Case Last Refreshed: 1 year ago
Heritage Communites, L. P., filed a(n) Unlawful Detainer - Property case against Rosalba Cruz, Jose Luis Rodriguez, Francisco Rodriguez, Felipe Rodriguez, in the jurisdiction of Orange County. This case was filed in Orange County Superior Courts .
Case Number |
||
Filing DateOctober 17, 2007 |
CategoryUnlawful Detainer - Residential |
|
Last RefreshedMay 04, 2023 |
Practice AreaProperty |
Time to Dismissal Following Dispositive Motions13 days |
Filing LocationOrange County, CA |
Matter TypeUnlawful Detainer |
|
Case Cycle Time55 days |
Date | Type | Description | |
---|---|---|---|
December 11, 2007 | Docket Event | PAYMENT RECEIVED FOR 42 - WRIT IN THE AMOUNT OF 15.00, TRANSACTION NUMBER 10014433 AND RECEIPT NUMBER 38845. | |
November 30, 2007 | Docket Event | WRIT OF POSSESSION RETURNED - WHOLLY SATISFIED FILED BY HERITAGE COMMUNITES, L. P. ON 11/30/2007 | |
October 31, 2007 | Docket Event | WRIT OF POSSESSION ISSUED FOR ORANGE COUNTY | |
October 30, 2007 | Docket Event | APPLICATION FOR WRIT OF POSSESSION FILED BY HERITAGE COMMUNITES, L. P. ON 10/30/2007 | |
October 30, 2007 | Docket Event | PROOF OF SERVICE OF 5-DAY SUMMONS & COMPLAINT - PERSONAL FILED BY HERITAGE COMMUNITES, L. P. ON 10/30/2007 | |
October 30, 2007 | Docket Event | DRAP- IW FELIPE RODRIGUEZ, ROSALBA CRUZ, JOSE LUIS RODRIGUEZ, FRANCISCO RODRIGUEZ | |
October 30, 2007 | Docket Event | JUDGMENT FOR POSSESSION ONLY | |
October 30, 2007 | Docket Event | PROOF OF SERVICE OF SUMMONS & COMPLAINT - UNNAMED OCCUPANTS FILED BY HERITAGE COMMUNITES, L. P. ON 10/30/2007 | |
October 30, 2007 | Docket Event | REQUEST FOR ENTRY OF DEFAULT FILED BY HERITAGE COMMUNITES, L. P. ON 10/30/2007 | |
October 18, 2007 | Docket Event | CASE INITIATION FORM(S) HAVE BEEN GENERATED. |
For full print and download access, please subscribe at https://www.trellis.law/.