Case Last Refreshed: 11 months ago
Lobel Financial Corp., A California Corporation, filed a(n) Breach of Contract - Commercial case against Francisco J Arroyo, Davore Gilford, in the jurisdiction of Orange County. This case was filed in Orange County Superior Courts .
Case Number |
||
Filing DateAugust 20, 2008 |
CategoryBreach Of Contract/Warranty |
|
Last RefreshedMay 04, 2023 |
Practice AreaCommercial |
Time to Dismissal Following Dispositive Motions110 days |
Filing LocationOrange County, CA |
Matter TypeBreach of Contract |
|
REQUEST FOR ENTRY OF DEFAULT FILED BY LOBEL FINANCIAL CORP., A CALIFORNIA CORPORATION ON 11/24/2008
Date: 2008-11-24T00:00:00REQUEST FOR DISMISSAL OF DOES FILED BY LOBEL FINANCIAL CORP., A CALIFORNIA CORPORATION ON 11/24/2008
Date: 2008-11-24T00:00:00E-FILING TRANSACTION NUMBER 1574032 REJECTED.
Date: January 24, 2019SUMMONS ISSUED AND FILED FILED BY LOBEL FINANCIAL CORP., A CALIFORNIA CORPORATION ON 08/20/2008
Date: 2008-08-20T00:00:00COMPLAINT FILED BY LOBEL FINANCIAL CORP., A CALIFORNIA CORPORATION ON 08/20/2008
Date: 2008-08-20T00:00:00WRIT (ISSUED ON 12/04/2013) RECEIVED ON 11/26/2013.
Date: 2013-11-26T00:00:00WRIT (ISSUED 8/22/16) RECEIVED ON 08/12/2016.
Date: August 12, 2016CIVIL CASE COVER SHEET FILED BY LOBEL FINANCIAL CORP., A CALIFORNIA CORPORATION ON 08/20/2008
Date: 2008-08-20T00:00:00JUDGMENT FILED BY LOBEL FINANCIAL CORP., A CALIFORNIA CORPORATION ON 12/11/2008
Date: 2008-12-11T00:00:00For full print and download access, please subscribe at https://www.trellis.law/.