We are checking for the latest updates in this case. We will email you when the process is complete.
Case Last Refreshed: 1 year ago
Capital One Bank ,
filed a(n)
Collections -
Creditor
case
against
Troy M Younge ,
in the jurisdiction of Orange County.
This case was filed in
Orange County
Superior Courts
.
Filing Date
October 17, 2007
Category
Rule 3.740 Collections
Last Refreshed
May 04, 2023
Time to Dismissal Following Dispositive Motions
55 days
Filing Location
Orange County, CA
Case Cycle Time
2083 days
Case Events for
Capital One Bank v. Troy M Younge
Date
Type
Description
June 30, 2013
Docket Event
CASE TRANSFERRED FROM NORTH JUSTICE CENTER TO CENTRAL JUSTICE CENTER, EFFECTIVE 07/01/2013.
December 10, 2008
Docket Event
ACKNOWLEDGMENT OF FULL SATISFACTION OF JUDGMENT FILED BY CAPITAL ONE BANK ON 12/10/2008
Get Document
December 03, 2008
Docket Event
WRIT OF EXECUTION RETURNED - WHOLLY SATISFIED FILED BY CAPITAL ONE BANK ON 12/03/2008
Get Document
May 28, 2008
Docket Event
PAYMENT RECEIVED BY FOR 42 - WRIT IN THE AMOUNT OF 15.00, TRANSACTION NUMBER 10124774 AND RECEIPT NUMBER 149140.
Get Document
May 27, 2008
Docket Event
WRIT OF EXECUTION ISSUED FOR ORANGE COUNTY
May 09, 2008
Docket Event
MEMORANDUM OF COSTS AFTER JUDGMENT; ACKNOWLEDGMENT OF CREDIT AND DECLARATION OF ACCRUED INTEREST - OR GREATER FILED BY CAPITAL ONE BANK ON 05/09/2008
Get Document
February 21, 2008
Docket Event
PAYMENT RECEIVED BY FOR 42 - ABSTRACT OF JUDGMENT IN THE AMOUNT OF 15.00, TRANSACTION NUMBER 10057996 AND RECEIPT NUMBER 82403.
Get Document
February 21, 2008
Docket Event
ABSTRACT ISSUED.
December 11, 2007
Docket Event
CASE DISPOSED WITH DISPOSITION OF DEFAULT JUDGMENT BY CLERK.
December 11, 2007
Docket Event
JUDGMENT FILED BY CAPITAL ONE BANK ON 12/11/2007
See all events
For full print and download access, please subscribe at https://www.trellis.law/.