Case Last Refreshed: 1 year ago
Palisades Collection Llc, filed a(n) Collections - Creditor case against Hee S Noh, in the jurisdiction of Orange County. This case was filed in Orange County Superior Courts .
Case Number |
||
Filing DateOctober 17, 2007 |
CategoryRule 3.740 Collections |
|
Last RefreshedMay 04, 2023 |
Practice AreaCreditor |
Time to Dismissal Following Dispositive Motions89 days |
Filing LocationOrange County, CA |
Matter TypeCollections |
|
Case Cycle Time3871 days |
JUDGMENT FILED BY PALISADES COLLECTION LLC ON 01/14/2008
Date: 2008-01-14T00:00:00PROOF OF SERVICE FILED BY PALISADES COLLECTION LLC ON 11/02/2017
Date: November 02, 2017APPLICATION FOR AND RENEWAL OF JUDGMENT FILED BY PALISADES COLLECTION LLC ON 10/10/2017
Date: October 10, 2017NOTICE OF CHANGE OF FIRM NAME FILED BY PALISADES COLLECTION LLC ON 05/20/2009
Date: 2009-05-20T00:00:00DECLARATION - OTHER (OF NON-MILITARY STATUS) FILED BY PALISADES COLLECTION LLC ON 12/21/2015
Date: 2015-12-21T00:00:00WRIT OF EXECUTION RETURNED - UNSATISFIED FILED BY PALISADES COLLECTION LLC ON 07/03/2012
Date: 2012-07-03T00:00:00WRIT OF EXECUTION RETURNED - UNSATISFIED FILED BY PALISADES COLLECTION LLC ON 11/13/2009
Date: 2009-11-13T00:00:00REQUEST FOR ENTRY OF DEFAULT FILED BY PALISADES COLLECTION LLC ON 01/14/2008
Date: 2008-01-14T00:00:00SUBSTITUTION OF ATTORNEY FILED BY PALISADES COLLECTION LLC ON 12/21/2015
Date: 2015-12-21T00:00:00NOTICE OF RENEWAL OF JUDGMENT (ISSUED ON 10/16/2017) RECEIVED ON 10/10/2017.
Date: 2017-10-10T00:00:00NOTICE - OTHER FILED BY THE SUPERIOR COURT OF ORANGE ON 05/15/2009
Date: 2009-05-15T00:00:00WRIT (ISSUED ON 05/23/2018) RECEIVED ON 05/15/2018.
Date: May 15, 2018DECLARATION - OTHER (CLERKS) FILED BY PALISADES COLLECTION LLC ON 01/14/2008
Date: 2008-01-14T00:00:00DECLARATION - OTHER FILED BY PALISADES COLLECTION LLC ON 05/15/2018
Date: May 15, 2018For full print and download access, please subscribe at https://www.trellis.law/.