Case Last Refreshed: 1 year ago
George J Higue, Dr, filed a(n) Unlawful Detainer - Property case against Dennis James Vartanian, in the jurisdiction of Orange County. This case was filed in Orange County Superior Courts .
Case Number |
||
Filing DateOctober 17, 2007 |
CategoryUnlawful Detainer - Residential |
|
Last RefreshedMay 04, 2023 |
Practice AreaProperty |
Time to Dismissal Following Dispositive Motions33 days |
Filing LocationOrange County, CA |
Matter TypeUnlawful Detainer |
|
Case Cycle Time75 days |
Date | Type | Description | |
---|---|---|---|
December 31, 2007 | Docket Event | WRIT OF POSSESSION RETURNED - WHOLLY SATISFIED FILED BY HIGUE, DR, GEORGE J ON 12/31/2007 | |
November 27, 2007 | Docket Event | PAYMENT RECEIVED FOR 42 - WRIT IN THE AMOUNT OF 15.00, TRANSACTION NUMBER 10008896 AND RECEIPT NUMBER 33349. | |
November 27, 2007 | Docket Event | WRIT OF POSSESSION ISSUED FOR ORANGE COUNTY AS TO DENNIS JAMES VARTANIAN FORWARDED TO SHERIFF | |
November 20, 2007 | Docket Event | JUDGMENT FILED BY HIGUE, DR, GEORGE J ON 11/20/2007 | |
November 19, 2007 | Docket Event | DRAP - IW | |
November 19, 2007 | Docket Event | MINUTES FINALIZED FOR COURT TRIAL 11/19/2007 09:00:00 AM. | |
November 19, 2007 | Docket Event | CASE DISPOSED WITH DISPOSITION OF DEFAULT JUDGMENT BY COURT. | |
November 19, 2007 | Docket Event | APPLICATION - OTHER (APPLICATION FOR WRIT OF POSSESSION-UD) FILED BY HIGUE, DR, GEORGE J ON 11/19/2007 | |
November 09, 2007 | Docket Event | NOTICE OF RULING FILED BY HIGUE, DR, GEORGE J ON 11/09/2007 | |
November 08, 2007 | Docket Event | COURT TRIAL SCHEDULED FOR 11/19/2007 AT 09:00:00 AM IN N18 AT NORTH JUSTICE CENTER. |
For full print and download access, please subscribe at https://www.trellis.law/.