We are checking for the latest updates in this case. We will email you when the process is complete.
Case Last Refreshed: 1 year ago
Capital One Bank ,
filed a(n)
Collections -
Creditor
case
against
Rogelio Moreno ,
in the jurisdiction of Orange County.
This case was filed in
Orange County
Superior Courts
.
Filing Date
October 17, 2007
Category
Rule 3.740 Collections
Last Refreshed
May 04, 2023
Time to Dismissal Following Dispositive Motions
64 days
Filing Location
Orange County, CA
Case Cycle Time
2083 days
Case Events for
Capital One Bank v. Rogelio Moreno
Date
Type
Description
June 30, 2013
Docket Event
CASE TRANSFERRED FROM NORTH JUSTICE CENTER TO CENTRAL JUSTICE CENTER, EFFECTIVE 07/01/2013.
March 19, 2008
Docket Event
PAYMENT RECEIVED BY FOR 42 - ABSTRACT OF JUDGMENT IN THE AMOUNT OF 15.00, TRANSACTION NUMBER 10076757 AND RECEIPT NUMBER 101141.
Get Document
March 15, 2008
Docket Event
ABSTRACT ISSUED AGAINST ROGELIO MORENO
December 21, 2007
Docket Event
DRAP - CLERKS
December 20, 2007
Docket Event
COURT ENTERS JUDGMENT FOR CAPITAL ONE BANK IN THE AMOUNT OF 4216.82 PRINCIPAL, 220.00 COSTS AND ATTORNEY FEES AGAINST MORENO, ROGELIO
December 20, 2007
Docket Event
REQUEST FOR DISMISSAL OF DOES FILED BY CAPITAL ONE BANK ON 12/20/2007
December 20, 2007
Docket Event
REQUEST FOR ENTRY OF DEFAULT FILED BY CAPITAL ONE BANK ON 12/20/2007
December 20, 2007
Docket Event
DECLARATION - OTHER (CLERKS) FILED BY CAPITAL ONE BANK ON 12/20/2007
December 20, 2007
Docket Event
JUDGMENT FILED BY CAPITAL ONE BANK ON 12/20/2007
November 02, 2007
Docket Event
PROOF OF SERVICE OF 30-DAY SUMMONS & COMPLAINT - SUBSTITUTE FILED BY CAPITAL ONE BANK ON 11/02/2007
See all events
For full print and download access, please subscribe at https://www.trellis.law/.