Case Last Refreshed: 1 year ago
Fia Card Services N.A., filed a(n) Collections - Creditor case against Jerome Newman, in the jurisdiction of Orange County. This case was filed in Orange County Superior Courts .
Case Number |
|
Filing DateMarch 31, 2011 |
CategoryRule 3.740 Collections |
Last RefreshedMay 04, 2023 |
Practice AreaCreditor |
Filing LocationOrange County, CA |
Matter TypeCollections |
PROOF OF SERVICE OF SUMMONS FILED BY FIA CARD SERVICES N.A. ON 09/10/2009
Date: 2009-09-10T00:00:00AFFIDAVIT - OTHER (VENUE) FILED BY FIA CARD SERVICES N.A. ON 08/31/2009
Date: 2009-08-31T00:00:00COMPLAINT (VENUE) FILED BY FIA CARD SERVICES N.A. ON 08/31/2009
Date: 2009-08-31T00:00:00SUMMONS ISSUED AND FILED FILED BY FIA CARD SERVICES N.A. ON 08/31/2009
Date: 2009-08-31T00:00:00CIVIL CASE COVER SHEET FILED BY FIA CARD SERVICES N.A. ON 08/31/2009
Date: 2009-08-31T00:00:00REQUEST FOR ENTRY OF DEFAULT FILED BY FIA CARD SERVICES N.A. ON 12/14/2010
Date: 2010-12-14T00:00:00NOTICE OF TRANSFER TO HARBOR JUSTICE CENTER - LAGUNA HILLS, EFFECTIVE 04/01/2010.
Date: 2010-05-11T00:00:00JUDGMENT FILED BY FIA CARD SERVICES N.A. ON 12/15/2010
Date: 2010-12-15T00:00:00SUBSTITUTION OF ATTORNEY FILED BY FIA CARD SERVICES N.A. ON 11/24/2015
Date: November 24, 2015PROOF OF SERVICE BY MAIL FILED BY FIA CARD SERVICES N.A. ON 08/21/2020
Date: August 21, 2020NOTICE OF RENEWAL OF JUDGMENT (ISSUED ON 08/10/2020) RECEIVED ON 07/31/2020.
Date: July 31, 2020DECLARATION IN SUPPORT (NON-MILITARY STATUS) FILED BY FIA CARD SERVICES N.A. ON 11/24/2015
Date: 2015-11-24T00:00:00For full print and download access, please subscribe at https://www.trellis.law/.