We are checking for the latest updates in this case. We will email you when the process is complete.
Case Last Refreshed: 11 months ago
Lake Grove Condominium Association, A California Non-Profit Mutual Benefit Corporation ,
filed a(n)
Collections -
Creditor
case
against
Marcos Perez ,
in the jurisdiction of Orange County.
This case was filed in
Orange County
Superior Courts
with John S. Adams presiding.
Filing Date
July 15, 2010
Category
Rule 3.740 Collections
Last Refreshed
May 04, 2023
Time to Dismissal Following Dispositive Motions
404 days
Filing Location
Orange County, CA
Plaintiffs
Lake Grove Condominium Association, A California Non-Profit Mutual Benefit Corporation
Case Events for
Lake Grove Condominium Association, A California Non-Profit Mutual Benefit Corporation v. Marcos Perez
Date
Type
Description
September 29, 2012
Docket Event
TRANSFER OF WEST JUSTICE CENTER CASE TO CENTRAL JUSTICE CENTER - ADMIN ORDER 12/7, EFFECTIVE 10/01/2012.
August 26, 2011
Docket Event
CLERK'S CERTIFICATE OF SERVICE BY MAIL (OUT OF PROCESS) GENERATED
Get Document
August 24, 2011
Docket Event
MINUTES FINALIZED FOR ORDER TO SHOW CAUSE RE: MONETARY SANCTIONS 08/23/2011 01:30:00 PM.
Get Document
August 23, 2011
Docket Event
COURT ORDERS THE ENTIRE ACTION DISMISSED WITHOUT PREJUDICE.
August 23, 2011
Docket Event
CASE DISMISSED WITH DISPOSITION OF DISMISSED
August 23, 2011
Docket Event
COMPLAINT DISPOSED WITH DISPOSITION OF DISMISSED.
July 15, 2011
Docket Event
ORDER TO SHOW CAUSE RE: MONETARY SANCTIONS SCHEDULED FOR 08/23/2011 AT 01:30:00 PM IN W01 AT WEST JUSTICE CENTER.
Judge: Thomas J. Rees
Get Document
July 15, 2010
Docket Event
PAYMENT RECEIVED BY FOR 137 - COMPLAINT OR OTHER 1ST PAPER <=$10K IN THE AMOUNT OF 205.00, TRANSACTION NUMBER AND RECEIPT NUMBER 10507341.
Get Document
July 15, 2010
Docket Event
SUMMONS ISSUED AND FILED FILED BY LAKE GROVE CONDOMINIUM ASSOCIATION, A CALIFORNIA NON-PROFIT MUTUAL BENEFIT CORPORATION ON 07/15/2010
Get Document
July 15, 2010
Docket Event
CIVIL CASE COVER SHEET FILED BY LAKE GROVE CONDOMINIUM ASSOCIATION, A CALIFORNIA NON-PROFIT MUTUAL BENEFIT CORPORATION ON 07/15/2010
Get Document
See all events
For full print and download access, please subscribe at https://www.trellis.law/.