Case Last Refreshed: 11 months ago
Target National Bank, filed a(n) Collections - Creditor case against Francisco J Guzman, in the jurisdiction of Orange County. This case was filed in Orange County Superior Courts with Craig E. Arthur presiding.
Case Number |
|
Filing DateFebruary 28, 2014 |
CategoryRule 3.740 Collections |
Last RefreshedMay 04, 2023 |
Practice AreaCreditor |
Filing LocationOrange County, CA |
Matter TypeCollections |
WRIT OF EXECUTION RETURNED - UNSATISFIED FILED BY TARGET NATIONAL BANK ON 02/28/2014
Date: February 28, 2014NOTICE OF LODGING (OF EXHIBITS) FILED BY TARGET NATIONAL BANK ON 04/13/2010
Date: 2010-04-13T00:00:00SUMMONS ISSUED AND FILED FILED BY TARGET NATIONAL BANK ON 08/14/2009
Date: 2009-08-14T00:00:00PROOF OF SERVICE BY MAIL FILED BY TARGET NATIONAL BANK ON 04/13/2010
Date: 2010-04-13T00:00:00SEPARATE STATEMENT (OF UNDISPUTED FACTS) FILED BY TARGET NATIONAL BANK ON 04/13/2010
Date: 2010-04-13T00:00:00NOTICE - OTHER (OF NON-APPEARANCE) FILED BY TARGET NATIONAL BANK ON 04/13/2010
Date: 2010-04-13T00:00:00CIVIL CASE COVER SHEET FILED BY TARGET NATIONAL BANK ON 08/14/2009
Date: 2009-08-14T00:00:00COMPLAINT FILED BY TARGET NATIONAL BANK ON 08/14/2009
Date: 2009-08-14T00:00:00PROOF OF SERVICE BY MAIL FILED BY GUZMAN, FRANCISCO J ON 09/17/2009
Date: 2009-09-17T00:00:00PROOF OF SERVICE OF 30-DAY SUMMONS & COMPLAINT - SUBSTITUTE FILED BY TARGET NATIONAL BANK ON 10/22/2009
Date: 2009-10-22T00:00:00ORDER AFTER HEARING FILED BY THE SUPERIOR COURT OF ORANGE ON 07/22/2010
Date: July 22, 2010MOTION FOR SUMMARY JUDGMENT/ADJUDICATION FILED BY TARGET NATIONAL BANK ON 04/13/2010
Date: 2010-04-13T00:00:00GUZMAN, FRANCISCO J APPLICATION FOR WAIVER GRANTED IN WHOLE.
Date: 2009-09-17T00:00:00JUDGMENT FILED BY TARGET NATIONAL BANK ON 07/22/2010
Date: July 22, 2010ANSWER TO COMPLAINT FILED BY GUZMAN, FRANCISCO J ON 09/17/2009
Date: 2009-09-17T00:00:00MEMORANDUM OF POINTS AND AUTHORITIES FILED BY TARGET NATIONAL BANK ON 04/13/2010
Date: 2010-04-13T00:00:00CLERK'S CERTIFICATE OF SERVICE BY MAIL (OUT OF PROCESS) GENERATED
Date: July 27, 2010For full print and download access, please subscribe at https://www.trellis.law/.