We are checking for the latest updates in this case. We will email you when the process is complete.
Case Last Refreshed: 1 year ago
filed a(n)
Collections -
Creditor
case
in the jurisdiction of Orange County.
This case was filed in
Orange County
Superior Courts
.
|
Filing Date
October 17, 2007
|
Category
Rule 3.740 Collections
|
Last Refreshed
May 04, 2023
|
|
Time to Dismissal Following Dispositive Motions
189 days
|
Filing Location
Orange County, CA
|
|
Case Cycle Time
2083 days
|
Case Events for
Capital One Bank Vs. Sara E Hamblen
Date |
Type |
Description |
|
June 30, 2013 |
Docket Event |
CASE TRANSFERRED FROM NORTH JUSTICE CENTER TO CENTRAL JUSTICE CENTER, EFFECTIVE 07/01/2013.
|
|
April 23, 2008 |
Docket Event |
CASE DISMISSED WITH DISPOSITION OF REQUEST FOR DISMISSAL
|
|
April 22, 2008 |
Docket Event |
REQUEST FOR DISMISSAL WITHOUT PREJUDICE - ENTIRE ACTION FILED BY CAPITAL ONE BANK ON 04/22/2008
|
|
October 17, 2007 |
Docket Event |
SUMMONS ISSUED AND FILED FILED BY CAPITAL ONE BANK ON 10/17/2007
|
|
October 17, 2007 |
Docket Event |
PAYMENT RECEIVED FOR 30 - COMPLAINT OR OTHER 1ST PAPER <=$10K IN THE AMOUNT OF 180.00, TRANSACTION NUMBER 10000547 AND RECEIPT NUMBER 25048.
|
|
October 17, 2007 |
Docket Event |
COMPLAINT - COLLECTIONS 3.740 FILED BY CAPITAL ONE BANK ON 10/17/2007
|
|
See all events
For full print and download access, please subscribe at https://www.trellis.law/.