Case Last Refreshed: 11 months ago
Pacific Premier Bank, Fsb, filed a(n) General Property - Property case against Silver Screen Entertainment Llc, in the jurisdiction of Orange County. This case was filed in Orange County Superior Courts .
Case Number |
|
Filing DateJanuary 02, 2008 |
CategoryOther Real Property |
Last RefreshedMay 04, 2023 |
Practice AreaProperty |
Filing LocationOrange County, CA |
Matter TypeGeneral Property |
DECLARATION IN SUPPORT (DECL. OF ROBERT C. WARREN, III) FILED BY PACIFIC PREMIER BANK, FSB ON 01/02/2008
Date: 2008-01-02T00:00:00REQUEST FOR DISMISSAL SUBMITTED BY PACIFIC PREMIER BANK, FSB REJECTED ON 01/18/2008.
Date: January 18, 2008REPLY - OTHER (TO NON OPPOSITION) FILED BY PACIFIC PREMIER BANK, FSB ON 01/18/2008
Date: January 18, 2008DECLARATION IN SUPPORT (DECL. OF GRETCHEN GRANT) FILED BY PACIFIC PREMIER BANK, FSB ON 01/02/2008
Date: 2008-01-02T00:00:00DECLARATION IN SUPPORT (DECL. OF TAMARA MADSEN) FILED BY PACIFIC PREMIER BANK, FSB ON 01/02/2008
Date: 2008-01-02T00:00:00REQUEST FOR JUDICIAL NOTICE FILED BY PACIFIC PREMIER BANK, FSB ON 01/02/2008
Date: 2008-01-02T00:00:00MINUTES FINALIZED FOR EX PARTE 01/03/2008 08:30:00 AM.
Date: January 08, 2008For full print and download access, please subscribe at https://www.trellis.law/.