We are checking for the latest updates in this case. We will email you when the process is complete.
Case Last Refreshed: 1 year ago
Alfonso Gomez ,
filed a(n)
Unlawful Detainer -
Property
case
against
Ricardo Sanchez ,
in the jurisdiction of Orange County.
This case was filed in
Orange County
Superior Courts
.
Filing Date
October 17, 2007
Category
Unlawful Detainer - Residential
Last Refreshed
May 04, 2023
Time to Dismissal Following Dispositive Motions
106 days
Filing Location
Orange County, CA
Matter Type
Unlawful Detainer
Case Cycle Time
1889 days
Case Events for
Alfonso Gomez v. Ricardo Sanchez
Date
Type
Description
December 18, 2012
Docket Event
PAYMENT RECEIVED BY FOR 44 - COPY OF ANY RECORD (PER SIDE) IN THE AMOUNT OF 14.00, TRANSACTION NUMBER 11283361 AND RECEIPT NUMBER 11107253.
Get Document
March 18, 2010
Docket Event
WRIT OF EXECUTION RETURNED - UNSATISFIED FILED BY GOMEZ, ALFONSO ON 03/18/2010
Get Document
March 18, 2008
Docket Event
PAYMENT RECEIVED BY FOR 42 - WRIT IN THE AMOUNT OF 15.00, TRANSACTION NUMBER 10075625 AND RECEIPT NUMBER 100010.
Get Document
March 10, 2008
Docket Event
WRIT OF EXECUTION ISSUED FOR LOS ANGELES COUNTY
March 10, 2008
Docket Event
MEMORANDUM OF COSTS AFTER JUDGMENT; ACKNOWLEDGMENT OF CREDIT AND DECLARATION OF ACCRUED INTEREST - OR GREATER FILED BY GOMEZ, ALFONSO ON 03/10/2008
Get Document
January 31, 2008
Docket Event
JUDGMENT FILED BY GOMEZ, ALFONSO ON 01/31/2008
Get Document
January 31, 2008
Docket Event
CASE DISPOSED WITH DISPOSITION OF DEFAULT JUDGMENT BY COURT.
December 05, 2007
Docket Event
DECLARATION IN SUPPORT OF DEFAULT JUDGMENT BY COURT CCP 585(D) FILED BY GOMEZ, ALFONSO ON 12/05/2007
December 05, 2007
Docket Event
REQUEST FOR ENTRY OF DEFAULT (PREVIOUSLY ENTERED) FILED BY GOMEZ, ALFONSO ON 12/05/2007
December 05, 2007
Docket Event
REQUEST FOR DISMISSAL OF DOES FILED BY GOMEZ, ALFONSO ON 12/05/2007
See all events
For full print and download access, please subscribe at https://www.trellis.law/.