Case Last Refreshed: 11 months ago
James S. Somsak, filed a(n) Unlawful Detainer - Property case against Stacy Miranda, David Miranda, in the jurisdiction of Orange County. This case was filed in Orange County Superior Courts with Craig E. Arthur presiding.
Case Number |
|
Filing DateMarch 11, 2014 |
CategoryUnlawful Detainer - Residential |
Last RefreshedMay 04, 2023 |
Practice AreaProperty |
Filing LocationOrange County, CA |
Matter TypeUnlawful Detainer |
COURT TRIAL SCHEDULED FOR 09/12/2012 AT 09:00:00 AM IN N18 AT NORTH JUSTICE CENTER.
Date: 2012-08-24T00:00:00NOTICE THAT YOU HAVE BEEN SUED OC GENERATED
Date: 2012-08-17T00:00:00PROOF OF SERVICE OF SUMMONS & COMPLAINT - UNNAMED OCCUPANTS FILED BY SOMSAK, JAMES S. ON 08/28/2012
Date: 2012-08-28T00:00:00WRIT RECEIVED ON 04/02/2013.
Date: April 02, 2013WRIT OF EXECUTION RETURNED - UNSATISFIED FILED BY SOMSAK, JAMES S. ON 09/09/2014
Date: September 09, 2014JUDGMENT - UNLAWFUL DETAINER FILED BY SOMSAK, JAMES S. ON 09/12/2012
Date: 2012-09-12T00:00:00APPLICATION FOR WRIT OF POSSESSION FILED BY SOMSAK, JAMES S. ON 09/12/2012
Date: 2012-09-12T00:00:00ANSWER TO COMPLAINT FILED BY MIRANDA, DAVID; MIRANDA, STACY ON 08/21/2012
Date: 2012-08-21T00:00:00WRIT (ISSUED 3/12/14) RECEIVED ON 03/11/2014.
Date: March 11, 2014COMPLAINT FILED BY SOMSAK, JAMES S. ON 08/17/2012
Date: 2012-08-17T00:00:00ORDER ON COURT FEE WAIVER (SUPERIOR COURT) FILED BY THE SUPERIOR COURT OF ORANGE ON 08/21/2012
Date: 2012-08-21T00:00:00WRIT OF POSSESSION RETURNED - WHOLLY SATISFIED FILED BY SOMSAK, JAMES S. ON 10/02/2012
Date: 2012-10-02T00:00:00PROOF OF SERVICE BY MAIL FILED BY MIRANDA, DAVID; MIRANDA, STACY ON 08/30/2012
Date: 2012-08-30T00:00:00MINUTES FINALIZED FOR COURT TRIAL 09/12/2012 09:00:00 AM.
Date: 2012-09-12T00:00:00SUMMONS ISSUED AND FILED FILED BY SOMSAK, JAMES S. ON 08/17/2012
Date: 2012-08-17T00:00:00CIVIL CASE COVER SHEET FILED BY SOMSAK, JAMES S. ON 08/17/2012
Date: 2012-08-17T00:00:00ASSOCIATION OF ATTORNEY FILED BY SOMSAK, JAMES S. ON 11/13/2012
Date: 2012-11-13T00:00:00For full print and download access, please subscribe at https://www.trellis.law/.