Case Last Refreshed: 6 months ago
Peter W. Allen, filed a(n) General Torts - Torts case against Fernando Grijalva, Co-Trustee Of The M, Miriam Girjalva, Miriam Grijalva Executor Of The Estate, Miriam Grijalva Trustee Of The Maria V, in the jurisdiction of Orange County. This case was filed in Orange County Superior Courts with Deborah C. Servino presiding.
Case Number |
JudgeDeborah C. Servino Track Judge’s New Cases |
Filing DateFebruary 02, 2015 |
CategoryPi/Pd/Wd - Other |
Last RefreshedOctober 17, 2023 |
Practice AreaTorts |
Filing LocationOrange County, CA |
Matter TypeGeneral Torts |
DECLARATION IN SUPPORT FILED BY ALLEN, PETER W. ON 05/21/2015
Date: 2015-05-21T00:00:00COMPLAINT FILED BY ALLEN, PETER W. ON 02/02/2015
Date: 2015-02-02T00:00:00NOTICE OF RELATED CASE FILED BY ALLEN, PETER W. ON 02/02/2015
Date: 2015-02-02T00:00:00CIVIL CASE COVER SHEET FILED BY ALLEN, PETER W. ON 02/02/2015
Date: 2015-02-02T00:00:00SUMMONS ISSUED AND FILED FILED BY ALLEN, PETER W. ON 02/02/2015
Date: 2015-02-02T00:00:00CASE MANAGEMENT CONFERENCE SCHEDULED FOR 06/08/2015 AT 09:00:00 AM IN C22 AT CENTRAL JUSTICE CENTER.
Date: 2015-03-19T00:00:00ORDER ON COURT FEE WAIVER (SUPERIOR COURT) FILED BY ALLEN, PETER W. ON 02/03/2015
Date: 2015-02-03T00:00:00PROOF OF SERVICE OF SUMMONS FILED BY ALLEN, PETER W. ON 03/12/2015
Date: 2015-03-12T00:00:00CASE ASSIGNED TO JUDICIAL OFFICER SERVINO, DEBORAH ON 02/02/2015.
Date: 2015-02-02T00:00:00PROPOSED ORDER RECEIVED ON 05/21/2015
Date: 2015-05-21T00:00:00NOTICE OF ERRATA FILED BY ALLEN, PETER W. ON 05/26/2015
Date: 2015-05-26T00:00:00CASE MANAGEMENT STATEMENT FILED BY ALLEN, PETER W. ON 06/05/2015
Date: 2015-06-05T00:00:00MINUTES FINALIZED FOR CASE MANAGEMENT CONFERENCE 06/08/2015 09:00:00 AM.
Date: 2015-06-10T00:00:00MINUTES FINALIZED FOR MOTION TO DEEM FACTS ADMITTED 07/10/2015 02:00:00 PM.
Date: 2015-07-13T00:00:00MOTION TO DEEM ANSWERS ADMITTED FILED BY ALLEN, PETER W. ON 05/21/2015
Date: 2015-05-21T00:00:00CLERK'S CERTIFICATE OF SERVICE BY MAIL OC GENERATED
Date: 2015-07-13T00:00:00MINUTES FINALIZED FOR NUNC PRO TUNC MINUTES 07/15/2015 03:12:00 PM.
Date: 2015-07-15T00:00:00DISCLOSURE ON THE RECORD.
Date: 2015-07-10T00:00:00E-FILING TRANSACTION NUMBER 1259424 REJECTED.
Date: 2015-07-28T00:00:00E-FILING TRANSACTION NUMBER 3340519 REJECTED.
Date: 2015-10-20T00:00:00PROPOSED JUDGMENT RECEIVED ON 10/20/2015.
Date: 2015-10-20T00:00:00MINUTES FINALIZED FOR CASE MANAGEMENT CONFERENCE 09/11/2015 09:00:00 AM.
Date: 2015-09-11T00:00:00MINUTES FINALIZED FOR CHAMBERS WORK 10/29/2015 08:36:00 AM.
Date: 2015-11-03T00:00:00REQUEST FOR DISMISSAL OF DOES FILED BY ALLEN, PETER W. ON 10/20/2015
Date: 2015-10-20T00:00:00JUDGMENT FILED BY ALLEN, PETER W. ON 10/29/2015
Date: 2015-10-29T00:00:00DECLARATION - OTHER FILED BY FERNANDO GRIJALVA, CO-TRUSTEE OF THE MARIA VILLACRES TRUST ON 10/14/2016
Date: 2016-10-14T00:00:00E-FILING TRANSACTION NUMBER 2496099 REJECTED.
Date: 2016-09-28T00:00:00OPPOSITION FILED BY ALLEN, PETER W. ON 11/09/2016
Date: 2016-11-09T00:00:00CASE MANAGEMENT STATEMENT FILED BY ALLEN, PETER W. ON 08/26/2015
Date: 2015-08-26T00:00:00NOTICE - OTHER FILED BY ALLEN, PETER W. ON 07/20/2015
Date: 2015-07-20T00:00:00REQUEST FOR ENTRY OF DEFAULT FILED BY ALLEN, PETER W. ON 07/24/2015
Date: 2015-07-24T00:00:00OBJECTION FILED BY ALLEN, PETER W. ON 11/09/2016
Date: 2016-11-09T00:00:00OBJECTION FILED BY FERNANDO GRIJALVA, CO-TRUSTEE OF THE MARIA VILLACRES TRUST ON 12/02/2016
Date: 2016-12-02T00:00:00REPLY - OTHER FILED BY FERNANDO GRIJALVA, CO-TRUSTEE OF THE MARIA VILLACRES TRUST ON 12/02/2016
Date: 2016-12-02T00:00:00DECLARATION IN SUPPORT OF OPPOSITION FILED BY ALLEN, PETER W. ON 11/09/2016
Date: 2016-11-09T00:00:00NOTICE - OTHER FILED BY ALLEN, PETER W. ON 10/20/2015
Date: 2015-10-20T00:00:00REQUEST FOR COURT DEFAULT JUDGMENT FILED BY ALLEN, PETER W. ON 10/20/2015
Date: 2015-10-20T00:00:00ABSTRACT OF JUDGMENT (ISSUED 11-23-15) RECEIVED ON 11/18/2015.
Date: 2015-11-18T00:00:00E-FILING TRANSACTION NUMBER 4464441 REJECTED.
Date: 2015-11-18T00:00:00E-FILING TRANSACTION NUMBER 4593363 REJECTED.
Date: 2016-08-23T00:00:00ORDER - OTHER FILED BY ALLEN, PETER W. ON 10/29/2015
Date: 2015-10-29T00:00:00MINUTES FINALIZED FOR MULTIPLE EVENTS 12/09/2016 10:00:00 AM.
Date: 2016-12-09T00:00:00E-FILING TRANSACTION NUMBER 2496118 REJECTED.
Date: 2016-09-28T00:00:00PROOF OF SERVICE BY MAIL FILED BY GIRJALVA, MIRIAM ON 10/20/2016
Date: 2016-10-20T00:00:00NOTICE OF RULING FILED BY ALLEN, PETER W. ON 12/14/2016
Date: 2016-12-14T00:00:00E-FILING TRANSACTION NUMBER 3492426 REJECTED.
Date: 2016-12-27T00:00:00DECLARATION IN SUPPORT FILED BY ALLEN, PETER W. ON 06/14/2017
Date: 2017-06-14T00:00:00PROPOSED ORDER RECEIVED ON 06/14/2017
Date: 2017-06-14T00:00:00PROPOSED ORDER (COVER SHEET) (ELECTRONIC FILING) FILED BY ALLEN, PETER W. ON 06/14/2017
Date: 2017-06-14T00:00:00SUBSTITUTION OF ATTORNEY FILED BY ALLEN, PETER W. ON 12/07/2016
Date: 2016-12-07T00:00:00PROPOSED STIPULATION AND ORDER RECEIVED ON 08/15/2017
Date: 2017-08-15T00:00:00MINUTES FINALIZED FOR ORDER TO SHOW CAUSE RE: SALE OF DWELLING 10/13/2017 10:00:00 AM.
Date: 2017-10-13T00:00:00NOTICE OF HEARING OC GENERATED
Date: 2017-08-24T00:00:00CLERK'S CERTIFICATE OF MAILING/ELECTRONIC SERVICE
Date: 2017-10-10T00:00:00E-FILING TRANSACTION NUMBER 2583182 REJECTED.
Date: 2017-08-21T00:00:00CLERK'S CERTIFICATE OF MAILING/ELECTRONIC SERVICE
Date: 2018-03-13T00:00:00STIPULATION TO CONTINUE (ORDER TO SHOW CAUSE) FILED BY ALLEN, PETER W. ON 10/06/2017
Date: 2017-10-06T00:00:00NOTICE OF RULING FILED BY ALLEN, PETER W. ON 03/14/2018
Date: 2018-03-14T00:00:00E-FILING TRANSACTION NUMBER 1512167 REJECTED.
Date: 2018-06-22T00:00:00NOTICE - OTHER FILED BY ALLEN, PETER W. ON 06/16/2017
Date: 2017-06-16T00:00:00STIPULATION TO CONTINUE (ORDER TO SHOW CAUSE) SUBMITTED BY ALLEN, PETER W. REJECTED ON 10/10/2017.
Date: 2017-10-10T00:00:00EX PARTE APPLICATION - OTHER FILED BY ALLEN, PETER W. ON 06/22/2018
Date: 2018-06-22T00:00:00WRIT (ISSUED 12/29/16) RECEIVED ON 12/28/2016.
Date: 2016-12-28T00:00:00EX PARTE APPLICATION - OTHER FILED BY ALLEN, PETER W. ON 06/14/2017
Date: 2017-06-14T00:00:00NOTICE - OTHER FILED BY ALLEN, PETER W. ON 07/31/2018
Date: July 31, 2018MINUTES FINALIZED FOR EX PARTE 06/15/2017 01:30:00 PM.
Date: 2017-06-16T00:00:00ORDER - OTHER FILED BY ALLEN, PETER W. ON 06/15/2017
Date: 2017-06-15T00:00:00MINUTES FINALIZED FOR CHAMBERS WORK 03/12/2018 09:02:00 AM.
Date: 2018-03-13T00:00:00NOTICE OF RULING FILED BY ALLEN, PETER W. ON 10/13/2017
Date: 2017-10-13T00:00:00PROPOSED ORDER RECEIVED ON 10/06/2017
Date: 2017-10-06T00:00:00CLERK'S CERTIFICATE OF MAILING/ELECTRONIC SERVICE
Date: June 25, 2018MINUTES FINALIZED FOR EX PARTE 06/25/2018 01:30:00 PM.
Date: June 25, 2018ORDER - OTHER FILED BY ALLEN, PETER W. ON 08/16/2017
Date: 2017-08-16T00:00:00JOINT STATEMENT FILED BY ALLEN, PETER W. ON 03/12/2018
Date: 2018-03-12T00:00:00ORDER - OTHER FILED BY ALLEN, PETER W. ON 06/25/2018
Date: 2018-06-25T00:00:00WRIT OF EXECUTION RETURNED - UNSATISFIED FILED BY ALLEN, PETER W. ON 01/31/2019
Date: January 31, 2019For full print and download access, please subscribe at https://www.trellis.law/.