Case Last Refreshed: 11 months ago
Lori Rivas, filed a(n) Landlord-Tenant - Property case against Guillermina Cruz, in the jurisdiction of Orange County. This case was filed in Orange County Superior Courts with Roger B. Robbins presiding.
Case Number |
||
Filing DateFebruary 16, 2010 |
CategoryWrongful Eviction |
|
Last RefreshedMay 04, 2023 |
Practice AreaProperty |
Time to Dismissal Following Dispositive Motions244 days |
Filing LocationOrange County, CA |
Matter TypeLandlord-Tenant |
|
Case Cycle Time1230 days |
JURY TRIAL SCHEDULED FOR 10/04/2010 AT 09:00:00 AM IN N18 AT NORTH JUSTICE CENTER.
Date: 2010-08-19T00:00:00CASE MANAGEMENT CONFERENCE SCHEDULED FOR 08/24/2010 AT 01:30:00 PM IN N18 AT NORTH JUSTICE CENTER.
Date: 2010-07-14T00:00:00DEMURRER TO AMENDED COMPLAINT FILED BY CRUZ, GUILLERMINA ON 04/19/2010
Date: 2010-04-19T00:00:00DEMURRER TO COMPLAINT FILED BY CRUZ, GUILLERMINA ON 03/16/2010
Date: 2010-03-16T00:00:00CIVIL CASE COVER SHEET FILED BY RIVAS, LORI ON 02/16/2010
Date: 2010-02-16T00:00:00MOTION TO STRIKE (COMPLAINT) FILED BY CRUZ, GUILLERMINA ON 03/16/2010
Date: 2010-03-16T00:00:00NOTICE OF RULING FILED BY CRUZ, GUILLERMINA ON 09/20/2010
Date: 2010-09-20T00:00:00MINUTES FINALIZED FOR DEMURRER TO COMPLAINT 04/29/2010 02:00:00 PM.
Date: 2010-04-29T00:00:00MINUTES FINALIZED FOR MANDATORY SETTLEMENT CONFERENCE 09/17/2010 09:00:00 AM.
Date: 2010-09-17T00:00:00RESPONSE (TO POINTS & AUTHORITIES) FILED BY RIVAS, LORI ON 10/13/2010
Date: October 13, 2010ANSWER TO AMENDED COMPLAINT FILED BY CRUZ, GUILLERMINA ON 06/04/2010
Date: 2010-06-04T00:00:00RESPONSE FILED BY RIVAS, LORI ON 05/12/2010
Date: 2010-05-12T00:00:00ORDER ON COURT FEE WAIVER (SUPERIOR COURT) (ADDITIONAL FEES) FILED BY CRUZ, GUILLERMINA ON 09/08/2010
Date: 2010-09-08T00:00:00MINUTES FINALIZED FOR ORDER TO SHOW CAUSE RE: MONETARY SANCTIONS 10/04/2010 09:00:00 AM.
Date: 2010-10-05T00:00:00SUMMONS ISSUED AND FILED FILED BY RIVAS, LORI ON 02/16/2010
Date: 2010-02-16T00:00:00MINUTES FINALIZED FOR CHAMBERS WORK 09/08/2010 11:12:00 AM.
Date: 2010-09-09T00:00:00POINTS AND AUTHORITIES (SUPPLEMENTAL OPPOSING MOTION) FILED BY RIVAS, LORI ON 10/13/2010
Date: 2010-10-13T00:00:00MINUTES FINALIZED FOR ORDER TO SHOW CAUSE RE: MONETARY SANCTIONS 10/18/2010 10:33:00 AM.
Date: October 18, 2010MINUTES FINALIZED FOR MOTION FOR RECONSIDERATION 07/15/2010 01:30:00 PM.
Date: 2010-07-16T00:00:00MINUTES FINALIZED FOR COURT TRIAL 10/04/2010 09:00:00 AM.
Date: 2010-10-05T00:00:00DECLARATION - OTHER (IN RESPONSE TO DECLARATION OF STEVEN AFGHANI) FILED BY RIVAS, LORI ON 05/26/2010
Date: 2010-05-26T00:00:00PROOF OF PERSONAL SERVICE FILED BY RIVAS, LORI ON 06/08/2010
Date: 2010-06-08T00:00:00COMPLAINT FILED BY RIVAS, LORI ON 02/16/2010
Date: 2010-02-16T00:00:00ORDER ON APPLICATION FOR WAIVER OF COURT FEES AND COSTS FILED BY CRUZ, GUILLERMINA ON 06/04/2010
Date: 2010-06-04T00:00:00MINUTES FINALIZED FOR CHAMBERS WORK 09/08/2010 04:48:00 PM.
Date: 2010-09-08T00:00:00AT ISSUE MEMORANDUM FILED BY CRUZ, GUILLERMINA ON 08/04/2010
Date: 2010-08-04T00:00:00MINUTES FINALIZED FOR CHAMBERS WORK 08/23/2010 03:18:00 PM.
Date: 2010-08-23T00:00:00OPPOSITION FILED BY CRUZ, GUILLERMINA ON 09/23/2010
Date: 2010-09-23T00:00:00AT ISSUE MEMORANDUM SUBMITTED BY RIVAS, LORI REJECTED ON 05/17/2010.
Date: 2010-05-17T00:00:00NOTICE - OTHER (OF POSTING JURY FEES) FILED BY CRUZ, GUILLERMINA ON 09/08/2010
Date: 2010-09-08T00:00:00MINUTES FINALIZED FOR ORDER TO SHOW CAUSE RE: MONETARY SANCTIONS 10/04/2010 09:00:00 AM.
Date: 2010-10-04T00:00:00DECLARATION - OTHER (IN RESPONSE TO MOTION) FILED BY CRUZ, GUILLERMINA ON 05/20/2010
Date: 2010-05-20T00:00:00CLERKS CERTIFICATE OF MAILING
Date: 2010-08-24T00:00:00AMENDED COMPLAINT (FIRST) FILED BY RIVAS, LORI ON 04/15/2010
Date: 2010-04-15T00:00:00MINUTES FINALIZED FOR MOTION TO COMPEL ANSWERS TO SPECIAL INTERROGATORIES 05/27/2010 02:00:00 PM.
Date: 2010-05-28T00:00:00MINUTES FINALIZED FOR EX PARTE 09/23/2010 01:30:00 PM.
Date: 2010-09-23T00:00:00EX PARTE APPLICATION - OTHER (MOTION FOR SECOND AMENDED COMPLAINT) FILED BY RIVAS, LORI ON 09/23/2010
Date: 2010-09-23T00:00:00MOTION TO COMPEL ANSWERS TO INTERROGATORIES FILED BY RIVAS, LORI ON 05/04/2010
Date: 2010-05-04T00:00:00PROOF OF PERSONAL SERVICE FILED BY RIVAS, LORI ON 05/04/2010
Date: 2010-05-04T00:00:00NOTICE OF HEARING FILED BY THE SUPERIOR COURT OF ORANGE ON 07/14/2010
Date: 2010-07-14T00:00:00POINTS AND AUTHORITIES (SUPPLEMENTAL) FILED BY CRUZ, GUILLERMINA ON 10/12/2010
Date: 2010-10-12T00:00:00MOTION FOR RECONSIDERATION FILED BY RIVAS, LORI ON 06/08/2010
Date: 2010-06-08T00:00:00MINUTES FINALIZED FOR COURT TRIAL 10/13/2010 01:30:00 PM.
Date: 2010-10-13T00:00:00MINUTES FINALIZED FOR ORDER TO SHOW CAUSE RE: MONETARY SANCTIONS 10/13/2010 01:30:00 PM.
Date: 2010-10-13T00:00:00CLERK'S CERTIFICATE OF SERVICE BY MAIL (OUT OF PROCESS) GENERATED
Date: 2010-09-10T00:00:00NOTICE - OTHER (OF UNAVAILABILITY) FILED BY CRUZ, GUILLERMINA ON 09/22/2010
Date: 2010-09-22T00:00:00CLERK'S CERTIFICATE OF SERVICE BY MAIL (OUT OF PROCESS) GENERATED
Date: October 27, 2010DECLARATION - OTHER FILED BY CRUZ, GUILLERMINA ON 10/04/2010
Date: 2010-10-04T00:00:00MINUTES FINALIZED FOR UNDER SUBMISSION RULING 10/18/2010 09:59:00 AM.
Date: October 18, 2010For full print and download access, please subscribe at https://www.trellis.law/.