Case Last Refreshed: 1 year ago
Hsbc Mortgage Services Inc, filed a(n) Unlawful Detainer - Property case against John A Kern, Laurie T Mccallum, in the jurisdiction of Orange County. This case was filed in Orange County Superior Courts .
Case Number |
||
Filing DateJune 15, 2009 |
CategoryUnlawful Detainer - Residential |
|
Last RefreshedMay 04, 2023 |
Practice AreaProperty |
Time to Dismissal Following Dispositive Motions36 days |
Filing LocationOrange County, CA |
Matter TypeUnlawful Detainer |
|
Case Cycle Time58 days |
REQUEST FOR ENTRY OF DEFAULT FILED BY HSBC MORTGAGE SERVICES INC ON 07/21/2009
Date: July 21, 2009JUDGMENT - UNLAWFUL DETAINER FILED BY HSBC MORTGAGE SERVICES INC ON 07/21/2009
Date: July 21, 2009COMPLAINT FILED BY HSBC MORTGAGE SERVICES INC ON 06/15/2009
Date: 2009-06-15T00:00:00PROOF OF SERVICE BY POSTING FILED BY HSBC MORTGAGE SERVICES INC ON 07/02/2009
Date: July 02, 2009CIVIL CASE COVER SHEET FILED BY HSBC MORTGAGE SERVICES INC ON 06/15/2009
Date: 2009-06-15T00:00:00DECLARATION - OTHER FILED BY HSBC MORTGAGE SERVICES INC ON 07/21/2009
Date: July 21, 2009SUMMONS ISSUED AND FILED FILED BY HSBC MORTGAGE SERVICES INC ON 06/15/2009
Date: 2009-06-15T00:00:00CASE INITIATION FORM(S) HAVE BEEN GENERATED.
Date: 2009-06-16T00:00:00For full print and download access, please subscribe at https://www.trellis.law/.