We are checking for the latest updates in this case. We will email you when the process is complete.
Case Last Refreshed: 1 year ago
Capital One Bank ,
filed a(n)
Collections -
Creditor
case
against
Dan Marin ,
in the jurisdiction of Orange County.
This case was filed in
Orange County
Superior Courts
.
Filing Date
October 17, 2007
Category
Rule 3.740 Collections
Last Refreshed
May 04, 2023
Time to Dismissal Following Dispositive Motions
54 days
Filing Location
Orange County, CA
Case Cycle Time
3207 days
Case Events for
Capital One Bank v. Dan Marin
Date
Type
Description
July 28, 2016
Docket Event
WRIT OF EXECUTION RETURNED - UNSATISFIED FILED BY CAPITAL ONE BANK ON 07/28/2016
Get Document
June 30, 2013
Docket Event
CASE TRANSFERRED FROM NORTH JUSTICE CENTER TO CENTRAL JUSTICE CENTER, EFFECTIVE 07/01/2013.
May 26, 2011
Docket Event
PAYMENT RECEIVED BY FOR 141 - ABSTRACT OF JUDGMENT, 141 - WRIT IN THE AMOUNT OF 50.00, TRANSACTION NUMBER 10914441 AND RECEIPT NUMBER 10738333.
Get Document
May 25, 2011
Docket Event
ABSTRACT ISSUED.
May 25, 2011
Docket Event
WRIT ISSUED.
November 16, 2010
Docket Event
ABSTRACT OF JUDGMENT (AND WRIT OF EXECUTION) SUBMITTED BY CAPITAL ONE BANK REJECTED ON 11/16/2010.
Get Document
September 24, 2010
Docket Event
SUBSTITUTION OF ATTORNEY FILED BY CAPITAL ONE BANK ON 09/24/2010
Get Document
February 23, 2009
Docket Event
DRAP - MD
March 04, 2008
Docket Event
PAYMENT RECEIVED BY FOR 42 - ABSTRACT OF JUDGMENT IN THE AMOUNT OF 15.00, TRANSACTION NUMBER 10066120 AND RECEIPT NUMBER 90505.
Get Document
March 01, 2008
Docket Event
ABSTRACT ISSUED.
See all events
For full print and download access, please subscribe at https://www.trellis.law/.