We are checking for the latest updates in this case. We will email you when the process is complete.
Case Last Refreshed: 1 year ago
Capital One Bank ,
filed a(n)
Collections -
Creditor
case
against
Earlean Bailey ,
in the jurisdiction of Orange County.
This case was filed in
Orange County
Superior Courts
.
Filing Date
October 17, 2007
Category
Rule 3.740 Collections
Last Refreshed
May 04, 2023
Time to Dismissal Following Dispositive Motions
139 days
Filing Location
Orange County, CA
Case Cycle Time
2083 days
Case Events for
Capital One Bank v. Earlean Bailey
Date
Type
Description
June 30, 2013
Docket Event
CASE TRANSFERRED FROM NORTH JUSTICE CENTER TO CENTRAL JUSTICE CENTER, EFFECTIVE 07/01/2013.
March 04, 2008
Docket Event
PAYMENT RECEIVED BY FOR FACSIMILE FILING PER PAGE IN THE AMOUNT OF 2.00, TRANSACTION NUMBER 10065742 AND RECEIPT NUMBER 90127.
Get Document
March 04, 2008
Docket Event
CASE DISMISSED WITH DISPOSITION OF REQUEST FOR DISMISSAL
March 04, 2008
Docket Event
DISM REC'VD 3/3/08
March 03, 2008
Docket Event
REQUEST FOR DISMISSAL WITHOUT PREJUDICE - ENTIRE ACTION FILED BY CAPITAL ONE BANK ON 03/03/2008
Get Document
October 17, 2007
Docket Event
COMPLAINT - COLLECTIONS 3.740 FILED BY CAPITAL ONE BANK ON 10/17/2007
October 17, 2007
Docket Event
SUMMONS ISSUED AND FILED FILED BY CAPITAL ONE BANK ON 10/17/2007
October 17, 2007
Docket Event
PAYMENT RECEIVED FOR 30 - COMPLAINT OR OTHER 1ST PAPER <=$10K IN THE AMOUNT OF 180.00, TRANSACTION NUMBER 10000472 AND RECEIPT NUMBER 24974.
See all events
For full print and download access, please subscribe at https://www.trellis.law/.