Case Last Refreshed: 11 months ago
Atlantic Credit And Finance Inc, filed a(n) Collections - Creditor case against Brian K. Hayes, in the jurisdiction of Orange County. This case was filed in Orange County Superior Courts with John S. Adams presiding.
Case Number |
|
Filing DateJanuary 14, 2013 |
CategoryRule 3.740 Collections |
Last RefreshedMay 04, 2023 |
Practice AreaCreditor |
Filing LocationOrange County, CA |
Matter TypeCollections |
DECLARATION - OTHER (RE: WAIVING INTEREST) FILED BY ATLANTIC CREDIT AND FINANCE INC ON 05/04/2009
Date: 2009-05-04T00:00:00SUMMONS ISSUED AND FILED FILED BY ATLANTIC CREDIT AND FINANCE INC ON 08/25/2008
Date: 2008-08-25T00:00:00DECLARATION - OTHER (RE: CCP 1033) FILED BY ATLANTIC CREDIT AND FINANCE INC ON 05/04/2009
Date: 2009-05-04T00:00:00REQUEST FOR ENTRY OF DEFAULT FILED BY ATLANTIC CREDIT AND FINANCE INC ON 05/04/2009
Date: 2009-05-04T00:00:00CIVIL CASE COVER SHEET FILED BY ATLANTIC CREDIT AND FINANCE INC ON 08/25/2008
Date: 2008-08-25T00:00:00DECLARATION - OTHER (RE: WAIVING ATTORNEY FEES) FILED BY ATLANTIC CREDIT AND FINANCE INC ON 05/04/2009
Date: 2009-05-04T00:00:00JUDGMENT FILED BY ATLANTIC CREDIT AND FINANCE INC ON 05/05/2009
Date: 2009-05-05T00:00:00COMPLAINT - COLLECTIONS 3.740 FILED BY ATLANTIC CREDIT AND FINANCE INC ON 08/25/2008
Date: 2008-08-25T00:00:00For full print and download access, please subscribe at https://www.trellis.law/.