Case Last Refreshed: 5 years ago
Kenji Haruki, filed a(n) Civil case against Etsuko Yamamura, Restaurant Funashin, Inc., in the jurisdiction of Orange County. This case was filed in Orange County Superior Courts .
Case Number |
|
Filing DateJuly 15, 2011 |
CategoryCivil |
Last RefreshedDecember 19, 2018 |
|
Filing LocationOrange County, CA |
|
Date | Type | Description | |
---|---|---|---|
October 24, 2011 | Action | Notice of entry of dismissal and proof of service filed by yamamura, etsuko on 10/24/2011 | |
October 05, 2011 | Action | Request for dismissal with prejudice - entire action filed by haruki, kenji on 10/05/2011 | |
October 05, 2011 | Action | Complaint disposed with disposition of request for dismissal. | |
October 05, 2011 | Action | Case dismissed with disposition of request for dismissal | |
September 30, 2011 | Action | Notice - other (of settlement) filed by haruki, kenji on 09/30/2011 | |
September 14, 2011 | Action | Case management conference scheduled for 11/02/2011 at 08:30:00 am in c23 at central justice center. | |
September 01, 2011 | Action | Answer to complaint filed by yamamura, etsuko; restaurant funashin, inc. on 09/01/2011 | |
September 01, 2011 | Action | Payment received by for 167 - answer or other 1st paper, 167 - answer or other 1st paper in the amount of 790.00, transaction number 10984512 and receipt number 10808404. | |
July 15, 2011 | Action | Complaint filed by haruki, kenji on 07/15/2011 | |
July 15, 2011 | Action | Summons issued and filed filed by haruki, kenji on 07/15/2011 |
For full print and download access, please subscribe at https://www.trellis.law/.