Your recipients will receive an email with this envelope shortly and will be able to access it on trellis. You can always see your envelopes by clicking the Inbox on the top right hand corner.
DAVID AMES VS. CRAIG CHUNG
An Other Employment case was filed by David Ames, against Craig Chung, and Chadeny Enterprises, Inc., in the jurisdiction of Orange County. Judge Timothy J. Stafford presiding.
Case Details
Case Number
Filing Date
December 14, 2012
Last Refreshed
May 04, 2023
Filing Location
Orange County, CA
Category
OTHER EMPLOYMENT
Practice Area
Labor and Employment
Matter Type
General Employment
Status
Settlement
OTHER JUDGES ON THIS CASE
Parties
Plaintiffs
Defendants
Case Documents
Case Events
Date | Type | Description | |
---|---|---|---|
March 06, 2015 | Docket Event | PAYMENT RECEIVED BY FOR 194 - COMPLAINT OR OTHER 1ST PAPER IN THE AMOUNT OF 435.00, TRANSACTION NUMBER 11747593 AND RECEIPT NUMBER 11571783. |
|
March 06, 2015 | Docket Event | REQUEST FOR DISMISSAL WITH PREJUDICE - ENTIRE ACTION FILED BY AMES, DAVID ON 03/06/2015 |
|
March 06, 2015 | Docket Event | COMPLAINT DISPOSED WITH DISPOSITION OF REQUEST FOR DISMISSAL. | |
March 06, 2015 | Docket Event | CASE DISMISSED WITH DISPOSITION OF REQUEST FOR DISMISSAL | |
March 06, 2015 | Docket Event | E-FILING TRANSACTION 3260880 RECEIVED ON 03/06/2015 01:37:58 PM. | |
February 25, 2015 | Docket Event | MINUTES FINALIZED FOR ORDER TO SHOW CAUSE RE: DISMISSAL ON SETTLED CASE 02/19/2015 01:30:00 PM. |
|
February 25, 2015 | Docket Event | CLERK'S CERTIFICATE OF SERVICE BY MAIL OC GENERATED |
|
February 19, 2015 | Docket Event |
ORDER TO SHOW CAUSE RE: DISMISSAL ON SETTLED CASE SCHEDULED FOR 03/12/2015 AT 01:30:00 PM IN C66 AT CENTRAL JUSTICE CENTER.
Judge: Timothy J. Stafford |
|
February 19, 2015 | Docket Event | ORDER TO SHOW CAUSE RE: DISMISSAL ON SETTLED CASE CONTINUED TO 03/12/2015 AT 01:30 PM IN THIS DEPARTMENT. | |
February 19, 2015 | Docket Event | STIPULATION TO JUDGE PRO TEM FILED BY AMES, DAVID; CHUNG, CRAIG ON 02/19/2015 |
|
February 18, 2015 | Docket Event | E-FILING TRANSACTION NUMBER 3253051 REJECTED. |
|
June 11, 2014 | Docket Event | MINUTES FINALIZED FOR CHAMBERS WORK 06/11/2014 03:09:00 PM. |
|
June 11, 2014 | Docket Event | Notice of Settlement FILED BY AMES, DAVID ON 06/11/2014 |
|
June 11, 2014 | Docket Event | CLERK'S CERTIFICATE OF SERVICE BY MAIL OC GENERATED |
|
June 11, 2014 | Docket Event | ORDER TO SHOW CAUSE RE: DISMISSAL ON SETTLED CASE SCHEDULED FOR 02/19/2015 AT 01:30:00 PM IN C65 AT CENTRAL JUSTICE CENTER. | |
June 11, 2014 | Docket Event | CASE REASSIGNED TO Timothy Stafford EFFECTIVE 06/11/2014. | |
June 11, 2014 | Docket Event | THE ORDER TO SHOW CAUSE RE: DISMISSAL ON SETTLED CASE IS SCHEDULED FOR 02/19/2015 AT 01:30 PM IN DEPARTMENT C65. | |
June 11, 2014 | Docket Event | E-FILING TRANSACTION 4202536 RECEIVED ON 06/11/2014 10:53:46 AM. | |
May 05, 2014 | Docket Event | MANDATORY SETTLEMENT CONFERENCE REASSIGNED TO C06 AT CENTRAL JUSTICE CENTER ON 06/13/2014 AT 08:45:00 AM. | |
May 05, 2014 | Docket Event | JURY TRIAL REASSIGNED TO C06 AT CENTRAL JUSTICE CENTER ON 07/07/2014 AT 08:30:00 AM. | |
April 09, 2014 | Docket Event | CASE REASSIGNED TO MARY SCHULTE EFFECTIVE 05/05/2014. |
|
December 16, 2013 | Docket Event | JURY TRIAL REASSIGNED TO C06 AT CENTRAL JUSTICE CENTER ON 07/07/2014 AT 08:30:00 AM. | |
December 16, 2013 | Docket Event | MANDATORY SETTLEMENT CONFERENCE REASSIGNED TO C06 AT CENTRAL JUSTICE CENTER ON 06/13/2014 AT 08:45:00 AM. | |
December 04, 2013 | Docket Event | CASE REASSIGNED TO LUIS RODRIGUEZ EFFECTIVE 12/16/2013. |
|
October 09, 2013 | Docket Event | PAYMENT RECEIVED BY FOR 195 - ANSWER OR OTHER 1ST PAPER, 195 - ANSWER OR OTHER 1ST PAPER IN THE AMOUNT OF 870.00, TRANSACTION NUMBER 11475952 AND RECEIPT NUMBER 11299864. |
|
October 09, 2013 | Docket Event | E-FILING TRANSACTION 488421 RECEIVED ON 10/08/2013 10:15:03 AM. | |
October 08, 2013 | Docket Event | Answer to Complaint FILED BY CHUNG, CRAIG; CHADENY ENTERPRISES, INC. ON 10/08/2013 |
|
October 01, 2013 | Docket Event | MANDATORY SETTLEMENT CONFERENCE SCHEDULED FOR 06/13/2014 AT 08:45:00 AM IN C13 AT CENTRAL JUSTICE CENTER. | |
October 01, 2013 | Docket Event | MINUTES FINALIZED FOR CASE MANAGEMENT CONFERENCE 10/01/2013 08:30:00 AM. |
|
October 01, 2013 | Docket Event | THE JURY TRIAL IS SCHEDULED FOR 07/07/2014 AT 08:30 AM IN DEPARTMENT C13. | |
October 01, 2013 | Docket Event | THE MANDATORY SETTLEMENT CONFERENCE IS SCHEDULED FOR 06/13/2014 AT 08:45 AM IN DEPARTMENT C13. | |
October 01, 2013 | Docket Event | JURY TRIAL SCHEDULED FOR 07/07/2014 AT 08:30:00 AM IN C13 AT CENTRAL JUSTICE CENTER. | |
September 25, 2013 | Docket Event | CASE MANAGEMENT STATEMENT FILED BY CHUNG, CRAIG; CHADENY ENTERPRISES, INC. ON 09/25/2013 |
|
September 25, 2013 | Docket Event | E-FILING TRANSACTION 1114233 RECEIVED ON 09/25/2013 10:12:27 AM. | |
September 20, 2013 | Docket Event | E-FILING TRANSACTION 362667 RECEIVED ON 09/20/2013 02:49:50 PM. | |
September 20, 2013 | Docket Event | CASE MANAGEMENT STATEMENT FILED BY AMES, DAVID ON 09/20/2013 |
|
August 02, 2013 | Docket Event |
CASE MANAGEMENT CONFERENCE SCHEDULED FOR 10/01/2013 AT 08:30:00 AM IN C13 AT CENTRAL JUSTICE CENTER.
Judge: Gregory Munoz |
|
August 01, 2013 | Docket Event | E-FILING TRANSACTION 344791 RECEIVED ON 08/01/2013 11:17:13 AM. | |
August 01, 2013 | Docket Event | NOTICE - OTHER FILED BY AMES, DAVID ON 08/01/2013 |
|
July 26, 2013 | Docket Event | CASE REASSIGNED TO Gregory Munoz EFFECTIVE 07/26/2013. | |
July 26, 2013 | Docket Event | CLERK'S CERTIFICATE OF SERVICE BY MAIL OC GENERATED |
|
July 26, 2013 | Docket Event | MINUTES FINALIZED FOR CHAMBERS WORK 07/26/2013 02:46:00 PM. |
|
May 16, 2013 | Docket Event | ORDER GRANTING (REMANDING BACK TO ORANGE SUPERIOR COURT) FILED BY AMES, DAVID ON 05/16/2013 |
|
February 21, 2013 | Docket Event | E-FILING TRANSACTION 155774 RECEIVED ON 02/19/2013 03:53:32 PM. | |
February 19, 2013 | Docket Event | NOTICE - OTHER (OF MINUTE ORDER) FILED BY CHUNG, CRAIG; CHADENY ENTERPRISES, INC. ON 02/19/2013 |
|
February 11, 2013 | Docket Event | CASE REASSIGNED TO OMNI EFFECTIVE 02/11/2013. | |
February 11, 2013 | Docket Event | CERTIFICATE OF SERVICE BY MAIL |
|
February 11, 2013 | Docket Event | E-FILING TRANSACTION 151408 RECEIVED ON 02/08/2013 12:04:28 PM. | |
February 11, 2013 | Docket Event | MINUTES FINALIZED FOR CHAMBERS WORK 02/11/2013 04:03:00 PM. |
|
February 08, 2013 | Docket Event | Notice of Removal TO FEDERAL COURT FILED BY CHUNG, CRAIG; CHADENY ENTERPRISES, INC. ON 02/08/2013 |
|
February 08, 2013 | Docket Event | NOTICE OF STAY OF PROCEEDINGS - CASE FILED BY CHUNG, CRAIG; CHADENY ENTERPRISES, INC. ON 02/08/2013 |
|
December 26, 2012 | Docket Event |
CASE MANAGEMENT CONFERENCE SCHEDULED FOR 05/01/2013 AT 08:30:00 AM IN C13 AT CENTRAL JUSTICE CENTER.
Judge: Gregory Munoz |
|
December 18, 2012 | Docket Event | AMES, DAVID Request to Waive Court Fees GRANTED IN WHOLE ON 12/18/2012. |
|
December 14, 2012 | Docket Event | Request to Waive Court Fees FILED BY AMES, DAVID ON 12/14/2012 | |
December 14, 2012 | Docket Event | CASE REASSIGNED TO Gregory Munoz EFFECTIVE 12/14/2012. | |
December 14, 2012 | Docket Event | CASE ASSIGNED TO JUDICIAL OFFICER MYERS, JANE ON 12/14/2012. |
|
December 14, 2012 | Docket Event | Summons ISSUED AND FILED FILED BY AMES, DAVID ON 12/14/2012 |
|
December 14, 2012 | Docket Event | Civil Case Cover Sheet FILED BY AMES, DAVID ON 12/14/2012 |
|
December 14, 2012 | Docket Event | COMPLAINT FILED BY AMES, DAVID ON 12/14/2012 |
|