Case Last Refreshed: 11 months ago
Lauren Prasad, filed a(n) Automobile - Torts case against Michelle Turchie, in the jurisdiction of Orange County. This case was filed in Orange County Superior Courts .
Case Number |
|
Filing DateJanuary 02, 2008 |
CategoryPi/Pd/Wd - Auto |
Last RefreshedMay 04, 2023 |
Practice AreaTorts |
Filing LocationOrange County, CA |
Matter TypeAutomobile |
REQUEST FOR DISMISSAL WITH PREJUDICE - ENTIRE ACTION FILED BY PRASAD, LAUREN ON 02/13/2008
Date: February 13, 2008DEMAND FOR JURY TRIAL FILED BY TURCHIE, MICHELLE ON 01/30/2008
Date: January 30, 2008NOTICE - OTHER (ACKNOWLEDGEMENT OF RECEIPT) FILED BY PRASAD, LAUREN ON 01/30/2008
Date: January 30, 2008PEMBROKE, JULIE APPOINTED AS GUARDIAN AD LITEM .
Date: January 02, 2008ANSWER TO COMPLAINT FILED BY TURCHIE, MICHELLE ON 01/30/2008
Date: January 30, 2008For full print and download access, please subscribe at https://www.trellis.law/.