 AM.
Date: 2022-07-19T00:00:00MINUTES FINALIZED FOR NUNC PRO TUNC MINUTES 07/19/2022 10:02:00 AM.
Date: 2022-07-19T00:00:00E-FILING TRANSACTION NUMBER 11014497 REJECTED.
Date: 2022-07-19T00:00:00E-FILING TRANSACTION NUMBER 21186161 REJECTED.
Date: 2022-07-21T00:00:00EX PARTE APPLICATION - OTHER FILED BY RAIMOVA, RUHANGIZ ON 08/04/2022
Date: 2022-08-04T00:00:00MINUTES FINALIZED FOR STATUS CONFERENCE 08/04/2022 08:30:00 AM.
Date: 2022-08-04T00:00:00PROOF OF SERVICE BY MAIL FILED BY CLEAR CHOICE LIEN SERVICE INC. ON 08/01/2022
Date: 2022-08-01T00:00:00E-FILING TRANSACTION NUMBER 41363266 REJECTED.
Date: 2022-07-27T00:00:00MINUTES FINALIZED FOR STATUS CONFERENCE 12/06/2022 08:30:00 AM.
Date: 2022-12-13T00:00:00ORDER - G061524
Date: 2023-05-01T00:00:00CLERK'S CERTIFICATE OF MAILING/ELECTRONIC SERVICE
Date: 2022-12-13T00:00:00MINUTES FINALIZED FOR EX PARTE 08/15/2023 08:30:00 AM.
Date: 2023-08-15T00:00:00REMITTITUR (G061524) FILED BY THE SUPERIOR COURT OF ORANGE ON 07/10/2023
Date: 2023-07-10T00:00:00For full print and download access, please subscribe at https://www.trellis.law/.