Case Last Refreshed: 1 year ago
Robinson , Keenan Wayne filed a(n) Cc Motn, Rules 29.15 Or 24.035 case in the jurisdiction of St. Louis City, MO, . St. Louis City, MO Superior Courts MO-City of St. Louis with SWEENEY, EDWARD WILLIAM JR presiding.
Case Number |
|
Filing DateDecember 06, 2013 |
CategoryCc Motn, Rules 29.15 Or 24.035 |
Last RefreshedSeptember 30, 2022 |
|
Filing LocationSt. Louis City, MO |
|
Filing Court HouseMO-City of St. Louis |
Case Outcome TypeDismiss By Ct W/ Prejudice |
Date | Type | Description | |
---|---|---|---|
February 19, 2014 | Docket Event |
Memorandum Filed memorandum; Electronic Filing Certificate of Service. Filed By: THOMAS L DUDASH |
|
January 21, 2014 | Docket Event |
Judge/Clerk - Note CASE TAXED |
|
January 17, 2014 | Docket Event |
Dismiss by Ct w/ Prejudice VOLUNTARY DISMISSAL GRANTED. SO ORDERED:24064-HON. JUDGE SWEENEY Filed By: ANDREW EDWARD ZLEIT |
|
January 16, 2014 | Docket Event |
Notice of Dismissal 1322-CC10109 voluntary dismissal. Filed By: ANDREW EDWARD ZLEIT \n On Behalf Of: KEENAN WAYNE ROBINSON |
|
December 23, 2013 | Docket Event |
Motion for Extension of Time Motion for Additional Time. Filed By: ANDREW EDWARD ZLEIT \n On Behalf Of: KEENAN WAYNE ROBINSON |
|
December 10, 2013 | Docket Event |
Judge/Clerk - Note Letter to inmate |
|
December 10, 2013 | Docket Event |
Judge Assigned Post Conviction Relief motion under Supreme Court Rule 24.035 filed. Relating Criminal Case 1222-CR05313-01 |
|
December 10, 2013 | Docket Event |
Judge/Clerk - Note letter to Michael Zajel-Court Reporter |
|
December 06, 2013 | Docket Event | Pet Filed in Circuit Ct | |
December 06, 2013 | Docket Event | Motion to Set Aside |
For full print and download access, please subscribe at https://www.trellis.law/.