Case Last Refreshed: 1 year ago
Cavalry Spv I Llc, filed a(n) Ac Suit On Account case represented by Pittenger , Brandon Taylor, against Williams , Ronald, in the jurisdiction of St. Louis City, MO, . St. Louis City, MO Superior Courts MO-City of St. Louis with MILLIKAN, SCOTT ANTHONY presiding.
Case Number |
|
Filing DateDecember 02, 2016 |
CategoryAc Suit On Account |
Last RefreshedSeptember 30, 2022 |
|
Filing LocationSt. Louis City, MO |
|
Filing Court HouseMO-City of St. Louis |
Case Outcome TypeDismiss By Ct W/O Prejudice |
Date | Type | Description | |
---|---|---|---|
April 04, 2018 | Docket Event |
Judge/Clerk - Note CASE TAXED |
|
March 30, 2018 | Docket Event |
Dismiss by Ct w/o Prejudice Cause having been placed on the dismissal docket 30-MARCH-2018 .And published in the St. Louis Daily Record 10 (ten) days in advance of the docket date. This cause shall stand dismissed without prejudice on 30-MARCH-2018 for failure to prosecute at Plaintiff¿s cost. SO ORDERED JUDGE SCOTT A. MILLIKAN, 56571 Associated Entries: 03/01/2017 - Hearing Continued/Rescheduled \n Associated Entries: 01/16/2018 - Dismissal Hearing Scheduled \n Scheduled For: 03/30/2018; 1:30 PM ; SCOTT ANTHONY MILLIKAN; City of St. Louis |
|
January 16, 2018 | Hearing |
Dismissal Hearing Scheduled Associated Entries: 03/30/2018 - Dismiss by Ct w/o Prejudice Cause having been placed on the dismissal docket 30-MARCH-2018 .And published in the St. Louis Daily Record 10 (ten) days in advance of the docket date. This cause shall stand dismissed without prejudice on 30-MARCH-2018 for failure to prosecute at Plaintiff¿s cost. SO ORDERED JUDGE SCOTT A. MILLIKAN, 56571 \n Scheduled For: 03/30/2018; 1:30 PM ; SCOTT ANTHONY MILLIKAN; City of St. Louis |
|
January 16, 2018 | Hearing |
Hearing Continued/Rescheduled THIS CAUSE PLACED ON DISMISSAL DOCKET DUE TO NO ACTION TAKEN ON THIS CASE ON SCHEDULED COURT DATE. Hearing Continued From: 01/16/2018; 9:30 AM Hearing |
|
December 28, 2017 | Hearing |
Hearing Scheduled Associated Entries: 01/16/2018 - Hearing Continued/Rescheduled THIS CAUSE PLACED ON DISMISSAL DOCKET DUE TO NO ACTION TAKEN ON THIS CASE ON SCHEDULED COURT DATE. \n Scheduled For: 01/16/2018; 9:30 AM ; SCOTT ANTHONY MILLIKAN; City of St. Louis |
|
December 28, 2017 | Hearing |
Hearing Continued/Rescheduled Hearing Continued From: 12/05/2017; 9:30 AM Hearing |
|
November 22, 2017 | Hearing |
Hearing Continued/Rescheduled Hearing Continued From: 11/22/2017; 9:30 AM Hearing |
|
November 22, 2017 | Hearing |
Hearing Scheduled Associated Entries: 12/28/2017 - Hearing Continued/Rescheduled \n Scheduled For: 12/05/2017; 9:30 AM ; NICOLE JEAN COLBERT BOTCHWAY; City of St. Louis |
|
October 25, 2017 | Hearing |
Hearing Scheduled Associated Entries: 11/22/2017 - Hearing Continued/Rescheduled \n Scheduled For: 11/22/2017; 9:30 AM ; NICOLE JEAN COLBERT BOTCHWAY; City of St. Louis |
|
October 25, 2017 | Hearing |
Hearing Continued/Rescheduled Hearing Continued From: 10/25/2017; 9:30 AM Hearing |
For full print and download access, please subscribe at https://www.trellis.law/.