Case Last Refreshed: 1 year ago
Capital Bank One, filed a(n) Collections - Creditor case against Rita Campbell, in the jurisdiction of Orange County. This case was filed in Orange County Superior Courts .
Case Number |
|
Filing DateJanuary 25, 2008 |
CategoryRule 3.740 Collections |
Last RefreshedMay 04, 2023 |
Practice AreaCreditor |
Filing LocationOrange County, CA |
Matter TypeCollections |
DECLARATION - OTHER (1033) FILED BY CAPITAL BANK ONE ON 12/02/2008
Date: December 02, 2008DECLARATION - OTHER (INTEREST; WAIVER OF ATTORNEY FEES) FILED BY CAPITAL BANK ONE ON 12/02/2008
Date: December 02, 2008JUDGMENT FILED BY CAPITAL BANK ONE ON 12/12/2008
Date: December 12, 2008REQUEST FOR DISMISSAL OF DOES FILED BY CAPITAL BANK ONE ON 12/02/2008
Date: December 02, 2008REQUEST FOR ENTRY OF DEFAULT FILED BY CAPITAL BANK ONE ON 12/02/2008
Date: 2008-12-02T00:00:00ABSTRACT-REJECTED
Date: June 11, 2009PROOF OF SERVICE OF SUMMONS FILED BY CAPITAL BANK ONE ON 01/25/2008
Date: 2008-01-25T00:00:00For full print and download access, please subscribe at https://www.trellis.law/.