Case Last Refreshed: 1 year ago
Campbell , Eric Eugene filed a(n) Cc Motn, Rules 29.15 Or 24.035 case in the jurisdiction of St. Louis City, MO, . St. Louis City, MO Superior Courts MO-City of St. Louis with OHMER, STEVEN RUSSELL presiding.
Case Number |
|
Filing DateDecember 06, 2013 |
CategoryCc Motn, Rules 29.15 Or 24.035 |
Last RefreshedSeptember 30, 2022 |
|
Filing LocationSt. Louis City, MO |
|
Filing Court HouseMO-City of St. Louis |
Case Outcome TypeDismissed By Parties |
Date | Type | Description | |
---|---|---|---|
August 11, 2015 | Docket Event |
Certif Copies/Leg File Prepard Legal File sent to Public Defender |
|
April 08, 2014 | Docket Event | Dismissed by Parties | |
April 08, 2014 | Docket Event |
Voluntary Dismissal Filed Voluntary Dismissal; Electronic Filing Certificate of Service. Filed By: TIMOTHY JOSEPH FORNERIS \n On Behalf Of: ERIC EUGENE CAMPBELL |
|
February 07, 2014 | Docket Event |
Memorandum Filed Memorandum; Notice of Assignment: States hereby assigns cause to ACA Sean O'Hagan.Electronic Filing Certificate of Service. Filed By: SEAN JAMES O'HAGAN |
|
January 27, 2014 | Docket Event |
Transcript Filed TRANSCRIPT OF PROCEEDINGS, FILED |
|
December 19, 2013 | Docket Event |
Motion for Extension of Time Motion for Additional Time. Filed By: TIMOTHY JOSEPH FORNERIS \n On Behalf Of: ERIC EUGENE CAMPBELL |
|
December 19, 2013 | Docket Event |
Entry of Appearance Filed EOA. Filed By: TIMOTHY JOSEPH FORNERIS \n On Behalf Of: ERIC EUGENE CAMPBELL |
|
December 12, 2013 | Docket Event | ORDER OF COURT RELATING TO POSTCONVICTION PROCEEDINGS SO ORDERED JUDGE STEVEN OHMER | |
December 09, 2013 | Docket Event |
Judge Assigned Post Conviction Relief motion under Supreme Court Rule 24.035 filed. Relating Criminal Case 1222-cr00513-01 |
|
December 09, 2013 | Docket Event |
Judge/Clerk - Note Letter to inmate |
For full print and download access, please subscribe at https://www.trellis.law/.