Case Last Refreshed: 1 year ago
Cach, Llc, filed a(n) Collections - Creditor case against Paulette Kessler, in the jurisdiction of Orange County. This case was filed in Orange County Superior Courts .
Case Number |
|
Filing DateJanuary 18, 2013 |
CategoryRule 3.740 Collections |
Last RefreshedMay 04, 2023 |
Practice AreaCreditor |
Filing LocationOrange County, CA |
Matter TypeCollections |
WRIT OF EXECUTION RETURNED - UNSATISFIED FILED BY CACH, LLC ON 01/26/2017
Date: January 26, 2017WRIT OF EXECUTION RETURNED - UNSATISFIED FILED BY CACH, LLC ON 03/10/2014
Date: March 10, 2014PROOF OF SERVICE OF 30-DAY SUMMONS & COMPLAINT - SUBSTITUTE FILED BY CACH, LLC ON 02/28/2013
Date: 2013-02-28T00:00:00CIVIL CASE COVER SHEET FILED BY CACH, LLC ON 12/05/2012
Date: 2012-12-05T00:00:00NOTICE OF CHANGE OF ADDRESS AND/OR TELEPHONE FILED BY CACH, LLC ON 02/09/2015
Date: February 09, 2015DECLARATION - OTHER FILED BY CACH, LLC ON 10/01/2013
Date: 2013-10-01T00:00:00WRIT (ISSUED 11/18/2013) RECEIVED ON 11/13/2013.
Date: 2013-11-13T00:00:00COMPLAINT (B&P 6322.1) FILED BY CACH, LLC ON 12/05/2012
Date: 2012-12-05T00:00:00DECLARATION - OTHER (OF VENUE) FILED BY CACH, LLC ON 12/05/2012
Date: 2012-12-05T00:00:00REQUEST FOR ENTRY OF DEFAULT FILED BY CACH, LLC ON 10/01/2013
Date: 2013-10-01T00:00:00WRIT (ISSUED ON 09/16/2014) RECEIVED ON 09/09/2014.
Date: September 09, 2014DECLARATION - OTHER (OF REDUCED FILING FEES B&P 6322.1) FILED BY CACH, LLC ON 12/05/2012
Date: 2012-12-05T00:00:00ACKNOWLEDGMENT OF FULL SATISFACTION OF JUDGMENT FILED BY CACH, LLC ON 10/28/2015
Date: October 28, 2015JUDGMENT (FILED AND ENTERED ON 10/2/13) RECEIVED ON 10/01/2013.
Date: 2013-10-01T00:00:00REQUEST FOR DISMISSAL OF DOES FILED BY CACH, LLC ON 10/01/2013
Date: 2013-10-01T00:00:00SUMMONS ISSUED AND FILED FILED BY CACH, LLC ON 12/05/2012
Date: 2012-12-05T00:00:00PROOF OF NON-SERVICE FILED BY CACH, LLC ON 01/18/2013
Date: 2013-01-18T00:00:00For full print and download access, please subscribe at https://www.trellis.law/.