Case Last Refreshed: 6 months ago
Barclays Bank Delaware, filed a(n) Breach of Contract - Commercial case represented by Ryczek , Thomas Andrew, against Patterson , Jacqueline M, in the jurisdiction of St. Louis City, MO, . St. Louis City, MO Superior Courts MO-City of St. Louis with NICOLE COLBERT-BOTCHWAY presiding.
Case Number |
|
Filing DateDecember 02, 2016 |
CategoryAc Breach Of Contract |
Last RefreshedOctober 21, 2023 |
Practice AreaCommercial |
Filing LocationSt. Louis City, MO |
Matter TypeBreach of Contract |
Filing Court HouseMO-City of St. Louis |
Case Outcome TypeDefault Judgment |
Judgment Entered
Date: July 10, 2017Date | Type | Description | |
---|---|---|---|
August 18, 2021 | Docket Event | Withdrawal of Attorney Filed | |
August 18, 2021 | Docket Event |
Withdrawal of Attorney Filed WITHDRAWAL AND ENTRY OF APPEARANCE on behalf of Plaintiff, Barclays Bank Delaware the above styled cause of action; Electronic Filing Certificate of Service. Filed By: DAVID JOSEPH PAGE \n On Behalf Of: BARCLAYS BANK DELAWARE |
|
July 14, 2017 | Docket Event | Judge/Clerk - Note | |
July 14, 2017 | Docket Event |
Judge/Clerk - Note CASE TAXED |
|
July 10, 2017 | Docket Event |
Judgment Entered PLAINTIFF APPEARS OR WITH ATTORNEY AND DEFENDANT APPEARS NOT. DEFAULT JUDGMENT ENTERED FOR PLAINTIFF AND AGAINST DEFENDANT IN THE AMOUNT OF $1915.71. PLUS COURT COST. SO ORDERED: JUDGE NICOLE COLBERT-BOTCHWAY #44856 |
|
July 10, 2017 | Docket Event | Judgment Entered | |
July 10, 2017 | Docket Event | Default Judgment | |
July 10, 2017 | Docket Event |
Default Judgment Associated Entries: 03/09/2017 - Hearing Continued/Rescheduled \n Associated Entries: 05/26/2017 - Hearing Scheduled \n Scheduled For: 07/10/2017; 9:30 AM ; NICOLE JEAN COLBERT BOTCHWAY; City of St. Louis |
|
June 16, 2017 | Docket Event | Summons Personally Served | |
June 16, 2017 | Docket Event |
Summons Personally Served Document ID - 17-AASM-3160; Served To - PATTERSON, JACQUELINE M; Server - REGINALD, JOHNSON, SERVICE DEPUTY; Served Date - 14-JUN-17; Served Time - 15:50:00; Service Type - Sheriff Department; Reason Description - Served |
For full print and download access, please subscribe at https://www.trellis.law/.