Case Last Refreshed: 11 months ago
Discover Bank, Issuer Of The Discover Card, filed a(n) Collections - Creditor case against Cindy Giao Ton, in the jurisdiction of Orange County. This case was filed in Orange County Superior Courts with John S. Adams presiding.
Case Number |
|
Filing DateFebruary 02, 2011 |
CategoryRule 3.740 Collections |
Last RefreshedMay 04, 2023 |
Practice AreaCreditor |
Filing LocationOrange County, CA |
Matter TypeCollections |
SUBSTITUTION OF ATTORNEY FILED BY DISCOVER BANK, ISSUER OF THE DISCOVER CARD ON 02/18/2010
Date: February 18, 2010REQUEST FOR ENTRY OF DEFAULT FILED BY DISCOVER BANK, ISSUER OF THE DISCOVER CARD ON 07/28/2008
Date: 2008-07-28T00:00:00NOTICE OF CHANGE OF FIRM NAME FILED BY DISCOVER BANK, ISSUER OF THE DISCOVER CARD ON 07/28/2008
Date: 2008-07-28T00:00:00SUMMONS ISSUED AND FILED FILED BY DISCOVER BANK, ISSUER OF THE DISCOVER CARD ON 02/14/2008
Date: 2008-02-14T00:00:00JUDGMENT FILED BY DISCOVER BANK, ISSUER OF THE DISCOVER CARD ON 07/30/2008
Date: 2008-07-30T00:00:00COMPLAINT - COLLECTIONS 3.740 FILED BY DISCOVER BANK, ISSUER OF THE DISCOVER CARD ON 02/14/2008
Date: 2008-02-14T00:00:00CIVIL CASE COVER SHEET FILED BY DISCOVER BANK, ISSUER OF THE DISCOVER CARD ON 02/14/2008
Date: 2008-02-14T00:00:00WAIVER OF ALL ATTORNEY FEES
Date: 2008-07-28T00:00:00For full print and download access, please subscribe at https://www.trellis.law/.