We are checking for the latest updates in this case. We will email you when the process is complete.
Case Last Refreshed: 11 months ago
American Express Bank, Fsb ,
filed a(n)
Collections -
Creditor
case
against
James Lam ,
in the jurisdiction of Orange County.
This case was filed in
Orange County
Superior Courts
with John S. Adams presiding.
Filing Date
July 08, 2010
Category
Rule 3.740 Collections
Last Refreshed
May 04, 2023
Filing Location
Orange County, CA
Plaintiffs
American Express Bank, Fsb
Case Events for
American Express Bank, Fsb v. James Lam
Date
Type
Description
September 29, 2012
Docket Event
TRANSFER OF WEST JUSTICE CENTER CASE TO CENTRAL JUSTICE CENTER - ADMIN ORDER 12/7, EFFECTIVE 10/01/2012.
July 28, 2011
Docket Event
REQUEST FOR DISMISSAL WITHOUT PREJUDICE - ENTIRE ACTION FILED BY AMERICAN EXPRESS BANK, FSB ON 07/28/2011
Get Document
July 15, 2011
Docket Event
ORDER TO SHOW CAUSE RE: MONETARY SANCTIONS SCHEDULED FOR 08/18/2011 AT 01:30:00 PM IN W01 AT WEST JUSTICE CENTER.
Judge: Thomas J. Rees
Get Document
July 20, 2010
Docket Event
PROOF OF SERVICE OF 30-DAY SUMMONS & COMPLAINT - PERSONAL FILED BY AMERICAN EXPRESS BANK, FSB ON 07/20/2010
Get Document
July 08, 2010
Docket Event
PAYMENT RECEIVED BY FOR 135 - COMPLAINT OR OTHER 1ST PAPER >$10K<=$25K IN THE AMOUNT OF 330.00, TRANSACTION NUMBER AND RECEIPT NUMBER 10502378.
Get Document
July 08, 2010
Docket Event
SUMMONS ISSUED AND FILED FILED BY AMERICAN EXPRESS BANK, FSB ON 07/08/2010
Get Document
July 08, 2010
Docket Event
CIVIL CASE COVER SHEET FILED BY AMERICAN EXPRESS BANK, FSB ON 07/08/2010
Get Document
July 08, 2010
Docket Event
COMPLAINT FILED BY AMERICAN EXPRESS BANK, FSB ON 07/08/2010
Get Document
See all events
For full print and download access, please subscribe at https://www.trellis.law/.