Case Last Refreshed: 1 year ago
Capital One Bank, filed a(n) Collections - Creditor case against Sandra F Toney, in the jurisdiction of Orange County. This case was filed in Orange County Superior Courts .
Case Number |
||
Filing DateOctober 17, 2007 |
CategoryRule 3.740 Collections |
|
Last RefreshedMay 04, 2023 |
Practice AreaCreditor |
Time to Dismissal Following Dispositive Motions212 days |
Filing LocationOrange County, CA |
Matter TypeCollections |
|
Case Cycle Time4158 days |
PROOF OF SERVICE OF 30-DAY SUMMONS & COMPLAINT - PERSONAL FILED BY CAPITAL ONE BANK ON 01/24/2008
Date: 2008-01-24T00:00:00WRIT OF EXECUTION RETURNED - UNSATISFIED FILED BY CAPITAL ONE BANK ON 01/22/2009
Date: 2009-01-22T00:00:00ASSOCIATION OF ATTORNEY FILED BY CAPITAL ONE BANK ON 01/28/2019
Date: January 28, 2019ACKNOWLEDGMENT OF FULL SATISFACTION OF JUDGMENT FILED BY CAPITAL ONE BANK ON 01/28/2019
Date: January 28, 2019REQUEST FOR ENTRY OF DEFAULT FILED BY CAPITAL ONE BANK ON 04/30/2008
Date: 2008-04-30T00:00:00CLERK'S CERTIFICATE OF MAILING/ELECTRONIC SERVICE
Date: March 06, 2019E-FILING TRANSACTION NUMBER 2756192 REJECTED.
Date: February 28, 2019DECLARATION IN SUPPORT OF DEFAULT JUDGMENT BY COURT CCP 585(D) FILED BY CAPITAL ONE BANK ON 04/30/2008
Date: 2008-04-30T00:00:00WRIT OF EXECUTION RETURNED - PARTIALLY SATISFIED FILED BY CAPITAL ONE BANK ON 10/08/2009
Date: October 08, 2009NOTICE OF CHANGE OF ADDRESS AND/OR TELEPHONE FILED BY CAPITAL ONE BANK ON 04/30/2008
Date: 2008-04-30T00:00:00REQUEST FOR DISMISSAL OF DOES FILED BY CAPITAL ONE BANK ON 04/30/2008
Date: 2008-04-30T00:00:00WRIT OF EXECUTION & MEMO OF COSTS REJECTED
Date: 2009-02-18T00:00:00For full print and download access, please subscribe at https://www.trellis.law/.