Case Last Refreshed: 1 year ago
Plantation Mobile Estates, Inc., filed a(n) Unlawful Detainer - Property case against Ana Teresa Beltran, Ana Maria Arredondo, in the jurisdiction of Orange County. This case was filed in Orange County Superior Courts with B. Tam Nomoto Schumann presiding.
Case Number |
||
Filing DateDecember 31, 2009 |
CategoryUnlawful Detainer - Residential |
|
Last RefreshedMay 04, 2023 |
Practice AreaProperty |
Time to Dismissal Following Dispositive Motions27 days |
Filing LocationOrange County, CA |
Matter TypeUnlawful Detainer |
|
Case Cycle Time27 days |
COURT TRIAL SCHEDULED FOR 01/27/2010 AT 09:00:00 AM IN N18 AT NORTH JUSTICE CENTER.
Date: January 13, 2010STIPULATION - OTHER FILED BY PLANTATION MOBILE ESTATES, INC. ON 01/27/2010
Date: January 27, 2010ORDER ON COURT FEE WAIVER (SUPERIOR COURT) FILED BY BELTRAN, ANA TERESA ON 01/06/2010
Date: January 06, 2010COMPLAINT FILED BY PLANTATION MOBILE ESTATES, INC. ON 12/31/2009
Date: 2009-12-31T00:00:00CIVIL CASE COVER SHEET FILED BY PLANTATION MOBILE ESTATES, INC. ON 12/31/2009
Date: 2009-12-31T00:00:00SUMMONS ISSUED AND FILED FILED BY PLANTATION MOBILE ESTATES, INC. ON 12/31/2009
Date: 2009-12-31T00:00:00CASE INITIATION FORM(S) HAVE BEEN GENERATED.
Date: 2009-12-31T00:00:00ORDER ON COURT FEE WAIVER (SUPERIOR COURT) FILED BY ARREDONDO, ANA MARIA ON 01/06/2010
Date: 2010-01-06T00:00:00MINUTES FINALIZED FOR COURT TRIAL 01/27/2010 09:00:00 AM.
Date: January 27, 2010ANSWER TO COMPLAINT FILED BY ARREDONDO, ANA MARIA; BELTRAN, ANA TERESA ON 01/06/2010
Date: 2010-01-06T00:00:00For full print and download access, please subscribe at https://www.trellis.law/.