Case Last Refreshed: 1 year ago
filed a(n) Civil case in the jurisdiction of Orange County. This case was filed in Orange County Superior Courts .
Case Number |
|
Filing DateSeptember 01, 2016 |
CategoryCivil |
Last RefreshedMay 16, 2022 |
|
Filing LocationOrange County, CA |
|
Date | Type | Description | |
---|---|---|---|
March 03, 2020 | Tentative Ruling |
Plaintiff’s (Connie Parker) Motion for Order to Strike, Alternatively, to Tax Costs Submitted by Nili N. Alai, M.D., Inc. (filed on 11-12-19 under ROA No. 1852) and Plaintiff’s Motion for Order to Str...
Judge: Walter SCHWARM |
|
November 12, 2019 | Tentative Ruling |
Moving Counsel’s (Grant, Genovese & Barrata) unopposed Motion to be Relieved as Counsel (Motion), filed on 10-16-19 as an Ex-Parte Application, is GRANTED. On 10-16-19, Moving Counsel served the Ex Pa...
Judge: Walter SCHWARM |
|
November 05, 2019 | Tentative Ruling |
Motion No. 1: Cross-Defendant’s (Charles Ton) Motion to Quash Summons and Complaint (filed as an ex parte application on 9-27-19 is DENIED. Code of Civil Procedure section 418.10 states in part, “(a) ...
Judge: Walter SCHWARM |
|
October 29, 2019 | Tentative Ruling |
On 10-8-19, the court granted Ms. O’Brien’s request to specially set a motion to be relieved as counsel of record for 10-29-19. The court ordered Ms. O’Brien to give notice of the 10-29-19 motion date...
Judge: Walter SCHWARM |
|
October 15, 2019 | Tentative Ruling |
Motion No. 1: Cross-Complainant’s (Nili Alai) unopposed Motion for Protective and Injunctive Relief Pursuant to Plaintiff’s Violation of 1) Penal Code 502 (C) 2) 18 U.S.C. § 2510 et seq 3) Bus. & Prof...
Judge: Walter SCHWARM |
|
October 08, 2019 | Tentative Ruling |
Motion No. 1: Defendant’s (Nili N. Alai) Motion for Summary Judgment, or in the Alternative Summary Adjudication Pursuant to C.C.P. § 437 (c) (Motion), filed on 4-6-18 under ROA No. 878, is off calend...
Judge: Walter SCHWARM |
|
October 01, 2019 | Tentative Ruling |
Motion No. 1: Defendants’/Cross-Complainants’ (Nili N. Alai, M.D., Inc. dba The Skin Center and 12712, Inc.; hereafter “Moving Parties”) Motion to Compel Plaintiff’s/Cross-Defendant’s Response to Spec...
Judge: Walter SCHWARM |
|
July 02, 2019 | Tentative Ruling |
Cross-Defendant’s (Charles Ton) Motion to Set Aside Default and/or Default Judgment (Motion), filed on 4-8-19, is DENIED. The court DENIES Cross-Complainant’s (Nili N. Alai, MD) Request for Judicial N...
Judge: Walter SCHWARM |
|
June 25, 2019 | Tentative Ruling |
Cross-Complainant’s (Nili N. Alai) Motion to Compel Response to Requests for Production of Documents, Set Two (filed on 3-15-19 under Register of Action No. 1460) is DENIED. Code of Civil Procedure se...
Judge: Walter SCHWARM |
|
May 28, 2019 | Tentative Ruling |
Cross-Complainant’s (Nili N. Alai) Motion to Compel Response to Requests for Production of Documents, Set Two (filed on 3-15-19 under Register of Action No. 1460) is DENIED. Code of Civil Procedure se...
Judge: Walter SCHWARM |
For full print and download access, please subscribe at https://www.trellis.law/.