1152 North West Homeowners Association A Nonprofit Mutual Benefit Corporation,
filed a(n)
Breach of Contract -
Commercial
case
against
Lilia Baena,
Jose Manuel Baena,
in the jurisdiction of Orange County.
This case was filed in
Orange County
Superior Courts
with Craig E. Arthur presiding.
Case Details for
1152 North West Homeowners Association A Nonprofit Mutual Benefit Corporation v. Lilia Baena
, et al.
Case Events for
1152 North West Homeowners Association A Nonprofit Mutual Benefit Corporation v. Lilia Baena
, et al.
Date
Type
Description
October 06, 2014
Docket Event
E-FILING TRANSACTION 3197413 RECEIVED ON 10/02/2014 01:25:20 PM.
October 02, 2014
Docket Event
CASE DISMISSED WITH DISPOSITION OF REQUEST FOR DISMISSAL
October 02, 2014
Docket Event
COMPLAINT DISPOSED WITH DISPOSITION OF REQUEST FOR DISMISSAL.
October 02, 2014
Docket Event
REQUEST FOR DISMISSAL WITHOUT PREJUDICE - ENTIRE ACTION FILED BY 1152 NORTH WEST HOMEOWNERS ASSOCIATION A NONPROFIT MUTUAL BENEFIT CORPORATION ON 10/02/2014
June 15, 2013
Docket Event
NOTICE OF CASE TRANSFER FROM NORTH JUSTICE CENTER TO CENTRAL JUSTICE CENTER, EFFECTIVE 07/01/2013.
November 23, 2010
Docket Event
ORDER TO SHOW CAUSE RE: DISMISSAL ON SETTLED CASE SCHEDULED FOR 06/16/2015 AT 01:30:00 PM IN N18 AT NORTH JUSTICE CENTER.
Judge: Frederick P. Aguirre
November 23, 2010
Docket Event
REJECTION NOTICE RETURNED THROUGH ABC LEGAL
November 22, 2010
Docket Event
NOTICE OF SETTLEMENT FILED BY 1152 NORTH WEST HOMEOWNERS ASSOCIATION A NONPROFIT MUTUAL BENEFIT CORPORATION ON 11/22/2010
November 01, 2010
Docket Event
NOTICE OF SETTLEMENT SUBMITTED BY 1152 NORTH WEST HOMEOWNERS ASSOCIATION A NONPROFIT MUTUAL BENEFIT CORPORATION REJECTED ON 11/01/2010.
September 13, 2010
Docket Event
PROOF OF SERVICE OF 30-DAY SUMMONS & COMPLAINT - SUBSTITUTE FILED BY 1152 NORTH WEST HOMEOWNERS ASSOCIATION A NONPROFIT MUTUAL BENEFIT CORPORATION ON 09/13/2010