Case Last Refreshed: 11 months ago
Ppc Anaheim Apartments, Llc, filed a(n) Unlawful Detainer - Property case against Adina Barr, in the jurisdiction of Orange County. This case was filed in Orange County Superior Courts .
Case Number |
|
Filing DateJanuary 02, 2008 |
CategoryUnlawful Detainer - Residential |
Last RefreshedMay 04, 2023 |
Practice AreaProperty |
Filing LocationOrange County, CA |
Matter TypeUnlawful Detainer |
NOTICE OF CHANGE OF ADDRESS AND/OR TELEPHONE FILED BY PPC ANAHEIM APARTMENTS, LLC ON 09/04/2008
Date: September 04, 2008ACKNOWLEDGMENT OF FULL SATISFACTION OF JUDGMENT FILED BY PPC ANAHEIM APARTMENTS, LLC ON 09/30/2009
Date: September 30, 2009APPLICATION FOR WRIT OF POSSESSION FILED BY PPC ANAHEIM APARTMENTS, LLC ON 01/28/2008
Date: 2008-01-28T00:00:00REQUEST FOR ENTRY OF DEFAULT FILED BY PPC ANAHEIM APARTMENTS, LLC ON 01/28/2008
Date: 2008-01-28T00:00:00WRIT OF POSSESSION - UNSATISFIED FILED BY PPC ANAHEIM APARTMENTS, LLC ON 02/06/2008
Date: 2008-02-06T00:00:00JUDGMENT FILED BY PPC ANAHEIM APARTMENTS, LLC ON 06/11/2008
Date: June 11, 2008REQUEST FOR ENTRY OF DEFAULT (PREVIOUSLY ENTERED) FILED BY PPC ANAHEIM APARTMENTS, LLC ON 05/23/2008
Date: 2008-05-23T00:00:00JUDGMENT/POSSESSION
Date: 2008-01-28T00:00:00REQUEST FOR DISMISSAL OF DOES FILED BY PPC ANAHEIM APARTMENTS, LLC ON 05/23/2008
Date: 2008-05-23T00:00:00CASE INITIATION FORM(S) HAVE BEEN GENERATED.
Date: 2008-01-02T00:00:00PROOF OF SERVICE BY POSTING FILED BY PPC ANAHEIM APARTMENTS, LLC ON 01/28/2008
Date: 2008-01-28T00:00:00WRIT OF EXECUTION RETURNED - WHOLLY SATISFIED FILED BY PPC ANAHEIM APARTMENTS, LLC ON 12/30/2011
Date: December 30, 2011For full print and download access, please subscribe at https://www.trellis.law/.