Case Last Refreshed: 1 year ago
Lvnv Funding Llc, filed a(n) Collections - Creditor case against Bernard B. Bustamante, in the jurisdiction of Orange County. This case was filed in Orange County Superior Courts .
Case Number |
||
Filing DateOctober 17, 2007 |
CategoryRule 3.740 Collections |
|
Last RefreshedMay 04, 2023 |
Practice AreaCreditor |
Time to Dismissal Following Dispositive Motions322 days |
Filing LocationOrange County, CA |
Matter TypeCollections |
|
Case Cycle Time2083 days |
REQUEST FOR ENTRY OF DEFAULT FILED BY LVNV FUNDING LLC ON 09/03/2008
Date: September 03, 2008ACKNOWLEDGMENT OF FULL SATISFACTION OF JUDGMENT FILED BY LVNV FUNDING LLC ON 09/24/2010
Date: September 24, 2010REQUEST FOR DISMISSAL OF DOES FILED BY LVNV FUNDING LLC ON 09/03/2008
Date: 2008-09-03T00:00:00DECLARATION - OTHER FILED BY LVNV FUNDING LLC ON 09/03/2008
Date: 2008-09-03T00:00:00JUDGMENT FILED BY LVNV FUNDING LLC ON 09/03/2008
Date: 2008-09-03T00:00:00For full print and download access, please subscribe at https://www.trellis.law/.