Case Last Refreshed: 6 months ago
Cach, Llc, filed a(n) Collections - Creditor case against Crystal R Matillo, in the jurisdiction of Orange County. This case was filed in Orange County Superior Courts with Claudia J. Silbar presiding.
Case Number |
|
Filing DateDecember 31, 2012 |
CategoryRule 3.740 Collections |
Last RefreshedOctober 18, 2023 |
Practice AreaCreditor |
Filing LocationOrange County, CA |
Matter TypeCollections |
SUMMONS ISSUED AND FILED FILED BY CACH, LLC ON 12/31/2012
Date: 2012-12-31T00:00:00WRIT OF EXECUTION RETURNED - UNSATISFIED FILED BY CACH, LLC ON 01/17/2017
Date: January 17, 2017CASE MANAGEMENT STATEMENT FILED BY CACH, LLC ON 04/02/2014
Date: 2014-04-02T00:00:00DECLARATION - OTHER FILED BY CACH, LLC ON 04/24/2014
Date: April 24, 2014DECLARATION - OTHER (DECLARATION OF VENUE) FILED BY CACH, LLC ON 12/31/2012
Date: 2012-12-31T00:00:00COMPLAINT FILED BY CACH, LLC ON 12/31/2012
Date: 2012-12-31T00:00:00PROOF OF NON-SERVICE FILED BY CACH, LLC ON 02/22/2013
Date: 2013-02-22T00:00:00PROOF OF SERVICE OF SUMMONS FILED BY CACH, LLC ON 02/22/2013
Date: 2013-02-22T00:00:00CIVIL CASE COVER SHEET FILED BY CACH, LLC ON 12/31/2012
Date: 2012-12-31T00:00:00REQUEST FOR DISMISSAL OF DOES FILED BY CACH, LLC ON 04/24/2014
Date: April 24, 2014WRIT (ISSUED 05/28/2014) RECEIVED ON 05/27/2014.
Date: May 27, 2014CASE MANAGEMENT CONFERENCE SCHEDULED FOR 04/25/2014 AT 09:00:00 AM IN C63 AT CENTRAL JUSTICE CENTER.
Date: 2013-12-27T00:00:00JUDGMENT FILED BY CACH, LLC ON 04/24/2014
Date: 2014-04-24T00:00:00REQUEST FOR ENTRY OF DEFAULT FILED BY CACH, LLC ON 04/24/2014
Date: 2014-04-24T00:00:00NOTICE OF CHANGE OF ADDRESS AND/OR TELEPHONE FILED BY CACH, LLC ON 02/09/2015
Date: February 09, 2015For full print and download access, please subscribe at https://www.trellis.law/.