Case Last Refreshed: 1 year ago
The Irvine Company, filed a(n) Breach of Contract - Commercial case against Martha Ghaznavi, Hormoz Ghaznavi, in the jurisdiction of Orange County. This case was filed in Orange County Superior Courts with Jane D. Myers presiding.
Case Number |
||
Filing DateDecember 09, 2009 |
CategoryBreach Of Contract/Warranty |
|
Last RefreshedMay 04, 2023 |
Practice AreaCommercial |
Time to Dismissal Following Dispositive Motions393 days |
Filing LocationOrange County, CA |
Matter TypeBreach of Contract |
|
Case Cycle Time485 days |
CASE MANAGEMENT CONFERENCE SCHEDULED FOR 06/03/2010 AT 08:30:00 AM IN C23 AT CENTRAL JUSTICE CENTER.
Date: 2010-04-12T00:00:00SUMMONS ISSUED AND FILED FILED BY THE IRVINE COMPANY ON 12/09/2009
Date: 2009-12-09T00:00:00NOTICE OF CONTINUANCE FILED BY THE IRVINE COMPANY ON 10/08/2010
Date: 2010-10-08T00:00:00CIVIL CASE COVER SHEET FILED BY THE IRVINE COMPANY ON 12/09/2009
Date: 2009-12-09T00:00:00NOTICE OF CONTINUANCE (CASE MANAGEMENT CONFERENCE) FILED BY THE IRVINE COMPANY ON 11/05/2010
Date: 2010-11-05T00:00:00PROOF OF SERVICE OF SUMMONS (ON FIRST AMENDED COMPLAINT) FILED BY THE IRVINE COMPANY ON 08/25/2010
Date: 2010-08-25T00:00:00MEMORANDUM FOR SETTING FOR HEARING FILED BY THE IRVINE COMPANY ON 12/14/2010
Date: 2010-12-14T00:00:00SUMMONS ISSUED AND FILED (FIRST AMENDED COMPLAINT) FILED BY THE IRVINE COMPANY ON 07/01/2010
Date: 2010-07-01T00:00:00REQUEST FOR ENTRY OF DEFAULT FILED BY THE IRVINE COMPANY ON 06/14/2010
Date: 2010-06-14T00:00:00PROOF OF SERVICE OF SUMMONS FILED BY THE IRVINE COMPANY ON 02/04/2010
Date: 2010-02-04T00:00:00NOTICE OF CONTINUANCE (AMENDED NOTICE) FILED BY THE IRVINE COMPANY ON 10/25/2010
Date: 2010-10-25T00:00:00CASE MANAGEMENT STATEMENT FILED BY THE IRVINE COMPANY ON 05/24/2010
Date: 2010-05-24T00:00:00REQUEST FOR ENTRY OF DEFAULT SUBMITTED BY THE IRVINE COMPANY REJECTED ON 05/25/2010.
Date: 2010-05-25T00:00:00COMPLAINT FILED BY THE IRVINE COMPANY ON 12/09/2009
Date: 2009-12-09T00:00:00MINUTES FINALIZED FOR CASE MANAGEMENT CONFERENCE 11/01/2010 08:30:00 AM.
Date: 2010-11-01T00:00:00CASE ASSIGNED TO JUDICIAL OFFICER MOSS, ROBERT ON 12/09/2009.
Date: 2009-12-09T00:00:00MINUTES FINALIZED FOR CASE MANAGEMENT CONFERENCE 06/03/2010 08:30:00 AM.
Date: 2010-06-03T00:00:00AMENDED COMPLAINT (FIRST) FILED BY THE IRVINE COMPANY ON 07/01/2010
Date: 2010-07-01T00:00:00MINUTES FINALIZED FOR CASE MANAGEMENT CONFERENCE 09/27/2010 08:30:00 AM.
Date: 2010-09-27T00:00:00REQUEST FOR ENTRY OF DEFAULT FILED BY THE IRVINE COMPANY ON 11/03/2010
Date: 2010-11-03T00:00:00MINUTES FINALIZED FOR CASE MANAGEMENT CONFERENCE 08/09/2010 08:30:00 AM.
Date: 2010-08-09T00:00:00REQUEST FOR ENTRY OF DEFAULT (JUDGMENT PACKET) FILED BY THE IRVINE COMPANY ON 12/23/2010
Date: 2010-12-23T00:00:00NOTICE OF CONTINUANCE (CMC) FILED BY THE IRVINE COMPANY ON 08/16/2010
Date: 2010-08-16T00:00:00JUDGMENT FILED BY THE IRVINE COMPANY ON 01/06/2011
Date: 2011-01-06T00:00:00REQUEST FOR DISMISSAL OF DOES FILED BY THE IRVINE COMPANY ON 12/23/2010
Date: 2010-12-23T00:00:00DECLARATION - OTHER (SUMMARY OF CASE) FILED BY THE IRVINE COMPANY ON 12/23/2010
Date: 2010-12-23T00:00:00MINUTES FINALIZED FOR MULTIPLE EVENTS 04/07/2011 09:00:00 AM.
Date: April 08, 2011DECLARATION - OTHER (RE: LEASE AGREEMENT) FILED BY THE IRVINE COMPANY ON 12/23/2010
Date: 2010-12-23T00:00:00DECLARATION - OTHER FILED BY THE IRVINE COMPANY ON 12/23/2010
Date: 2010-12-23T00:00:00NOTICE OF CONTINUANCE FILED BY THE IRVINE COMPANY ON 01/14/2011
Date: January 14, 2011MINUTES FINALIZED FOR MULTIPLE EVENTS 01/10/2011 08:30:00 AM.
Date: 2011-01-10T00:00:00For full print and download access, please subscribe at https://www.trellis.law/.