Case Last Refreshed: 1 year ago
Unifund Ccr Partners Assignee Of Palisades Collection, Llc, A Partnership Doing Business In California, filed a(n) Collections - Creditor case against Deborah J Camacho, in the jurisdiction of Orange County. This case was filed in Orange County Superior Courts .
Case Number |
||
Filing DateOctober 17, 2007 |
CategoryRule 3.740 Collections |
|
Last RefreshedMay 04, 2023 |
Practice AreaCreditor |
Time to Dismissal Following Dispositive Motions160 days |
Filing LocationOrange County, CA |
Matter TypeCollections |
|
Case Cycle Time2083 days |
NOTICE OF DISCHARGE (BANKRUPTCY) FILED BY CAMACHO, DEBORAH J ON 01/17/2012
Date: January 17, 2012REJECT CLERK JUDGMENT
Date: 2008-03-05T00:00:00NOTICE OF DISCHARGE (BANKRUPTCY) FILED BY CAMACHO, DEBORAH J ON 06/21/2011
Date: June 21, 2011NOTICE - OTHER (BANKRUPTCY) FILED BY THE SUPERIOR COURT OF ORANGE ON 03/10/2011
Date: March 07, 2011JUDGMENT
Date: 2008-03-25T00:00:00For full print and download access, please subscribe at https://www.trellis.law/.